Herring, et al v. Metropolitan Life, et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Lee Reeves, Earl Reeves, Henry Lee Reeves, Hester Odessa Reeves, Imogene W. Reeves, James C. Reeves, Walter Felton Reeves, Johnny Troy Reid, Oscar Jarrell Reid, Herman Hugh Renfroe, Roy Lester Rennie, Albert Respress, Jr., Bertha Mae Revell, Bonnie Jean Reviere, Virginia H. Reviere, Arthur Lee Reynolds, Donald G. Rhames, Eugene Rice, George K. Rice, Evelyn Ruby Richardson, James F. Richardson, Mary C. Richardson, Alex Rider, Robert David Risper, David Paul Ritch, Donald Glenn Ritchie, Donny R. Rivers, Harold D. Robbins, Grady W. Roberson, Kenneth Roberson, Albert I. Roberts, Beverly H. Roberts, Georgia B. Roberts, Homer Eugene Roberts, Hue Burl Roberts, James Thomas Roberts, Kyle Eugene Roberts, Louise B. Roberts, Mildred B. Roberts, Rachel Roberts, Robert Kenneth Roberts, Sarah Wynelle Roberts, Victoria Lynn Roberts, Hazel May Robertson, David L. Robinson, Kenneth Chester Robinson, Louise R. Robinson, Catherine A. Rock, Billy J. Rogers, Ernest Clifton Rogers, Josephine T. Rogers, Marcia F. Rogers, Mary Emma Rogers, Sara M. Rogers, W. L. Rogers, William Cullen Rogers, William D. Rogers, Glen G. Rollins, Mildred Rooks, William J. Rooks, Jack E. Ross, Milton Edward Ross, Inez B. Rowe, James A. Rowe, Loraine Rowe, Roy Hansel Rowe, Larry W. Rowell, Bobby Ruffin, Bobby A. Ruffin, Claire B. Ruffin, Ewell G. Ruffin, Frances W. Ruffin, Johnny William Ruffin, Mary Ellen Russaw, Ollie Lee Rutland, Betty S. Ryals, George F. Ryals, Jr., Raymond Rycroft, Coy Saddler, Alice Jane Salter, Alvah Reginald Salter, Bart Salter, Larry G. Salter, Marion Hazel Salter, Bobby Jack Salter, Mary Rosie Samples, Vera S. Sandefur, Billy Franklin Sanders, Carolyn Russell Sanders, Dennis Sanders, Gail P. Sanders, L. K. Sanders, Mary G. Sanders, Mattie Belle Sanders, Nellie Mae Sanders, Mary Faye Sanders, Douglas Allen Sands, Jackie Wayne Sapp, William Henry Sapp, Charles Glen Scott, David W. Scott, Dixie C. Scott, Helen Katherine Scott, Ulyss G. Scott, William H. Scott, William Lee Scott, Willie C. Scott, Solomon Scott, Jr., James Fred Scott, Sr., Ernest Edward Scruggs, Fannie L. Searcy, Rosa Mae Searcy, Henry Lee Seay, Golden T. Self, Betty Jean Sellars, Martha W. Sellars, Alvin Ashley Selph, Kennth F. Sexton, Betty Lou Shannon, James L. Shannon, Roxie Anna Shannon, Esther Joy Sharpe, Stanley R. Sharpe, Vivian E. Sheffield, William B. Sheffield, Jr., Betty W. Sheflet, Leo Shelby, Sara Roquemore Shelley, Laura Ouida Shepard, Laverne F. Shepard, Marvell G. Shepard, Candler Shepphard, James Edward Shiver, Betty Frances Short, Jeanette H. Short, Larry E. Short, James E. Shurley, Everette F. Simmons, Josephine S. Simmons, Laura L. Simmons, Lillian Dorothy Simmons, Thelma Simmons, Sylvester Simpson, Deloris K. Sims, James W. Sims, Jr., Agnes H. Singleton, Gladys L. Siniard, James Siniard, Milton J. Skipper, E. V. Skipper, Joanne G. Sledge, Wilbert D. Small, Alice Mae Smith, Barbara Jean Smith, Betty Jean Smith, Betty M. Smith, Bobby Smith, Bobby Aaron Smith, Bobby Royce Smith, Charles L. Smith, Charlie Smith, Charlie Louis Smith, Cleveland Smith, Donna Lynn Smith, Evelyn P. Smith, Faye E. Smith, Fulton E. Smith, Harold Daniel Smith, Harry L. Smith, Harry T. Smith, Henry Winston Smith, Hugh G. Smith, James Wayne Smith, Jerry A. Smith, Joan L. Smith, Joseph F. Smith, Josephine H. Smith, Juanita S. Smith, Mamie J. Smith, Mary B. Smith, Phyllis Louise Smith, Rebecca Smith, Robert Steve Smith, Ruby Smith, Ruby M. Smith, Sandra Elaine Smith, Sarah A. Smith, Tommie Jack Smith, Tommy Joe Smith, Verlie O'Neal Smith, William J. Smith, Willie L. Smith, Chance C. Smith, Jr., James Paul Smith, Jr., Louise W. Sneed, Sara Joyce Snow, Henry Grady Sorrells, Charles E. Sparks, Dollie G. Sparks, Wilbert L. Sparks, Dorothy N. Speir, John Wayne Spillers, Delna I. Spinks, Emmett Daniel Spires, Lillie Mae Spivey, Charlie Stafford, Mary George Staley, Oliver W. Stanfield, James C. Stanley, Helen Turner Stansell, Frances C. Starley, John William Statham, Jr., Randy Jack Statham, Sr., Mary L. Steele, Buredell Murdie Stephens, Charles W. Stephens, Christine F. Stephens, Lois M. Stephens, Robert Stephens, Thelma H. Stevens, Albert Franklin Stewart, James Tolbert Stewart, John L. Stewart, Scotty Lee Stewart, Wayne D. Stewart, Henry L. Stinson, Doris Irene Stitcher, Walter George Stitcher, Lynn G. Stokes, Clarence Stone, Danny James Story, Barbara A. Strickland, Deborah B. Strickland, James Michael Strickland, Lucille S. Strickland, Luther L. Strickland, Robert L. Strickland, Jimmy C. Stripling, Lawrence Stubbs, Troy Edward Suddeth, Warren L. Suggs, Floyd Sullivan, Howard David Sullivan, Juanita A. Sullivan, Paul F. Sullivan, George A. Sullivan, Jewel Adams Summerlin, David H. Sutton, Melba L. Sutton, William Grover Swails, Shirley J. Swanson, Alma Nora Sweatman, David T. Tamplin, Gloria Ivey Tanner, Lucy B. Tanner, Billy Joe Tarleton, Delma Tarpley, John Tarpley, Dotsie Blair Tarrer, Harold Morris Tarrer, Larry B. Tarrer, Sr., Agnes Melissa Taunton, Cecil W. Taunton, Jackie Glenn Taunton, Morris C. Taunton, Henry Marvin Taunton, Jr., Henry Marvin Taunton, Sr., Edgar Wayne Taylor, Lamar Linnie Taylor, Willie B. Taylor, Adel W. Teal, Herman L. Teal, Louie Eugene Teal, Dorothy P. Thacker, Peggy Joyce Tharp, Johnnie A. Tharpe, Arlinda Thomas, Billy E. Thomas, Catherine D. Thomas, Hazel Thomas, Holly Van Thomas, Kenneth A. Thomas, Lona C. Thomas, Sadie F. Thomas, Tilda M. Thomas, James Thomas, Sr., David P. Thompson, Houston Thompson, Margaret M. Thompson, Mildred G. Thompson, Robert J. Thompson, Yvonne C. Thompson, Shirley Ann Thornton, Arthur Lee Thrasher, Betty J. Thrasher, Willie Kate Thrasher, Mary L. Threatt, Beaulah Thurman, Wilbert Thurman, Anna Bell Tidwell, Betty Ann Tidwell, Eugene Clifford Tidwell, Leigh Ann Tidwell, Norton Zilph Tidwell, Virginia Marcel Tidwell, Jessie B. Tigner, Jimmy L. Tindell, Rex Allen Tindell, George Tinsley, William Lewis Todd, John D. Tompkins, Rufus Claude Tower, Lillie W. Towns, Payton Lamar Towns, James D. Trammell, Jr., Carlton Roger Trawick, Ernest Cecil Trawick, Johnnie