Moon v. Bramlett et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Wesly Moon
Defendant: Kim Bramlett, Lynn Lyons, Ned Boyd, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Charles Doerge, Unknown US Probation Officers, Clint Vestal, Sergeant Goggins, Gary Stolzer, Jason Schott, Andy Johnson, Andrew Har, Tara Davis, Fletcher DeBera, Grant Sneed, Steven Holmes, Damir Begovic, Jo Cooper, John Epple and Charo Prude
Case Number: 4:2023cv01560
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Phillip Delaney Stelzer for Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Stelzer, Phillip)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Scope of Employment Determination Motion (ECF No. #16 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit a responsive brief on or before February 14, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further extensions of time will be granted without good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/24/2024. (KXS)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted until February 14, 2024, within which to file his response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #7 ). No further extensions of time will be granted without good cause shown. (Response to Court due by 2/14/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/24/2024. (KXS)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint ;Proposed extension date February 22, 2024 by Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Jo Cooper, Fletcher DeBera, Charles Doerge, Patrick James. ORDERED GRANTED. ( Response to Court due by 2/22/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/24/2024. (KXS)
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Response to Plaintiff's Complaint ;Proposed extension date February 22, 2024 by Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Jo Cooper, Fletcher DeBera, Charles Doerge, Patrick James. (Schute, Karin)
January 2, 2024 Filing 21 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Attachment moed-0064 - notice re magistrate judge jurisdiction) (LNJ)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon and #15 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition in Excess of Page Limitations by Plaintiff. (Response to Court due by 1/9/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/2/2024. (CLT)
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition in Excess of Page Limitations, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon. (LNJ)
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition in Excess of Page Limitations filed by Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 26, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File; Extension to file the following: Rebuttal by Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon. (LNJ)
December 26, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition in Excess of Page Limitations by Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon. (LNJ)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon. (LNJ)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Substitute Party United States filed by Defendants Damir Begovic, Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Jo Cooper, Tara Davis, Fletcher DeBera, Charles Doerge, John Epple, Steven Holmes, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Charo Prude, Grant Sneed, Clint Vestal. (Schute, Karin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party United States by Defendants Damir Begovic, Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Jo Cooper, Tara Davis, Fletcher DeBera, Charles Doerge, John Epple, Steven Holmes, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Charo Prude, Grant Sneed, Clint Vestal. (Schute, Karin)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (CLT)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert); SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/20/2023. (CLT)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Wed Dec 20 11:07:47 CST 2023 (Thoele, Cassandra)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Electronic Noticing from Darnell Moon. Email Address will be added to the party's record. (LNJ)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Plunkert, Robert)
December 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/14/2023) (CLT).
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Plunkert for Defendants Sergeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Francois County Circuit Court, filed by Darnell Wesley Moon.(JWD)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Damir Begovic, Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Jo Cooper, Tara Davis, Fletcher DeBera, Charles Doerge, John Epple, Steven Holmes, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Charo Prude, Grant Sneed, Clint Vestal Sent To: Plaintiff (JWD)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Karin A. Schute for Defendants Damir Begovic, Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Jo Cooper, Tara Davis, Fletcher DeBera, Charles Doerge, John Epple, Steven Holmes, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Charo Prude, Grant Sneed, Clint Vestal. (Schute, Karin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Francis County Circuit Court, case number 23SF-CC00194, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by John Epple, Charles Doerge, Grant Sneed, Kim Bramlett, Charo Prude, Steven Holmes, Fletcher DeBera, Daniel Macke, Clint Vestal, Jo Cooper, Tara Davis, Ned Boyd, Damir Begovic, Patrick James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 State Court file, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Notice of Filing to Plaintiff)(Schute, Karin)
December 6, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
December 6, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Dec 6 17:01:57 CST 2023 (admin,)
December 6, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Bramlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Wesly Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Bramlett
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned Boyd
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick James
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Macke
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Doerge
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown US Probation Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Vestal
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Goggins
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stolzer
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Schott
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Johnson
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Har
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Davis
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fletcher DeBera
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Sneed
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Holmes
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damir Begovic
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Cooper
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Epple
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charo Prude
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?