Combs v. Astrue
Plaintiff: |
John Combs |
Defendant: |
Michael J. Astrue |
Interested Party: |
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00429 |
Filed: |
December 18, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Warren K. Urbom |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: DIWC/DIWW |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON REVIEW OF THE FINAL DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY - IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
|
July 1, 2013 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall on or before July 29, 2013, file and serve its response brief; within one week after the defendant's ans wer brief is filed and served, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
|
June 3, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The Defendants Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 15, is granted and the defendant shall on or before June 28, 2013, file and s erve its response brief; within one week after the defendant's response brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g ); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 2 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
|
December 19, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?