Davenport v. Charter Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Penny Davenport and James Rachal
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to decertify the conditionally certified FLSA class is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 410 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims of the Plaintiffs who have opted in to the collective action are DISMISSED without prejudice, such that only the claims of named Plaintiffs Penny Davenport, Rita Gentry, Angela Nelson, and Joshua Westmaas remain pending before the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the applicable statute of limitation s for the FLSA claims of the Plaintiffs who have opted in to the collective action is tolled for a period of 60 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' counsel shall promptly notify the Plaintiffs who have opted in to the collective action of this Memorandum and Order, and shall file a notice with the Court confirming that they have done so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, the remaining parties shall file a joint proposed amended schedule for the remainder of the litigation, including a proposed trial date. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 6, 2017. (BRP)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth above. (Doc. No. 400 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims of opt-in Plaintiffs June Dortch, Ryan McDermot t, Adena Martin, Nicholas Stafford, Takella Durham, Chardae Jackson, Kachelle Jones, Ginger Wallace, David DeBaggis, and Kimberly Torgersen are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the declarations of Kimberly Torgersen, Ginger Wal lace, Chardae Jackson, and David DeBaggis are STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant may depose an additional nine opt-in Plaintiffs of its choice. Pursuant to the amended Case Management Order, each such deposition shall not exceed three and a half hours. (Takella D Durham, Chardae Jackson, Kachelle Jones, Adena Martin, Ryan McDermott, Kimberly Torgersen, Ginger Wallace, David A DeBaggis and June Dortch terminated.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/26/2016. (NEB)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure of L. Scott Baggett and His Expert Report (Doc. No. 383 ) is DENIED, except as explained herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plai ntiffs' request for leave to submit an addendum to Dr. L. Scott Baggett's expert report is GRANTED. Such addendum shall be disclosed on or before July 22, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall make L. Scott Baggett available fo r an additional deposition, and have such deposition completed, no later than August 19, 2016. Plaintiffs shall bear the costs and expenses, including Defendant's costs and attorney fees for attendance, for said deposition. IT IS FINALLY ORDER ED that Plaintiffs shall submit any spreadsheets supporting the expert opinions of L. Scott Baggett in a native format that demonstrates formulas utilized in the calculations contained therein. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 12, 2016. (BRP)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to compel is DENIED. (Doc. No. 329.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 20, 2015. (BRP)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to stay briefing on Defendant's decertification motion, or alternatively to deny Defendant's decertification motion as premature is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 305 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion to decertify the conditionally certified FLSA class is DENIED without prejudice. (Doc. No. 302 .) Defendant may refile this motion after the close of discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant' s motion to stay discovery is DENIED. (Doc. No. 307 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 308 .) Defendant shall have until February 13, 2015 to produce the following: (SEE ORDER). IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that on or before January 23, 2015, the parties shall file a joint motion to amend the case management order, attaching a proposed amended case management order setting forth proposed deadlines for the remainder of these proceedings. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to extend expert deadlines is DENIED as moot, without prejudice to including the requested extension in the joint motion to amend the case management order as discussed above. (Doc. No. 320 .) (Response to Court due by 1/23/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 13, 2015. (BRP)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to certify a question of law to the Kentucky Supreme Court is DENIED. (Doc. No. 230.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/6/2014. (NCL)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to strike is DENIED. (Doc. No. 165 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to certify Counts II through V (Missouri Claims) of the first amended complaint as a class action is DENIED. (Doc. No. 140 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/30/2014. (NEB)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED as set forth above. (Doc. No. 183.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to certify Count VI of the first amended complaint as a cla ss action is DENIED. (Doc. No. 143.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to certify Count VII of the first amended complaint as a class action is DENIED. (Doc. No. 145.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs combined motion for conditional certification of Count VI is DENIED. (Doc. No. 191.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/4/14. (JWJ)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that the stay of proceedings entered in this matter on April 10, 2014, is LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant's motion for reconsideration of the Court's order granting conditional collec tive action certification is DENIED. (Doc. No. 179 ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Tolling during the Pendency of the Amended Motion for Conditional Class Certification (Doc. No. 173 ) is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that the statute of limitations on Plaintiffs' FLSA claims is tolled for the period commencing December 9, 2012 (sixty days after the conclusion of briefing on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Conditional Class Certification) through t he date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if it has not already done so Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff's counsel within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, and in readable electronic format, the mailing addresses and email addresses of all putative members of the conditionally certified class. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 07/03/2014. (NEB)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings in this matter are STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/10/2014. (RAK)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an order conditionally certifying a collective action under the FLSA is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 58.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court conditionally certifies a cl ass of all of Defendant's present and former non-exempt call center employees who held or hold the job title, "advisor," and who were hired and had completed training before September 1, 2011, and who worked at Defendant Charter Commun ications, LLC's call centers located in Town and Country, Missouri; Walker, Michigan; Louisville, Kentucky; Greenville, South Carolina; Vancouver, Washington; Rochester, Minnesota; Fond du Lac, Wisconsin; and Worcester, Massachusetts. The conditionally certified class shall not include persons who were hired by Defendant but worked only as trainees. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/27/2014. (NCL)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is GRANTED as set forth above. (Doc. No. 102.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/13/2013. (KSM)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss Counts III, IV, and V of Plaintiffs' amended complaint is DENIED, with the exception of claims accruing prior to January 4, 2012. (Doc. No. 78). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/18/2012. (KSM)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to strike the declarations of Penny Davenport and James Rachal is DENIED. (Doc. No. 26.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/17/2012. (NCL)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to amend pleadings and add parties is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 49.)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a FirstAmended Complaint is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 52.) The Clerk of Court shall detach the proposed amended complaint (Doc. No. 52-1) and enter it on the docket sheet as Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion filed on February 7, 2012, to condit ionally certify a class and facilitate class notification is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 11.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss Counts III, IV, and V of the original complaint is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 13.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that Defendants motion for leave to file a surreply addressed to Plaintiffs motion to conditionally certify a class and facilitate class notification is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 41.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion for leave to file a memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs notice of additional evidence in support of Plaintiffs motion for conditional certification is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 48.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to strike, or alternatively stay, Plain tiffs amended motion to conditionally certify a class is DENIED. (Doc. No. 61.)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion (Doc. No. 26) to strikethe declarations of Penny Davenport and James Rachal filed in support of the initial motion for class c ertification shall be deemed to apply to the declarations of these individuals filed in support of the amended motion for class certification. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of the Memorandum and Order, the parties shall confer and submit to the Court, on or before August 24, 2012, a joint proposed Amended Case Management Order. In their joint submission, the parties shall advise the Court if a further scheduling conference is necessary.( Response to Court due by 8/24/2012.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/7/12. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Davenport
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rachal
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Toby J. Asel
Represented By: Charles H. Morgan
Represented By: Stanley G. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?