Larson v. Astrue
Plaintiff: |
Kent M. Larson |
Defendant: |
Michael J. Astrue |
Interested Party: |
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03010 |
Filed: |
January 18, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Warren K. Urbom |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: DIWC/DIWW |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's application for attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, ECF No. 25 , is granted, and the plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $5695.52. This amount is to be paid directly to the plaintiff by the Social Security Administration. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Commissioner of Social Security's decision is reversed, and the case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the memorandum accompanying this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
|
July 10, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall on or before August 10, 2012, file and serve its answer brief; within one week after the defendant's an swer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL )
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before July 11, 2012, to file and serve its answer brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?