Jones v. Astrue
Plaintiff: |
Pamela L. Jones |
Defendant: |
Michael J. Astrue and Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00379 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 21, 2014 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Liberally construed, Plaintiff's pro se Motion is a request for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has not filed a notice of appeal in this matter. Nevertheless, the court will liberally construe Plaintiff's Motion as a notice of appeal. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (filing no. 41 ) is provisionally granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and e-mailed to USCA 8th Circuit)(JAB)
|
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON REVIEW OF THE FINAL DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY - IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)
|
September 13, 2013 |
Filing
34
ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND FOR LEAVE TO REFILE AN AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF - IT IS ORDERED that:1. the Joint Motion to Withdraw the Administrative Re cord and for Leave to Refile an Amended Administrative Record, ECF No. 32 , is granted in part in that according to the District of Nebraska Clerk of the District Court's procedures under the directive of Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp to ma intain the integrity of the court dated February 8, 2013, the transcript cannot be withdrawn; however, the clerk shall strike and seal ECF Nos. 16 and 17 in accordance with NEGenR 1.3(1)(B)(i) ; 2. all copies of the Administrative Record, ECF Nos. 16 and 17 , shall be returned to the defendant; 3. the defendant shall file an Amended Administrative Record on or before September 20, 2013; 4. the Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief, ECF No. 33 , is granted; 5. the plaintiff shall on or before September 30, 2013, file and serve her reply brief; and 6. the case shall be deemed to be submitted after the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 6 above. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
4
ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED: Filing No. 2, the plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, is granted. Following completion of the service and summons, the Marshal shall serve the United States, without payment of costs or fees. Service shall be effected pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i) regarding "[s]erving the United States, Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees." That upon receipt of a certified copy of the transcript of the records, the Clerk of Court shall enter its standard briefing order in this case. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?