BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC. et al v. PFIZER INC. et al
Plaintiff: A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., GEORGE AYOOBS, BAKERS LOCAL 433 HEALTH FUND, EDNA BELL, NANCY BILLINGTON, HAROLD F. BLAKER, JR., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS' LOCAL UNION NO. 5, OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., BEN CALLI, CENTRAL REGIONAL EMPLOYEES BENEFIT FUND ("CREBF"), CITY OF PROVIDENCE, CATHEY CLARK, RETA COBURN, EDWIN CZARNECKI, Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, James Clayworth, R.Ph., Edward Czarnecki, JUDITH DEPIPPO, Jean Ellyne Dougan, ECKERD CORPORATION, EDWARD ELLENSON, JACK EUGSTER, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, GIANT EAGLE, INC., SID GILREATH, GREATER METROPOLITAN HOTEL EMPLOYERS-EMPLOYEES HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Graphic Communications Local 1B Health and Welfare Fund "A", HEB GROCERY CO. LP, EMILIE HIENLE, NEIL HIRSCH, Emilie Heinle, Sandra Hellgren, Richard Holden, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN,, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, KROGER CO., THE, DARLENE LEWIS, ANDREW LIVEZEY, LOCAL 17 HOSPITALITY BENEFIT FUND, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE INDEMNITY COMPANY, JOHN LUCE, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, Louisiana Health Insurance Indemnity Company d/b/a Bluecross Blueshield of Louis, Gerald Lutz, MAXI DRUG, INC. D/B/A BROOKS PHARMACY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MARYLAND, MC-UA LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, DENISE MCCLINTIC, MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC., KATY MYERS MINER, MINNEAPOLIS AUTO DEALERS EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUND, Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc., Prudence Lise Miller, ALEC NAIMAN, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH, NEW YORK HOTELS TRADE COUNSIL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUNDS, HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW, EMILY NEWHOUSE, FRANK PALTER, CARLOS A. PARALITICCI, DAVID PAVEL, CYNTHIA POND, PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc., CATHERINE RAY, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., RAY ROY, RP Healthcare, Inc., SAFEWAY INC., JEFFREY P. SANTACARGELO, MICHAEL WILSON SAUL, W. PATRICK SCHNEESE, JOSEPH V. SICA, STEPHEN DEWAYNE SIMMONS, TIMOTHY S. SMITH, STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., CARLEY SULLIVAN, SUPERVALU INC., Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, LUCIA TEJEDA, THE BERGEN MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUND, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Tilley Apothecaries, Inc., VALUE DRUG COMPANY, WALGREEN CO., DONNA WENTZEL, DOROTHY WILLARD, THOMAS WILLIAMS, Philip E. Wolfson, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, DROGUERIA BETANCES, Anita Cox, Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. 12-5129 doing business as Zweber's Apothecary, James Clayworth, R.Ph. 12-5129 doing business as Clayworth Pharmacy, Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc. 12-5129 doing business as Golden Gate Pharmacy, NEW YORK HOTELS TRADE COUNSIL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUNDS, HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC, SERIES PMPI, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph. 12-5129 doing business as Jack's Drug, Louisiana Health Insurance Indemnity Company d/b/a Bluecross Blueshield of Louisiana, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, MAXI DRUG, INC. doing business as BROOKS PHARMACY, CVS PHARMACY, INC., NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, Marin Apothecaries, Inc. 12-5129 doing business as Ross Valley Pharmacy and CESAR CASTILLO, LLC
Defendant: CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE, CVS Caremark Corporation, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD, PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BRUCE ROTH, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, PFIZER, INC. and PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND
Petitioner: MATRIX LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and MATRIX LABORATORIES INC.
Special Master: JOSE L. LINARES
In Re: LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Not Classified By Court: FAITH HOCHBERG
Intervenor: MYLAN INC.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02389
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 LETTER ORDER granting the request to withdraw William Olson as pro hac vice counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/22/2021. (jem)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1044 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq. re #885 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1043 NOTICE of Change of Address by GIL D. MESSINA (MESSINA, GIL)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1042 NOTICE of Change of Address by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT (BENNETT, NATALIE)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #994 Motion for Reconsideration but the relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/26/2021. (jem)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1040 NOTICE by DROGUERIA BETANCES WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF DANIEL C. SIMONS (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1039 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI terminated. (OFOSU-ANTWI, ELEONORE)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1038 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2021 re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Sandra Hellgren, Anita Cox, Motions Taken Under Advisement . (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL as to Debra Josephson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/21/2021. (jdb)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1036 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DEBRA GAW JOSEPHSON terminated. (JOSEPHSON, DEBRA)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1035 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 19, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1034 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Debra Josephson on 1/19/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices - Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1034 NOTICE by STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC. Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel (JOSEPHSON, DEBRA)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1032 NOTICE by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Second Notice of Supplemental Authority (MESSINA, GIL)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1033 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
January 11, 2021 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert(and Judge Peter G. Sheridan): Telephone Status Conference held on 1/11/2021. (eh, )
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 2. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/11/2021. (jem)
January 11, 2021 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED BY TELEPHONE for the #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . Motion set for 1/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Same AT&T information previously provided). (dh, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 1030 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel re In Re Lipitor Antitrust Litigation (PGS). (jem)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1029 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq. re #1025 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Transcript)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1028 Proposed Order Letter by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund re #1025 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1027 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney AAKRUTI GOVIND VAKHARIA terminated. (GATELY, MATTHEW)
December 21, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1026 Notice to Withdraw from NEF filed by Matthew Gately was submitted incorrectly as a Notice(Other). Please resubmit using the event - Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case - that can be found under - Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1026 NOTICE by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF AAKRUTI VAKHARIA, ESQ. (GATELY, MATTHEW)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER that within five business days Pearlman and Rodriguez shall meet and confer electronically about the membership and terms of a proposed form of order to establish a settlement committee; if the conference fails, Rodriguez and Pearlman shall each submit a proposed form of order for the Court to consider. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/17/2020. (jem)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1024 Transcript of HEARING ON ECF DOCUMENTS #1016 , #1017 , #1018 , and #1019 via Telephone held on 12/15/2020, before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Court Reporter Frank Gable (856-889-4761). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 1/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2021. (km) (Main Document 1024 replaced on 12/18/2020) (km, ).
