White, et al v. Natl Football League, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Reggie White, Michael Buck, Hardy Nickerson, Vann McElroy and Dave Duerson
Defendant: Five Smiths, Inc., The, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston Oilers, Inc., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Los Angeles Raiders, Ltd., The, Los Angeles Rams Football Co., Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club, Inc., KMS Patriots, L.P., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., B & B Holdings, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Chargers Football Co, Tampa Bay Area NFL Football Club, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., The, Cleveland Browns, Inc., National Football League, Seattle Seahawks Inc, New Orleans Saints, LP and San Francisco Forty-Niners Ltd., The
Respondent: National Football League Management Council
Counter_claimant: Five Smiths, Inc., The, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston Oilers, Inc., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Los Angeles Raiders, Ltd., The, Los Angeles Rams Football Co., Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club, Inc., KMS Patriots, L.P., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., The, B & B Holdings, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Chargers Football Co, Tampa Bay Area NFL Football Club, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Cleveland Browns, Inc., National Football League, Seattle Seahawks Inc, New Orleans Saints, LP and San Francisco Forty-Niners Ltd., The
Counter_defendant: Reggie White, Michael Buck, Hardy Nickerson, Vann McElroy and Dave Duerson
Objector: Michael C Johnson, Reggie Langhorne, Maurice Hurst, John Fourcade, Byron Evans, Brian Pressler, Robert J Sheridan, Paul Gruber, Brian Washington, Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton, Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Don Beebe, Gregory Scales, Mark Dusbabek, Carl Lee, Audray McMillian, Felix Wright, Cody Risien, Mark Harper, Sammy Martin, Mike Farr, Pepper Johnson, Barry Sanders, Luis Sharpe, Steve Atwater, Horatio Bennie Blades, James Hasty, Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren, Roland James, Brian Blades, Wilber Marshall, Gregory J Baty, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., The, Kenneth F Ruettgers, Pat Carter, Jerry Ball, Jeff Bostic, Todd Bowles, Ray Brown, Jason Buck, Earnest A Byner, Desmond Howard, Anthony Johnson, Brian Mitchell, Ricky Sanders, Paul Siever, John Elliott, Duane Bickett, Steve Young, Jesse Becton, Scott Brown, Rudy Thompson, Ernie Lewis, Eugene Brown, Percy Coleman, James Chinn, Ron Alexander, Brad LaCombe, Dan Purcell, Steve Ross, Ron Moran, Steve Robinson, Garrett Washington, Bennie Hargro, Steinberg, Moorad & Dunn and Gary Wichard
Special_master: Stephen B Burbank
Movant: NFL Players Association
Case Number: 4:1992cv00906
Filed: September 21, 1992
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: MPLS Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Doty
Presiding Judge: Special Master
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2011 TEXT ENTRY ONLY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims pending regarding the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement 637 are dismissed. All other outstanding motions - 642 ; 652 and 677 are dismissed. By Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/11/2011. (PJM)
August 4, 2011 Filing 701 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of claims regarding the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement by National Football League and Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Block, Benjamin) Modified filers on 8/5/2011 (jz).
July 8, 2011 Filing 700 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott A Benson (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Notice of Deceased Party)(Benson, Scott)
June 2, 2011 Filing 699 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/12/2011 before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (83 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 6/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori)
June 2, 2011 Filing 698 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori)
May 12, 2011 Filing 697 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Hearing held on 5/12/2011 re: Money Damages and Equitable Relief - argued and taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (CLB)
April 28, 2011 Filing 696 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 695 Reply, (Thornton, Timothy)
April 28, 2011 Filing 695 REPLY re 676 Order IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MONEY DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 1, 2011 (REDACTED) filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 4/28/11. (Thornton, Timothy) Modified on 4/29/2011 (akl).
April 21, 2011 Filing 694 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 693 Declaration in Support, 692 Memorandum, (Connolly, Daniel)
April 21, 2011 Filing 693 Declaration of Benjamin C. Block in Support of 692 Memorandum, filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Errata B)(Connolly, Daniel)
April 21, 2011 Filing 692 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 688 Memorandum,, filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Daniel) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFICE ON 4/21/11. (KT) Modified text on 4/22/2011 (jz).
March 31, 2011 Filing 691 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 689 Declaration, 687 Notice (Other), 688 Memorandum, 690 Declaration (Thornton, Timothy)
March 31, 2011 Filing 690 DECLARATION of DAVID L. GREENSPAN re 688 Memorandum, by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Thornton, Timothy)
March 31, 2011 Filing 689 DECLARATION of DAVID SCHULTE re 688 Memorandum, by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White PLACEHOLDER FOR DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL. (Thornton, Timothy) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERk'S OFFICE ON 3/31/11. (KT)
March 31, 2011 Filing 688 MEMORANDUM by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 676 Order CLASS COUNSEL'S AND THE NFLPA'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MONEY DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 1,2011 filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thornton, Timothy) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERk'S OFFICE ON 3/31/11. (KT)
March 31, 2011 Filing 687 NOTICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 676 Order OF HEARING - 5/12/2011, 9:00 A.M., COURTROOM 14W, MINNEAPOLIS COURTHOUSE (Thornton, Timothy)
March 16, 2011 Filing 686 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 683 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 685 Declaration in Support, 684 Declaration in Support (Connolly, Daniel)
March 16, 2011 Filing 685 Declaration of Benjamin C. Block in Support of 683 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - R, # 2 Exhibit(s) S - II)(Connolly, Daniel)
March 16, 2011 Filing 684 Declaration of Brian Rolapp in Support of 683 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Connolly, Daniel)
March 16, 2011 Filing 683 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 677 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Daniel)
March 11, 2011 Filing 682 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Lloyd, Charles)
March 11, 2011 Filing 681 MEMORANDUM in Support re 677 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document filed by St. Paul Pioneer Press, Star Tribune. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hannah, Paul)
March 9, 2011 Filing 680 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 677 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document (Thornton, Timothy)
March 9, 2011 Filing 679 Declaration of DAVID BARRETT in Support of 677 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Thornton, Timothy)
March 9, 2011 Filing 678 MEMORANDUM in Support re 677 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thornton, Timothy)
March 9, 2011 Filing 677 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, NFL Players Association, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Thornton, Timothy)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 676 AMENDED ORDER to correct counsel appearances re Appeal from Special Master's Decision dated February 1, 2011 (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/1/2011. (PJM)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER re Appeal from Special Master's Decision dated February 1, 2011.(Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/1/2011. (PJM)
February 28, 2011 Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on February 24, 2011 before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (101 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 3/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (cb)
February 28, 2011 Filing 673 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (cb)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER granting 664 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Joshua Johanningmeier to Serve as Local Counsel for DIRECTV, Inc.; granting 664 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Andrew E. Paris for DIRECTV, Inc. Fee paid; receipt number 0864-2723053. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/25/11. (MMC)
February 24, 2011 Filing 671 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 669 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Connolly, Daniel)
February 24, 2011 Filing 670 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 667 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 668 Status Report (Jacobson, Mark)
February 24, 2011 Filing 669 REDACTED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 637 MOTION Objection to Special Master Recommendation regarding Broadcase Revenues filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 2/24/2011 (jz).
February 24, 2011 Filing 668 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT REDACTED Opinion in Broadcast Revenue Proceeding. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 24, 2011 Filing 667 MEMORANDUM in Support re 637 MOTION Objection to Special Master Recommendation REDACTED filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 24, 2011 Filing 666 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2011 re 652 MOTION to Intervene - granted & and motion to unseal all documents - argued & granted, in part - filed by Star Tribune & St. Paul Pioneer Press. 637 Objection to Special Master Recommendation filed by Reggie White, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Michael Buck & Hardy Nickerson - argued and taken under advisement. 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part filed by Reggie White, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Michael Buck, Hardy Nickerson - argued and granted. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (CLB)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER re the redacted versions of the February 1, 2011 Opinion of the Special Master. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/24/2011. (PJM)
February 23, 2011 Filing 664 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andrew E. Paris. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2723053 by DIRECTV, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Permission for a Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Johanningmeier, Joshua) Modified on 2/24/2011 (MMC).
February 23, 2011 Filing 663 RESPONSE in Opposition re 652 MOTION to Intervene Non-Party DIRECTV, Inc.'s Opposition to Intervenors' Motion to Unseal Record filed by DIRECTV, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Johanningmeier, Joshua)
February 23, 2011 Filing 662 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 661 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Connolly, Daniel)
February 23, 2011 Filing 661 RESPONSE in Opposition re 652 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal all Documents Filed Under Seal filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Daniel)
February 22, 2011 Filing 660 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 659 Declaration in Support, (Benjamin C. Block (Exhs. G & H under seal)) (Connolly, Daniel)
February 22, 2011 Filing 659 Declaration of Benjamin C. Block in Support of 657 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-F, # 2 Exhibit(s) G (Placeholder), # 3 Exhibit(s) H (Placeholder))(Connolly, Daniel) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 2/22/11 Modified on 2/23/2011 (JAM).
February 22, 2011 Filing 658 Declaration of Brian Rolapp in Support of 657 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Connolly, Daniel)
February 22, 2011 Filing 657 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Daniel)
February 22, 2011 Filing 656 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by St. Paul Pioneer Press, Star Tribune re 655 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 654 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 653 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 652 MOTION to Intervene (Hannah, Paul)
February 22, 2011 Filing 655 AFFIDAVIT of Paul R. Hannah in SUPPORT OF 652 MOTION to Intervene filed by St. Paul Pioneer Press, Star Tribune. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hannah, Paul)
February 22, 2011 Filing 654 MEMORANDUM in Support re 652 MOTION to Intervene filed by St. Paul Pioneer Press, Star Tribune. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hannah, Paul)
February 22, 2011 Filing 653 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 652 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Hannah, Paul)
February 22, 2011 Filing 652 MOTION to Intervene by St. Paul Pioneer Press, Star Tribune. (Hannah, Paul)
February 22, 2011 Filing 651 MEMORANDUM by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 639 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Memorandum Filed Under Seal) filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 2/18/11 Modified on 2/23/2011 (jam).
February 21, 2011 Filing 650 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D Van Oort on behalf of National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Van Oort, Aaron)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER granting 647 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/17/2011. (PJM)
February 16, 2011 Filing 648 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 647 MOTION to Expedite Briefing (Jacobson, Mark)
February 16, 2011 Filing 647 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 16, 2011 Filing 646 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 645 Declaration in Support, 643 Notice (Other), 644 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part (Jacobson, Mark)
February 16, 2011 Filing 645 Declaration of David Barrett in Support of 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Jacobson, Mark) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/16/11. (KT)
February 16, 2011 Filing 644 MEMORANDUM in Support re 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark)
February 16, 2011 Filing 643 NOTICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part re 642 MOTION: no hearing date set. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified on 2/16/2011 (kt).
February 16, 2011 Filing 642 MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document and Lift Protective Order in Part by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 11, 2011 Filing 641 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 639 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 638 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 637 MOTION/Objection to Special Master Recommendation, 640 Declaration in Support (Jacobson, Mark) Modified text on 2/14/2011 (akl).
February 11, 2011 Filing 640 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 637 MOTION/Objection to Special Master Recommendation filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified text on 2/14/2011 (akl).
February 11, 2011 Filing 639 MEMORANDUM in Support re 637 MOTION/Objection to Special Master Recommendation filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark) Modified text on 2/14/2011 (akl).
February 11, 2011 Filing 638 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re 637 Motion/Objection to Special Master Recommendation: Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified link and text on 2/14/2011 (akl).
February 11, 2011 Filing 637 MOTION/Objection to Special Master Recommendation by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified text on 2/14/2011 (akl).
February 10, 2011 Filing 636 LETTER from Senior Judge David S. Doty regarding request to file briefs and supporting materials. (PJM)
February 10, 2011 Filing 635 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 9, 2011 Filing 634 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 631 Letter to District Judge. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified on 2/10/2011 (kt).
February 9, 2011 Filing 633 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Index, # 2 Placeholder for Record)(Jacobson, Mark)
February 4, 2011 Filing 632 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 631 Letter to District Judge dated 2-4-11 (Jacobson, Mark)
February 4, 2011 Filing 631 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re trial record by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White dated 2-4-2011. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified on 2/4/2011 (kt).
February 4, 2011 Filing 630 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R Thornton on behalf of Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Thornton, Timothy)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 627 , 628 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorneys Leah E. Pogoriler and Paul W. Schmidt for National Football League. Fees paid; receipt number 3-007741.Approved by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/17/10. (MMC)
November 16, 2010 Filing 629 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League re 628 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul W. Schmidt, 627 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Leah E. Pogoriler (Connolly, Daniel)
November 16, 2010 Filing 628 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul W. Schmidt by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
November 16, 2010 Filing 627 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Leah E. Pogoriler by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
September 24, 2010 Filing 626 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re final payment by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kirwin, Anthony) Modified on 9/24/2010 (kt).
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER granting 624 Stipulated Motion to Authorize Final Distributions to Class Members from the Settlement Fund. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/2/2010. (PJM)
September 1, 2010 Filing 624 MOTION authorize final distributions to class members by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kirwin, Anthony)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 620 , 621 , 622 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys David A. Barrett, James R. Barrett and Thomas J. Heiden for NFL Players Association. Fees paid; receipt number 4-047783.Approved by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/16/10. (MMC)
August 16, 2010 Filing 623 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NFL Players Association re 622 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Heiden, 621 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James R. Barrett, 620 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David A. Barrett (Kirwin, Anthony)
August 16, 2010 Filing 622 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Heiden by NFL Players Association. (Kirwin, Anthony)
August 16, 2010 Filing 621 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James R. Barrett by NFL Players Association. (Kirwin, Anthony)
August 16, 2010 Filing 620 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David A. Barrett by NFL Players Association. (Kirwin, Anthony)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 619 Second Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather McPhee for Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. Fee paid; receipt number 4-046422. Approved by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/5/10. (MMC)
August 5, 2010 Filing 619 SECOND AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Heather McPhee by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kirwin, Anthony) Modified on 8/5/2010 (MMC).
July 6, 2010 Filing 618 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Mark A. Jacobson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Mark)
June 28, 2010 Filing 617 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White re 616 Amended MOTION to Amend/CorrectMOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Heather McPhee (Kirwin, Anthony)
June 28, 2010 Filing 616 WITHDRAWN - see doc. #618. AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Heather McPhee by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Kirwin, Anthony) Modified on 6/30/2010 (MMC). Modified on 8/5/2010 (MMC).
June 25, 2010 Filing 615 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #616. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Heather McPhee by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kirwin, Anthony) Modified on 6/30/2010 (MMC).
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting 613 Motion to Extend Deadline for Class Members to Contact the NFLPA. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/20/2010. (PJM)
January 20, 2010 Filing 613 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Class Members to Contact the NFLPA by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Mark)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER granting 609 Stipulated Motion to Modify Time to Object to Special Master's Discovery Ruling. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/19/2010. (PJM)
January 15, 2010 Filing 611 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White re 610 Declaration in Support, 609 MOTION Modify the time to object to the Special Master's discovery ruling (Jacobson, Mark)
January 15, 2010 Filing 610 Declaration of Mark A. Jacobson in Support of 609 MOTION Modify the time to object to the Special Master's discovery ruling filed by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Vann McElroy, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Jacobson, Mark)
January 15, 2010 Filing 609 MOTION Modify the time to object to the Special Master's discovery ruling by Michael Buck, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White. (Jacobson, Mark)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 608 Second Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney DeMaurice Smith for NFL Players Association. Fee paid; receipt number 4-039923. Approved by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/6/10. (MMC)
January 6, 2010 Filing 608 SECOND AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for DeMaurice Smith by NFL Players Association. (Rau, Steven) Modified on 1/6/2010 (MMC).
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER granting 593 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A, B and C) (PJM)
December 23, 2009 Filing 606 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - will be refiled. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for DeMaurice F. Smith by NFL Players Association. (Rau, Steven) Modified on 12/28/2009 (MMC).
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER of USCA re: Appellees shall recover from the appellants the sum of $378.61 as taxable costs on appeal, as to 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League (received electronically from COA). (jam)
December 11, 2009 Filing 603 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - will be refiled. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for DeMaurice Smith by NFL Players Association. (Rau, Steven) Modified on 12/28/2009 (MMC).
