Young v. Hy-Vee, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Young
Defendant: Gayla Faelske and Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00699
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Alexander Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Young. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Edelman, Alexander)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marty Streit)(Related document(s) #6 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Alexander Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Young. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Edelman, Alexander)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to remand filed by Alexander Edelman on behalf of Brenda Young. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Edelman, Alexander)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/18/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/1/2019. Signed on 9/17/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 1916-CV18010, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number CMOWDC-6473942. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Hy-Vee, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayla Faelske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Jennifer Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Young
Represented By: Sarah C. Liesen
Represented By: Alexander Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?