Brooks v. Lincoln Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Clinton Brooks, Jr.
Defendant: Lincoln Police Department, Officer Hite, Officer Pickering and Officer Schmidt
Case Number: 4:2011cv03114
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal is deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis 9 is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JSF)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding: Notice of Appeal to USCA 8 filed by Clinton Brooks, Jr. Plaintiff shall have until December 2, 2011, to submit an affidavit to show excusable neglect or good cause for failing to file a timely notice of appeal. If Pla intiff fails to submit such an affidavit by December 2, 2011, Plaintiff's appeal will not be processed. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for affidavit on December 2, 2011. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Lincoln Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Brooks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?