Roberts v. Trotta et al
Plaintiff: Nick Roberts
Defendant: Dr. Hustad, Holsing, Griffith, Dr. Furgusion, Department of Corrections Maintanence, Department of Corrections, D/E Health Inspector, Dennis Bakewell, Dr. Machado, Mausbach, OMS Budsman and Trotta
Case Number: 4:2013cv03154
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this action is dismissed in its entirety. The federal law claims raised in the pleadings are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The state law claims are dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in the proper forum. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave and 24 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff shall have until April 14, 2014, to file a third amended complaint. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: April 14, 2014: Deadline for Plaintiff to file a third amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion requesting leave to file a second amended complaint 18 is granted. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file a second amended complaint. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: January 29, 2014: Deadline for Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: January 3, 2014: Check for am ended complaint. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint 6 is denied as moot. As set forth above, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that: Plaintiff's Request for Production ofDocuments (Filing No. 12) and 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is pai d, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the Clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. The Clerk of the cour t shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiff's current institution. Plaintiff shall continue to keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending, as failure to do so may result in dismissal of this matter. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Trotta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Furgusion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections Maintanence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D/E Health Inspector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Bakewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mausbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMS Budsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?