Strenfel v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Plaintiff: Daniel Strenfel
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00900
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED Defendant T-Mobile's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. #28) is DENIED AS MOOT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE to reassertion at the appropriate time in MDL 3019. Signed on 1/22/2022 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
December 17, 2021 Filing 34 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01208.
December 15, 2021 Filing 33 MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Parties' #31 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer; striking Defendant's #26 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED pending a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) on the pending motion to transfer in In re: T-Mobile Customer Data Sec. Breach Litig., MDL No. 3019. Briefing on Defendant's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No. #28 ) is STAYED in light of this Order staying this action. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 31 Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, to #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Christopher Muzio filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc re #28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Kristine McAlister Brown filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc re #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #22 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. T-Mobile's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended for a total of 14 days, through 10/14/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Attorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #20 Notice of Appearance. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7267350 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 22 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ron Marron for plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexis Wood for plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kas Gallucci for plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) MDL No. 3019; 3:21cv6879 (N.D. Cal.); Filed by counsel for T-Mobile re MDL.(LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 11, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 9/9/2021, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel. (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 11, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ALEXIS M. WOOD FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7246136 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 11, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY KAS L. GALLUCCI FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7246135 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 11, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY RONALD A. MARRON FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7246134 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christian Levis for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda Grace Fiorilla for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margaret C MacLean for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura, as this is a related matter. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christian Levis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240429 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda G. Fiorilla FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240366 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Margaret C. MacLean FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240304 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118 21-cv-01119 21-cv-01130 21-cv-01137 21-cv-01138 21-cv-01139 21-cv-01148 21-cv-01153 21-cv-01157 21-cv-01161 21-cv-01169 21-cv-01179 21-cv-01181 21-cv-01183 21-cv-00189 21-cv-01190, by Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel. (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7237152) Attorney Manish Borde added to party Daniel Strenfel(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Strenfel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Borde, Manish)[Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strenfel v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Strenfel
Represented By: Alexis Wood
Represented By: Amanda Grace Fiorilla
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Kas Gallucci
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean
Represented By: Ron Marron
Represented By: Manish Borde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?