Ericson v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Andrew E. Ericson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2011cv00432
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion filed by Plaintiff's counsel for an award of attorney fees (filing 27 ) is granted, as follows: The Commissioner shall distribute to Plaintiff's counsel, from the amount withheld from Plaintiffs past-due benefits for the payment of attorney fees, the sum of $19,500.00. Plaintiff's counsel shall refund to Plaintiff the sum of $6,500.00, the full amount previously awarded as attorney fees under the EAJA, and shall provide the Commissioner with documentation showing that the EAJA attorney fee award has been refunded to Plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall attempt to secure an affidavit from their client approving the proposed fee award and file the same with the court. The court will defer ruling on counsel's motion (filing 27 ) for a period not to exceed 30 days from today's date, pending receipt of the affidavit. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's application for attorneys fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (filing 23 ) is granted, but the amount of the award shall be in the amount of $6,500.00, as agreed by the parties (filing 24 ). By separate document, the court shall enter judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendant, providing that Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees of $6,500.00. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and the case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the foregoing opinion. Final judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 2 ) is granted, and, accordingly, that: Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. The Clerk of the court shall send THREE summons forms and THREE U SM-285 forms to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of process on the United States. Upon receipt of the completed summons forms and USM-285 forms, the Clerk shall sign the summonses and forward them, together with copies of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Forms mailed as directed) (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew E. Ericson
Represented By: Thomas A. Krause
Represented By: Michael J. Haller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?