Peterson v. Lewien
Petitioner: |
Randy S. Peterson |
Respondent: |
Lewien |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00171 |
Filed: |
June 6, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Petitioner's Objection (Filing No. 21 ) to the court's Memorandum and Order dated March 16, 2015, is overruled. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Peterson's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 19 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 10 ) is granted. Peterson's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 12 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. T he Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By September 29, 2014, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment o r state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 29, 2014: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of an swer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the following procedures shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner: A. By September 29, 2014, Respondent shall file all state court records that are relevant to the c ognizable claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 28, 2014: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 3 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?