Pearl Trawick, Virginia Traylor, Willie Evelyn Traylor, Donald Ervin Trice, Mattie S. Trice, Susan E. Trice, Willie James Trice, Sally Mae Tripp, Bernice S. Truitt, Elbert Truitt, Dorothy Louis Tucker, Randall Tucker, Geneva A. Tumlin, Cecil S. Turner, Charles E. Turner, Evelyn C. Turner, Hansel H. Turner, J. C. Turner, Jackson Stanford Turner, Joe Turner, John C. Turner, Katie H. Turner, Robert Artie Turner, James W. Tyler, Barry Glenn Tyson, Wendell L. Tyson, Irene W. Underwood, W. R. Underwood, Evelyn Conley Ussery, Freeta Tarrer Ussery, Mattie Ruth Ussery, Gary L. Vanhouten, James B. Vanmeter, Neda D. Vann, James Howard Vanoy, Sr., Frances Janette Vanpelt, Ottis Pearl Vanwinkle, Charlene M. Varnadoe, A. Artie Varnom, Harold Vaughn, Jerline S. Vaughn, Raymond C. Vaughn, Jewel M. Vickery, Woodroe Wilson Vickery, Thomas Lee Vincent, Dorothy F. Vinson, Edith R. Vinson, William Vordenbaum, Fred J. Voss, James M. Voss, Richard Arlen Waddle, Bertie M. Wade, Israel Wade, Myra Ruth Wade, Wilona B. Wade, Robert Gene Wahl, Doris H. Wainwright, Lewis M. Wainwright, Lucy Florene Wainwright, Marvin F. Wainwright, Robert Shelton Wainwright, Rodney Neil Wainwright, Stephen Franklin Wainwright, William Donald Wainwright, Billy J. Waldon, Mattie Mae Waldroup, Addie Louise Walker, Angelene P. Walker, Carl Walker, Carlton Elmo Walker, Edward Walker, Henry Edward Walker, John W. Walker, Larry Walker, Martha J. Walker, Mary Ivey Walker, Nelle B. Walker, Robert Lee Walker, Rose M. Walker, Wilbert Walker, William C. Walker, Alton Walker, Jr., Donald F. Walker, Sr., Cecil D. Wallace, Edwin C. Wallace, George S. Waller, Louise Bailey Waller, Marsha G. Waller, Betty O. Walton, Emmett Walton, Sara Agnes Walton, Lucy Grace Ward, Thomas Gene Ward, William Carl Ward, Sr., James E. Ware, Elta Jo Warnock, Leonard Aldine Warren, Helen Washer, Homer L. Washington, Ollie D. Washington, Redell Washington, Bobbie C. Watkins, Gene Arthur Watkins, Irene Watkins, Leon G. Watkins, Thelma A. Watkins, William G. Watkins, Alice M. Watson, Johnny Gene Watson, Kate L. Watson, Grover C. Watts, James E. Watts, Joel S. Watts, Larry Wayne Watts, Lenora B. Watts, Mamie Lee Watts, Ruby T. Watts, Vera D. Watts, William F. Watts, Calvin Webb, Jeneda S. Webb, Charles Donald Webb, Willie Bruce Webster, Marilyn Weeks, Myrna P. Welborn, James W. Welch, Jodie Wellmaker, Douglas Clifford Wessinger, Zebedee Weston, Mattie Julia Whatley, Emmitt Eugene Wheeler, James E. Wheeless, Jerry W. Whitaker, Sr., Barbara Ann White, Betty A. White, Earnest D. White, Jessie P. White, Robert Douglas White, Rufus White, Sarah A. White, Wilmon White, Luther White, Jr., Ella Mae Whitfield, J. B. Whitfield, Sr., Talmadge Whitley, Jean I. Whitlock, Jimmie Whitlow, Eva H. Whitten, Frank O. Wiggins, Myrtle R. Wilder, Earline Wiley, Willie Joe Wiley, Bobby Wilkes, Arthur Lee Williams, Carlton C. Williams, Charles Edward Williams, Charles R. Williams, Clarance Williams, Dorothy Lucile Williams, J. L. Williams, Jack T. Williams, Joseph L. Williams, Judy J. Williams, Katherine W. Williams, Katie L. Williams, Lucille Audrey Williams, R. L. Williams, Robert Bruce Williams, Sherry Tucker Williams, Susie Mae Williams, Thomas E. Williams, Charles Cecil Williams, Sr., Mary L. Williamson, George H. Williamson, Sr., Clinton Dan Willis, John Cleveland Willis, Mildred C. Willis, Angulin S. Wilson, Carol Gay Wilson, Edwin Thomas Wilson, Kelly Wade Wilson, Mary Nell Wilson, Shelia Ann Wilson, Vernice I. Wilson, Robert L. Wilson, Sr., Aaron Wimberly, Annie Laura Windham, Ola Mae Winfrey, Connie Pearl Winkles, Kenneth Randall Winkles, Margaret Kathleen Winslett, Monroe J. Winters, Phillip Joseph Wise, Charles Larry Wisham, Richard Wayne Wisham, Terry Womack, James E. Womble, Betty J. Wood, Lila U. Wood, Minnie A. Wood, Doris Gertrude Woodall, Louise E. Woodall, James A. Woodall, Jr., James Woodard, Willie James Woodard, Willie Lee Woodard, Jerry C. Wooddell, Charles Woodruff, Susan J. Woodson, Ella W. Word, Charlie T. Worthy, Eula Mae Worthy, Jim H. Worthy, Fred Woullard, James Ralph Wright, Johnny J. Wright, Julia Lois Wright, Larry Dewey Wright, Allen Wrye, James P. Yates, Mary Y. Young, Peggy Young and Charlie Zorn
Case Number: 1:2000cv00486
Filed: October 18, 2000
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Walter J Gex
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 COMBINED MOTION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AND TRANSFER TO THE BANKRUPTCY ONLY DOCKET Signed by Judge Eduardo Robreno on 3/4/09 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(wld)
September 25, 2008 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #71. This order has the incorrect case number and should not be filed in this case. Please disregard. (wld)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Owens-Illinois, Inc. dba O-I dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A attached hereto, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 9/12/08. (wld)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. dba O-I dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of plaintiffs Cecil D. Wallace and Myrick H. Raines with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 9/12/08 (wld)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 (DISREGARD)AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Owens-Illinois, Inc. dba O-I dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of plaintiffs Mazie C. Thomas, Arthur Weathers, Hubert Stanley Wiley and James Hayes, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 9/12/08 (wld) Modified on 9/25/2008 (wld).
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Owens-Illinois, Inc. dba O-I dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of plaintiffs, listed on Exhibit A attached hereto, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 7/10/08 (wld)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. dba O-I dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of plaintiffs listed on Exhbit A attached hereto, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 4/2/08 (wld)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. dba O-I dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A attached hereto, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 4/2/08 (wld)
