Valentine v. Dodson et al
Plaintiff: Diandre Valentine
Defendant: GCJC Medical Department, Jim Arnott and T Dodson
Case Number: 6:2020cv03235
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Courts order. (Willis, Kathy)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Courts Order. Any motion to reopen this case must be filed within a reasonable period of time and must comply with the Court's previous Order. Signed on September 22, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Willis, Kathy)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before September 8, 2020, as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed on 08/24/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $29.15; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before August 20, 2020, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on August 6, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Davies, Cindy)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Diandre Valentine. (Davies, Cindy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Diandre Valentine. (Davies, Cindy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Diandre Valentine. (Davies, Cindy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Diandre Valentine. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Dodson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCJC Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Arnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diandre Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?