Fiorito v. Fikes
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Respondent: Warden J. Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00749
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Michael Fiorito need not respond to the April 11, 2022 order to show cause in Case No. 22-CV-0797 [ECF No. 4]. 2. The remainder of plaintiff's motions filed on May 20, 2022 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/23/2022. (CLG)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION Seeking Clarification and Possibly Leave of the Court filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying #5 Motion to Adopt the Application to Proceed IFP from Another Matter. SEE ORDER FOR DATES AND DETAILS. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/9/2022. (CLG)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 22-CV-0759 (NEB/JFD), 22-CV-0797 (WMW/BRT), 22-CV-0923 (NEB/LIB), 22-CV-0924 (WMW/ECW), 22-CV-0925 (JRT/DTS),22-CV-0927 (ECT/LIB) have been reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/18/2022. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/19/2022.(MMG)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by J. Fikes Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Adopt IFP Application from case 22-cv-512 filed by Michael Fiorito. (MMG)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Authorized Prison Official, #2 Envelope)(MMG)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of J. Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Michael Fiorito (JGK)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Fiorito. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorito v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden J. Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?