December 15, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert(and Judge Peter G. Sheridan): Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2020. (eh, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 1023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 1022 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re #1019 Letter. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1021 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference on December 15, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss correspondence recently received by the Court (ECF Nos. #1016 , #1017 , #1018 and #1019 ). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/10/2020. (jdb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1019 Letter from Lisa Rodriguez. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 9, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference (Re: Doc. 1018)set for 12/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (AT&T information will be provided). (dh, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 1018 NOTICE by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CHRISTOPHER T. STOW-SERGE, ESQ. (GATELY, MATTHEW)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1017 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq. re #1006 Order, #1016 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Transcript)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1016 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez re #1006 Order,. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1015 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez re #1013 Notice (Other),. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 LETTER ORDER that Heligren and Cox moved to strike the brief of End-Payors as being filed late. That motion or application is denied #1009 . End-Payors move to strike this reply brief of Heligren and Cox. That application is denied #1012 . If after relief is requested the parties may seek same. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/30/2020. (jem)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1013 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel from Judge Sheridan re. Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration #994 . If any party wishes to submit a brief in support of or in opposition to the moving party, please advise the Court no later than 12/04/2020, and the Court will set up a briefing schedule. (jem)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1012 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez re #1009 Letter,. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1011 Transcript of STATUS CONFERENCE - RE: SETTLEMENT COMMITTEE held on 11/13/2020, before District Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Court Reporter Frank Gable (856-889-4761). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 12/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021. (km)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1009 Letter from Gil D. Messina for Plaintiffs Sandra Hellgren and Anita Cox re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . (Attachments: #1 Brief Proposed Reply Brief, #2 Declaration Proposed Reply Declaration)(MESSINA, GIL)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER that Lisa J. Rodriguez shall be authorized to coordinate and collect payment of all outstanding and future invoices of behalf of Special Master Linares, from the plaintiffs in accordance with Paragraph 9 of this Court's 7/10/2019 Order #877 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/23/2020. (jem)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1007 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, End-Payors (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER Establishing Settlement Committee. Mr. Pearlman and Ms. Rodriguez shall confer in good faith regarding the direct purchasers' representation on the settlement committee no later than 12/04/2020. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/16/2020. (jem)
November 13, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert (and Judge Peter G. Sheridan): Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2020. (eh, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 1010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 LETTER ORDER that the letter herein was received by the Court on 11/10/2020; the conference is for all Plaintiffs' counsel. The Court intends to discuss the formulation of a settlement committee and the following letters: #993 , #996 , #1000 , #1001 , #1002 , #1003 , and #1004 . Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/10/2020. (jem) Modified on 11/12/2020.
November 9, 2020 Filing 1004 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re #990 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 3, 2020 Filing 1003 Letter from Lawrence G. Papale for Sandra Hellgren and Anita J. Cox. (MESSINA, GIL)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1002 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1001 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.and James Cecchi, Esq.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1000 Letter from James E. Cecchi and Lisa J. Rodriguez Regarding Status Report re #990 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,. (Attachments: #1 List of Attendees for Zoom Conference)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 25, 2020 Filing 999 NOTICE by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Supplemental Authority (MESSINA, GIL)
October 20, 2020 Filing 998 ANSWER to Complaint (ECF No. 1 in Civil Action No. 20-10824) by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
October 19, 2020 Filing 997 NOTICE of Change of Address by ARNOLD B. CALMANN (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
October 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to the #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . Motion reset for 11/16/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
October 13, 2020 Filing 996 Letter from Patrick D. Doran to Hon. Peter G Sheridan re #990 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,. (DORAN, PATRICK)
October 7, 2020 Filing 995 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
October 6, 2020 Filing 994 MOTION for Reconsideration re #989 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
October 6, 2020 Filing 993 Letter from James Cecchi, Esq., Lisa Rodriguez, Esq. and Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 992 LETTER ORDER thanking counsel for clarification but it does not change the Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/05/2020. (jdb) Modified on 10/14/2020 (eaj, ).
October 1, 2020 Filing 991 Letter from Bruce E. Gerstein and David F. Sorensen re #990 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,. (HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 990 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Castillo's #961 Motion; Rodriguez, Pearlman and Cecchi are directed to arrange a joint meeting of direct purchasers counsel and end-payor counsel to confer and recommend whether a committee should be established with the sole authority of negotiating a settlement on behalf of all Plaintiffs; counsel shall submit a report to the Court setting forth the resolutions and/or the varying positions of all parties by 11/01/2020; the mediation continues in accordance with Mediator Hochberg's direction. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/24/2020. (jem)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 989 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying California Consumers' #955 Motion For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/22/2020. (jem)
September 18, 2020 Filing 988 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PFIZER INC., PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 18, 2020 Filing 987 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (Answer to Complaint (DE No. 1) in Civil Action No. 20-10824) by PFIZER INC., PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC.(WALSH, LIZA)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the cases herein as consolidated for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial, subject to further order of the Court; Civil Action No. 12-2389 shall be the Lead Case and all filings in the Consolidated Actions are to be made only in Civil Action No. 12-2389. The Clerk of Court shall designate Civil Action No. 20-6255, as closed for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/26/2020. (jem)
August 22, 2020 Filing 985 NOTICE by ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC. re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order RDCs Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding the Zetia Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KOHN, PETER)
August 21, 2020 Filing 984 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Response To Letter From David Sorensen re #982 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 20, 2020 Filing 983 NOTICE by ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC. Notice of Withdrawal (SIMONS, DANIEL)
August 20, 2020 Filing 982 Letter from David F. Sorensen. (SIMONS, DANIEL)
July 30, 2020 Filing 981 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2020 re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order , Motions Taken Under Advisement . (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
July 30, 2020 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel . Motion set for 8/5/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. AT&T information will be provided. (dh, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 980 Letter from Kimberly Hennings. (HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
July 17, 2020 Filing 979 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CESAR CASTILLO, LLC re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 17, 2020 Filing 978 ANSWER to Complaint (ECF No. 1 in Civil Action No. 20-6255) and Separate Defenses by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the cases herein as consolidated for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial, subject to further order of the Court; Civil Action No. 12-2389 shall be the Lead Case and all filings in the Consolidated Actions are to be made only in Civil Action No. 12-2389. The Clerk of Court shall designate Civil Action No. 20-6255, as closed for administrative purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/16/2020. (jem)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 976 LETTER ORDER granting Movant/Plaintiff Cesar Castillo, LLC's request #974 for an extension of time, until 7/17/2020, and five additional pages, to prepare a consolidated reply brief filing in opposition to the two briefs Value Drug has filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/13/2020. (jem)
July 13, 2020 Filing 975 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson, Chief U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. Regarding Reassignment and Consolidation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Reassignment, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Consolidation)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 13, 2020 Filing 974 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Additional Time and Pages For Reply Brief re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #973 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, #971 Response in Opposition to Motion, #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order , #972 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 12, 2020 Filing 973 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