December 11, 2009 Filing 602 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2009 re 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund filed by Reggie White, Michael Buck, National Football League, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Detroit Lions, Inc., Minnesota Vikings Football Club, Inc., Dave Duerson, Seattle Seahawks Inc, Tampa Bay Area NFL Football Club, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Chargers Football Co, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., KMS Patriots, L.P., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Los Angeles Rams Football Co., Inc., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., The, New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Houston Oilers, Inc., Buffalo Bills, Inc., Vann McElroy, PDB Sports, Ltd., New Orleans Saints, LP, San Francisco Forty-Niners Ltd., The, Five Smiths, Inc., The, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., B & B Holdings, Inc., Hardy Nickerson, Los Angeles Raiders, Ltd., The, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., The, New York Football Giants, Inc., Cleveland Browns, Inc., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc. - granted. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (CLB)
December 10, 2009 Filing 604 MANDATE of USCA re: the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter, as to 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League (received electronically from COA). (jam)
November 19, 2009 Filing 601 RESPONSE re 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
November 10, 2009 Filing 600 USCA JUDGMENT re: it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court, as to 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League (received electronically from COA). (jam)
November 10, 2009 Filing 599 Opinion of USCA re: The judgment is affirmed, as to 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(jam)
October 27, 2009 Filing 598 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs re 597 Declaration in Support, 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund, 596 Declaration in Support, 594 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 595 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Jacobson, Mark) Modified filers and text on 10/28/2009 (jam).
October 27, 2009 Filing 597 Declaration of David G. Feher in Support of 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund filed by plaintiffs and defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A through C, # 2 Exhibit(s) D, # 3 Exhibit(s) D1, # 4 Exhibit(s) D2, # 5 Exhibit(s) D3, # 6 Exhibit(s) D4, # 7 Exhibit(s) D5, # 8 Exhibit(s) D6)(Jacobson, Mark) Modified filers on 10/28/2009 (jam).
October 27, 2009 Filing 596 Declaration of DeMaurice Smith in Support of 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund filed by plaintiffs and defendants. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified filers on 10/28/2009 (jam).
October 27, 2009 Filing 595 MEMORANDUM in Support re 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund filed by plaintiffs and defendants. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark) Modified filers on 10/28/2009 (jam).
October 27, 2009 Filing 594 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2009 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 8E (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Jacobson, Mark)
October 27, 2009 Filing 593 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and to Close the Settlement Fund by plaintiffs and defendants. (Jacobson, Mark) Modified filers on 10/28/2009 (jam).
December 17, 2008 Filing 592 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re Objection of Class Counsel and the NFL Players Association to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Dated December 1, 2008, Regarding Jimmy Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Mark)
May 7, 2008 Filing 591 NOTICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Certification that no transcript will be ordered (Block, Benjamin)
May 2, 2008 Filing 590 USCA Case Number 08-2001 for 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League. (akl)
April 29, 2008 Filing 589 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal, # 2 Form A)(jz)
April 29, 2008 Filing 588 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 40023306 re 587 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League (jz) QC'd by KT on 5/7/08. (KT)
April 28, 2008 Filing 587 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to 574 Order, 586 Order on Motion to Vacate by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 COA - Form A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Block, Benjamin)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER denying 575 Motion to Vacate Judgment.(Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/22/2008. (PJM)
March 19, 2008 Filing 585 REPLY re 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Block, Benjamin)
March 7, 2008 Filing 584 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 583 Declaration in Support, 582 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Jacobson, Mark)
March 7, 2008 Filing 583 Declaration of Eva W. Cole in Support of 582 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C, # 2 Exhibit(s) D)(Jacobson, Mark)
March 7, 2008 Filing 582 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment filed by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson, Houston Oilers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment filed by National Football League Management Council, National Football League. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/15/2008. (PJM)
February 14, 2008 Filing 580 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 579 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 576 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 578 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, 577 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment (Block, Benjamin)
February 14, 2008 Filing 579 AFFIDAVIT of Neil K. Roman in SUPPORT OF 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Block, Benjamin)
February 14, 2008 Filing 578 AFFIDAVIT of Gregg H. Levy in SUPPORT OF 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) No. 1 - SportsBusiness Journal Article, # 2 Exhibit(s) No. 2 - Gazette Article, # 3 Exhibit(s) No. 3 - Transmittal Letter, # 4 Exhibit(s) No. 4 - Prior Motion to Modify Final Consent Judgment, # 5 Exhibit(s) No. 5 - 2/28/07 Hrg Transcript, # 6 Exhibit(s) No. 6 - 7/25/06 Hrg Transcript)(Block, Benjamin)
February 14, 2008 Filing 577 MEMORANDUM in Support re 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Block, Benjamin)
February 14, 2008 Filing 576 NOTICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment (Notice of Motion) (Block, Benjamin)
February 14, 2008 Filing 575 MOTION to Vacate 526 Order, 574 Order and for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Doty or Modification of the Final Consent Judgment by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Block, Benjamin)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER re 554 & 552 Appeals from Special Master's Decision Dated October 9, 2007. (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/1/2008. (PJM)
December 13, 2007 Filing 573 TRANSCRIPT of Objection of Class Counsel and NFL Players Association to the Special Master Burbank's Recommendation dated 10/9/07 regarding Michael Vick held on 11/30/07 before Judge David S Doty. Court Reporter: Lorilee K Fink. (59pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (kt)
December 7, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 572 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin C Block for National Football League. Fee paid; receipt number 3-003571. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 12/7/07. (MMC)
December 6, 2007 Filing 572 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin C. Block by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
November 30, 2007 Filing 571 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S. Doty: Hearing on objection of Class Counsel and the NFL Players Association to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank & objection of the NFL and the NFL Management Council to the conditional portions of the recommendation of Special Master Burbank (552 & 554) held on 11/30/2007. Argument presented and matter taken under advisement. Order forthcoming from the Court. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (CLB)
November 21, 2007 Filing 570 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 569 Exhibit, 568 Reply, (Jacobson, Mark)
November 21, 2007 Filing 569 EXHIBIT re 568 Reply, by all plaintiffs filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Jacobson, Mark)
November 21, 2007 Filing 568 REPLY re 552 Letter to Magistrate Judge, in Support of its Objection to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Michael Vick filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark)
November 21, 2007 Filing 567 REPLY re 557 Memorandum,, 554 Letter to Magistrate Judge, in Support of the NFL/NFLMC's Objections to the Conditional Portions of the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Michael Vick filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate # 2 Certificate of Service)(Roman, Neil)
November 14, 2007 Filing 566 RESPONSE re 558 Memorandum, 552 Letter to Magistrate Judge, in Opposition to Class Counsel's Objections to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Michael Vick filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) No. 1 -- Class Counsel/NFLPA Br. in 30%(Up) Rule Dispute# 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate # 3 Certificate of Service)(Roman, Neil)
November 14, 2007 Filing 565 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 563 Memorandum, 564 Exhibit (Jacobson, Mark)
November 14, 2007 Filing 564 EXHIBIT re 563 Memorandum, by all plaintiffs filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A through D)(Jacobson, Mark)
November 14, 2007 Filing 563 MEMORANDUM by all plaintiffs in Opposition to the National Football League's and NFL Management Council's Objections to the Conditional Portion of the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Michael Vick filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark)
October 30, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 561 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eva W Cole for Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White, Michael Buck. Fee paid; receipt number 4-017271. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 10/30/07. (MMC)
October 30, 2007 Filing 562 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 561 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eva W. Cole (Jacobson, Mark)
October 30, 2007 Filing 561 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eva W. Cole by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson. (Jacobson, Mark)
October 29, 2007 Filing 560 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 558 Memorandum, 559 Declaration in Support, of Class Counsel's Objection to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Michael Vick (Jacobson, Mark)
October 29, 2007 Filing 559 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 558 Memorandum filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Exhibit(s) B# 3 Exhibit(s) C# 4 Exhibit(s) D# 5 Exhibit(s) E# 6 Exhibit(s) F# 7 Exhibit(s) G# 8 Exhibit(s) H# 9 Exhibit(s) I# 10 Exhibit(s) J# 11 Exhibit(s) K# 12 Exhibit(s) L)(Jacobson, Mark)
October 29, 2007 Filing 558 MEMORANDUM by all plaintiffs re 552 Objection, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark) Modified on 10/30/2007 (jam).
October 29, 2007 Filing 557 MEMORANDUM by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 554 Objection, in Support of Objection to Conditional Portion of Special Master's Recommendation filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) #1 -- Falcons' Non-Injury Grievance# 2 Exhibit(s) #2 -- In re McCardell# 3 Exhibit(s) #3 -- In re Greene# 4 Exhibit(s) #4 -- In re Vanover# 5 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate # 6 Certificate of Service)(Roman, Neil) Modified on 10/30/2007 (jam).
October 19, 2007 Filing 555 NOTICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council regarding term of Special Master (Roman, Neil)
October 12, 2007 Filing 554 OBJECTION of the National Football League and the NFL Management Counsel to the Conditional Portions of the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank dated 10/9/07 regarding Michael Vick by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 10/12/2007 (dch).
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 556 OPINION RE: Michael Vick before Special Master Stephen B. Burbank. Signed by Special Master Stephen B. Burbank on 10/09/2007. (jc) Modified filing date and QC'd on 10/25/2007 (mkc).
October 10, 2007 Filing 553 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 552 Objection of class counsel and the NFL players association to the recommendation of Special Master Burbank dated October 9, 2007 (Jacobson, Mark) Modified text on 10/10/2007 (dch).
October 10, 2007 Filing 552 OBJECTION of Class counsel and the NFL Players Association to the recommendation of Special Master Burbank dated October 9, 2007 by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(Jacobson, Mark) Modified text on 10/10/2007 (dch).
October 3, 2007 Filing 551 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 550 Notice (Other) of Change of Law Firm Name (Jacobson, Mark)
October 3, 2007 Filing 550 NOTICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson of Change of Law Firm Name (Jacobson, Mark)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER re 532 Motion filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re Appeal of Special Master's Decision dated November 16, 2006. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 3/26/2007. (PJM)
March 21, 2007 Filing 548 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Objection to the Special Master's Recommendation regarding Ashley Lelie. Joint Motion to stay the Special Master's Recommendation regarding Corey Simon held on 2/28/07 before Judge David S Doty. (36pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (kt)
March 13, 2007 Filing 547 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (CLB)
February 28, 2007 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY**Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S. Doty: Hearing re: Objection of the NFL and the NFL Mgmt Council to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank dated 11/16/2006 (532) & Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2007 re 544 Joint MOTION to Stay re 543 Status Report /Special Master Recommendation filed by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Hardy Nickerson, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson - matter argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (CLB) Modified on 2/28/2007 (jc). Modified on 2/28/2007 (Councillor, Janelle).
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting 544 Motion to Stay . Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 2/28/2007. (PJM)
February 12, 2007 Filing 545 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 544 Joint MOTION to Stay re 543 Status Report /Special Master Recommendation, 543 Status Report (Jacobson, Mark)
February 12, 2007 Filing 544 Joint MOTION to Stay re 543 Status Report /Special Master Recommendation by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 12, 2007 Filing 543 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT /RECOMMENDATION RE: Corey Simon. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 9, 2007 Filing 542 REPLY re 532 Memorandum, in Support of Objections to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Ashley Lelie filed by National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) CBA Article VIII# 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate # 3 Certificate of Service)(Roman, Neil)
January 26, 2007 Filing 541 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 540 Declaration in Support, 539 Memorandum, (Jacobson, Mark)
January 26, 2007 Filing 540 Declaration of Mark A. Jacobson in Support of 539 Memorandum, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-B# 2 Exhibit(s) C-D# 3 Exhibit(s) E-F-G# 4 Exhibit(s) H-I)(Jacobson, Mark)
January 26, 2007 Filing 539 MEMORANDUM by all plaintiffs re 536 Memorandum, of Law in Opposition to the NFL Management Council's Objections to the Opinion of Special Master Burbank Regarding Ashley Lelie filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark)
January 26, 2007 Filing 538 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 537 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Greenspan (Jacobson, Mark)
January 26, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 537 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Greenspan for Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson, Reggie White, Michael Buck. Fee paid; receipt number 3-001991. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 1/26/07. (MMC)
January 25, 2007 Filing 537 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Greenspan by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson. (Jacobson, Mark)
January 4, 2007 Filing 536 MEMORANDUM by National Football League Management Council re 532 Memorandum, in Support of Objections to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank Regarding Ashley Lelie filed by National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Exhibit(s) Lelie Player Contract# 4 Exhibit(s) Acknowledgement and Agreement)(Roman, Neil)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER re Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 12/20/2006. (PJM)
December 6, 2006 Filing 534 BEFORE SPECIAL MASTER STEPHEN B. BURBANK OPINION RE: Ashley Lelie (JMH)
December 5, 2006 Filing 533 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League, National Football League Management Council re 532 Memorandum, (Objection to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank dated November 16, 2006 Regarding Ashley Lelie) (Connolly, Daniel)
December 5, 2006 Filing 532 MEMORANDUM by National Football League, National Football League Management Council (Objection to the Recommendation of Special Master Burbank dated November 16, 2006 Regarding Ashley Lelie) filed by National Football League, National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Connolly, Daniel)
October 27, 2006 Filing 531 DECLARATION by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson of Brenda K. Rowe Concerning Undeliverable Mail. (Jacobson, Mark)
October 27, 2006 Filing 530 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Reggie White re 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 519 Declaration in Support, 517 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, 521 Declaration in Support,, 520 Declaration in Support, 516 MOTION Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Memorandum in Support thereof (Jacobson, Mark)
September 8, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stephen B Burbank returned as Not deliverable as addressed. Doc. #526(LPH)
September 8, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roland James returned as undeliverable as addressed/unable to forward. Order #526(LPH)
September 5, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary C Adler Attempted-Not known/unable to forward. Doc. 526.(LPH)
September 1, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Brian Washington returned not at the Lincoln, NE address. Order dated 8/24/06 docket #526.(VEM)
August 30, 2006 Filing 529 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 528 Errata Corrected Appendix H to Stipulation and Settlement Agreement (Jacobson, Mark)
August 30, 2006 Filing 528 ERRATA to 524 Stipulation, corrected Appendix H by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson. (Jacobson, Mark)
August 25, 2006 Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement held on July 25, 2006 before Judge David S. Doty. Court Reporter: Lorilee K. Fink. (24pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (kt)
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER re 524 Stipulation and Settlement Agreement filed by Reggie White, et al. Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/24/2006. (PJM)
August 23, 2006 Filing 525 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White re 524 Stipulation, (Jacobson, Mark)
August 23, 2006 Filing 524 STIPULATION and Settlement Agreement by Reggie White. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement pp. 41 - 80# 2 Supplement pp. 81 - 118# 3 Supplement pp. 119 -169# 4 Supplement pp. 170 - 211# 5 Supplement pp. 212 - 264# 6 Supplement pp. 265 - 303# 7 Supplement pp. 304 - 313# 8 Appendix Index)(Jacobson, Mark)