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Plaintiff therefore moves that, following the dismissal of the non-bankrupt defendants, this action be transferred to the Court's administrative "Bankrupt's Only" docket. Plaintiff further understands that it is plaintiff's responsibility to submit a final dismissal order to this Court when all claims have been resloved. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 7/31/07 (wld)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER : O-I is dismissed with prejudice from the claims of the plaintiffs on Exhibit A . Signed by Judge Giles on 3/29/2007. (AVM)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER : O-I is dismissed with prejudice as to plaintiffs on Exhibit A . Signed by Judge Giles on 3/29/2007. (AVM)
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER : Foster Wheeler LLC is dismissed without prejudice from the claims of Henry M. Eubanks. Signed by Judge Giles on 12/12/2006. (AVM)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO FOSTER WHEELER LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE: defendant, Foster Wheeler LLC, survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation, be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice from the claims asserted in this action by the plaintiffs listed on exhibit A, with each party to bear its own costs . Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 10/5/06. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(wd )
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER : National Service Industries, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice, and terminated. Signed by Judge Giles on 7/11/2006. (AVM)
January 10, 2005 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #59; docketed in this case in error; removed from record and docketed in correct case 1:00cv485. (AVM)
October 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Owens-Illinois is dismissed with prejudice. (Judge Weiner); copies mailed. (avm)
August 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting [59-1] joint motion to Dismiss (Judge Weiner); copies mailed. (avm)
August 2, 2004 Filing 59 JOINT MOTION by plaintiff D. A. Herring, defendant Asten, Inc. to Dismiss (avm)
February 4, 2003 Filing 58 Envelope returned by Post Office marked (Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward) containing (orders filed 1/27/03) addressed to William R. Couch. (pak)
January 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: A P Green having declared bankruptcy, it is dismissed without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 action; signed Judge Weiner ED/PA; copies mailed. (avm)
January 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Harbison-Walker Refractories Co. dismissed without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions. copies mailed. (wld)
January 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER, Dismissing Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co. without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
October 30, 2002 Filing 54 Envelope returned by Post Office marked Return to Sender containing envelope addressed to William R. Couch. (wld)
October 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, Dismissing Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co., Inc. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
September 27, 2002 Filing 52 Envelope returned by Post Office marked "moved left no address" containing order field 9/16/02 addressed to William R. Couch. (wld)
September 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER, Dismissing Flexitallic, Inc. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
July 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER, Dismissing Uniroyal Holding, Inc. without prejudice from claims of plaintiffs (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak) Modified on 07/18/2002
May 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (copy) ORDER, Dismissing A.P. Green Industries, Inc. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (orig. filed in 1:93cv60GR) (pak)
May 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, Dismissing Harbison-Walker Refractories Co. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 19, 2002 Filing 47 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: defendant Uniroyal Holding, Inc. dismissed without prejudice from the claims of the plaintiffs in the above-referenced matter, with each party to bear their own costs. copies mailed. (wld)
February 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER, Dismissing General Electric Company without prejudice from the claims of plaintiffs (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, Dismissing Industrial Holdings Corporation, BP Amoco, Inc., BP America, Unifrax Corporation, Standard Oil Company, Kennecott Corporation, KEnnecott Mining Corpo, and Stemcor Corporation without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, Dismissing Turner Supply Company without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER, Dismissing Standard Equipment Company, Inc. without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, Dismissing Pneumo Abex Corporation without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER, Dismissing Phoenix Specialty Manufacturing Co. without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA ); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER, Dismissing Owens-Illinois, Inc. without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, Dismissing McMaster-Carr Supply Company without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charlels R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, Dismissing Marine Specialty Company without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, Dismissing Laurel Machine & Foundry Company without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, Dismissing Komp Equipment Company without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Dismissing Combustion Engineering, Inc. without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, Dismissing Brice Building Company without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER, Dismissing Asten, Inc. without prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