July 9, 2020 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED BY TELEPHONE for the #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order . Motion set for 7/30/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Kimberly Hennings, Esq. will provide a dial in number. (dh, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 972 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Certificate of Service)(HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
July 6, 2020 Filing 971 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order {{THIRD-PARTY NATIONAL WHOLESALERS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CESAR CASTILLO, LLCS MOTION TO MODIFY CMO-1}} (DORAN, PATRICK)
July 6, 2020 Filing 970 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK DAVID DORAN on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (DORAN, PATRICK)
July 6, 2020 Filing 969 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren re #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
June 29, 2020 Filing 968 NOTICE by GIANT EAGLE, INC. Notice of Name Change (Blistan, Rachel)
June 29, 2020 Reset deadlines as to the #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel . Motion reset for 7/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 967 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request that the reply to End-Payor Plaintiffs response be permitted to be filed by July 6, 2020, and the motion be continued one motion cycle until July 20, 2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/26/2020. (jdb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 966 Letter from Gil D Messina Requesting Extension to File Reply Brief re #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel . (MESSINA, GIL)
June 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ELLEN T. NOTEWARE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
June 25, 2020 Filing 965 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ellen T. Noteware, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number TRE112229 on behalf of Ellen T. Noteware, Esq. (jjc, )
June 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, LINDA P NUSSBAUM, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
June 24, 2020 Filing 964 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Linda P. Nussbaum to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
June 23, 2020 Filing 963 Letter from Counsel for Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs re #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order . (HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
June 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order . Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 22, 2020 Filing 962 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan re #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 22, 2020 Filing 961 MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Order by CESAR CASTILLO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 18, 2020 Filing 960 NOTICE by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC. - Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance - Linda P. Nussbaum of Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER granting #953 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ellen T. Noteware, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/04/2020. (jem)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER that the stay of discovery is extended until a decision is entered with respect to Plaintiffs' motion #955 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/05/2020. (jem)
May 27, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to the #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel . Motion reset for 7/6/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 957 LETTER ORDER granting the request for a one motion cycle continuance re #955 Motion, until 7/06/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/27/2020. (jem)
May 26, 2020 Filing 956 Letter from L. Rodriguez re #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel . (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel . Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
May 22, 2020 Filing 955 MOTION For Relief From Part of Case Management Order No. 1 and to Create a Sub-Class of California Consumers and to Appoint Separate Interim Lead Counsel by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence G. Papale, #2 Brief Legal Memorandum, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
May 7, 2020 Filing 954 NOTICE by JOHN F. BAUGHMAN of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Removal from Notices of Electronic Filing (WALSH, LIZA)
March 31, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #953 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellen T. Noteware. Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
March 31, 2020 Filing 953 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellen T. Noteware by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #2 Certification of Ellen T. Noteware, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 24, 2020 Filing 952 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel (PGS). The telephone conference currently scheduled for 3/30/2020 in this matter is cancelled. (jem)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 951 LETTER ORDER granting the request that Gavin R. Tisdale, Esq. is withdrawn as pro hac vice counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/23/2020. (jem)
March 20, 2020 Filing 950 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Requesting Approval of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Attorney, Gavin R. Tisdale, Esq. re #810 Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 949 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER Referring Case to Mediation. Faith Hochberg, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) is appointed to serve as the mediator; the Mediator may meet with counsel and the parties jointly or ex parte; discovery is stayed for two months from the date of this Order except that Defendants shall comply with the Order of the Discovery Master dated 3/10/2020 #944 . Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/12/2020. (jem)
March 12, 2020 Filing 947 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 11, 2020 Filing 946 Letter from Bruce E. Gerstein & David F. Sorensen re #945 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
March 10, 2020 Filing 945 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Peter Sheridan and Hon. Douglas Arpert. (WALSH, LIZA)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 944 Order from Special Master (Attachments: #1 OPINION)(LINARES, JOSE)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 943 MEDIATION ORDER: Counsel must file a Joint Status Report with the Court concerning the parties' efforts to select a Mediator within fourteen (14) days of this filing. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on 3/30/2020 at 12:00pm. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/02/2020. (jem)
February 26, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 2/26/2020. (ce3)
February 26, 2020 Filing 942 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
February 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL R. CELLUCCI and JEEHYEON LEE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
February 25, 2020 Filing 941 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeehyeon Lee, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 25, 2020 Filing 940 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel R. Cellucci, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Daniel R. Cellucci and Jeehyeon Lee: $ 300, receipt number TRE109843 (mg)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 939 LETTER ORDER granting the request to unseal docket entries #925 , #931 , and #934 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/21/2020. (jem)
February 20, 2020 Filing 938 Letter from All Parties re: Removing Sealing re #925 Letter,, #931 Letter,,,, #934 Letter,,. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Daniel R. Cellucci, Esq. and Jeehyeon Lee, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/13/2020. (jem)
February 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALEXANDRA STRANG and PENINA C. MOISA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
February 13, 2020 Filing 936 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Penina C, Moisa, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 13, 2020 Filing 935 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexandra Strang, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Alexandra Strang, Esq. and Penina C. Moisa, Esq., receipt number TRE109584. (jem)
February 12, 2020 Filing 934 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to Special Master Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) in Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel re #930 Letter, #925 Letter,, #933 Letter, #931 Letter,,,,. (PEARLMAN, PETER)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 11, 2020 Filing 933 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Regarding Application On Consent for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel R. Cellucci, Esq. and Jeehyeon Lee, Esq. on Behalf of Ranbaxy. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., #2 Declaration of Daniel R. Cellucci, Esq., #3 Declaration of Jeehyeon Lee, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 10, 2020 Filing 932 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Blistan on behalf of GIANT EAGLE, INC. (jem)
February 7, 2020 Filing 931 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to Special Master Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) Regarding Ranbaxy's Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel re #925 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Ranbaxy's Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 7, 2020 Filing 930 Letter from Liza Walsh to Special Master re #925 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 31, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 11:00 AM MOVED to 2/26/2020 at 1:00 PM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
January 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: ATTENTION COUNSEL - Telephone Conference (Re: Doc. 929) set for 2/4/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 929 LETTER ORDER that the Case Management Conference will be held telephonically. Saiber shall arrange the call. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/28/2020. (jem)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Alexandra Strang, Esq. and Penina C. Moisa, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/28/2020. (jem)