July 19, 2006 Filing 523 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 519 Declaration in Support, 517 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, 521 Declaration in Support,, 520 Declaration in Support, 522 Certificate of Service,, 516 MOTION Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Memorandum in Support thereof AMENDED (Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson re 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 519 Declaration in Support, 517 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, 521 Declaration in Support,, 520 Declaration in Support, 516 MOTION Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Memorandum in Support thereof (Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 521 Declaration of of Dissemination of Notice to Class in Support of 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Index# 2 Exhibit(s) A# 3 Exhibit(s) B# 4 Exhibit(s) C# 5 Exhibit(s) D)(Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 520 Declaration of Eugene Upshaw in Support of 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by all plaintiffs. (Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 519 Declaration of Jeffrey L. Kessler in Support of 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Index# 2 Exhibit(s) A)(Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 518 MEMORANDUM in Support re 516 MOTION Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Memorandum in Support thereof filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 517 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 516 MOTION Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Memorandum in Support thereof: Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2006 01:30 PM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 14W before Senior Judge David S Doty. (Jacobson, Mark)
July 18, 2006 Filing 516 MOTION Order Granting Final Approval of the Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Memorandum in Support thereof by Reggie White, Michael Buck, Vann McElroy, Dave Duerson, Hardy Nickerson. (Jacobson, Mark)
May 30, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gregory Baty re: Order 513.(LPH)
May 24, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Don Howarth and Suzelle M. Smithat Los Angeles returned attempted not known. Order document #513.(VEM)
May 8, 2006 Filing 515 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary Adler moved, not forwardable. Order dated 4/25/06 document number 513.(VEM)
May 4, 2006 Filing 514 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail, Order #513, sent to Stephen B. Burbank not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward. No further information available.(VEM)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER . Signed by Judge David S Doty on 4/25/2006. (PJM)
April 24, 2006 Filing 512 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Gregory J. Baty re: Order #508.(JMH)
April 18, 2006 Filing 511 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Duane Bickett - Attempted, unknown re 508 Order.(JLB)
April 17, 2006 Filing 510 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Gary Adler re Order doc. no. #508.(JMH)
April 17, 2006 Filing 509 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Brian Washington re Order doc. no. #508. (JMH)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER re Approval of Proposed Amendments to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge David S Doty on 4/3/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - NFLPA Term Sheet)(PJM)
March 10, 2006 Filing 507 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S Doty : Telephonic Conference held on 3/10/2006. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (CLB)
December 22, 2003 Filing 506 NOTICE by Jeffret L. Kessler and David G. Feher of change of address to: Dewey Ballantine LLP, 1301 Avenue of the Americas, NY, NY 10019. 1 pg(s) (HLL)
November 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER Appointing Special Master ( Senior Judge David S. Doty / 11/21/02) appointing Special Master Stephen B. Burbank 15pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (SJH)
May 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER (Senior Judge David S. Doty / 5/8/02) approving the terms of the amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement dated as of 1/8/02. These terms are incorporated into and made a part of the Final Consent Judgment in this action dated 8/20/93. This Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over this action to effectuate and enforce the terms of the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement, as amended, and the Judgment. 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR)
May 3, 2002 Filing 503 MINUTES:(Senior Judge David S. Doty / Kristine Mousseau) Hrg. to determine the final approval of the amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement - granted. 1pg (JMR)
April 26, 2002 Filing 502 DECLARATION of David G. Feher, with Exhibits, of Dissemination of Notice to Class, regarding order [500-1] 64pg(s) (SJH)
February 22, 2002 Filing 501 MINUTES:(Senior Judge David S. Doty / Kristine Mousseau) Pltf's motion for preliminary approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement (telephonic) - granted. Final hrg - 5/3/02 at 9:00 a.m. 1pg(s) (JMR)
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER (Senior Judge David S. Doty) granting motion for an order of preliminary approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement. A hearing to determine the final approval of the amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement is scheduled to be held on 5/3/02 at 9:00 a.m. The proposed notices to the Class and method of notification are approved and Class Counsel shall carry out the notification in a timely manner so as to permit any objections to be lodged with the Court in advance of the hearing scheduled above. [496-1] (c: attys.) 2pgs (JMR)
February 19, 2002 Filing 499 DECLARATION of James W. Quinn 25pg(s) + exhibits (JMR)
February 19, 2002 Filing 498 DECLARATION of Eugene Upshaw 12pg(s) (JMR)
February 19, 2002 Filing 497 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion for an order of preliminary approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement [496-1] 30pg(s) (JMR)
February 19, 2002 Filing 496 Notice and MOTION by plaintiffs for an order of preliminary approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement ( to Senior Judge David S. Doty ) ret. telephonically 2/22/02 at 1:30 p.m. 3pg(s) (JMR)
July 19, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 7/17/01) that a Player Contract that states that a specific amt. is a signing bonus shall be considered, pursuant to Article XXIV 7(b) (iv)(1) of the CBA, to be a signing bonus for purposes of the salary cap even though the contract contains conditions that, if not fulfilled, would require all or a portion of the amt. paid to be refunded or a deferred payment to be canceled. 8pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR)
July 6, 2001 Filing 494 TRANSCRIPT OF proceedings re objections to opinion and recommendation of Special Master taken before Judge David S. Doty on 5/22/01 by Kristine Mousseau (separate) (JMR)
June 15, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty) that the objections of class counsel are overruled and the decision of the special master is affirmed 12pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR)
May 22, 2001 Filing 492 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of plaintiff Reggie White by David G Feher 1pgpg(s) (JMR)
May 22, 2001 Filing 491 MINUTES:(Judge David S. Doty / Kristine Mousseau) Oral motion to move admission of David G. Feher - granted. Pro hac vice form to be filed. Hearing re - obj. by class counsel and the NFLPA to opinion of Special Master dated 3/15/01 482 and objs. by NFL & NFL Mgmt. Council to the recommendation of the Special Master 483 - argued, submitted and taken under advisement 1pg (JMR)
May 14, 2001 Filing 490 MEMORANDUM of class counsel and the National Football League Players Assoc. concerning the free agency rights of Kyle Richardson 35pgs (JMR)
May 14, 2001 Filing 489 REPLY memorandum of class counsel and the National Football League Players Assoc. concerning the free agency rights of Kyle Richardson 8pg(s) (JMR)
May 14, 2001 Filing 488 MEMORANDUM by respondent Natl Football Mgt Council and Natl Football League in support of Special Master decision in Kyle Richardson proceeding 16pg(s) (JMR)
May 11, 2001 Filing 487 MEMORANDUM of deft Natl Football League and NFL Management council in support of objections to the Special Master's recommendation in dispute regarding disguised incentives [483-1] 79pg(s) (separate) (JMR)
May 11, 2001 Filing 486 MEMORANDUM of class counsel and the NFL Players Assoc. in support of the Special Master's decision enforcing the plain language of the signing bonus provisions of the SSA 50pgs (JMR)
May 11, 2001 Filing 485 REPLY memorandum by defts Natl Football League and NFL Management Council in support of objections to the Special Master's recommendation in dispute regarding disguised incentives [483-1] 6pg(s) (JMR)
April 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 4/6/01) that in accordance with Local Rule 72.1 and pursuant to stipulation between counsel for the respective parties, the following briefing schedule is prescribed by the Court: Initial memorandum will be served on opposing counsel on/before 4/23/01; The original and three copies of the responsive memoranda will be served on/before 5/4/01; Reply memoranda will be served on/before 5/11/01; and The moving party as to each appeal will file with the Court the original and two copies of all motion papers pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(b) on/before 5/12/01. (c: attys.) 2pgs (JMR)
April 4, 2001 Filing 483 OBJECTIONS by respondent Natl Football Management Council and defendant Natl Football League to the recommendation of the Special Master in dispute regarding disguised incentives 10pg(s) (JMR)
March 28, 2001 Filing 482 OBJECTION by class counsel and the NFLPA to opinion of Special Master dated 3/15/01, regarding Kyle Richardson: determination of accrued season 9pg(s) (JMR)
October 6, 2000 ATTORNEY TERMINATION: terminating attorneys Herbert Dym and Frank Rothman for defts National Football League, Five Smiths, Inc., Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears, Cincinnati Bengals, Cleveland Browns Inc, Dallas Cowboys, PDB Sports, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Green Bay Packers, Houston Oilers, Inc. Indianapolis Colts, Kansas City Chiefs, Los Angeles Raiders, Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings, KMS Patriots, L.P., New Orleans Saints, New York Football, New York Jets, B & B Holdings, Inc. Holdings, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers, Chargers Football Co, San Francisco 49ers, Seattle Seahawks Inc, Tampa Bay Area NFL, Pro-Football, Inc. per phone call from Daniel Joseph Connolly, local counsel. (JMR) Modified on 10/06/2000
July 24, 2000 Filing 481 CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction [480-1] MANDATE ISSUED July 20, 2000 (Notice to Counsel) (GJS)
May 18, 2000 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 00-2208 MNMI (GJS)
May 2, 2000 DELIVERED/MAILED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel (GJS)
April 28, 2000 Filing 480 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals by objector Gary Wichard from Judge David S. Doty Order dated March 30, 2000 [477-1] (1pg) Fee paid receipt #417744 (GJS) Modified on 05/05/2000
March 31, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 3/31/00) that the special master's decision dated 2/10/00 is affirmed 15pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
March 30, 2000 Filing 479 TRANSCRIPT OF Motions held March 23, 2000 before the Honorable Judge David S. Doty ( Lori A. Case). (SEPARATE) (DDB)
March 30, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 3/30/00) that: 1. The portion of the special master's decision dismissing player agents from the underlying proceeding is reversed; 2. The portion of the special master's decision finding that player agents are subject to the penalty provision contained in Article XXIX, Section 3 of the CBA and Section XVI, Paragraph 3 of the SSA is affirmed 19pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (SJH)
March 23, 2000 Filing 473 MINUTES ( Judge David S. Doty / Lori A. Case) Objections of Class Counsel and the NFLPA to Report of Special Master in Arizona Cardinals Franchise Player Proceedings; Objections to the NFL and NFL Management Council to the Special Master's Recommendation Regarding the Status, Rights and Obligations of Player Agents - Hearing held; matters argued, submitted and taken under advisement; order forthcoming from the Court 1pg(s) (SJH)
March 22, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 3/22/00) that the Clerk of Court shall seal the documents found under Tab 3 of Volume I of the materials accompanying objections to the NFL and NFL Management Counsel to the Special Master's Recommendation regarding the status, rights and obligations of player's agents [461-] (c: attys.) 1pg (JMR)
March 21, 2000 Filing 471 LETTER to court from deft Natl Football League's council Daniel J. Connolly regarding the NFL, NFL Management Council & Arizona Cardinals' memorandum in support of Special Master's decision in franchise player proceeding. (3pg(s) (DDB)
March 21, 2000 Filing 468 MEMORANDUM by NFLPA in support of Special Master decision in franchise player proceeding 20+pg(s) (DFL)
March 20, 2000 Filing 476 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of objector Steinberg Moorad & Dunn by Theodore W. Ullyot 2pg(s) (JMR)
March 20, 2000 Filing 475 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of objector Steinberg Moorad & Dunn by Steven G. Bradbury 2pg(s) (JMR)
March 20, 2000 Filing 470 RESPONSE MEMORANDUM by Class Counsel & deft Natl Football League concerning the objections of the NFL & the NFL Management Council to the Special Master's decision concerning the status of player agents [463-1]. (14pg(s) (DDB)
March 17, 2000 Filing 472 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of objector Gary Wichard by Denis P. O'Leary 1pg(s) (JMR)
March 17, 2000 Filing 469 RESPONSE by objector Gary Wichard to the objections of the NFL & NFL management Council & objection to the Special Master's fourth finding, regarding the status, rights & obligations of player agents [460-1]. (11pg(s) (DDB)
March 17, 2000 Filing 467 OBJECTIONS by objector Steinberg, Moorad & Dunn to preserve rights with respect to conditional aspect of Special Master's decision as to the status, rights & obligations of player agents [460-1]. (3pg(s) (DDB)
March 17, 2000 Filing 466 MEMORANDUM by objector Steinberg, Moorad & Dunn in opposition to the NFLMC's objection to the Special Master's decision as to the status, rights & obligations of player agents [460-1]. (13pg(s) (DDB)
March 15, 2000 Filing 465 LETTER to court from Charles J. Lloyd with first pages of memo in support of objections of class counsel and NFLPA to Report and Recommendation and affidavit of Bruce Meyer attached 3pg(s) (DFL)
March 7, 2000 Filing 464 AFFIDAVIT of Bruce S. Meyer regarding objection [460-1] 2+pg(s) separate (DFL)
March 7, 2000 Filing 463 MEMORANDUM by NFLPA and class counsel in support of objection [460-1] to special master's decision 26pg(s) (DFL)
March 6, 2000 Filing 460 OBJECTIONS by the NFL and NFL Management Council to the Special Master's Recommentation regarding the status, rights and obligations of player agents 28pgs (JMR)
March 6, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 3/6/00) The agents shall have until 3/17/00 to file a response to the objections of the NFL to the special master's decision. The agents' response brief shall not exceed 12 pages in length. The NFL shall not be permitted to file a reply to the agents' response. Oral argument, whether in-person or telephonic, shall be scheduled for a date shortly after 3/17/00. 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR)
February 29, 2000 Filing 462 Materials accompanying objections of the NFL and NFL Management Council to the Special Master's Recommendation regarding the status, rights, and obligations of players agents (separate) (Volume 2) (JMR)
February 29, 2000 Filing 461 Materials accompanying objections of the NFL and NFL Management Council to the Special Master's Recommendation regarding the status, rights, and obligations of players agents (separate) (Volume I) (Documents found under Tab 3 removed and sealed 3/22/00 pursuant to order of Judge David S. Doty filed 3/22/00 [474-1]) (JMR) Modified on 03/27/2000
July 2, 1999 Filing 458 CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA granting appellant's motion to dismiss appeal [445-1] [436-1] - MANDATE ISSUED 6/30/99 (Notice to Counsel) (1pg) (BLW
June 2, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 457 STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty ) That this court's order of 12/23/97 in this matter is vacated in its entirety without prejudice. That the portions of this court's order of 7/30/97 in this matter that addressed this court's jurisdiction is vacated without prejudice. All other portions of this court's order of 7/30/97 in this matter remain in full force and effect. 4pgs (c: attys.) (JMR)
June 2, 1999 Filing 456 Withdrawal of objections by deft., NFL and its teams. 2pgs (JMR)
May 14, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 5/13/99) re approval of amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement, dated as of 2/28/98. 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR)
April 30, 1999 Filing 454 MINUTES: (Judge David S. Doty / Edward Rafel) Pltf's motion for final approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement - argued, submitted & granted. [452-1] [447-1] 1pg (JMR)
April 28, 1999 Filing 453 DECLARATION of David G. Feher re Dissemination of Notice to Class. (56 pgs) (MKC)
March 24, 1999 Filing 452 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION by plaintiffs for final approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement (to Judge David S. Doty) [447-1] at 10:00 a.m. on 4/30/99 (3pgs) (
February 12, 1999 Filing 451 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Ed Rafel) Pltf's motion for preliminary and final approval of proposed amendments the stipulation and settlement agreement is submitted and granted. Final hrg is 4/23/99 at 10:00. [447-1] (1 pg) (MKC)
January 29, 1999 Filing 450 DECLARATION of James W. Quinn re motion for preliminary and final approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement [447-1] (19+ pgs) (DFL)
January 29, 1999 Filing 449 DECLARATION of Eugene Upshaw re motion for preliminary and final approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement [447-1] (17 pgs) (DFL)
January 29, 1999 Filing 448 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion for preliminary and final approval of proposed amendments to the and settlement agreement [447-1] (22 pgs) (DFL)
January 29, 1999 Filing 447 NOTICE AND MOTION by plaintiff for preliminary and final approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement (to Judge David S. Doty) , ret. 2/12/99 at 11:15 a.m. (2 pgs) (DFL)
March 31, 1998 Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT OF hearing held 9/19/97 (Amon, Stephen) (Separate) (DFL)
February 17, 1998 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 98-1366MNMI (BLW
January 12, 1998 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel (BLW
January 9, 1998 Filing 445 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendants' from Judge David S. Doty's Order entered on 12/23/97 [444-1] (2pgs) (Receipt #222585) (BLW Modified on 01/12/1998
December 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty ) that dfts' motion to modify the final consent judgment to terminate the Court's continuing jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of player employment in professional football is denied (cc: all counsel) (8 pgs) (order vacated in its entirety without prejudice pursuant to Judge Doty's stipulation and order filed 6/2/99 [457-1]) (SJH) Modified on 06/02/1999
September 19, 1997 Filing 443 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Steve Amon) dfts motion to terminate the court's jurisdiction as Rule 23 guardian of the White Class - Argued, submitted and taken under advisement. 1pg (PAK)
September 15, 1997 Filing 442 REPLY by defendants in support of motion to modify the final consent jgm (14 pgs) (JMR)
September 12, 1997 Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT of Proceeding held 7/2/97 before Judge David S. Doty (Court Reporter Edward D. Rafel) (separate) (
September 11, 1997 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 97-3375MNMI (BLW
August 29, 1997 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel (BLW
August 27, 1997 Filing 440 DECLARATION of James W. Quinn (7pgs + exh./separate) (
August 27, 1997 Filing 439 DECLARATION of Reggie White (3pgs) (
August 27, 1997 Filing 438 DECLARATION of Eugene Upshaw (6pgs) (
August 27, 1997 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM of class counsel and the NFL Players Assoc. in opposition to dfts motion to terminate the court's jurisdiction as Rule 23 guardian of the White Class (27pgs) (
August 26, 1997 Filing 436 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendants' from Judge David S. Doty Order filed on 7/30/97 [432-1] (Receipt #219851) (24pgs) (BLW
August 25, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty ) that Terry Allen's request to file a motion to reconsider is denied (cc: all counsel) (1 pg) (SJH)
August 18, 1997 Filing 434 MOTION by pltfs for enlargement of time to file motion for reconsideration ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time set) 3pgs (PAK)
August 8, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 8/7/97) that the decision of the special master dated 2/24/97 is affirmed in all respects [423-1] (cc: all counsel) (1 pg) (DFL)