January 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER (JUDGMENT) granting [0-0] oral motion to Dismiss with prejudice Gasket Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Flexitallic, Inc., Ferodo America, Inc. f/k/a Nuturn Corporation, Wagner Electric Corp., Pneumo Abex Corp and T&N as to the 18 plaintiffs listed on Exhibit "A" (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
September 11, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Thomas E. Vaughn to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated, granting [29-2] motion to Substitute Attorney Thomas W. Tardy, III (party not listed) (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
September 4, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, Dismissing Babcock & Wilcox Co. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
August 20, 2001 Filing 29 MOTION by defendant Plibrico Company (not listed as party) for Thomas E. Vaughn to Withdraw as Attorney , and to Substitute Attorney Thomas W. Tardy, III (pak)
August 16, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (AGREED JUDGMENT) granting [26-1] joint motion to Dismiss without Prejudice A.W. Chesterton as to certain plaintiffs listed on Exhibit "A" (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
August 16, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting [0-0] oral motion to Dismiss with prejudice Gasket Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Flexitallic, Inc., Ferodo America, Inc. f/k/a Nuturn Corporation, Wagner Electric Corp., Pneumo Abex Corp and T&N (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
August 16, 2001 MOTION ORE TENUS by plaintiff D. A. Herring, et al. (all plaintiffs to Dismiss with prejudice Gasket Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Flexitallic, Inc., Ferodo America, Inc. f/k/a Nuturn Corporation, Wagner Electric Corp., Pneumo Abex Corp and T&N (pak)
August 7, 2001 Filing 26 JOINT MOTION by defendant A.W. Chesterton, and plaintiff Ruth H. Abbott, et al. (plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A) to Dismiss without Prejudice (pak)
June 20, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting [25-1] joint motion to Dismiss claims of all plaintiffs against deft Sepco Corp. with prejudice (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
April 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: as to defendant Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corp. (Judge Charles R Weiner); copies mailed. (certified copy in 1:82cv290GR) (avm)
April 27, 2001 Terminated party W.R. Grace & Co. (pak)
April 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, Dismissing W.R. Grace & Co. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (certified copy in 1:93cv60GR) (pak)
March 8, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Dismissing Fibreboard Corp. without prejudice from all pending MDL 875 actions (Signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner, EDPA); copies mailed. (pak)
February 5, 2001 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION of EXPERTS by defendant Harbison-Walker (pak)
February 5, 2001 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION of EXPERTS by defendant A.P. Green Ind. (pak)
February 5, 2001 Case closed (pak)
February 5, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Weiner (Signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chairman of the Panel); copies mailed. (pak)
January 29, 2001 Filing 18 Copy of transfer order received from MDL for notification that case will be transferred when certified copy is received. (pak)
January 12, 2001 Filing 17 MOTION by plaintiff D. A. Herring for Hearing Expedited Hearing on Motions to Remand (pak)
December 27, 2000 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION to further extend the stipulation and order entered June 9, 2000 extending injunctive relief by defendant PPG Industries, Inc. (wld)
December 15, 2000 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on various matter set for 1/18/01 at the Phillip Burton U.S. Courthouse, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Michael J. Beck, Clerk of the Panel. (pak)
December 1, 2000 Filing 14 Notice of Joinder by defendant SB Decking, Inc. to [12-1] opposition response by defendant to plaintiff's motion to remand. (pak)
November 22, 2000 Filing 13 REBUTTAL by plaintiff D. A. Herring to [12-1] opposition response by defendant GAF to motion to remand. (pak)
November 16, 2000 Filing 12 RESPONSE by defendant GAF Corporation in opposition to [11-1] motion for Entry of Order to Remand by plaintiff (pak)
November 16, 2000 Filing 11 MOTION by plaintiff D. A. Herring for Entry of Order to Remand (pak)
November 9, 2000 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Stipulation and Order Extending Injunctive Relief by defendant PPG Industries, Inc. (pak)
November 8, 2000 Filing 9 Amended Joinder by defendant SB Decking, Inc. to [1-1] removal notice by defendant. (pak)
November 1, 2000 Filing 8 Joinder to [1-1] removal notice by defendant Harbison-Waler Refractories Co. (wld)
November 1, 2000 Filing 7 Joinder to [1-1] removal notice by defendant A.P. Green Industries, Inc. (wld)
October 30, 2000 Filing 6 RESPONSE by plaintiff D. A. Herring to Discovery re: requests for admissions (wld)
October 26, 2000 Filing 5 Joinder by defendant SB Decking, Inc. to [1-1] removal notice by defendant. (pak)
October 25, 2000 Filing 4 MOTION by plaintiff D. A. Herring to Remand (wld)
October 24, 2000 Letter to Patricia D. Howard, Clerk of the Panel, with regard to asbestos case filing. (pak)
October 23, 2000 Filing 3 NOTICE of Tag Along Action by defendant GAF Corporation (pak)
October 18, 2000 Magistrate Judge John M. Roper Assignment (pak)
October 18, 2000 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel of Removal by defendant GAF Corporation (pak)
