62nd & 65th Regiments Legacy Foundation, Inc. et al v. Board of Curators of Lincoln University et al
Plaintiff: Sharlyn L. Cooper, 62nd & 65th Regiments Legacy Foundation, Inc. and Thomas J. Cooper
Defendant: Board of Curators of Lincoln University and Joseph Simmons
Case Number: 2:2020cv04014
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. In accordance with the Chief Judge's General Order limiting in-person hearings, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 11:30 a.m. will be held telephonically before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. The parties are asked to call: 877-336-1839; access code: 6328169 to participate in the conference.(Baldwin, Joella)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed as to #15 Answer to Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Joseph Simmons. (Miller, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant Joe Simmons' First ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defendse to Plaintiff's Verified Petition on behalf of Joseph Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit-Verification)(Attorney Michael Todd Miller added to party Joseph Simmons(pty:dft))(Miller, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Joseph Simmons served on 02/26/2020 #14 . Answer due 3/27/2020. (Lock, Tania)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Joseph Simmons served on 02/26/2020. Answer due 03/27/2020. (Gore, Gabriel) Modified on 3/12/2020 to set deadlines (Lock, Tania).
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Amended Petition) filed by Gabriel E Gore on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Gore, Gabriel)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. This case having been transferred to Judge Wimes with deadlines set by the previous Judge, this Court sets a Scheduling Conference 4/2/2020 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel for each party shall appear in-person at this conference, unless allowed upon written motion to appear telephonically by order of the Court for good cause shown. Counsel who appears for each party must have authority to agree upon the proposals submitted in the joint proposed scheduling order/discovery plan.(Baldwin, Joella)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Gabriel E Gore on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gore, Gabriel)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #9) is, with Defendants having no objection, GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to dismiss on or before March 6, 2020. Signed on 2/24/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
February 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Simmons. (Kern, Kendra)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Amended Petition) filed by Gabriel E Gore on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Gore, Gabriel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Amended Petition) filed by William R. Bay on behalf of Defendant Board of Curators of Lincoln University. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Bay, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Amended Petition) filed by William R. Bay on behalf of Board of Curators of Lincoln University. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17)(Bay, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Milton P Wilkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Milton P Wilkins added to party 62nd & 65th Regiments Legacy Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Milton P Wilkins added to party Sharlyn L. Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Milton P Wilkins added to party Thomas J. Cooper(pty:pla))(Wilkins, Milton)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Jeff Hoops on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Jeff Hoops added to party 62nd & 65th Regiments Legacy Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jeff Hoops added to party Sharlyn L. Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Jeff Hoops added to party Thomas J. Cooper(pty:pla))(Hoops, Jeff)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Brian C. Wimes and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case Signed on 2/6/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/19/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 3/4/2020. Signed on 2/3/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(James, Carrie)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cole County County, case number 19AC-CC00203, filed by William R. Bay on behalf of Board of Curators of Lincoln University. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6705173. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition Original Petition, #3 State Court Petition University's Waiver of Service, #4 State Court Petition Order as to Disbursements from Special Purpose Funds, #5 State Court Petition First Amended Petition, #6 State Court Petition Second Amended Petition)(Bay, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 62nd & 65th Regiments Legacy Foundation, Inc. et al v. Board of Curators of Lincoln University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Curators of Lincoln University
Represented By: William R. Bay
Represented By: Booker T Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Simmons
Represented By: Michael Todd Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharlyn L. Cooper
Represented By: Gabriel E Gore
Represented By: Jeff Hoops
Represented By: Milton P Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 62nd & 65th Regiments Legacy Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel E Gore
Represented By: Jeff Hoops
Represented By: Milton P Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Cooper
Represented By: Gabriel E Gore
Represented By: Jeff Hoops
Represented By: Milton P Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?