Trekell v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Kenneth Trekell
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00662
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Hollis Hanover(Otto, Theresa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Leah M. Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Trekell.(Mason, Leah)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/9/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/23/2018. Signed on 9/6/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Target Corporation.(Otto, Theresa)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Theresa A. Otto on behalf of Defendant Target Corporation.(Otto, Theresa)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County County, case number 1816-CV17512, filed by Theresa A. Otto on behalf of Target Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5905774. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 3)(Otto, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trekell v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Represented By: Molly Beecher Westering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Trekell
Represented By: Leah M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?