Jackson v. USA et al
Plaintiff: William Phillip Jackson
Defendant: USA, IRS and David A. Hubbert
Case Number: 3:2021cv05061
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to substitute party (United States in place of Acting Assistant Attorney General Hubbert and IRS) filed by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of Defendant USA. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Edelstein, Russell)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to respond to the motion to dismiss (Doc. #14) is GRANTED to provide Plaintiff with additional time to hire counsel. Plaintiff shall file opposition suggestions to the motion to dismiss on or before September 24, 2021. Signed on 8/19/2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Modified on 8/20/2021 (Anderson, Christy) - Copy of 'NEF' mailed via first class mail to William Phillip Jackson at 10356 Venice Lane, Stark City, MO 64866.
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to substitute party (United States in place of Acting Assistant Attorney General Hubbert and IRS) on behalf of Plaintiff William Phillip Jackson. Reply suggestions due by 8/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to William Phillip Jackson, 10356 Venice Lane, Stark City, MO 64866 (Related document(s) #10 ) (Keller, Jeanne) (Keller, Jeanne).
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by William Phillip Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to William Phillip Jackson, 10356 Venice Lane, Stark City, MO 64866. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/29/2021. Pro Se Plaintiff(s): William Phillip Jackson. Counsel for Defendant(s): Not Appear. Time in court: 2:37 p.m. to 2:54 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of certified mailing of Complaint Upon the Defendants by William Phillip Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(Furtak, Rebecca)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to substitute party (United States in place of Acting Assistant Attorney General Hubbert and IRS) and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Restraining Order Against the United States (Doc. No. 5) filed by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of Defendant USA. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Edelstein, Russell)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to substitute party (United States in place of Acting Assistant Attorney General Hubbert and IRS) filed by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of USA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Edelstein, Russell)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of USA (Attorney Russell J. Edelstein added to party USA(pty:dft))(Edelstein, Russell)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing of Notice of Trespass by William Phillip Jackson. (Furtak, Rebecca)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by David A. Hubbert, USA. David Hubbert and Merrick Garland served on 7/19/2021. (Furtak, Rebecca)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 7/29/2021 02:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Teleconference participation information sent in separate email to plaintiff. (Anderson, Christy)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION for Emergency Correction re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by William Phillip Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Siegert, Karen)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Brian C. Wimes, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge Roseann Ketchmark no longer assigned to case. Signed on July 12, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
July 9, 2021 RECEIPT number KCMO090817 in the amount of $402.00 issued to William Phillip Jackson. (Woods, Gloria)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order). NEF, and MAP assignment and General Order mailed to William Phillip Jackson, 10356 Venice Lane, Stark City, MO 64866. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by William Phillip Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against David A. Hubbert, IRS, USA William Phillip Jackson. Service due by 10/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Exhibit Index, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Jeanne) NEF and completed filed copy given to Plaintiff.
July 7, 2021 Prepared SUMMONSES ISSUED as to David A. Hubbert, IRS, USA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and returned to Plaintiff for service. NEF to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Phillip Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Russell J. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Hubbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?