Cordle v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Cordle
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00396
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Rule 26(f) Report Deadline.(Filing No. #23 ). The parties shall file their joint 26(f) report on or before November 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend the Deadline to File the Rule 26(f) Report by Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Cordle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seideman, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Cordle (Seideman, Scott)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Harrison Meyers on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Meyers, Harrison)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Tyler Coombe on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Coombe, Tyler)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas E. Dutton on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc..(Dutton, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER A telephone conference is set for October 4, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties shall use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (See Filing No. #16 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - that the motion to withdraw Richard North, Jr. as counsel of record for Defendants, (Filing No. #14 ), is granted. Richard North, Jr. shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Attorney Thomas E. Dutton on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc..(Dutton, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas E. Dutton on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Dutton, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS C. R. BARD, INC.'S AND BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' MASTER COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMAND. (LAC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS. (LAC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Richard B. North has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Scott R Seideman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03077. Original electronic file received.
September 9, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Nebraska via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3077-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16910012 filed by Donna Cordle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordle v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Dutton
Represented By: Tyler Coombe
Represented By: Harrison Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Dutton
Represented By: Tyler Coombe
Represented By: Harrison Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cordle
Represented By: Scott R Seideman
Represented By: Scott R. Seideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?