Gray v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Malcolm Gray
Defendant: N. Childers, Greg Cox, Timothy Filson, Sheryl Foster, E K McDaniel, Mental Health Providers, Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven, Owens and Bruce Stroud
Case Number: 2:2016cv01651
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 28 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the sealed filing at ECF No. 37 be UNSEALED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court (see order for details)., Service must be perfected within ninety (90) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance, NVDOC, Atty General NV - JM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that this action shall proceed against Defendants Neven, Stroud, Filson, Nash, and Owens (Count I-mail violations); Childers (Count I-retaliation); Foster, Neven, and Nash (Count II-retaliation); and Neven, Filson, and Nash (Count II-conditio ns of confinement) only.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that given the nature of the claim(s) that the Court has permitted to proceed, this action is STAYED for ninety (90) days. FURTHER ORDERED that the Attorney General's Office shall advise the C ourt within twenty-one (21) days of the date of the entry of this order whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: NV Atty General - JM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file his updated address with the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, the Court shall dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner and the instructions. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either f ile a properly completed ifp form or pay the filing fee. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECF No. 1-2), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Filson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E K McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?