October 18, 2000 Filing 1 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by plaintiff D. A. Herring (pak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring, et al v. Metropolitan Life, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Lee Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lee Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hester Odessa Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imogene W. Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Felton Reeves
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Troy Reid
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Jarrell Reid
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Hugh Renfroe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Lester Rennie
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Respress, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Mae Revell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Jean Reviere
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia H. Reviere
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Reynolds
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald G. Rhames
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Rice
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George K. Rice
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Ruby Richardson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Richardson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary C. Richardson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Rider
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert David Risper
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Paul Ritch
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Glenn Ritchie
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny R. Rivers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold D. Robbins
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady W. Roberson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Roberson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert I. Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly H. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia B. Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer Eugene Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hue Burl Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Eugene Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise B. Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred B. Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kenneth Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Wynelle Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lynn Roberts
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel May Robertson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Robinson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Chester Robinson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise R. Robinson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine A. Rock
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J. Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Clifton Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine T. Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia F. Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Emma Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara M. Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. L. Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cullen Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Rogers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen G. Rollins
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Rooks
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Rooks
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack E. Ross
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Edward Ross
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez B. Rowe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Rowe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Rowe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hansel Rowe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W. Rowell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ruffin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby A. Ruffin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire B. Ruffin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ewell G. Ruffin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances W. Ruffin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny William Ruffin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Russaw
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Lee Rutland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty S. Ryals
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George F. Ryals, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Rycroft
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coy Saddler
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Jane Salter
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvah Reginald Salter
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Salter
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Salter
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Hazel Salter
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jack Salter
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rosie Samples
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera S. Sandefur
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Franklin Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Russell Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail P. Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. K. Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary G. Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Belle Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Mae Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Faye Sanders
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Allen Sands
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Wayne Sapp
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Henry Sapp