January 27, 2020 Filing 927 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., on Behalf of All Parties, Requesting Adjournment of February 4, 2020 Case Management Conference re #909 Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 27, 2020 Filing 926 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Regarding Application on Consent for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexandra Strang, Esq. and Penina C. Moisa, Esq. on Behalf of Ranbaxy. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., #2 Declaration of Alexandra Strang, Esq., #3 Declaration of Penina C. Moisa, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 24, 2020 Filing 925 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to J. Linares seeking to Compel Defendants' Interrogatory Responses. (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief, #2 Exhibits A-L)(PEARLMAN, PETER)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN P. BJORK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
January 17, 2020 Filing 924 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John P. Bjork to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 923 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Ahold USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/15/2020. (jem)
January 14, 2020 Filing 922 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC.. (SOBOL, THOMAS)
January 10, 2020 Filing 921 STIPULATION - STIPULATED REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENT TO MEIJER'S EXISTING COMPLAINT by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN)
January 8, 2020 Filing 920 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRIANNE BENEDETTO on behalf of LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE INDEMNITY COMPANY (BENEDETTO, TERRIANNE)
January 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER T. STOW-SERGE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
January 3, 2020 Filing 919 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher Stow-Serge to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Christoper Stow-Serge: $ 150, receipt number TRE108618 (mg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 918 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R DUGAN, II on behalf of PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417) (DUGAN, JAMES)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER granting #913 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Stow-Serge, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/11/2019. (jem)
December 2, 2019 Filing 916 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Thomas Paul Pier. (jem)
December 2, 2019 Filing 915 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angelina Alioto-Grace. (jem)
December 2, 2019 Filing 914 Letter from All Parties re #909 Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #913 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Stow-Serge. Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 19, 2019 Filing 913 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Stow-Serge by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of Christopher Stow-Serge, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 912 CONSENT ORDER granting #908 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert G. Eisler, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/14/2019. (jem)
November 14, 2019 Filing 911 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JUSTIN J. WOLOSZ. (jem)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 910 LETTER ORDER that Matthew P. Downer, Esq. is withdrawn as pro hac vice counsel of record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/07/2019. (jem)
November 6, 2019 Filing 909 LETTER in regard to the Case Management Conference Agenda. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/06/2019. (jem)
November 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #908 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert G. Eisler. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 5, 2019 Filing 908 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert G. Eisler by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Lisa Rodriguez, #2 Certification Cert of R. Eisler, #3 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 5, 2019 Filing 907 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Requesting Approval of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Attorney, Matthew P. Downer, Esq. re #743 Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 906 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney NICOLE M. ACCHIONE terminated. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (All Counsel must be present). (dh, )
October 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID A. LANGER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
October 25, 2019 Filing 905 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David A. Langer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to David A. Langer: $ 150, receipt number TRE106883 (abr)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 904 LETTER ORDER granting the request that Renae Steiner of Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. be substituted for Vincent J. Esades of Heins Mills & Olson as co-lead counsel in this action. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/21/2019. (jem) Modified on 10/23/2019 (eaj, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 903 Letter from Lisa Rodriguez re substitution of co-lead counsel. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 902 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Class certification motions due 11/09/2021. Daubert motions to exclude any expert whose opinions are being challenged as to class certification and/or summary judgment due 12/14/2021. Class certification oppositions due 1/04/2022. Class certification replies due 2/08/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/16/2019. (jem)
October 15, 2019 Filing 901 Letter from All Parties re #899 Scheduling Order,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Further Amended Scheduling Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER granting #894 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Langer, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/02/2019. (jem)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 899 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 11/4/2020. No later than 10/14/2019 the parties are directed to submit proposed dates for the remainder of the schedule either jointly or in competing forms of order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/01/2019. (jem)
September 30, 2019 Filing 898 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq. re 896 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT A. BULLWINKEL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
September 20, 2019 Filing 897 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Bullwinkel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Robert Allan Bullwinkel: $ 150, receipt number TRE106020 (abr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 896 TEXT ORDER: The parties are to submit a joint status report to the Court by September 30, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/18/2019. (JB)
September 17, 2019 Filing 895 NOTICE by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL - JULIE A. KEARNS (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #894 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice DAVID A. LANGER. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 894 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice DAVID A. LANGER by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of David A. Langer, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER granting #890 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert A. Bullwinkel, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/10/2019. (jem)
August 29, 2019 Filing 892 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Aaron Rose. (jem)
August 14, 2019 Filing 891 NOTICE by VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #304 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Miranda Y. Jones (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #890 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Bullwinkel. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 13, 2019 Filing 890 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Bullwinkel by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of Robert A. Bullwinkel, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOSEPH M. ALIOTO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
August 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WILLIAM OLSON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
August 9, 2019 Filing 889 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William Olson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 9, 2019 Filing 888 Letter from Jose L. Linares. (LINARES, JOSE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 887 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph M.Alioto to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MESSINA, GIL)
August 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to William Olson, Esq., receipt number TRE104741. (jem)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER granting #874 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph M. Alioto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/05/2019. (jem)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER granting #878 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William Olson, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/23/2019. (jem)
July 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALEXANDRA RUSSELL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
July 17, 2019 Filing 884 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexandra Russell, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Alexandra Russell, ESQ. receipt number TRE104241 (in-jal, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 883 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Thomas Paul Pier. (jem)
July 15, 2019 Filing 882 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angelina Alioto-Grace. (jem)
July 12, 2019 Filing 880 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Adam C. Belsky (km)
July 12, 2019 Filing 879 Letter from Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Lois Goodman and Hon. Douglas Arpert re #858 Order, #872 Letter. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 12, 2019 Set Deadlines for the #878 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Olson. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 12, 2019 Filing 878 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Olson by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of William Olson, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER Appointing Jose L. Linares as Discovery Master to case. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 7/10/2019. (km) Modified on 7/17/2019 (eaj).
July 9, 2019 Filing 876 NOTICE of Appearance by AAKRUTI GOVIND VAKHARIA on behalf of VALUE DRUG COMPANY (VAKHARIA, AAKRUTI)
July 9, 2019 Set deadlines as to #874 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER that Docket entry #871 is VACATED. It is further ordered that the Clerk is to reopen #874 Motion for pro hac vice admission. Any opposition to the motion is to be filed by 07/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/09/2019. (jmh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 874 Letter from Gil D Messina. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Alioto)(MESSINA, GIL) Modified on 7/9/2019 to reopen motion (eaj, ).
