Heit v. LG Chem, Ltd
Plaintiff: Gary Heit
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd
Case Number: 4:2021cv00771
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Sara B. Craig and William H. Cross for Gary Heit allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to allow William H. Cross to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7676586) filed by John Matthew Simon on behalf of Gary Heit. (Simon, John)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to allow Sara B. Craig to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7676561) filed by John Matthew Simon on behalf of Gary Heit. (Simon, John)
October 27, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG Chem, Ltd. (Woods, Gloria)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 and #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney William A. Levin and Angela J. Nehmens allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to allow Angela J. Nehmens to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7643112) filed by John Matthew Simon on behalf of Gary Heit. (Simon, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to allow William A. Levin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7643088) filed by John Matthew Simon on behalf of Gary Heit. (Simon, John)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG Chem, Ltd filed by John Matthew Simon on behalf of Gary Heit. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7640800. Service due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heit v. LG Chem, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Heit
Represented By: John Matthew Simon
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Angela J Nehmens
Represented By: Sara Beth Craig
Represented By: William H. Cross
Represented By: William A Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?