National Labor Relations Board v. Anderson Excavating Company
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Anderson Excavating Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00456
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESTRICTED ORDER - Video conference Instructions. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate regarding Order to Show Cause,, #6 by Attorney Elliott Becker on behalf of Petitioner National Labor Relations Board.(Becker, Elliott)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that service on Respondent of a copy of this Order to Show Cause and of the Application and supporting documents upon which it is issued, be made on or before December 14, 2020, and that Respondent shall file and serve an answer to the Application no later than January 11, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent shall appear and show cause on January 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Court Room No. 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate regarding MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena #1 Certificate of Service by Attorney Elliott Becker on behalf of Petitioner National Labor Relations Board.(Becker, Elliott)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate regarding MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena #1 Certificate of Service by Attorney Elliott Becker on behalf of Petitioner National Labor Relations Board.(Becker, Elliott)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena #1 by Attorney Elliott Becker on behalf of Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Becker, Elliott)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena, by Attorney Elliott Becker on behalf of National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Application, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Supplement Certificate of Compliance)(Becker, Elliott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Anderson Excavating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Elliott Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anderson Excavating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?