July 30, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 7/30/97) The court has considered the NFLMC's remaning arguments and finds them unpersuasive. Based on the foregoing, the court concludes that the Hobert renegotiation and Grbac contract are permitted under terms of SSA and the CBA, and therefore do not constitute circumvention. Moreover, netiher Player Contract violates the good faith negotiation requirement of the SSA. Accordingly, the court reverses the Special Master's decision dated 5/30/97. (cc: all counsel) (24pgs) (the portion of this order that addressed this court's jurisdiction is vacated without prejudice and all other portions of this order remain in full force and effect pursuant to Judge Doty's stipulation and order filed 6/2/99 [457-1]) ( Modified on 06/02/1999
July 11, 1997 Filing 431 DECLARATION of Jeff Diamond (12 pgs) (DFL)
July 11, 1997 Filing 430 DECLARATION of Peter Ruocco (6 pgs) (DFL)
July 10, 1997 Filing 429 BRIEF of appellants on appeal from the Special Master (42pgs + exh./separate) (
July 9, 1997 Filing 428 RESPONSE by Natl Football League to objections to the Special Master Decision in Re: Terry Allen [423-1] (27 pgs) (DFL)
July 2, 1997 Filing 427 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Edward Rafel) Objections of class counsel and NFLPA to special master decision-argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (
July 1, 1997 Filing 426 REPLY MEMORANDUM of class counsel & NFLPA concerning the right to create salary cap room by negotiating ocntracts that comply with the plain language of the White settlement agreement [416-1] (23pgs + exh.) (
June 27, 1997 Filing 425 EXHIBITS filed by Natl Football League re resonse to class counsel's objections to the special master circumvention decision (1+ pg) (separate) (SJH)
June 27, 1997 Filing 424 RESPONSE by Natl Football League to class counsel's objections to the special master circumvention decision (23 pgs) (SJH)
June 25, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 423 OBJECTIONS OF CLASS COUNSEL AND NFLPA TO SPECIAL MASTER DECISION IN RE: TERRY ALLEN. 36PGS (PAK)
June 20, 1997 Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS hearing held 1/7/97 in Washington D.C. In Re: Terry Allen ( Alderson Reporting Company, Inc., Washington, D.C.) (separate) (
June 20, 1997 Filing 421 HEARING EXHIBITS In Re: Terry Allen (1pg + exh./separate) (
June 20, 1997 Filing 420 OBJECTIONS of class counsel and NFLPA to Special Master decision in re: Terry Allen (30pgs) (
June 18, 1997 Filing 419 OBJECTIONS of class counsel and NFLPA to the Special Master decision disregarding the right of players and clubs to create salary cap room by negotiating contracts that fully comply with the plain language of the White settlement agreement (38 pgs) (SJH)
June 10, 1997 Filing 418 EXHIBITS in support of dfts' motionto modify the final consent judgment (1+ pgs) (SJH)
June 10, 1997 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to modify the final consent judgment [416-1] (15 pgs) (SJH)
June 10, 1997 Filing 416 MOTION by defendants to modify the final consent judgment ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (2 pgs) (SJH)
November 21, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 11/20/96) That: the terms of the amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement, dated 2/7/96 and 6/6/96, a copy of which is annexed hereto as Exh. A, are fair, reasonable and adequate, and that said amendments be, and they hereby are, approved in all respects; the terms of the amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement, dated 2/7/96 and 6/6/96, are incorporated into and made a part of the final consent judgment in this action dated 8/20/93; and in accordance with the terms of the stipulation and settlement agreement, as amended, and without in any affecting the finality of the final consent judgment, dated 8/20/93, this court retains exclusive jurisdiction over this action to effectuate and enforce the terms of the stipulation and settlement agreement, as amended, and the judgment. (cc: all counsel) (43pgs) (
October 7, 1996 Filing 414 MINUTES: (Judge David S. Doty) final hearing seeking approval of amemdments to the 2/26/93 stipulation and settlement agreement - granted; Order to follow (1 pg) (DFL)
July 26, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 7/26/96) That the preliminary injunction entered by the court on 2/23/96, is vacated. (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
June 27, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER ( Judge David S. Doty / 6/27/96) That: Dean Jack H. Friedenthal is appointed as Special Master pursuant to the stipulation and settlement agreement. (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
April 1, 1996 Filing 411 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher J. Morvillo re: dissemination of notice to class. (3pgs + Exh. A-C) (
February 26, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 2/23/96) That: pltfs' motion for a preliminary injunction is granted; expansion team revenue shall be included in the calculation of projected defined gross revenues for the purpose of computing the salary cap for the 1996 league year; pltfs' bond in the amount of $500,000 shall remain in place. Memorandum opinion to follow. (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
February 23, 1996 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDING re: telephone conf. call held 2/22/96 before U.S. District Judge David S. Doty (Ed Rafel) (separate) (
February 23, 1996 Filing 408 AMENDED ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 2/22/96) That: class counsel shall cause a "notice of amendment to settlement agreement," in substantially the form submitted to this court, to be mailed by first-class mail, postage prepaid, within 20 days of the entry of this order, to all players who were on NFL rosters at the end of the 1995 season and all other players who, as of 2/1/96, have signed a contract with an NFL club for the upcoming NFL season. A hearing shall be held before the undersigned in Courtroom 4 in the U.S. Courthouse, Mpsl., MN on 4/5/96 at 1:00 p.m. on the fairness and reasonableness of the proposed amendments. Dfts are preliminarily and temporarily ordered to abide by the terms of the proposed amendments until a final ruling of this court approving or rejecting the proposed amendments. (cc: all (3pgs) counsel) (
February 22, 1996 Filing 407 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Edward Rafel) Pltf class' motion (oral) for a preliminary injunction - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (
February 21, 1996 Filing 406 LETTER to court from plaintiffs' counsel regarding Salary Cap. (8pgs) (
February 16, 1996 Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDING re: hearing held 2/15/96 before Judge David S. Doty (Edward Rafel) (separate) (
February 16, 1996 Filing 403 BOND for temporary restraining order in amount of $500,000.00 Hartford Fire Insurance Co. filed by plaintiffs. (3pgs) (
February 15, 1996 Filing 404 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Edward Rafel) Hearing for preliminary review of the proposed amendments to the 2/26/93 stipulation and settlemenmt agreement - court approved. Final hearing set for 4/5/96 at 1:00 p.m. (
February 15, 1996 Filing 402 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 2/15/96) re: salary cap - a final ruling likely will be made on 2/22/96. The pltf. class shall post a bond in the amt. of $500,000 by the close of business on Friday 2/16/96. If the class should fail to file with the Court the appropriate documentation on the bond, this order shall be vacated (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (JMR)
February 8, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER ( Judge David S. Doty / 2/8/96) That: John Feerick is appointed as interim Special Master under the stipulation and settlement agreement in this action only for the purposes of the proceeding involving Mr. Blades. (cc: all counsel) (1pg) (
February 8, 1996 Filing 400 AFFIDAVIT of Eugene Upshaw (18pgs) (
February 8, 1996 Filing 399 AFFIDAVIT of James W. Quinn (13pgs + exh.) (
February 8, 1996 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of moption for preliminary and final approval of proposed amendments to the stipulation and settlement agreement.(20pgs) (
February 5, 1996 Removed counsel Gerald Goldman for objector Wilber Marshall from mailing list per his request. (
January 17, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER ( Judge David S. Doty / 1/16/96) That: John Feerick is appointed as interim Special Master under the stipulation and settlement agreement in this action only for the purposes of the proceeding involving Mr. Mayberry. (cc: all counsel) (1pg) (
January 4, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 1/2/96) That: the parties in this action, by and through their respective counsel, shall appear before the Hon. David S. Doty, Courtroom 3, U.S. Courthouse, Mpls., MN, 2/7/96, at 1:30 p.m. for a hearing to consider preliminary court approval of an extension and modification of the White stipulation and settlement agreement. The parties shall submit any papers in support of preliminary approval by 1/26/96. (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
October 27, 1995 Filing 395 NOTICE by Richard Dent to dismiss his individual application. (3pgs) (
October 27, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty ) In re: Deion Sanders; re that this matter is referred to Special Master Feerick in accordance with the terms of the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement; class counsel and counsel for the Dallas Cowboys shall serve their brief no later than the close of bsiness Thursday, 11/2/95; counsel for the NFL Management Council shall serve their reply brief no later than the close of business Monday, 11/6/95 (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (SJH)
October 26, 1995 NOTICE given to atty admission's clerk to send PHV to out of state attorney: Dennis Curran. (CJF)
October 24, 1995 Filing 393 BRIEF OF Natl Football Mgt in re: Dallas Cowboys Salary Cap Circumvention Dispute. (44pgs + exhibits) (Separate) (CJF)
September 29, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 9/28/95) That: the court concludes that under the SSA and CBA a renegotiated or extended contract only modifies a Player Contract. Accordingly, the court affirms Special Master Feerick's decision dated 5/22/95. (cc: all counsel) (13pgs) (
July 20, 1995 Filing 391 REPLY MEMORANDUM by petitioners' Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent to application for oral argument and action upon the report of the special master ( to Judge David S. Doty ) [352-1] (15psg) (
July 20, 1995 Filing 389 MINUTES ( Judge David S. Doty / Edward Rafel) Application of petitioners Sterling Sharpe & Richard Dent requesting oral argument and action upon the report of the Special Maser - argued, submitted and taken under advisement [352-1] (1 pg) (SJH)
July 19, 1995 Filing 390 REPLY memorandum of petitioners Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent [388-1], [387-1], [386-1], [385-1], [384-1], [383-1], [382-1], [381-1], [380-1], [379-1], [378-1], [377-1], [376-1], [374-1] (15 pgs) (copy) (JMR) Modified on 07/21/1995
July 18, 1995 Filing 373 RESPONSE by Natl Football League to the objections of grievants Richard Dent and Steling Sharpe (9pgs+Exhibits A-G) (separate) (BLW
July 17, 1995 Filing 388 EXHIBIT M re: Special Master's appointment by the Court and duties of same (3 pgs) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 387 EXHIBIT L re: Article XXV Enforcement of the Salary Cap and Entering Player Pool (2 pgs) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 386 EXHIBIT K re: Article XXIV Guaranteed League - Wide Salary, Salary Cap & Minimum Team Salary (1 pg) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 385 EXHIBIT J re: Article III Scope of Agreement (1 pg) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 384 EXHIBIT I - letter from Herbert Fishgold, Article IX Notice Arbitrator, to Irvin, Jr., Curran, and Berthelsen dated 4/20/95 (3 pgs) (copy) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 383 EXHIBIT H - letter from Herbert Fishgold, Arbitrator, to Irvin, Jr., Curran, and Berthelsen dated 4/6/95 (4 pgs) (copy) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 382 EXHIBIT G re: opinion and decision of Special Master John D. Feerick (2 pgs) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 381 EXHIBIT F re: notice to the NFL Management Council and NFL Players Association of objections by Richard Dent and Sterling Sharpe to the opinion and decision of the Special Master and motion for reconsideration (8 pgs) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 380 EXHIBIT E re: opinion and decision of Special Master John D. Feerick (8 pgs) (copy) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 379 EXHIBIT D - memo from John D. Feerick to Gregg Levy re: decision (1 pg) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 378 EXHIBIT C re: preliminary statement by counsel for Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 377 EXHIBIT B re: transcript of telephone conference taken 5/8/95 before Special Master John D. Feerick by Jan A. Williams (37 pgs) (copy) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 376 EXHIBIT A re: application of petitioners, Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent, requesting oral argument and action upon the report of the Special Master (19 pgs) (copy) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 375 NOTICE of filing documents and or/exhibits by counsel for Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent (4 pgs) (JMR)
July 17, 1995 Filing 374 LETTER to Judge David S. Doty dated 7/14/95 from Grady C. Irvin, Jr., counsel for Richard Dent and Sterling Sharpe (copy) (1 pg) (JMR)
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 372 OPINION AND DECISION (Special Master John D. Feerick/ 6/1/95) By communication dated 5/24/95, I was requested by Grady C. Irvin, Jr., Esq. on behelf of players Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent, to reconsider andvacate my decision dated 5/12 and 5/15/95, lifting salary cap holds. I have considered the points contained in the submission and find no basis to change that decision. Accordingly, I decline the requested relief. (cc: all counsel) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 371 OPINION AND DECISION (Special Master John D. Feerick / 5/22/95) In the final analysis, therefore, I conclude that the parties adopted the 30% Down Rule as part of a "solar system" in order to protect the integrity of a much beloved American sport. There may be inequities to some as a result of the workings of the Rule but larger purposes are at stake. My responsibility is plain and that is to enforce the Rule. Accordingly, I deny the relief requested by Class Counsel and Counsel for the NFLPA. (cc: all counsel) (8pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 370 OPINION AND DECISION (Special Master John D. Feerick/ 5/15/95) As noted in my abbreviated decision of 5/12, I view what Arbitrator Fishgold as having done is effectively stayed the processing of the grievances before him pending a threshold jurisdiction determination by Arbitrator Stark. I therefore direct that the salary cap hold be released under all the circumstances presented. (cc: all counsel) (8pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 369 DECISION (Special Master John D. Feerick/ 5/12/95) Given the current posture of the jurisdictional issue, I conclude that it would be undfair and unjust to place a hold on the salary caps of the teams in question, as ocntended for by the two players. I therefore concur in the substance of the ruling made by Arbitrator Fishgold and direct that the salary cap hold be released under the unique circumstances presented. A formal opinion will follow. (cc: all counsel) (1pg) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER of Special Master John D. Feerick (4/19/95) For the reasons mentioned, I (John D. Feerick) decline to overturn the decision made by the NFLMC and award different compensatory draft selections. (cc: all counsel) (11pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 367 DECISION of Special Master John D. Feerick (4/21/95) I (John D. Feerick) express no opinion as to whether the subsequent inability of Mr. Siglar to play would entitle the Chiefs to a return of the bonus, in whole or in part. (cc: all counsel) (10pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 366 DECISION (as corrected) of Special Master John D. Feerick (4/11/95) I (John D. Feerick) express no view as to whether a subsequent inability by Mr. Siglar to play would entitle the Club to a return of the bonus, in whole or part. That is a question for another day and another forum. A formal opinion will follow. (cc: all counsel) (3pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 365 DECISION AND OPINION of Special Master John D. Feerick re signing bonuses (7/11/94) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) declines to grant the relief requested by Class Counsel. (cc: all counsel) (6pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 364 DECISION of Special Master John D. Feerick re qualified settlement fund tax obligation issue (4/22/94) Accordingly, I (John D. Feerick) retain jurisdiction to hear the underlying dispute as soon as the IRS makes its initial ruling and either party requests that I proceed with an expedited hearing. If such a hearing is held, I expect, based on the arguments made in this proceeding, that some of the questions presented will include whether, in reaching the Settlement Agreement, the minds of the parties ever met on the subject of the FICA and FUTA taxes; whether the Settlement Agreedment placed the liability with one party or the other; whether the Trust Agreement and subsequent agreements finally resolved the issue; and if not resolved by any of these instruments, how the matter should be addressed, including potential remedies. (cc: all counsel) (7pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 363 DECISION of Special Master John D. Feerick re the Minnesota Vikings' right to withdraw the future transition player designation of Henry Thomas (3/8/94) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) grants the relief requested by the Minnesota Vikings and the National Football League Management Council. (cc: all counsel) (9pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 362 DECISION OF Special Master John D. Feerick re The Los Angeles Raiders right to withdraw the future transition player designation of Tim Brown (2/27/94) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) declines to grant the relief requested by the Los Angeles Raiders. (cc: all counsel) (9pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 361 SUMMARY DECISION AND ORDER of Special Master John D. Feerick re the Los Angeles Raiders right to withdraw a future transition player designation of Tim Brown (2/15/94) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) finds that the Club may not withdraw its futture Transition Player designation of Tim Brown. Accordingly, the undersigned declines to grant the relief requested by the Los Angeles Raiders. A full opinion will follow. (cc: all counsel) (4pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 360 DECISION AND ORDER of Special Master John D. Feerick re the validity of certain first refusal rights of The Cincinnati Bengals (2/9/94) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) declines to grant the relief requested by the Cincinnati Bengals. (cc: all counsel) (9pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 359 OPINION of Special Master John D. Feerick re action by the Cincinnati Bengals, the Tampa Bay Buccaneers, et al. ( 1/12/94) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) declines to grant the relief requested by the Clubs that initiated htis action. (cc: all counsel) (10pgs) (
July 14, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 358 DECISION of Special Master John D. Feerick re action by the Cinciannati Bengals, the Tampa Bay Buccaneers, et al. (12/20/93) The undersigned (John D. Feerick) declines to grant the relief requested by the Clubs that initiated this action. A formal opinion will follow. (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
July 11, 1995 Filing 357 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Steve Amon) Telephonic hearing - objections of class counsel and NFLPA to Special Master decision regarding application of the "30% Rules" - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (
July 11, 1995 Filing 356 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of Sterling Sharpe and Richard Dent by Grady Charles Irvin, Jr. (
July 11, 1995 Filing 355 NOTICE OF HEARING & request for additional hearing time. ( to Judge David S. Doty ) [352-1] Ret. 7/20/95 at 8:30 a.m. (1pg) (
June 27, 1995 Filing 354 NOTICE from Court of Appeals that an order of the U. S. Supreme Court has been filed denying certiorari in the above case (1pg) (BLW
June 27, 1995 Filing 353 RESPONSE by National Football League to class counsel's "objections" [351-1] (27pgs + exh.) (separate) (
June 15, 1995 Filing 352 APPLICATION of petitioners, Sterling Sharpe & Richard Dent for oral argument and action upon the report of the special master ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (19pgs) (
June 15, 1995 Filing 351 OBJECTIONS of class counsel and NFLPA to special master decision regarding application of the "30% rules." (28pgs + exh.) (separate) (
May 4, 1995 Filing 350 NOTICE of filing petition for certiorari by objector Mark Dusbabek (1pg) (BLW
May 3, 1995 Filing 349 NOTICE of filing petition for certiorari by petitioner Sean Jones (1pg) (BLW Modified on 05/04/1995
February 6, 1995 Filing 348 CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA That the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed. MANDATE ISSUED 02/03/95. (8 pgs). (Notice to Counsel).