July 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Joseph M. Alioto. Receipt number TRE103796 (jdb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 873 LETTER ORDER granting the request for additional time to confer; the parties will report to the Court by 7/12/2019 as to the status of their discussion and any remaining issues that need to be addressed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/02/2019. (jem)
July 1, 2019 Filing 872 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Lois Goodman and Hon. Douglas Arpert re #858 Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 871 *VACATED* ORDER granting #861 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph M. Alioto, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/27/2019. (jem)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Alexandra Russell, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/27/2019. (jem)
June 27, 2019 Filing 869 NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA)
June 26, 2019 Filing 868 Letter from All Parties re #862 Notice (Other). (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 25, 2019 Filing 867 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Regarding Application On Consent for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexandra Russell, Esq. on Behalf of Ranbaxy. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexandra Russell, Esq., #2 Declaration of Alexandra Russell, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 866 LETTER ORDER Granting application to withdraw Pro Hac Vice Counsel. JONATHAN D. JANOW terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/21/2019. (km)
June 20, 2019 Filing 865 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Requesting Approval of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Attorney, Jonathan D. Janow, Esq. re #300 Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 864 MDL ORDER that the #863 Affidavit/Certification of the Honorable Jose L. Linares (Ret.) is sealed until 7/10/2019; that any party may object and/or comment about public disclosure of the certification on or before 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 6/19/2019. (gxh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 863 AFFIDAVIT of the Honorable Jose L. Linares (Ret.) in Support of Court Appointment as Special Master for Discovery. (gxh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 862 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (PGS) (jem)
May 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #861 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph M. Alioto. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
May 29, 2019 Filing 861 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph M. Alioto by Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph M. Alioto, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MESSINA, GIL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 860 Letter from All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Discovery Master)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
May 28, 2019 Filing 859 NOTICE of Appearance by GIL D. MESSINA on behalf of Anita Cox, Sandra Hellgren (MESSINA, GIL)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER granting-in-part and denying-in-part the relief sought in the parties' jointly presented discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/23/2019. (jem)
May 22, 2019 Filing 857 NOTICE by KATHERINE KELLY FELL of Withdrawal of Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice and Request for Removal from Electronic Notification (WALSH, LIZA)
May 3, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference (Re: Appointment of Discovery Master and any other outstanding matters) set for 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 856 LETTER ORDER that the additional time to discuss resolution of the remaining issues is granted until 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/9/2019. (mps)
April 9, 2019 Filing 855 Letter from All Parties re #853 Notice (Other). (PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 854 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 3/26/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/1/2019. (mps)
March 29, 2019 Filing 853 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel (PGS) (km)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 852 LETTER ORDER that the motion hearing for the 16 Motion to Dismiss in Civil Action 18-14414 will be held on 4/24/2019 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/19/2019. (mps)
March 15, 2019 Filing 851 NOTICE by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. of Change of Firm Address and Telephone Numbers of Pro Hac Vice Counsel (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
March 15, 2019 Filing 850 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MICHAEL F. WILLIAMS terminated. (WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
March 8, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - BRIAN HERRINGTON does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (jml, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 849 Letter from All Parties re #754 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
February 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DEVORA W. ALLON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
February 25, 2019 Filing 848 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Devora W. Allon, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 22, 2019 Filing 847 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez re MSP. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 846 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re 845 Order, #843 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Devora W. Allon, Esq., receipt number TRE100036 (mps)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 845 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the February 12, 2019 letter #843 on behalf of the end-payor plaintiffs requesting an order suspending any further briefing of the motion to dismiss filed in Member Case No. 18-14414. Any response to this letter should be submitted to the Court no later than February 22, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 02/19/2019. (JB)
February 14, 2019 Filing 844 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL MORRIS BUCHMAN (BUCHMAN, MICHAEL)
February 12, 2019 Filing 843 Letter from L. Rodriguez re end-payor plaintiffs. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 842 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Devora W. Allon, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/1/2019. (mps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 841 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Devora W. Allon, Esq. on behalf of Ranbaxy (On Consent) for by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Devora W. Allon, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 840 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/23/2019. (mps)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 839 STIPULATION AND ORDER adjourning dates for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in re 18-cv-14414. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/24/2019. (mps)
December 21, 2018 Filing 838 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOHN D. RADICE (RADICE, JOHN)
December 19, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #837 Application for a Clerk's Extension filed by Arnold Calmann on 12/18/2018 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE REVIEW and file it in the correct case of 18-cv-14414. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
December 18, 2018 Filing 837 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint of Plaintiffs MSP Recovery Claims, Series, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, and MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER that the deadline by which Defendants must decide whether to waive the attorney-client privilege shall be 3/29/2019. Defendants' #771 Motion is denied in all other aspects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/27/2018. (mps)
November 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, NINA KOVALENKO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
November 15, 2018 Filing 835 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nina Kovalenko to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9174935.) (WALSH, LIZA)
November 14, 2018 Filing 834 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez requesting Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance - ERIN C. DURBA. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 833 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Nina Kovalenko, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/14/2018. (mps)
November 1, 2018 Filing 832 Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of the Parties to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 831 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding the Non-Disclosure of Certain Information Regarding Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/31/2018. (mps)
October 29, 2018 Filing 830 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re Open Discovery Issues. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 829 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert re: Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nina Kovalenko on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Nina Kovalenko, #2 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 828 Transcript of HEARING: [#771] MOTION CONCERNING PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATIONS BY PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC held on 10/4/2018, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber- Transcripts Plus, Inc. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (kas, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 827 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by End-Payor Class Plaintiffs by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC.(WALSH, LIZA)
October 4, 2018 Filing 826 ANSWER to Complaint --Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by End-Payor Class Plaintiffs (ECF No. 815)-- by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
October 4, 2018 Filing 825 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Motion Hearing held on 10/4/2018 re #771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications filed by PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO. Ordered decision reserved. (digitally recorded.) (Attachments: #1 Appearances) (ce3)
October 3, 2018 Filing 824 Letter from Scott E. Perwin re Set/Reset Hearings. (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 823 LETTER ORDER granting request that Mr. Patunas and his firm be withdrawn from the case as counsel of record for the Ranbaxy parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/28/2018. (mps)
September 27, 2018 Filing 822 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications . (WALSH, LIZA)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 821 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-7) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
September 27, 2018 Filing 820 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Requesting Approval of the Withdrawal of Ranbaxy's former counsel, Michael Patunas, Esq. and his firm Patunas Law LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 25, 2018 Filing 819 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
September 25, 2018 Filing 818 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SOOS, JEFFREY)
September 25, 2018 Filing 817 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 816 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund. Amendment to #815 Amended Complaint UNREDACTED. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 20, 2018 Filing 815 AMENDED COMPLAINT (3rd) CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against PFIZER INC., filed by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 4, 2018 Filing 814 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL F. WILLIAMS on behalf of RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 813 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant's #755 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted in part and denied in part. EPPs have thirty (30) days from the filing of this Memorandum and Order to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/21/2018. (mps)
August 17, 2018 Filing 812 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J., Regarding Discovery Disputes (Joint Letter). (WALSH, LIZA)
August 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GAVIN R. TISDALE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
August 15, 2018 Filing 811 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gavin R. Tisdale, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8957641.) (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Gavin R. Tisdale, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/7/2018. (mps)
August 6, 2018 Filing 809 APPLICATION/PETITION for by RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gavin R. Tisdale, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 808 MDL Letter ORDER Granting Extension of Deadline for Joint Discovery Dispute Submission to 8/17/2018 at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/2/2018. (kas, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 807 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J., Requesting Extension of Deadline for Joint Discovery Dispute Submission. (WALSH, LIZA)