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Glen Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie C. Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Katherine Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulyss G. Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie C. Scott
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Scott, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fred Scott, Sr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Edward Scruggs
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie L. Searcy
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Mae Searcy
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lee Seay
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden T. Self
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jean Sellars
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha W. Sellars
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Ashley Selph
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennth F. Sexton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Lou Shannon
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Shannon
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie Anna Shannon
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Joy Sharpe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley R. Sharpe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian E. Sheffield
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Sheffield, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty W. Sheflet
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Shelby
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Roquemore Shelley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ouida Shepard
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne F. Shepard
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvell G. Shepard
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candler Shepphard
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Shiver
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Frances Short
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette H. Short
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Short
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Shurley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everette F. Simmons
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine S. Simmons
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura L. Simmons
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Dorothy Simmons
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Simmons
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Simpson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris K. Sims
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Sims, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes H. Singleton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys L. Siniard
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Siniard
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton J. Skipper
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. V. Skipper
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne G. Sledge
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert D. Small
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Mae Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Jean Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jean Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty M. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Aaron Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Royce Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Louis Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lynn Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn P. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye E. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton E. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Daniel Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry L. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry T. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Winston Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh G. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wayne Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan L. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine H. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita S. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie J. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Louise Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Steve Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby M. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Elaine Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah A. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Jack Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Joe Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlie O'Neal Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L. Smith
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul Smith, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise W. Sneed
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Joyce Snow
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Grady Sorrells
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Sparks
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollie G. Sparks
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert L. Sparks
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy N. Speir
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wayne Spillers
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delna I. Spinks
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Daniel Spires
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Mae Spivey
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Stafford
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary George Staley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver W. Stanfield