February 6, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 347 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION FROM USCA (McMillian) (Hansen) (Morris Sheppard Arnold) - J; filed 12/06/94 That we affirm the approval of the settlement agreement by the District Court [330-1] [329-1] [327-1] [326-1] [324-1]. MANDATE ISSUED 02/03/95. (14 pgs). (cc: All Counsel)
June 14, 1994 Filing 346 CERTIFIED COPY of Order from USCA That the motion of appellants' Jeff Bostic, Todd Bowles, Jason Buck, Ravin Caldwell, Shane Collins, Kelly Goodburn, Kurt Gouveia, David Gulledge, Desmond Howard, James Jenkins, A.J. Johnson, Sidney Johnson, Ron Middleton, Brian Mitchell, Paul Siever, Ed Simmons, Johnny Thomas, Don Warren, and Eric Williams to dismiss the portion of the appeal that pertains to them is hereby granted. The appeal shall proceed as to the remaining appellants'. (1 pg.). (Notice to counsel). Modified on 06/16/1994
May 12, 1994 Filing 345 NOTICE of name change of counsel for Mark Dusbabek, etc. Firm of Heins Schatz & Paquin became: SCHATZ PAQUIN LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL & HOLSTEIN (
April 28, 1994 Filing 344 CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA that appellant's, Philadelphia Eagels, motion to dismiss the appeal is granted [328-1] MANDATE ISSUED 4/26/94 (Notice to Counsel) (2pgs) (BLW
December 14, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 12/14/93) That: the court concludes that its initial appointment of the special master, and its extension of that appointment, are proper pursuant to Rule 53 and its equitable powers. The court therefore denies the Eagles' motion to vacate, and reaffirms its orders of 5/10/93 and 10/6/93. [334-1] (cc: all counsel) (10 pgs) (
November 19, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER ( Judge David S. Doty / 11/18/93) That: Dean John D. Feerick is appointed as Special Master pursuant to the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement, as amended, and that, in the event any appeal of a decision of the Special Master is made to this Court, all reports, transcripts of proceedings and other evidence and original exhibits, if any, relating to the proceedings before the Special Master, as well as any decision of the Special Master, shall be filed with the Court, and that, in the event no appeal to this Court is made of a decision of the Special Master, such decision only shall be filed with the Court. (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
November 18, 1993 Filing 341 LETTER to court from counsel Leonard, Street and Deinard, William L. Greene and James J. Bertrand for objector Wilber Marshall. They are no longer acting as counsel in this matter. They request removal of their names from the mailing list. (
November 15, 1993 Filing 343 CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA as to Paul Gruber dismissing the appeals [325-1] [332-1] filed 09/15/93 and 10/04/93. MANDATE ISSUED 11/12/93. (Notice to Counsel).
November 8, 1993 Filing 339 NOTICE by appellees of designation of additional parts of the record to be included pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3) (
November 5, 1993 Filing 338 NOTICE by plaintiffs/appellees Rule 10(b)(3) cross-designation (
October 27, 1993 Filing 337 MEMORANDUM by pltfs in opposition to motion to vacate the Court's order extending the appointment of the special master [334-1] (
October 27, 1993 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM by dft NFL & 27 NFL member clubs in response to Philadelphia Eagles' motion to vacate the Court's order extending the appointment of the special master [334-1] (
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3415MN for appeal filed by Maurice Hurst on 09/21/93. (14 pgs.).
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3403MN for appeal filed by Don Beebe on 09/17/93. (14 pgs.).
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3396MN for appeal filed by the Philadelphia Eagles on 09/16/93. (14 pgs.).
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3382MN for appeal filed by Terry Orr on 09/15/93. (14 pgs.).
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3381MN for appeal filed by Sean Jones on 09/15/93. (14 pgs.).
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3380MN for appeal filed by Paul Gruber on 09/15/93. (14 pgs.)
October 19, 1993 NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 93-3375MN for appeal filed by Byron White on 09/14/93. (14 pgs.)
October 19, 1993 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM by Philadelphia Eagles in support of motion to vacate the Court's order extending the appointment of special master [334-1] (
October 19, 1993 Filing 334 MOTION by defendant Philadelphia Eagles to vacate the Court's order extending the appointment of the special master ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
October 6, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 10/6/93) That: Barbara P. Berens' appointment as special master in the present action is extended until 1/1/94 under the following conditions: the special master is authorized to review all papers, attend all proceedings and otherwise assist the court in any further matters related to the present action. The special master shall be compensated at $125 per hour. Compensation shall be divided equally between pltfs and dfts. A final report pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 53(e) shall not be required. This order is to be effective nunc pro tunc as of 8/20/93. (cc: all counsel) (
October 5, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: (Paul Gruber) Amended Notice of Appeal, and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel.
October 4, 1993 Filing 332 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Paul Gruber from Judge David S. Doty decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (3 pgs.).
October 1, 1993 Filing 331 NOTICE by defendant Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc. of service of documents attached hereto as Exhibits A, B, and C. (
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Maurice Hurst & John Fourcade] Notice of Appeal, Order filed 08/20/93 and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel.
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Don Beebe, Mark Dusbabek] Notice of Appeal, Order filed 08/20/93, and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel.
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Philadelphia Eagles] Notice of Appeal, Order filed 08/20/93, and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel.
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Terry Orr, et al.] Notice of Appeal, Orders filed 04/30/93 and 08/20/93, and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel.
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Sean Jones, Ken Norton, et al.] Notice of Appeal, Order filed 08/20/93, and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 09/23/1993
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Paul Gruber] Notice of Appeal, Order filed 08/20/93, and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 09/23/1993
September 23, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Byron Evans] Notice of Appeal, Order filed 08/20/93, and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 09/23/1993
September 21, 1993 Filing 330 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Maurice Hurst and John Fourcade from Judge David S. Doty's decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (5 pgs.). (Receipt #: 400 200035).
September 17, 1993 Filing 329 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objectors Don Beebe, Gregory Scales, Mark Dusbabek, Carl Lee, Audray McMillian, Felix Wright, Cody Risien, Mark Harper, Sammy Martin from Judge David S. Doty's decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (3 pgs.). (Receipt #: 109959). Modified on 09/23/1993
September 16, 1993 Filing 328 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Philadelphia Eagles from Judge David S. Doty's decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (7 pgs.) (Receipt #: 109949).
September 15, 1993 Filing 327 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objectors Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren, Jeff Bostic, Todd Bowles, Ray Brown, Jason Buck, Earnest A Byner, Desmond Howard, Anthony Johnson, Brian Mitchell, Ricky Sanders, Paul Siever from Judge David S. Dotys decision filed 04/30/93 [224-1] and 08/20/93 [320-1]. (4 pgs.) (Receipt #: 109918). Modified on 09/23/1993
September 15, 1993 Filing 326 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objectors Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Jerry Ball from Judge David S. Doty's decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (6 pgs.). (Receipt #: 109934). Modified on 09/23/1993
September 15, 1993 Filing 325 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Paul Gruber from Judge David S. Doty's decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (4 pgs.) (Receipt #: 109911).
September 14, 1993 Filing 324 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Byron Evans from Judge David S. Doty's decision [320-1] filed 08/20/93. (4 pgs.). (Receipt #: l09906). Modified on 09/23/1993
September 1, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 9/1/93) That: the court's order of 8/20/93, is vacated solely to the extent that it held Mr. O'Neal in contempt of this court's order of 4/30/93, as a result of his motion to return his case, O'Neal v. NFL, No. 92-4368 (C.D. Cal.), to the active caseload of the Central District of California; and the order of 8/20/93 is reaffirmed in all other respects. (cc: all counsel) (5 pgs) (
August 27, 1993 Filing 322 NOTICE of Leslie O'Neal's compliance with 8/20/93 order (separate/with exhibit A) (
August 20, 1993 Filing 321 TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING BEFORE JUDGE DOTY held on 8/10/93 ( Ed Rafel) (Separate) (PAK)
August 20, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 8/19/93) that: 1. The mo to amd the stip and settlement agreement is granted; 2. The mo to approve the stip and settlement agreement, as amended, is granted, and the court grants final approval of the amended version of the stip and settlement agreement; 3. The mo for further factual findings is granted; and 4. Pltfs' mo to sanction the Philadelphia Eagles is denied (c: attys.) (116 pgs) (JMR)
August 20, 1993 Filing 319 EXHIBIT To Final Consent Judgment entered 8/20/93 [318-1] (195 pgs + appendix A - K) (separate) (JMR)
August 20, 1993 Filing 318 Final Consent JUDGMENT (by Judge David S. Doty) this Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over this action to effectuate, and enforce the terms of the stipulation and settlement agreement, as amended, and this judgment; also, no application for attys' fees or costs will be submitted by any pty in this case (cc: all counsel) (7 pgs) (JMR)
August 20, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER (Judge David S. Doty / 8/20/93) that: 1. Defts' mo to hold Mr. O'Neal in contempt is granted. 2. Mr. O'Neal may purge himself of this contempt by withdrawing his mo to return his case to the active caseload of the Central District of California by 8/27/93, notifying this court of such withdrawal, and taking no further action inconsistent with this court's order of 4/30/93. 3. If the mo is withdrawn, the court will entertain a mo to show cause why the court should not hold Mr. O'Neal's counsel in contempt of this court's order of 4/30/93. 4. In the event that the contempt is not purged, the court will defer imposition of sanctions pending the outcome of Mr. O'Neal's appeal, if any, in the present action. (cc: all counsel) (8 pgs) (JMR)
August 16, 1993 Filing 316 CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA dismissing the appeals for lack of jurisdiction. Mandate issued 12/12/93 (c: attys.) [269-1] [266-1] [237-1] [241-1] [264-1] [265-1] [268-1] [267-1] (10 pgs) (JMR) Modified on 08/17/1993
August 12, 1993 Filing 315 STIPULATION & settlement agreement (separate) (
August 10, 1993 Filing 314 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / EDR) hearing; to show cause why Mr. Leslie O'Neal should not be held in contempt of this court's order of 4/30/93 - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (
August 5, 1993 Filing 313 REPLY by Leslie O'Neal to dfts' memorandum in support of motion for an order holding Leslie O'Neal in contempt [300-1] (
July 22, 1993 Filing 312 DECLARATION of James Fitzmaurice regarding dfts' motion for order holding class member Leslie O'Neal in contempt of this court's 4/30 order [299-1] (
July 22, 1993 Filing 311 REPLY MEMORANDUM by NFL in support of their motion for an order holding class member Leslie O'Neal in contempt of this court's 4/30 order [299-1] (
July 22, 1993 Filing 310 RESPONSE (letter form/original) by NFL to Mr. Kessler's letter dated 7/20/93 regarding the NFL's proposed findings of fact [307-1] (
July 21, 1993 Filing 309 RESPONSE (letter form) by National Football to Mr. Kessler's letter dated 7/20/93 regarding the NFL's proposed findings of fact. [307-1] (
July 21, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 7/21/93) That: Mr. O'Neal shall appear on 8/10/93 at 2:30 p.m. to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of this court's order of 4/30/93. [300-1] (cc: all counsel) (2pgs) (
July 20, 1993 Filing 307 LETTER to court from Jeffrey L. Kessler to Judge David S. Doty dated 7/20/93 re: dfts' proposed finding concerning non-statutory labor exemption (2 pgs) (
July 19, 1993 Filing 306 DECLARATION of Suzelle M. Smith in support of memorandum of law showing cause why Leslie O'Neal should not be held in contempt [300-1] [305-1] (separate w/exhibits) (
July 19, 1993 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OF LAW showing cause why Leslie O'Neal should not be held in contempt [300-1] (
July 15, 1993 Filing 304 PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS by pltfs pursuant to the court's request at the 7/7/93 fairness hearing. (
July 15, 1993 Filing 303 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by objectors' Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson and Jerry Ball. (
July 15, 1993 Filing 302 SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by dfts NFL and twenty-seven of its member clubs (
July 15, 1993 Filing 301 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Philadelphia Eagles (33 pgs) (
July 13, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( Judge David S. Doty /7/13/93) That: Mr. O'Neal is ordered to appear on 7/26/93, at 1:30 p.m. to show cause why he should not be held in contempt; that Mr. O'Neal shall file any memorandum on or before 7/19/93; and that dfts shall file any responsive memorandum on or before 7/22/93. (cc: all counsel) (
July 12, 1993 Filing 299 MOTION by defendants for order to show cause ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
July 12, 1993 Filing 298 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by certain objectors' Don Beebe, Gregory Scales, Mark Dusbabek, Carl Lee, Audray McMillian, Felix Wright, Cody Risien, Mark Harper (4 pgs) (
July 9, 1993 Filing 297 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS re: hearing held 7/7/93 before DSD ( EDR) (separate) (
July 7, 1993 Filing 296 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / EDR) Pltfs' motion to amend the settlement agreement; parties' motion to reconfirm factual findings and request further factual findings; parties' request that the court sanction the Philadelphia Eagles - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (
July 2, 1993 Filing 295 DECLARATION of Neil Austrian w/Exhibit A (
July 2, 1993 Filing 294 DECLARATION of Harold Henderson (
July 2, 1993 Filing 293 RESPONSE of the NFL and 27 of its member clubs to the June 22, 1993 objections of Phildadelphia Eagles [281-1] (
July 2, 1993 Filing 292 REPLY MEMORANDUM (
July 2, 1993 Filing 291 REPLY MEMORANDUM by dfts in support of pltfs' motion to amend the stipulation and settlement agreement; and in further support of the parties' joint motion for certain proposed factual findings [230-1] [227-1] (
July 2, 1993 Filing 290 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey L. Kessler (
July 2, 1993 Filing 289 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Douglas F. Allen (
July 2, 1993 Filing 288 DECLARATION of James W. Quinn [286-1] (
July 2, 1993 Filing 287 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to objections to proposed findings (
July 2, 1993 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in further support of proposed amendments to class action stipulation and settlement agreement (30 pgs) (
June 29, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 6/29/93) That: this court's order to show cause dated 6/9/93, is vacated in all respects; Curtis Duncan is relieved of any obligation to appear in this court on 7/7/93, pursuant to the order to show cause dated 6/9/93; and all other parties are relieved of any obligation to address the court concerning the 6/9/93, order to show cause. [270-1] (cc: all counsel) (
June 24, 1993 FOLDER XI beginning with Item 279 (
June 23, 1993 Filing 284 AFFIDAVIT of Arnold D. Herz of dissemination of notice to class [256-1] (separate) (
June 23, 1993 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM by Maurice Hurst and John Fourcade in opposition to the amendments and proposed findings [256-1] (
June 22, 1993 Filing 282 EXHIBITS to objections of the Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc. to the proposed findings and the motion to amend the stipulation and settlement agreement (
June 22, 1993 Filing 281 OBJECTIONS by Philadelphia Eagles to the proposed findings and the motion to amend the stipulation and settlement agreement (20 pgs) [218-1] [230-1] (
June 22, 1993 Filing 280 NOTICE by Byron Evans of intention to appear (
June 22, 1993 Filing 279 AFFIDAVIT of Arnold D. Herz of dissemination of notice to class (facsimile copy) (
June 21, 1993 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM by objectors Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Jerry Ball in opposition to proposed amended stipulation and settlement agreement (7pgs + exh.) (
June 21, 1993 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM by objectors Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Jerry Ball in opposition to proposed factual findings (5pgs + exh.) (
June 21, 1993 Filing 276 NOTICE of intention to appear by Mark Dusbabek, Carl Lee, Audray McMillian, Felix Wright, Cody Risien, Mark Harper, Sammy Martin, Don Beebe, Gregory Scales at the 7/7/93 hearing (1pg) (
June 21, 1993 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM by Paul Gruber in opposition to proposed amendments to the settlement agreement. (
June 21, 1993 Filing 274 NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS by Paul Gruber to the amendments and proposed findings. Ret. 7/7/93 (
June 21, 1993 Filing 273 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for objector Paul Gruber by Mary L. Setter of the Law Firm of Gregg M. Corwin & Assoc. (
June 16, 1993 Filing 272 DECLARATION of Richard A. Bennett, Jr. re protective notice [271-1] (
June 16, 1993 Filing 271 PROTECTIVE NOTICE of class member Wilber Marshall (
June 9, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 6/9/93) That: the pltf in Duncan v. Houston Oilers, Inc. is ordered to appear on 7/7/93, at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why further prosecution of the claims set forth in para. 2 and 3 of pltfs' original petition in that case should not be enjoined; and that Mr. Duncan shall file any memorandum on or before 6/22/93; that dfts shall file any response of memorandum on or before 7/2/93; and that this order remain in effect pending further order of the court and will apply to any further litigation filed by Mr. Duncan that challenges either the Plan B right of first refusal/compensation system, any matter addresssed in the stipulation and settlement agreement in this case, or the stipulation and settlement agreement itself. [263-1] (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (
June 9, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Orr, Collins, #269] Notice of Appeal and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 06/24/1993
June 9, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Dusbabek, #268] Notice of Appeal and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 06/24/1993
June 9, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Philadelphia Eagles, #267] Notice of Appeal and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 06/24/1993
June 9, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Jones, Norton, #266] Notice of Appeal and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 06/24/1993
June 9, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Byron Evans, #265] Notice of Appeal and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 06/24/1993
