Jones v. City of North Platte et al
Plaintiff: |
Marlin E. Jones |
Defendant: |
City of North Platte, Monte McNeil, Mike Swain and Jim Ady |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00130 |
Filed: |
April 7, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii,) this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
October 21, 2011 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, Plaintiff shall have 21 days from todays date to supplement his amended complaint with any additional allegations. The court directs the clerk's office to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Deadline for Plaintiff to supplement his Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 8 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA) Modified on 8/17/2011 to change the title (AOA).
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have 30 days to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff's clai ms against Defendants will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (f iling no. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on September 8, 2011. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying 3 Motion for Summons. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?