August 1, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: The oral argument on #771 Motion Concerning Privileged Communications has been rescheduled for 10/4/2018 at 11:30 A.M. (ce3)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER on Procedures and Guidelines for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel's Time and Expense Submissions. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 7/20/2018. (mmh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 805 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI terminated. (ZOLNOSKI, MICHELLE)
July 23, 2018 Filing 804 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2018 filed 7/23/2018 re #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., Motions Taken Under Advisement . (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 803 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct oral argument on #771 Motion Concerning Privileged Communications on September 19, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6W. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/19/2018. (Biamonte, J)
June 27, 2018 Filing 802 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Tutorial Hearing held on 6/27/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
June 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JULIE A. KEARNS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER on Procedures and Guidelines for End-Payor Plaintiffs' Counsel's Time and Expense Submissions. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 6/25/2018. (mps)
June 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERIN C. DURBA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
June 25, 2018 Filing 800 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice ERIN C. DURBA to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Erin C. Durba, Esq., receipt number TRE092822 (mps)
June 22, 2018 Filing 799 Letter from Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J., Regarding Tutorial for June 27 Conference. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 21, 2018 Filing 798 Letter from Parvin K. Aminolroaya re: request permission for pro hac vice attorney John Bjork to appear telephonically at the upcoming hearing scheduled for June 27th, 2018. (AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN)
June 21, 2018 Filing 797 NOTICE of Appearance by PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA on behalf of MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC. (AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN)
June 21, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee Received in the amount of $ 150.00 as to Julie A Kearns, receipt number TRE092790 (km)
June 20, 2018 Filing 796 Letter from LISA J. RODRIGUEZ - REVISED TIME AND EXPENSE PROTOCOL. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 20, 2018 Filing 795 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
June 20, 2018 Filing 794 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re #771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Baughman with Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2018 Filing 793 STATUS REPORT For June 27, 2018 Conference by All Plaintiffs. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 20, 2018 Filing 792 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Procedures and Guidelines for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel's Time and Expense Submissions)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 8, 2018 Filing 791 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 790 LETTER ORDER granting request that the page limit for Defendants' Reply Brief be extended from 15 pages to 20 pages. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 6/8/2018. (mps)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER granting #782 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ERIN C. DURBA, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/6/2018. (mps) Modified on 6/26/2018 (eaj, ).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER granting #781 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Gray, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/6/2018. (mps) Modified on 6/26/2018 (eaj, ).
June 6, 2018 Filing 787 RESPONSE re #757 Brief, #756 Pretrial Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Hennings, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 6, 2018 Filing 786 Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of Defendants to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. Requesting Page Limit Extension. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 4, 2018 ATTENTION COUNSEL CORRECTION ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #755 ONLY MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Motion set for 6/25/2018 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
June 4, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications , #782 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of ERIN C. DURBA, #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #781 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected - Joshua Gray :. Motion set for 6/13/2018 moved to 6/25/2018 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Disregard this entry) Modified on 6/4/2018 (dh).
May 31, 2018 Filing 785 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #775 Brief. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 784 LETTER ORDER granting request for a deferral of the 5/24/2018 deadline to allow the continuance of the meet and confer process.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/23/2018. (mps)
May 23, 2018 Filing 783 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re adjournment request. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 22, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #782 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of ERIN C. DURBA. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
May 22, 2018 Filing 782 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of ERIN C. DURBA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #780 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Barton Gray, #781 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected - Joshua Gray. Motions set for 6/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
May 16, 2018 Filing 781 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected - Joshua Gray by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
May 16, 2018 Filing 780 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Barton Gray by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
May 15, 2018 Filing 779 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure End-Payer Plaintiffs (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Memorandum in Opposition of Motion d.e. #778 submitted by Lisa Rodriguez on 5/14/2018 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
May 14, 2018 Filing 778 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure End-Payer Plaintiffs (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER granting #773 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Julie A. Kearns, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/14/2018. (mps)
May 11, 2018 Filing 775 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Response to Pfizer's Inherently Defective Privilege Log Proposal (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley J. Demuth, Esq.)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
May 10, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #774 Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Lisa Rodriguez on 5/10/2018 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once an Order granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Julie Kearns is entered on the docket by the Court. (mps)
May 10, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #773 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Rodriguez. Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
May 10, 2018 Filing 774 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Julie Kearns to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 10, 2018 Filing 773 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Rodriguez by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of J. Kearns, #2 Statement Cert. of L. Rodriguez, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 10, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #772 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Lisa Rodriguez on 5/9/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice found under Motions and Related Filings, Motions. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
May 9, 2018 Filing 772 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lisa J. Rodriguez to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of L. Rodriguez in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Julie Kearns, #2 Certification Certif. of Julie Kearns to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice admission, #4 Supplement Request by local counsel for Pro Hac Vice Atty to Receive Elec. Notification)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 8, 2018 Set deadlines as to the #771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications . Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
May 7, 2018 Filing 771 MOTION Concerning Privileged Communications by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of John F. Baughman with Exhibits A - E, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 7, 2018 Filing 770 BRIEF from Ranbaxy in Support of Pfizer's Motion Concerning Privileged Communications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
May 4, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee received $ 150, receipt number TRE091384 for John P. Bjork. (sab)
May 3, 2018 Filing 776 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 5/3/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
May 3, 2018 Filing 769 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman re: Conference Call Appearance List. (Attachments: #1 Counsel List)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
May 1, 2018 Filing 768 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez Enclosing End Payor Plaintiffs' Time and Expense Protocol. (Attachments: #1 End Payor Class Plaintiffs' Time and Expense Protocol)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 1, 2018 Filing 767 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Counsel re: [Proposed] Order on Procedures and Guidelines for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel's Time and Expense Submissions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
May 1, 2018 Filing 766 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman re: Conference Call Dial-In Information re #765 Order. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 765 LETTER ORDER rescheduling the telephone conference to 5/3/2018 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/30/2018. (mps)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 764 LETTER ORDER that Defendants' Initial Brief is due 5/7/2018. Plaintiffs' Responsive Brief is due 6/6/2018. Defendants' Reply Brief is due 6/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/27/2018. (mps)
April 27, 2018 Filing 763 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN CAMPBELL HILL on behalf of GIANT EAGLE, INC. (HILL, BRIAN)
April 27, 2018 Filing 762 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. Requesting Adjournment re #760 Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER granting #732 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John P. Bjork. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/25/2018. (km)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 760 LETTER ORDER that the Court will conduct a conference call on this issue. It will be held on 5/1/2018 at 2:00 PM. Mr. Pearlman is in charge of the logistics for the call. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/25/2018. (mps)
April 25, 2018 Filing 759 Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of Defendants to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #754 Scheduling Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 25, 2018 Filing 758 Letter from All Counsel regarding Economics Tutorial. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 23, 2018 Filing 757 BRIEF in Support of the Pfizer Defendants' Proposed Approach to Privilege Logs (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward O. Gramling, #2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 23, 2018 Filing 756 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
April 17, 2018 CORRECTION - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Motion set for 6/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
April 16, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Motion set for 5/21/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
April 16, 2018 Filing 755 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief with Attachments 1 - 2, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 754 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/16/2018. (mps) Modified on 4/23/2018 (eaj).