June 9, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Hurst and Fourcade, #264] Notice of Appeal and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. Modified on 06/24/1993
June 8, 1993 Filing 263 MOTION by defendants for order to show cause why further prosecution of certain claims in a case filed in the 129th Dist. Court, Harris County, Texas should not be enjoined ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time set) (
June 8, 1993 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS re : motion hearing held 6/1/93 before Judge David S. Doty ( EDR) (separate) (
June 3, 1993 Filing 261 Certified copies of the docket entries, pursuant to Order signed by Judge David S. Doty and filed on 6/3/93, of: Jackson v. National Football League, Civ. No. 4-92-876 (D. Minn. filed 9/14/92) (
June 3, 1993 Filing 260 Certified copies of the docket entries, pursuant to Order signed by Judge David S. Doty and filed on 6/3/93, of: McNeil v. National Football League, Civ. No. 4-90-476 (D. Minn. filed 4/10/90) (
June 3, 1993 Filing 259 Certified copies of the docket entries, pursuant to Order signed by Judge David S. Doty and filed on 6/3/93, of: Powell v. National Football League, Civ. No. 4-87-917 (D. Minn. filed 10/15/87) (
June 3, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 6/3/93) That: dfts' motion to incorporate is granted, and the full and complete records in: (1) Powell v. NFL, Civil 4-87-917 filed 10/15/87, (2) McNeil v. NFL, Civil 4-90-476, filed 4/10/90, and (3) Jackson v. NFL, Civil 4-92-876, filed 9/14/92, including the original papers and exhibits, transcripts of proceedings, if any, and certified copies of the docket entries prepared by the Clerk of this Court, shall be incorporated into the record of the present action. The Clerk of this Court is ordered to incorporate the records of the foregoing cases by filing a summary of the docket entries in the foregoing cases as part of the docket entries in the present case. (cc: all counsel) (3 pgs) (
June 3, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 6/3/93) That: class counsel's request that the court resolve the disputes involving Tim Brown and Terry McDaniel is denied. (cc: all counsel) (3 pgs) (
June 2, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 6/2/93) That: the amendments and proposed findings are preliminarily approved as fair, reasonable and adequate to all class members; pltfs shall cause notice, in the form annexed hereto, to be mailed by first class mail, postage prepaid, within seven days of the entry of this order, to all persons whom the parties through their best efforts have been able to determine: a. were on the active list of an NFL Club at the end of the 1992 NFL season; b. were selected in the 1993 NFL College Draft; or c. since 3/1/93, have signed a player contract for the parties have been able to obtain a current or last known mailing address. A hearing shall be held before this court in courtroom 4 of the U.S. Courthouse, Minneapolis, MN on 7/7/93 at 9:00 a.m. (the "Settlement Hearing"), on the fairness, reasonableness and adequacy of the amendments and the proposed findings. Amendments and proposed findings, and all papers in support thereof, shall be available for inspection at the office of the clerk of the court. The parties are preliminarily and temporarily ordered to abide by the terms of the amendments until a final ruling by this court rejecting or approving the amendments. [230-1] [227-1] (cc: all counsel) (20 pgs) (
June 2, 1993 Filing 255 RESPONSE by Sean Jones, Ken Norton, Jr., Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Jerry Ball to pltfs' and dfts' joint submission regarding motion to intervene by "California objectors" [215-1] (
June 2, 1993 Filing 253 LETTER to court dated 5/28/93 from plaintiff re: application of the stipulation and settlement agreement. (
June 2, 1993 Filing 252 LETTER to court from Los Angeles Raiders re: continued opposition to Mr. Kessler's attempts to avoid the binding arbitration procedure previously begun by Mr. Brown and Mr. McDaniel. (
June 2, 1993 Filing 251 RESPONSE (letter to court) on behalf of the Commissioner of the NFL to the court's inquiry at the 6/1/93 hearing re: intervening in the Tim Brown/Terryy McDaniel arbitration proceeding. (
June 2, 1993 Filing 249 LETTER to court from plaintiffs re: request by class members Tim Brown and Terry McDaniel to commence an enforcement proceeding under the White Settlement Agreement. (
June 1, 1993 Filing 254 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / EDR) Pltfs' motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1]; Parties' (other than Philadelphia Eagles) motion for entry of certain factual findings [227-1] pltfs'motion for immediate entry of consent order; motions argued, submitted and taken under advisement. Dfts' oral motion to supplement record wherein Jackson, Powell & McNeil are incorporated into White- argued, submitted and granted. (no objections) (
June 1, 1993 Filing 250 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Jeffrey Pash and substituting attorney Gregg Levy on behalf of the NFL. (
June 1, 1993 Filing 248 RESPONSE (letter) by National Football League to Class Counsel's request that the court schedule a hearing to interpret the 1992 NFL Player Contract between the Los Angeles Raiders and Tim Brown, and the 1992 NFL Player Contract between the Los Angeles Raiders and Terry McDaniel. (
June 1, 1993 Filing 247 RESPONSE (letter) by Los Angeles Raiders to Mr. Kessler's letter of 5/28/93. (
May 28, 1993 Filing 269 NOTICE OF APPEAL by pltf-intervenors Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren, Jeff Bostic, Todd Bowles, Ray Brown, Jason Buck, Earnest A Byner, Desmond Howard, Anthony - Johnson, Brian Mitchell, Ricky Sanders, Paul Siever from Judge David S. Doty decision of 4/30/93. [224-1] (3pgs) (CJF)
May 28, 1993 Filing 267 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Philadelphia Eagles from Judge David S. Doty's decision [224-1] filed 04/30/93. (7 pgs.).
May 28, 1993 Filing 266 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Sean Jones, objector Eric Allen, objector Leslie O'Neal, objector Eric Sanders, objector Ken Norton Jr, objector Curtis Duncan, objector Patrick Hunter, objector William C Matthews, objector Cris Dishman, objector Lomas Brown, objector Neil Smith, objector Van Waiters, objector Broderick Thompson, objector Jerry Ball from Judge David S. Doty's decision [224-1] filed 04/30/93. (2 pgs.).
May 28, 1993 Filing 246 OBJECTIONS (letter) by Terry Orr, et al. to notices of appeal [237-1] (
May 28, 1993 Filing 245 MEMORANDUM by Maurice Hurst and John Fourcade in support of objections and in opposition to motion to amend the stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1] (
May 27, 1993 Filing 268 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Mark Dusbabek, objector Carl Lee, objector Audray McMillian, objector Felix Wright, objector Cody Risien, objector Mark Harper, objector Sammy Martin, objector Don Beebe, objector Gregory Scales from Judge David S. Doty's decision [224-1] filed 04/30/93. (3 pgs.).
May 27, 1993 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Byron Evans from Judge David S. Doty's decision [224-1] filed 04/30/93. (4 pgs.).
May 27, 1993 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Maurice Hurst, objector John Fourcade from Judge David S. Doty 's decision [224-1] filed 04/30/93. (2 pgs.).
May 27, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Gruber, #241] Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. (JMR) Modified on 06/24/1993
May 27, 1993 Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Paul Gruber from Judge David S. Doty decision [224-1] (1 pg) (JMR)
May 26, 1993 Filing 244 LETTER to court from plaintiffs requesting filing the attached: (i) Appendix C to the Collective Bargaining Agreement between the National Football League Management Council and the National Football League Players Assoc., dated 5/6/93 (the "CBA"), which is attached as exhibit A to the supplemental affidavit of Eugene Upshaw [232-1] filed on 5/14/93. (
May 26, 1993 Filing 243 Supplemental DECLARATION of Jeffrey L. Kessler (
May 26, 1993 Filing 242 NOTICE by plaintiffs of preliminary hearing concerning pltfs' motion to amend class action stipulation & settlement agreement & the parties' joint motion regarding entry of certain factual findings [230-1] Ret. 6/1/93 at 2:00 p.m. (2 pgs) (
May 26, 1993 DELIVERED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: [Wilbur Marshal, #237]: Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and District Court Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel. (JMR) Modified on 07/05/1993
May 25, 1993 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM by Sean Jones, et al. (objectors) in support of objections and opposition to joint memorandum in support of proposed factual findings (4pgs + exh.) (
May 25, 1993 Filing 239 MEMORANDUM by players Sean Jones, et al. (objectors) in support of objections and opposition to pltfs' motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1] (
May 25, 1993 Filing 238 MEMORANDUM by "Vikings Players" in support of objections and in opposition to motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1] (4pgs) (
May 21, 1993 Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEAL by objector Wilber Marshall from Judge David S. Doty decision [224-1] (1 pg) (JMR)
May 21, 1993 Filing 236 NOTICE by plaintiffs of preliminary hearing concerning pltfs' motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement ( Judge David S. Doty ) [230-1] Ret. 6/1/93 at 2:00 p.m. (
May 20, 1993 Filing 235 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS re: Fairness Hearing held 4/16/93 before Judge David S. Doty ( EDR) (separate) (
May 17, 1993 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Harold Henderson (7 pgs) (JMR)
May 14, 1993 Filing 233 DECLARATION of Jeffrey L. Kessler re motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1] (separate) (
May 14, 1993 Filing 232 SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Eugene Upshaw regarding motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1] (separate) (
May 14, 1993 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement [230-1] (18+pgs) (
May 14, 1993 Filing 230 MOTION by plaintiffs to amend class action stipulation and settlement agreement ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
May 14, 1993 Filing 229 DECLARATION of Harold Henderson re motion for entry of certain factual findings [227-1] (
May 14, 1993 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM by the parties in support of proposed factual findings [227-1] (
May 14, 1993 Filing 227 MOTION by the parties for entry of certain factual findings ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
May 11, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 5/10/93) That: Barbara P. Berens is appointed special master pursuant to Rule 53 of the F.R.C.P. The special master is authorized to review all papers, attend all proceedings and otherwise assist the court in any further proceedings concerning the present action. The special master shall be compensated $125 per hour. Compensation shall be divided equally between pltfs and dfts. For purposes of this appointment, a final report pursuant to F.R.C.P. 53(e) shall not be required. This appointment is to be effective nunc pro tunc as of 5/1/93, and will continue until the court enters final judgment in the present action. (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (
April 30, 1993 Due to clerical error docket number 225 not used (JMR)
April 30, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 4/30/93) That: all motions to intervene are denied except to the extent that those movants will be permitted to preserve their right to appeal; named movants are fully-described on pages 112 and 113 of this order. [108-1] [126-1] [160-1] [215-1]. The complaints in intervention shall not be filed, and the named pltfs and dfts need not answer or otherwise respond to any such complaints in intervention. The motions to extend time are granted to the extent that the court previously granted such motions on the record, that is, all motions to extend time filed on or before 4/16/93, are granted; all motions to extend time made at the hearing on 4/16/93, are granted; and no objections filed after will be considered by the court. [158-1] [163-1] [198-1-2]. Dfts' motions to enjoin the 17 named actions on pages 114 & 115 in the order are granted. Dfts' request to sanction the Philadelphia Eagles is denied. The Philadelphia Eagles' motion for leave to file a response to the named parties' proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law is granted. Robert Sheridan's motion to intervene for agents is denied in its entirety. [211-1] (cc: all counsel) (115 pgs) (
April 28, 1993 Filing 223 JOINE SUBMISSION regarding motion to intervene by California objectors and recent developments concerning objections of Brian Pressler & Robert J. Sheridan [215-1] (6 pgs) (
April 23, 1993 Filing 222 MEMORANDUM by certain objectors' Carl Lee, et al. in opposition to proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (
April 23, 1993 Filing 221 Certain objectors' Carl Lee, et al. proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (
April 23, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 4/22/93 / Judge Paul A. Magnuson /4/22/93 ) That Related Case No. 3-93-182 be assigned to Judge Doty. (cc: all counsel) (
April 23, 1993 Filing 219 RESPONSE of "Washington Redskins" objectors (5 pgs) (
April 23, 1993 Filing 218 Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by NFL League Players Sean Jones, Ken Norton, Jr., Eric Allen, Patrick Hunter, William C. Mathews, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Curtis Duncan, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson and Jerry Ball. (
April 23, 1993 Filing 217 Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by the Hurst objectors (8 pgs) (
April 23, 1993 Filing 216 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal /4/20/93 ) on behalf of Byron Evans by Butron J. Kinerk, Esq. (
April 23, 1993 Filing 215 MOTION by Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Jerry Ball to intervene ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
April 23, 1993 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Suzelle M. Smith in support of objections to pltfs' proposed findings of fact and dfts' proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law [213-1] (
April 23, 1993 Filing 213 OBJECTIONS by Sean Jones, Eric Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton Jr, Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C Matthews, Cris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters, Broderick Thompson, Jerry Ball to pltfs' proposed findings of fact and dfts' proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (26 pgs) (
April 20, 1993 Filing 212 Proposed counter-findings of fact & conclusions of law by objector Philadelphia Eagles and opposition to dfts' proposed findings [211-1] (
April 20, 1993 Filing 211 MOTION by objector Philadelphia Eagles for leave to file proposed counter-findings of fact and conclusions of law (to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
April 20, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 4/20/93/ 4/20/93 Judge James M> Rosenbaum ) That: related case 4-93 Civil 314 be assigned to Judge Doty. (cc: all counsel) (
April 16, 1993 Filing 210 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / Ed Rafel) Final hearing held - Objections to proposed settlement put on the record. All motions to intervene & all motions to extend time-argued submitted and taken under advisement. NFL's motions to enjoin - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. [198-2], [163-1], [160-1], [126-1], [118-1], [158-1], [108-1] 4pgs (PAK)
April 15, 1993 Filing 208 PETITION for admission pro hac vice on behalf of objector Kenneth F Ruettgers by Scott R. Baker, Esq. (
April 15, 1993 Filing 207 PETITION for admission pro hac vice on behalf of objector Maurice Hurst, objector John Fourcade by Lawrence D. Wiedemann, Esq. (
April 15, 1993 Filing 206 PETITION for admission pro hac vice on behalf of objector Maurice Hurst by Brian G. Shearman, Esq. (
April 15, 1993 Filing 205 AFFIDAVIT of Felix Wright regarding notice of objection to settlement (facsimile copy) [150-1] (
April 15, 1993 Filing 204 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Dusbabek regarding notice of objection to settlement (facsimile copy) [150-1] (
April 15, 1993 Filing 203 NOTICE of opposition by Cody Risien and Mark Harper to dfts' motion for a further order to show cause (
April 15, 1993 Filing 202 Notice of joinder in OBJECTIONS by Jerry Ball to proposed 23(b)(1) settlement class certification (5 pgs) (
April 15, 1993 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Robert J. Sheridan re reply [200-1] (
April 15, 1993 Filing 200 REPLY memorandum by Brian Pressler and Robert J Sheridan and all other similarly situated college, etc., players, and agents to supplemental memoranda filed by class counsel and dfts' counsel (22 pgs) (
April 15, 1993 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM by (17) players/Washington Redskins in support of motion for leave to amend or for enlargement of time [198-1] [198-2] (
April 15, 1993 Filing 198 MOTION by (17) players/Washington Redskins for leave to amend or for enlargement of time ( to Judge David S. Doty ) Ret. 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (
April 15, 1993 Filing 197 DECLARATION of Dave Duerson (
April 15, 1993 Filing 196 SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. Berthelsen (
April 15, 1993 Filing 195 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by pltfs in response to opposition of Washington Redskins objectors (5 pgs) (
April 15, 1993 Filing 194 OBJECTIONS by Kenneth F Ruettgers to proposed 23(b)(1) class settlement and joinder in objection filed by others [193-1] (
April 15, 1993 Filing 193 REQUEST by Kenneth F Ruettgers for leave to file objection (
April 15, 1993 Filing 192 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Richard A. Bennett, Jr. (
April 15, 1993 Filing 191 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) by Gary C. Adler appearing on behalf of certain objectors. (
April 14, 1993 Filing 190 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Richard A. Bennett, Jr. (facsimile copy) (
April 14, 1993 Filing 189 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Gerald Goldman (
April 14, 1993 Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT of Cody Risien in support of his objection to settlement (facsimile copy) [151-1] (
April 14, 1993 Filing 187 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Harper (facsimile copy) (
April 14, 1993 Filing 186 Notice of OBJECTION by Pat Carter to settlement (
April 14, 1993 Filing 185 NOTICE of joinder by objector Curtis Duncan (
April 14, 1993 Filing 184 Notice of intent to object by objector Kenneth F Ruettgers to confirmation of the settlement hearing on 4/16/93. (
April 14, 1993 FOLDER VII ending with item 174 FOLDER VIII beginning with item 175 (
April 13, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 4/13/93) That: the court's order to show cause of 3/4/92 is amended to include an additional case captioned B. Evans v. NFL, et al., Case No. 92-878 (D. Ariz.), and pltf in that case is ordered to appear on 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why further prosecution of that case should not be enjoined, and to state his objection, if any, to the settlement of this case; and that this order remain in effect pending further order of the court and will apply to any further litigation filed by Mr. Evan's counsel that challenges either Plan B right of first refusal/compensation system, any matter addressed in the stipulation and settlement agreement in this case, or the stipulation and settlement agreement itself. (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (
April 13, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 4/13/93) That: the court's order to show cause is amended to include an additional case captioned Curtis Duncan v. NFL, et al., Case No. 93-1481 (C.D. Cal.), and pltf in that case is ordered to appear on 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why further prosecution of that case should not be enjoined, and to state his objection, if any, to the settlement of this case; that any supplement memorandum on behalf of Mr. Duncan shall be filed on or before 4/15/93; and that this order remain in effect pending further order of the court and will apply to any further litigation filed by Mr. Duncan's counsel that challenges either the Plan B right of first refusal/compensation system, any matter addressed in the stipulation and settlement agreement in this case, or the stipulation and settlement agreement itself. (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (
