Jones et al v. The Hartford Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jones and Debra Jones
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd and The Hartford Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00254
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. David V. Drew and Kelly Henry Turner are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs, who remain represented by other counsel. David V. Drew and Kelly Henry Turner shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Kelly H. Turner and David V. Drew on behalf of Plaintiffs Debra Jones and Michael Jones. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Extend. The Rule 26(f) Meeting Report deadline is extended to August 14, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time to File Rule 26(f) Report Scheduling Order #8 by Attorney David A. Houghton on behalf of Plaintiffs Debra Jones, Michael Jones.(Houghton, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David A. Houghton on behalf of Plaintiffs Debra Jones, Michael Jones (Houghton, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendants Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd, The Hartford Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Murphy, Spencer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendants Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd, The Hartford Insurance Company.(Murphy, Spencer)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/24/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd, The Hartford Insurance Company (Murphy, Spencer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Hartford Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kelly H. Turner has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David V. Drew has not registered for the system or paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Washington County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-0095 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3959262) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd, The Hartford Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Murphy, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. The Hartford Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd
Represented By: Nicholas K. Rudman
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas K. Rudman
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Kelly H. Turner
Represented By: David V. Drew
Represented By: David A. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Jones
Represented By: Kelly H. Turner
Represented By: David V. Drew
Represented By: David A. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?