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 753 STIPULATION AND ORDER that End-Payor Plaintiffs' Opposition is to be filed 5/14/2018. Defendants' Reply is to be filed 6/8/2018. Hearing is scheduled for 6/13/2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/16/2018. (mps)
April 13, 2018 Filing 752 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re Filing of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) re #751 Stipulation. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 11, 2018 Filing 751 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
April 10, 2018 Filing 750 Letter from All Counsel. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KATHERINE KELLY FELL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
April 5, 2018 Filing 749 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Katherine Kelly Fell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8616157.) (WALSH, LIZA)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER granting #727 Motion for Withdrawal of appearance of pro hac vice counsel C. Michael Ellingburg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/3/2018. (mps)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER granting #726 Motion for Withdrawal of appearance of pro hac vice counsel Larry D. Moffett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/3/2018. (mps)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 746 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Katherine Kelly Fell, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/3/2018. (mps)
April 2, 2018 Filing 745 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Katherine Kelly Fell for by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #2 Certification of Katherine Kelly Fell, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 29, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANNA T. NEILL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
March 29, 2018 Filing 744 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anna Neill to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Matthew P. Downer, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/28/2018. (mps)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 742 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding the #416 Agreement Establishing Protocol for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/28/2018. (mps)
March 28, 2018 Filing 741 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Status Conference held on 3/28/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: #1 Index) (dh, )
March 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #740 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF filed Deborah Corbishley on 3/28/2018 cannot be processed at this time as there is no valid email address as to Anna Neill to be added to receive the notices. PLEASE RESUBMIT with a valid email address as to Anna Neill. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
March 28, 2018 Filing 740 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anna Neill to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8588051.) (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
March 27, 2018 Filing 739 APPLICATION/PETITION for Matthew P. Downer for by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Matthew P. Downer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 738 LETTER ORDER granting request to excuse the attendance of Lisa Rodriguez from the 3/28/2018 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/27/2018. (mps)
March 27, 2018 Filing 737 Letter from All Counsel re #416 Order Electronic Discovery. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulation and Order Amending the Agreement Establishing Protocol for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 27, 2018 Filing 736 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 27, 2018 Filing 735 Letter from All Counsel re #730 Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Litigation Schedule)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 27, 2018 Filing 734 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC (WALSH, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #732 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John P. Bjork. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER granting #724 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anna T. Neill, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/26/2018. (mps)
March 26, 2018 Filing 732 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John P. Bjork by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher Seeger in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of John P. Bjork, #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service - Cert of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 731 LETTER ORDER granting request that the deadline for the submission of the status report is extended to 3/23/2018, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/23/2018. (mps)
March 23, 2018 Filing 730 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 20, 2018 Filing 729 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J., Requesting Extension of Deadline for Status Report. (WALSH, LIZA)
March 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRIS LETTER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
March 19, 2018 Filing 728 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice CHRIS LETTER to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Chris Letter, Esq., receipt number TRE089890 (mps)
March 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #727 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL, C. MICHAEL ELLINGBURG , #726 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL, LARRY D. MOFFETT . Motions set for 4/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 13, 2018 Filing 727 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL, C. MICHAEL ELLINGBURG by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of C. Michael Ellingburg, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 13, 2018 Filing 726 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL, LARRY D. MOFFETT by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of Larry D. Moffett, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER granting #723 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chris Letter, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/6/2018. (mps)
March 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #724 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 6, 2018 Filing 724 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO.. (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
February 23, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #723 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chris Letter, Esq.. Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 23, 2018 Filing 723 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chris Letter, Esq. by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of Chris Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
February 15, 2018 Filing 722 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2018 Filing 721 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2018 Filing 720 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2018 Filing 719 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2018 Filing 718 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC.(WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2018 Filing 717 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2018 Filing 716 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., and HEB Grocery's Amended Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2018 Filing 715 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc. d/b/a Brooks Pharmacy and Eckerd Corp.'s Amended Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2018 Filing 714 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Distribution Inc.'s Consolidated Amended Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2018 Filing 713 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Giant Eagle, Inc.'s Consolidated Amended Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2018 Filing 712 ANSWER to Complaint End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2018 Filing 711 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 710 LETTER ORDER that Pfizer and Ranbaxy are to respond to Plaintiffs' respective amended complaints by 2/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/13/2018. (mps)
February 9, 2018 Filing 709 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J., Requesting Extension of Deadline for Defendants' Answers to Amended Complaints. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER Setting Initial Litigation Schedule. Status Conference set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4E. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/9/2018. (mps)
February 8, 2018 Filing 707 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Setting Initial Litigation Schedule)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
February 7, 2018 Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 2/7/2018. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (mmh)
February 7, 2018 Pursuant to the #706 MANDATE of the USCA, the orders of the USDC entered 11/5/2014 and 9/29/2017 are AFFIRMED. (mmh)
February 7, 2018 Filing 706 MANDATE of USCA as to #589 Notice of Appeal (USCA)filed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.,Professional Drug Company, Inc.,BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., #588 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by MEIJER INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC.(Finance notified)(Attachments: #1 Opinion)(ca3tmk)
February 2, 2018 Filing 705 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO.. (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 704 NOTICE AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal as to BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/30/2018. (mps)
January 30, 2018 Filing 703 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC. (HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
January 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL WALKER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
January 17, 2018 Filing 702 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Walker, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 17, 2018 Filing 701 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW F. GATELY on behalf of AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY (GATELY, MATTHEW)
January 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Daniel Walker, Esq., receipt number TRE087897. (jem)