April 13, 1993 Filing 181 DECLARATION of Paul Tagliabue in support of final court approval of the stipulation and settlement agreement (executed) [173-1][174-1] (
April 13, 1993 Filing 180 RESPONSE of the NFL and 27 of its member clubs to the objections of the Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc. [119-1] (19 pgs) (
April 13, 1993 Filing 179 DECLARATION of Douglas F. Allen re pltfs' memorandum in support of proposed settlement [176-1] (
April 13, 1993 Filing 178 SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. Berthelsen regarding pltfs' further support of final approval of the stipulation and settlement agreement [176-1] (separate) (
April 13, 1993 Filing 177 SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of James W. Quinn regarding pltfs' further support of the stipulation and settlement agreement [176-1] (separate) (
April 13, 1993 Filing 176 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by pltfs in further support of final approval of the class action stipulation and settlement agreement [93-1] (96 pgs/separate) (
April 12, 1993 Filing 175 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of players by C Lamont Smith (1 pg) (DFL)
April 12, 1993 Filing 174 DECLARATION of Paul Tagliabue in support of final court approval of the stipulation and settlement agreement (unexecuted) [173-1] (
April 12, 1993 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM of dft NFL & 27 NFL member clubs in response to player and player-agent objections and in support of final court approval of the proposed stipulation and settlement agreement with exhibits A & B (separate) (
April 12, 1993 Filing 172 APPENDIX to extended memorandum by Redskins Players [171-1] (includes affidavits of Terry Orr, Eric Williams, Jason Buck, Joe Jacoby and Matt Elliott w/exhibits). (
April 12, 1993 Filing 171 Extended MEMORANDUM in support of Washington Redskins Players' opposition to final approval of the stipulation and settlement agreement (18pgs) (
April 9, 1993 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM by dft NFL & 27 NFL member clubs in response to motions to intervene [108-1] [129-1] [160-1] (
April 9, 1993 Filing 168 DECLARATION of James Fitzmaurice re dfts' motion for an order enjoining the further prosecution of separate lawsuits filed by individual members of the mandatory class [118-1] (separate) (
April 9, 1993 Filing 167 REPLY MEMORANDUM by dfts in support of motion for an orderr enjoining the further prosecution of separate lawsuits filed by individual members of the mandatory class [118-1] (47 pgs) (
April 9, 1993 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM by pltfs in response to motions to intervene by the following players: Wilber Marshall, Paul Gruber, Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, and Don Warren. (
April 8, 1993 Filing 170 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice (Clerk Francis E. Dosal) on behalf of objectors Michael C Johnson and Reggie Langhorne by David Aggers (1 pg) (SJH)
April 8, 1993 Filing 165 OBJECTIONS by Brian Blades to proposed settlement (
April 8, 1993 Filing 164 OBJECTIONS by objector Roland James to proposed settlement (
April 5, 1993 Filing 159 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice (Clerk Francis E. Dosal) on behalf of players by Robert J Sheridan (1 pg) (SJH)
April 5, 1993 Filing 156 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / EDR) The court verbally orders that the requirement of local counsel is waived for attorneys who are to be admitted pro hac vice for the hearing on 4/16/93 (1 pg) (DFL)
April 5, 1993 Filing 155 DECLARATION of Norman Braman (11 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 163 MOTION by objectors Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren to extend time to serve and file an extended memorandum in opposition to approval of settlement agreement ( to Judge David S. Doty ) Ret. 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (
April 2, 1993 Filing 162 NOTICE of intention to appear by objectors Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren. (
April 2, 1993 Filing 161 MEMORANDUM by objectors Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren in support of motion to intervene [160-1] (
April 2, 1993 Filing 160 MOTION by objectors Terry Orr, Shane Collins, Ron Middleton, Mark Schlereth, Kelly Goodburn, David Gulledge, Ed Simmons, Matt Elliott, Joe Jacoby, Sidney Johnson, Kurt Gouveia, Ravin Caldwell, Mark Rypien, James Jenkins, Johnny Thomas, Eric Williams, Don Warren to intervene ( to Judge David S. Doty ) Ret. 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (unsigned complaint in intervention attached) (
April 2, 1993 Filing 158 MOTION by Barry Sanders, Luis Sharpe, Steve Atwater, Horatio Bennie Blades, and James Hasty for extension of time to file papers, affidavits, and briefs in opposition to the settlement ( to Judge David S. Doty ) 3 pages (PJS)
April 2, 1993 Filing 157 NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPEAR at Order to Show Cause Hearing on April 16, 1993 and NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT by Barry Sanders, Luis Sharpe, Steve Atwater, Bennie Blades, and James Hasty (3 pages) (PJS)
April 2, 1993 Filing 154 Memorandum in opposition by Barry Sanders, Luis Sharpe, Steve Atwater, Horatio Bennie Blades and James Hasty to order [83-2] (16 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 153 NOTICE BY MIKE FARR, PEPPER JOHNSON AND LOMAS BROWN OF OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT (2 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 152 NOTICE BY SAMMY MARTIN OF OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT (1 pg) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 151 Memorandum by Carl Lee, Mark Dusbabek, Audray McMillian, Felix Wright, Cody Risien and Mark Harper in opposition to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (25 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 150 NOTICE BY MARK DUSBABEK, CARL LEE, AUDRAY McMILLIAN, FELIX WRIGHT, CODY RISIEN AND MARK HARPER TO OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT (1 PG) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 149 NOTICE BY GRETORY SCALES OF OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT (1 pg) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 148 NOTICE BY DON BEEBE OF OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT (1 pg) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT of Lomas Brown, Jr. regarding objection [133-1] (15+ pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Neil Smith (4 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Cris Dishman (4 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Curtis Duncan (4 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Patrick Hunter (5 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Erick Sanders (4 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 141 DECLARATION of William C. Mathews (4 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Ken Norton, Jr. (4 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Eric Allen (5 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 138 DECLARATION of Sean Jones (5 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT of Don Howarth (2 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 136 DECLARATION of Michael J. Wagner re objection [133-1] (10 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Don Howarth re objection [133-1] (2+ pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Suzelle M. Smith regarding objection [133-1] (13+ pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 133 OBJECTIONS by Sean Jones, Erick Allen, Leslie O'Neal, Eric Sanders, Ken Norton, Jr., Curtis Duncan, Patrick Hunter, William C. Matthews, Chris Dishman, Lomas Brown, Neil Smith, Van Waiters and Broderick Thompson to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (46 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 132 NOTICE BY BRIAN WASHINGTON OF INTENTION TO APPEAR AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 4/16/93 (1 pg) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Ralph E. Cindrich re memorandum [130-1] (5 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 130 Memorandum by objector Paul Gruber in opposition to proposed settlement agreement [83-2] (11 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 129 NOTICE OF OBJECTION by Paul Gruber to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (1 pg) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 128 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by GreggM. Corwin for Paul Gruber (1 pg) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 127 Memorandum by objector Paul Gruber in support of motion by Paul Gruber to intervene [126-1] (13 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 126 NOTICE AND MOTION by Paul Gruber to intervene ( to Judge David S. Doty ) , ret. 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (2 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 125 LETTER to court from Gregory J. Baty requesting exclusion from class action (2 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 124 OBJECTIONS by Brian Pressler and all other present and future college and other football players and of Robert J. Sheridan and all other present and future agents and attorney-agents to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (28 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT of Byron Evans regarding notice [122-1] (28 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 122 NOTICE BY CLASS MEMBER BYRON EVANS TO APPEAR at hearing scheduled for 4/16/93 to approve the proposed settlement (35 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 121 OBJECTIONS of "Hurst" players to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (34 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 120 Exhibits to objections of the Eagles to Stipulation and Settlement Agreement (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 119 OBJECTIONS by defendant Philadelphia Eagles to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (34 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 118 MOTION by defendants for order to show cause why further prosecution of 4-93-314 and 4-93-182 should not be enjoined ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (7+ pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 117 OBJECTIONS of Michael C. Johnson and Reggie Langhorne to order [83-2] dated 2/26/93 (14+ pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 116 Memorandum by Wilber Marshall in support of motion to intervene [108-1] (5 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Gerald Goldman re notice [113-1] (7 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 114 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Richard A. Bennett, Jr. re notice [113-1] (11+ pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Filing 113 NOTICE OF CLASS MEMBER WILBUR MARSHALL of intention to appear, and supplmental argument (16 pgs) (DFL)
April 2, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Amending and Supplementing Order to Show Cause of 3/4/93 (Judge David S. Doty) 1. That the Court's order to show cause of 3/4/93 is amended to include the additional cases captioned Mark Harper v. National Football League, et al., Civil Action No. 4-93-314, and Cody Risien v. National Football League, et al., Civil Action No. 4-93-182 (D. Minn.), and pltfs in those cases are hereby ordered to appear on 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why further prosecution of those cases should not be enjoined, and to state their objections, if any, to the settlement of this case; and 2. That the memorandum filed on behalf of Messrs. Mark Dusbabek, Carl Lee, Eric McMillan and Felix Wright shall be deemed to have been filed on behalf of Messrs. Harper and Risien as well, and 3. That any supplemental memorandum on behalf of Messrs. Harper and Risien shall be filed on or before 4/5/93; and 4. That any responsive memorandum be filed on or before 4/9/93; and 5. That his order remain in effect pending further order of the Court and will apply to any further litigation filed by Messrs. Harper and Risien's counsel that challenges either the Plan B Right of First Refusal/Compensation System, any matter addressed in the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement in this case, or the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement itself (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (SJH)
March 30, 1993 Filing 111 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of intervenor Wilber Marshall by Gerald Goldman. (lpg) (CJF)
March 29, 1993 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT of Jay L. Levine of dissemination of notice to class (separate) (
March 26, 1993 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM by players in opposition to motion for order to show cause [98-1] (
March 25, 1993 Filing 108 MOTION by Wilber Marshall to intervene ( to Judge David S. Doty ) Ret. 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (
March 25, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 3/24/93) That: players Maurice Hurst & John Fourcade's motion to extend date to file opposition to enjoin is granted, and that said opposition the motion to enjoin shall be filed by Friday, 3/26/93. [104-1] (cc: all counsel) (
March 24, 1993 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in support of players Hurst and Fourcade's motion to extend date to file opposition to enjoin [104-1] (
March 24, 1993 Filing 104 MOTION by players Maurice Hurst and John Fourcade to extend date to file oppositon to enjoin ( to Judge David S. Doty (no date/time) (
March 24, 1993 Filing 103 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of defendant Philadelphia Eagles by Maxwell M. Blecher (1pg) (VEM)
March 23, 1993 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT OF hearing before Judge Doty on 2/26/93 (Stephen Amon ) (Separate) (PAK)
March 23, 1993 TRANSCRIPT FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, INJUNCTIVE CLASS CERTIFICATION & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF held 11/2/92 before Judge Doty ( Amon, R) (document located in 4-90-476) (Separate) (CJF) Modified on 03/25/1993
March 19, 1993 Filing 102 OBJECTORS CARL LEE, FELIX WRIGHT, MARK DUSBABEK AND AUDRAY MCMILLIAN MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (21pgs) (PAK)
March 19, 1993 Filing 101 DECLARATION and EXHIBITS of Don Howarth (3+ pages) --separate-- (PJS)
March 19, 1993 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM by NFL players Sean Jones, Ken Norton, Eric Allen, Patrick Hunter, William Mathews, Leslie O'Neal,and Eric Sanders ("California litigants") to show cause why their individual lawsuits filed in the USDC California should not be enjoined (13 pages) (PJS)
March 18, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 3/18/93) amending and supplementing order to show cause of 3/4/93 to include an additional case captioned Maurice Hurst and John Fourcase v. Natonal Football League, Civil Action No. 93-0766 (E.D. La), and plaintiffs in this case are ordered to appear on 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why further prosecution of that case should not be enjoined and to state their objectons, if any ; that plaintiffs file any memorandum showing cause why the prosecution of this case should not be enjoined on or before 3/26/93 ; any responsive memoranda be filed on or before 4/9/93 ; that this order remain in effect pending further order of the court and will apply to any further litigation filed by Messrs. Hurst and Fourcase that challenges either the Plan B Right of First Refusal/Compensation System or the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement in this case (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (DFL)
March 18, 1993 Filing 98 MOTION by defendants for order to show cause why further prosecution of a case filed in the U.S. Distrct of Louisiana should not be enjoined ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/tmie noticed) (4+ pgs) (DFL)
March 16, 1993 Filing 97 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Philadelphia Eagles; represented by Dorsey and Whitney, and by Maxwell M. Blecher, Blecher & Collins, 611 West Sixth St., 28th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 9017, (213) 622-4222 (
March 11, 1993 Filing 96 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of various objectors by Don Howarth (1pg) (VEM)
March 11, 1993 Filing 95 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of various objectors by Suzelle M Smith (1pg) (VEM)
March 8, 1993 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of dfts' motion for an order to show cause [89-1] (
March 5, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( Judge David S. Doty ) That: dfts' motion for an order to show cause why certain cases should not be enjoined is granted; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that pltfs in each of the actions identified above appear on 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why the prosecution of these lawsuits should not be enjoined and to state their objection, if any, to the settlement of this case; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that the pltfs in each of the actions identified above file any memoranda showing cause why the prosecution of these lawsuits should not be enjoined on or before 3/19/93; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that any responsive memoranda be filed on or before 4/9/93. (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (
March 5, 1993 Filing 92 LETTER to Clerk of Court from attorney Peter S. Hendrixson reminding us of his separate representation of the defendant Philadelphia Eagles. (
March 4, 1993 Filing 91 DECLARATION of James Fitzmaurice re dfts' motion for order to show cause with Exhibits A-N [89-1] (separate) (
March 4, 1993 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM by defendants in support of motion for order to show cause [89-1] (
March 4, 1993 Filing 89 MOTION by defendants for order to show cause ( to Judge David S. Doty ) Ret. 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (
March 4, 1993 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM (corrected version 3/4/93) of class member Wilber Marshall in opposition to court approval of proposed settlement and in support of sua sponte relief [85-1] (
March 3, 1993 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Richard A. Bennett, Jr. pursuant to court's oral order of 2/26/93. (
March 2, 1993 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Richard A. Bennett, Jr. in support of memorandum of class member Wilber Marshall [85-1] (facsimile copy) (
March 2, 1993 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM of class member Wilber Marshall in opposition to court approval of proposed settlement and in support of sua sponte relief (24 pgs) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 84 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / EDR) Preliminary & final approval of the settlement agreement - argued, submitted and granted. Order forthcoming. (Objs filed to settlement agreement 4/2/93. Final hearing: 4/16/93. (
