Wofford v. Gable et al
Petitioner: Nico Wofford
Respondent: Craig Gable and Rob Jeffrys
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2023cv00464
Filed: October 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Copies of Filing No. 1 on behalf of Petitioner Nico Wofford.(MLF)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER requesting copies with clerk's response on behalf of Petitioner Nico Wofford.(JES)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the Court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The Court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed on behalf of Petitioner Nico Wofford.(MKR)
October 24, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner Nico Wofford. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (MKR)
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Nico Wofford.(MKR)
October 24, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of Petitioner Nico Wofford. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wofford v. Gable et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nico Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig Gable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rob Jeffrys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?