Sutton v. Precythe
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamont Sutton
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Case Number: 2:2019cv04147
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed without prejudice (Willis, Kathy)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is cautioned that an appeal of this Order will result in imposition of appellate filing fees of $505.00. Signed on 09/11/2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
August 30, 2019 RECEIPT number KCMO079582 in the amount of $1.50 issued to Ronald Lamont Sutton. (Kern, Kendra)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to ORDER dated 08/20/19 (Doc. 12) filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton.(Willis, Kathy)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before September 3, 2019 as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed on August 20, 2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $1.50; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before August 19, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on August 5, 2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Davies, Cindy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. (Davies, Cindy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT as directed by 7/25/19 order (Doc. 7 ) filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits and Declaration)(Davies, Cindy)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 #5 without prejudice. See Doc. 7. Signed on July 25, 2019, by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McCoy, Mike)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Having reviewed the record, Plaintiff is granted provision leave to proceed as a pauper. It is unclear whether Plaintiff intended for Doc. 1 to be filed as the original pleading in this new case or as an amended/supplemental pleading in pending case 19-4085. Either way, Doc. 1 is a jumble and difficult to read. The Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff a Section 1983 complaint form. By August 8, 2019, Plaintiff shall complete and return this form to the Court, indicating whether it should be filed as an amended pleading in this case or in 19-4085. Signed on July 25, 2019, by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McCoy, Mike) (CLERK'S NOTE: Section 1983 complaint form mailed to plaintiff as directed.)(Davies, Cindy).
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/1/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/1/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. (Davies, Cindy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. (Davies, Cindy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anne L. Precythe filed by Ronald Lamont Sutton. (Attachment: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Precythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamont Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?