December 24, 2014 |
Filing
129
ORDER granting Defendants' 119 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 115 Motion for Reconsideration; directing Clerk to add Defendant Lamprich to the caption; directing the AG's Office to file a notice within 14 days advising whether or not it will be accepting service on behalf of Lamprich. See order for further details re service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
114
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/16/2014, denying/denying as moot 112 Motion for Issuance of Summons. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
August 7, 2014 |
Filing
99
ORDER directing the AG to advise within 21 days re acceptance of service for remaining defendants (see order for details); directing defendants on whose behalf service has already been accepted to file an answer to the newly operative 10 first ame nded complaint within 21 days; directing Plaintiff to file a motion identifying unserved defendants if the AG does not accept service; directing Clerk to send this order to Plaintiff at ESP along with copies of 95 , 97 , and 98 (mailed 8/7/2014); directing Plaintiff to file a notice of change of address within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
April 18, 2014 |
Filing
94
ORDER re 92 USCA Memorandum/Opinion, allowing certain claims to proceed and permitting amendment within 30 days to correct deficiencies in other claims, as follows (see order for details). Second Amended Complaint deadline: 5/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
December 10, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER adopting and accepting 79 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 58 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying as moot 62 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 70 Defendants' Partial Motion to Strike. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
78
ORDER granting 57 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/8/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
June 14, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER accepting 55 Report and Recommendation : Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (#48) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as follows: (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count VI, on the ground that Plaintiff failed to exhaust administ rative remedies is DENIED; (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants Bannister, Hartman, Morrow, Baca, Neven, Cox, and Skolnik in Count VII is GRANTED, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; (3) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Graham is GR ANTED, WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.(4) In sum, Count VI may proceed as alleged. Count VII will proceed against Defendant Clark, and Plaintiff has leave to amend Count VII with respect to Defendants Bannister, Hartman, Morrow, Baca, Neven, Cox, and Skolnik. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/14/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
42
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action SHALL PROCEED in accordance with the court's 9 Screening Order. FURTHER ORDERED, defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the 8 amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff's 29 motion for temporary restraining order and 30 injunctive relief is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff's 28 motion for order granting additional extension of prison copywork limit (second request) is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff's 37 motion to strike response to motion for order granting additional extension of copywork and 40 motion for sanctions are both DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/13/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
April 19, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDERED P's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ( # 29 and # 30 ) SHALL BE HELD IN ABEYANCE pending P's filing of a second amended petition. FURTHER ORD that Ds shall not file a response to P's #'s 29 & 30 Motion until further order from this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 4/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDERED P's 23 Supplement to motion is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORD P's 2nd Amended complaint due by 5/18/2011. FURTHER ORD P shall title amended complaint "SECOND AMENDED" w case number above. FURTHER ORD if P does not file a 2nd amended complaint then this action shall proceed as set forth in # 9 Order FURTHER ORD Clerk shall send P a blank 1983 w instructions, and copy of # 10 first amended complaint. FURTHER ORD Ds shall not file an answer until further order of this Court. This supersedes # 25 Minute Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 4/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 4/18/2011 to reflect specified docs mailed to P 4/18/2011 (DRM).
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's 12 motion for relief from this courts 9 order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
February 23, 2011 |
Filing
22
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2011 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Jennifer Cotter; Pla Counsel: Narviez Alexander, In Pro Per (telephonically); Def Counsel: Susan Lee; FTR #: 8:59:45 a.m. - 9:14:57 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. IT IS ORDERED that 11 Motion for Order Extending Copywork Limit is GRANTED; 18 Motion - Judicial Notice/Request for Issuance of Summons is DENIED AS MOOT. Please see attached minutes for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
January 14, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORD even if this action is dismissed, the full filing fee shall still be due. FURTHER ORD NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate acount. Clerk shall send NDOC Inmate S ervices this Order ( Mailed to NDOC and Finance 1/19/2011 ). FURTHER ORD Clerk shall FILE the amended complaint # 8 . FURTHER ORD all claims against State of Nevada, NDOC, ESP, HDSP, and all other Ds in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 11th Amendment. FURTHER ORD the State of Nevada, NDOC, ESP, HDSP, K. Mellinger, R. Daniels, and L.C. Adams are DISMISSED from this action. FURTHER ORD all claims are DISMISSED with prejudice, except: (1) Count 1 is DISMISSED wi th leave to amend to plead a 1st Amendment and/or RLUIPA claim; and (2) the 8th Amendment claims under Counts VI and VII MAY PROCEED. FURTHER ORD Clerk shall E-serve AG w this Order, attached mediation forms, and Ps amended complaint. ( E -service performed 1/19/2011). AG shall advise by 2/9/2011 re acceptance of service.If service accepted by AG then Ds answer/response to amended complaint due 30 days following notice of acceptance of service. FURTHER ORD If service not accepted the n P shall file a motion re unserved Ds. FURTHER ORD the parties SHALL DETACH, COMPLETE, AND FILE attached mediation forms by 2/18/2011. FURTHER ORD henceforth P shall serve Ds counsel w copy of every pleading submitted for consideration w certificate of mailing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|