Burke v. Astrue
Plaintiff: |
Joseph K. Burke |
Defendant: |
Michael J. Astrue |
Interested Party: |
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
8:2010cv00445 |
Filed: |
November 29, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: DIWC/DIWW |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 3, 2012 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM OPINION -The Court has reviewed the evidence related to this case, the opinion of the ALJ, and defendants brief defending such opinion, and is satisfied the ALJs opinion is supported by substantial evidence on the record as a whole. Thu s, the Court finds no reason to reverse the final decision of the defendant Commissioner and will defer to the findings and conclusions of the Social Security Administration. The Commissioners denial of Mr. Burkes disability benefits and supplemental social security income benefits claim will be affirmed. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e- mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting the defendant's 31 Motion for Extension of time to respond to plaintiff's brief. Defendant shall have until December 2, 2011, to respond to plaintiff's brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall have until October 3, 2011, to obtain counsel or file a brief in support of his complaint. No further extensions will be granted, and the case will be deemed submitted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend time to show cause 26 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until August 26, 2011, to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Joseph K. Burke show cause in writing not later than July 20, 2011 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute this lawsuit. The order to show cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiffs response. Failure to file a timely response is deemed consent to the dismissal without prejudice of this action as to the above defendant. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting Motion to Amend 16 . IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to submit amended complaint is granted. The clerk of court shall file the amended complaint as submitted. Summons shall be served with the amended complaint. After service of process is complete, defendant shall have rule time to respond. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
|
January 10, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. This action shall be filed at no cost to plaintiff pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel 4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs motion for fees and expenses 8 is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?