Camron v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Mary A. Camron
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2012cv00229
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's amended motion for attorney fees 31 is granted in the amount of $4,273.25 to be paid by the Social Security Administration. Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees (Filing No. 30 ) is denied as moot. The EAJA fee is payable to plaintiff and may be subject to offset to satisfy any pre-existing debt that the litigant may owe to the United States. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Commissioner's decision is vacated, and this matter is remanded for further findings consistent with this opinion. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motion is granted; defendant shall have until April 24, 2013, to respond to plaintiff's brief. No further extensions will be granted. If plaintiff wishes to file a reply brief, she shall do so on or before May 10, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motion 23 is granted; defendant shall have until April 17, 2013, to respond to plaintiff's brief. If plaintiff wishes to file a reply brief, she shall do so on or before May 1, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Defendant's motion 20 is granted; defendant shall have until March 18, 2013, to respond to plaintiff's brief. If plaintiff wishes to file a reply brief, she shall do so on or before April 1, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - IT IS ORDERED: The Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted, and payment of costs and fees is not required for the filing of the appeal. If requested to do so, the U.S. Marshal will serve process in this case without prepayment of fees. In making such a request, Plaintiffs counsel must complete the Marshal's Form 285, to be submitted to the Marshal with the completed summons forms and copies of the C omplaint. This order is entered without prejudice to the Court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including the Plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after the completion of this action. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camron v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A. Camron
Represented By: Gregory W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?