Santee v Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dana Alene Santee
Case Number: 8:2013cv00099
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall file her brief by September 25, 2013. Defendant shall file a brief by October 25, 2013. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by November 8, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
May 2, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's application for attorney fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (filing 31 ) is granted. By separate document, the Court will enter judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendant, providing that Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $4,018.80, subject to offset to satisfy any preexisting debt that Plaintiff might owe to the United States. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
March 27, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 1 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the original complaint and the accompanying pleadings without the prepayment of costs or fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santee v Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Alene Santee
Represented By: John W. Kocourek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.