February 26, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, NOTICE TO CLASS AND SCHEDULING ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 2/26/93) Pltfs shall cause notice, in the form annexed to the stipulation and settlement agreement to be mailed by First-Class Mail, postage prepaid, within 15 days of the date of entry of this order, to all persons whom the parties through their best efforts have been able to determine are Class Members and with respect to whom the parties have been able to obtain a current or last-known mailing address (the "Notice to Class"). A summary notice, in the form annexed as Exhibit A, shall be published in one issue of USA Today newspaper, within 10 days of the date of entry of this order. Notice given in the form and manner provided in paragraphs 2 and 3 of this order is found to be due, adequate, and sufficient notice, and the best notice practicable under the circumstances, and shall constitute the notice required by Rule 23 of The F.R.C.P. Pltfs shall serve and file affidavits evidencing compliance with this order withiin 30 days after the date of its entry. The costs of printing or otherwise duplicating and mailing the Notice of Class and of publishing the Summary Notice shall be paid exclusively by pltfs. A hearing shall be held before Judge Doty in Courtroom 4 in the U.S. Courthouse, 110 South Fourth St., Mpls., MN on 4/16/93 at 9:00 a.m. (the Settlement Hearing"), on the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the proposed settlement and dismissal of the Action. Any class member may appear at the settlement hearing in person or by counsel and be heard in support of, or in opposition to, the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the proposed settlement, provided that by 4/2/93, notice of such class member's intention to appear, along with any papers in opposition to the proposed settlement, or any other statement by a class member of his position with his respect to the foregoing, has been filed with the Clerk of the Court and served in person or by first-class mail upon all counsel. The stipulation and settlement agreement and all papers in support shall be available for inspection at the office of the Clerk of the Court. The court reserves the right to approve the stipulation and settlement agreement, with such modifications as may be agreed to by the parties, without further notice, and to adjourn the settlement hearing from time to time, by oral announcement at the hearing, without further written notice to the class members. The parties are preliminarily and temporarily ordered to abide by the terms of the stipulation and settlement agreement until a final ruling of this court approving or rejecting this stipulation and settlement agreement. (cc: all counsel) (5 pgs w/summary notice of hearings, stipulation & settlement agreement) (separate) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 82 NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT HEARING set for 4/16/93 (25 pgs) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Edward M. Glennon in support of the NFL's motion for preliminary and final court approval of the proposed settlement (7 pgs) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Eugene Upshaw in support of pltfs' motion for preliminary and final court approval of the proposed settlement of this class action (3 pgs) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Berthelsen in support of pltfs' motion for preliminary and final court approval of the proposed settlement of this class action (22pgs w/exhibits A-G) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of James W. Quinn in support of pltfs' motion for preliminary and final court approval of the proposed settlement of this class action (separate) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of preliminary and final approval of the settlement agreement (50 pgs) (
February 26, 1993 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM of Tice players to preliminary approval of settlement (Law Firm of Yablonski, Both & Edelman submitted for filing this document in White v. NFL, Civil 4-92-906) (
February 24, 1993 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Paul Tagliabue (original executed document) (
February 23, 1993 Filing 74 COUNTERCLAIM; by defendants against plaintiffs (included w/answer to second amended class action complaint) (
February 23, 1993 Filing 74 ANSWER by defendants to pltfs' second amended class action complaint (counterclaim included) [69-1] (30 pgs) (
February 23, 1993 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Paul Tagliabue (unexecuted) (
February 23, 1993 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM by defendants in support of preliminary court approval of the proposed stipulation & settlement agreement (35 pgs) (
February 19, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 2/17/93 /Judge James M. Rosenbaum /2/18/93 ) Reassignment of companion case Civil 4-93-166 to Judge David S. Doty. (cc: all counsel) (
February 18, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty /2/17/93 ) Re: Consolidating actions 4-92-906 & 4-93-143 and certifying the Lewis case. (cc: all counsel) (3 pgs) (
February 18, 1993 Filing 69 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [3-1] by plaintiffs pursuant to stipulation & order dated 2/17/93. (
February 18, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty /2/17/93 ) Re: filing of second amended complaint is granted. Dave Duerson is add as pltf. (cc: all counsel) (
February 18, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty /2/17/93) Re: amended stipulation to certify class for injunctive relief & damages is granted. Dfts' time to answer the second amended complaint in this action will be extended until further order of this court. (cc: all counsel) (6 pgs) (
February 8, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CAMPANION CASE ( Judge David S. Doty / 2/2/93/RHK/2/3/93/PAM/2/4/93) Re: reassignment of these civil related cases. Related Case Nos. 3-93-62, 3-93-63 and 3-93-64 have been assigned to Judge Doty, nunc pro tunc, without use of the case assignment system. (cc: all counsel) (
January 13, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ( Judge David S. Doty / 1/12/93) That: 1. Each dft NFL club is preliminarily and temporarily enjoined from entering into negotiations or signing a contract with any player who has an existing contract with any other NFL club which contract is scheduled to expire on 2/1/93. 2. This order shall expire at 12:01 a.m. EST on 3/1/93 or as otherwise amended by this court. 3. This order shall apply only to those contracts scheduled to expire on 2/1/93. 4. Nothing in this order is intended to give any club any greater rights to a player's services than that club already has. (cc: all counsel) (2 pgs) (
January 6, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Certify Classes for Injunctive Relief and Damages (Judge David S. Doty / 1/11/93 Nunc Pro Tunc 1/6/93) (cc: all counsel) (5 pgs) (SJH)
November 24, 1992 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Benjamin Klein (
November 20, 1992 Filing 62 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by defendants in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 17, 1992 FOLDER II - Items 16 - 45 FOLDER III beginning with Item 46 (
November 13, 1992 Filing 61 RETURN OF SERVICE (summons/complaint) executed upon defendant National Football, defendant Five Smiths, Inc., defendant Buffalo Bills, Inc., defendant Chicago Bears, defendant Cincinnati Bengals, defendant Cleveland Browns, In, defendant Dallas Cowboys, defendant PDB Sports, Ltd., defendant Detroit Lions, Inc., defendant Green Bay Packers, defendant Houston Oilers, defendant Indianapolis Colts, defendant Kansas City Chiefs, defendant Los Angeles Raiders, defendant Los Angeles Rams, defendant Miami Dolphins, Ltd., defendant Minnesota defendant KMS Patriots, L.P., defendant New Orleans Saints, defendant New York Football, defendant New York Jets, defendant B & B Holdings, Inc., defendant Pittsburgh Steelers, defendant Chargers Football Co, defendant San Francisco Forty, defendant Seattle Seahawks, In, defendant Tampa Bay Area, defendant Pro-Football, Inc., defendant Philadelphia Eagles on 11/10/92 (
November 12, 1992 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Richard McKay re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #33) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 59 DECLARATION of George Young re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #34) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Daniel M. Rooney re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #32) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Paul Tagliabue re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #31) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 56 DECLARATION of William Polian re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #29) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Arthur B. Modell re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #28) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 54 DECLARATION of John McVay re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #27) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Benjamin Klein re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #26) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Sam Jankovich re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #25) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Michael Brown re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #24) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Harry T. Gamble re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #23) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 49 DECLARATION of James Irsay re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #22) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 48 DECLARATION of James Finks re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #21) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Robert Harlan re pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fully executed - see docket entry #20) (
November 12, 1992 Filing 46 MINUTES:( Judge David S. Doty / SA) Pltf's motion for preliminary injunction, motion for injunctive class certification, and pltf's motion (post-trial) for injunctive relief [5-1] [4-1] - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. (
November 10, 1992 FOLDER I beginning and ending with items 1-15 FOLDER II beginning with item 16 (
November 9, 1992 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Charles J. Lloyd re Fehr testimony in McNeil; and in connection with pltfs' motion for preliminary injunctive relief [4-1] (separate/expandable folder with exhibits) (
November 9, 1992 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Charles J. Lloyd re Roger Noll testimony in McNeil; and in connection with pltfs' motion for preliminary injunctive relief [4-1] (separate/expandable folders) (
November 9, 1992 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Charles J. Lloyd in connection with pltfs' motion for preliminary injunctive relief [4-1] (separate/expandable folder with exhibits) (
November 9, 1992 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Michael L. Glassman regarding pltfs' reply to dfts' memorandum in opposition to motion for a preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 9, 1992 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Roger G. Noll in support of pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page - filed pursuant to amendment to Rule 5) (
November 9, 1992 Filing 40 REPLY by pltfs to dfts' memorandum in opposition to motion for a preliminary injunction [4-1] [16-1] (
November 9, 1992 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Mark A. Jacobson in connection with pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [5-1] (separate/expandable folder) (
November 9, 1992 Filing 38 DECLARATION of James W. Quinn in support of pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [5-1] (fax copy of signature page - filed pursuant to amendment to Rule 5) (
November 9, 1992 Filing 37 REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of their motion for injunctive class certification pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) [5-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 36 Affidavits and Exhibits (A-K) to dfts' memorandum in opposition to pltfs' motion for a preliminary injunction (separate/expandable folder) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by defendants in opposition to pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 34 DECLARATION of George Young in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (unexecuted) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Richard McKay in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Daniel M. Rooney in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Paul Tagliabue in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (unexecuted) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 30 DECLARATION of William L. Daly motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (separate/expandable folder) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 29 DECLARATION of William Polian in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Arthur B. Modell in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 27 DECLARATION of John McVay in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Benjamin Klein regarding pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Sam Jankovich in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunctive relief [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Michael Brown in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Harry T. Gamble in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 22 DECLARATION of James Irsay in opposition to the pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 21 DECLARATION of James Finks in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Robert Harlan in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Gary Bettman regarding pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (fax copy of signature page) (
November 3, 1992 Filing 18 DECLARATION of James R. Hausmann in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Allan H. Selig regarding pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 3, 1992 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by defendants in opposition to pltfs' motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
November 2, 1992 Filing 15 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs by Jeffrey L Kessler - approved by Francis E. Dosal, Clerk of Court, on 10/27/92. (
November 2, 1992 Filing 14 PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs by James W. Quinn - approved by Francis E. Dosal, Clerk of Court, on 10/27/92. (
October 20, 1992 Filing 13 ANSWER by defendants to first amended complaint (17 pgs) (DFL)
October 15, 1992 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Daniel Rubin in connection with pltfs' post trial motion for injunctive relief (separate/expandable folder) (
October 15, 1992 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of their motion for preliminary injunction [4-1] (
October 15, 1992 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Charles J. Lloyd in connection with pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [5-1] (
October 15, 1992 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Hardy Nickerson in support of pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [5-1] (
October 15, 1992 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Michael Buck in support of pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [5-1] (
October 15, 1992 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Reggie White in support of pltfs' motion for injunctive class certification [5-1] (
October 15, 1992 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of their motion for injunctive class certification pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) [5-1] (
October 15, 1992 Filing 5 MOTION by plaintiffs for injunctive class certification ( to Judge David S. Doty ) Ret. 11/12/92 at 9:00 a.m. (
October 6, 1992 Filing 4 MOTION by plaintiffs for preliminary injunction ( to Judge David S. Doty ) (no date/time) (
October 5, 1992 FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS issued and mailed to Law Firm of Lindquist & Vennum. (
October 5, 1992 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff; jury demand; adding pla Vann McElroy (35 pgs) (
October 1, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ( Chief Judge Diana E. Murphy / 10/1/92 & Judge David S. Doty /9/25/92 ) Case reassigned to Judge David S. Doty , and case referred to Magistrate Judge Floyd E. Boline (cc: all counsel) (
September 21, 1992 Related cases are: Civil 4-90-476 (DSD) and Civil No. 4-92-876 (DSD) (
September 21, 1992 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge Diana E. Murphy per Antitrust list and referred to Magistrate Jonathan G. Lebedoff. (

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White, et al v. Natl Football League, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie White
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Buck
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy Nickerson
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vann McElroy
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Duerson
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Smiths, Inc., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Bills, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Bengals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDB Sports, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Lions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Bay Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Oilers, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Raiders, Ltd., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Rams Football Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dolphins, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Vikings Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMS Patriots, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Football Giants, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Jets Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & B Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chargers Football Co
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tampa Bay Area NFL Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Football, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., The
Represented By: Maxwell M Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Browns, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Seahawks Inc
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Saints, LP
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Forty-Niners Ltd., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Five Smiths, Inc., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Buffalo Bills, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cincinnati Bengals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PDB Sports, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Detroit Lions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Green Bay Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Houston Oilers, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Los Angeles Raiders, Ltd., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Los Angeles Rams Football Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Miami Dolphins, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Minnesota Vikings Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: KMS Patriots, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New York Football Giants, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New York Jets Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., The
Represented By: Maxwell M Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: B & B Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chargers Football Co
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Tampa Bay Area NFL Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pro-Football, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cleveland Browns, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: National Football League
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Seattle Seahawks Inc
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New Orleans Saints, LP
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: San Francisco Forty-Niners Ltd., The
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Reggie White
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Buck
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hardy Nickerson
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Vann McElroy
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dave Duerson
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Michael C Johnson
Represented By: David F Aggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Reggie Langhorne
Represented By: David F Aggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Maurice Hurst
Represented By: Brian G Shearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: John Fourcade
Represented By: Brian G Shearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Byron Evans
Represented By: Burton J Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Brian Pressler
Represented By: Robert J Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Robert J Sheridan
Represented By: Robert J Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Paul Gruber
Represented By: Gregg M Corwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Brian Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Sean Jones
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Eric Allen
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Leslie O'Neal
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Eric Sanders
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Ken Norton, Jr
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Curtis Duncan
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Patrick Hunter
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: William C Matthews
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Cris Dishman
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Lomas Brown
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Neil Smith
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Van Waiters
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Broderick Thompson
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [