Hurd v. The City of Lincoln et al

Plaintiff: Troy M. Hurd
Defendant: Leo Benes, Roger Bonin, Pat Borer, Tom Casady, John Huff, Jeanne Pashalek and The City of Lincoln
Case Number: 4:2016cv03029
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2018 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that the pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. If this case is not fully resolved by summary judgment, within ten (10) days after the summary judgment ruling, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to re-schedule the pretrial conference and trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
January 19, 2018 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The deadline to file additional discovery motions is January 29, 2018. If Plaintiff moves for permission to depose Lincoln Mayor Chris Beutler, Plaintiff's request must be based on evidence which was unavailable when his previous motion on this issue was filed. The response to any discovery motion filed in compliance with this order shall be filed on or before February 5, 2018. No reply shall be permitted absent leave of the court for good cause shown. The deadline for deposing all fact witnesses and for completing all written discovery is extended to February 16, 2018. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment is extended to March 2, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
December 21, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion to Quash Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
December 6, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the conference call held today, any formal motion to disqualify the City Attorney's Office from representing the defendants shall be filed on or before December 11, 2017, with Defendants' response due on or before Decem ber 18, 2017. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Any formal motion to quash or for protective order as to the noticed deposition of the Chris Beutler, Mayor of the City of Lincoln, shall be filed on or before December 11, 2017, with Plaintiff's response due on or before December 18, 2017. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
August 18, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 11:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Status Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. No additional continuances will be granted absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
February 24, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - the motion to extend (Filing No. 33 ) is granted and the Final Progression Order is amended as follows: The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Richard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on March 19, 2018, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of seven (7) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such othe r civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on March 6, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart&# 064;ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on March 2, 2018. A status conference to discuss the status of case progression and potential settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on September 19, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline is September 30, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
September 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting JOINT STIPULATION for Protective Order 24 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd v. The City of Lincoln et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Benes
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Bonin
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Borer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Casady
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Huff
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Pashalek
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Lincoln
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy M. Hurd
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?