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Stanley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Turner Stansell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances C. Starley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John William Statham, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Jack Statham, Sr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Steele
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buredell Murdie Stephens
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Stephens
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine F. Stephens
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois M. Stephens
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stephens
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma H. Stevens
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Franklin Stewart
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tolbert Stewart
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Stewart
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Lee Stewart
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne D. Stewart
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L. Stinson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Irene Stitcher
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter George Stitcher
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn G. Stokes
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Stone
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny James Story
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Strickland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah B. Strickland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Strickland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille S. Strickland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther L. Strickland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Strickland
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy C. Stripling
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Stubbs
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Edward Suddeth
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren L. Suggs
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Sullivan
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard David Sullivan
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita A. Sullivan
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F. Sullivan
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. Sullivan
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Adams Summerlin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H. Sutton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba L. Sutton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grover Swails
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley J. Swanson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Nora Sweatman
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T. Tamplin
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ivey Tanner
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy B. Tanner
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Tarleton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delma Tarpley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tarpley
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dotsie Blair Tarrer
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Morris Tarrer
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry B. Tarrer, Sr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Melissa Taunton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil W. Taunton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Glenn Taunton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris C. Taunton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Marvin Taunton, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Marvin Taunton, Sr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Wayne Taylor
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Linnie Taylor
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B. Taylor
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel W. Teal
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman L. Teal
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Eugene Teal
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy P. Thacker
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Joyce Tharp
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie A. Tharpe
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlinda Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy E. Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine D. Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Van Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lona C. Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie F. Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilda M. Thomas
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas, Sr.
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P. Thompson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Thompson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Thompson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred G. Thompson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Thompson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne C. Thompson
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Ann Thornton
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Thrasher
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J. Thrasher
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Kate Thrasher
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Threatt
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaulah Thurman
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Thurman
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Bell Tidwell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Tidwell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Clifford Tidwell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Ann Tidwell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norton Zilph Tidwell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Marcel Tidwell
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie B. Tigner
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Sea