January 12, 2018 Filing 700 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against PFIZER INC., filed by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN F. BAUGHMAN, FARRAH R. BERSE and YAHONNES CLEARY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
January 10, 2018 Filing 699 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Yahonnes Cleary to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8385774.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Filing 698 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Farrah R. Berse to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8385754.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Filing 697 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John F. Baughman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8385724.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 9, 2018 Filing 696 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Status Conference held on 1/9/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: #1 Index) (dh, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 695 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to John F. Baughman, Farrah R. Berse and Yahonnes Cleary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/9/2018. (mps)
January 5, 2018 Filing 694 STATEMENT (Joint Rule 16 Conference Report with Exhibits A-D) by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (WALSH, LIZA)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER granting #688 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Walker, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/5/2018. (mps)
January 5, 2018 Filing 692 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admissions of John F. Baughman, Farrah R. Berse and Yahonnes Cleary for by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Liza M. Walsh in support of Pro Hac Vice admissions, #2 Certification of John F. Baughman, #3 Certification of Farrah R. Berse, #4 Certification of Yahonnes Cleary, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 2, 2018 Filing 691 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Thomas Paul Pier (mps)
January 2, 2018 Filing 690 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Harrison J. Frahn, IV (mps)
December 28, 2017 Filing 689 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JUSTIN J. WOLOSZ (mps)
December 8, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
December 7, 2017 Set Deadlines as to the #688 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Walker. Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
December 7, 2017 Filing 688 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Walker by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417), ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman in Support of Application to Allow Daniel Walker to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Daniel Walker in Support of Application to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 4, 2017 Filing 687 NOTICE of Change of Address by BARRY L. REFSIN (REFSIN, BARRY)
November 20, 2017 Filing 686 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Requesting Parties by Reinstated. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 20, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #685 Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Peter Pearlman on 11/17/2017 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice found under Motions and Related Filings, Motions. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
November 17, 2017 Filing 685 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman (NOTICE OF MOTION TO ADMIT DANIEL WALKER TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE). (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why no Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of Daniel Walker, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER IMPLEMENTING MANDATE. The End Payor Class Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before January 12, 2018. The Defendants shall file an answer to the respective complaints by 2/12/2018. A Rule 16 conference is set for 1/9/2018 beginning at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/17/2017. (mps)
November 16, 2017 Filing 683 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Implementing Mandate (Revised))(PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 15, 2017 Filing 682 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Implementing Mandate)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 14, 2017 Filing 681 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI on behalf of A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan (ZOLNOSKI, MICHELLE)
November 8, 2017 Filing 680 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2017. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
October 23, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference (Re: Mandate Orders and Letters)set for 11/8/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Eleonare Ofosu Antwi, Esq will initiate the conference call into chambers at (609)989-0508). (dh, )
October 20, 2017 Filing 679 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re #676 Letter, #678 Letter. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2017 Filing 678 Letter from Moira Cain-Mannix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 79.4 Implementing Mandate)(CAIN-MANNIX, MOIRA)
October 16, 2017 Filing 677 Letter from End-Payor Class Plaintiffs to Judge Sheridan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Pursuant to L. Civ. Rule 79.4 Implementing Mandate)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 16, 2017 Filing 676 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 79.4 Implementing Mandate)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 675 LETTER ORDER that the request for Discovery is DENIED. A previous request for Discovery was also DENIED. This request was not filed on a timely basis. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/29/2017. (km)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER that the Court finds there is diversity jurisdiction; there is a lack of personal jurisdiction over Daiichi Limited, so Daiichi Limited is dismissed from the lawsuit on that basis; wherein the Court previously dismissed the lawsuit against Daiichi Limited and Daiichi, Inc. based on Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), the Court vacates that portion of the #482 Order as it applied to Daiichi Limited, but the other portion of the Order, as it applies to Daiichi, Inc. remains in effect. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/28/2017. Re: 12-5129 (km)
September 29, 2017 Filing 673 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/28/2017. (km) Re: 12-5129
September 28, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DONNA M. EVANS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
September 28, 2017 Filing 672 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Donna M. Evans to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 28, 2017 Filing 671 Letter from Daiichi Sankyo Defendants in Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Jurisdictional Discovery re #670 Letter. (KISTLER, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 670 Letter from Joseph M. Alioto re: Partial Remand by the Third Circuit to the District Court to Settle Subject Matter and In Personam Jurisdiction Issues. (ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
September 27, 2017 Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 9/26/2017. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (mmh)
September 27, 2017 Pursuant to the #669 MANDATE of the USCA, the judgment of the USDC entered 9/12/2014 is REVERSED and REMANDED. (mmh)
September 26, 2017 Filing 669 MANDATE of USCA as to #625 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by RP Healthcare, Inc., #589 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., Professional Drug Company, Inc.,BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC.,ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.,STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., #588 Notice of Appeal (USCA)filed by MEIJER INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC. (Finance notified)(Attachments: #1 Mandate Letter, #2 Opinion)(ca3tmk)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER withdrawing appearance of pro hac vice counsel, Craig M. Glantz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/26/2017. (mps)
September 25, 2017 Filing 667 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman (NOTICE OF MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL, CRAIG M. GLANTZ). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Statement As to Why No Brief is Necessary, #3 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman in Support of Application for Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel, Craig M. Glantz, #4 Certification of Craig M. Glantz in Support of Application for Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 25, 2017 Filing 666 NOTICE by DAVID WOODWARD of Withdrawal of Appearance (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 21, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Donna M. Evans, Esq., receipt number TRE084414 (mps)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER granting #664 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Donna M. Evans, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/12/2017. (mps)
September 8, 2017 Set Deadlines as to the #664 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 8, 2017 Filing 664 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez, #2 Certification of Donna M. Evans, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
August 21, 2017 Filing 663 USCA JUDGMENT as to #625 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by RP Healthcare, Inc., #589 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., Professional Drug Company, Inc., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., #588 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by MEIJER INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC. reversing and remanding. (Lopez, Lynn)
July 14, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, RENAE D. STEINER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
July 14, 2017 Filing 662 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Renae D. Steiner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 12, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Renae D. Steiner, Esq. receipt number TRE082202 (mps)
July 11, 2017 Filing 661 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER granting #653 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Renae D. Steiner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/05/2017. (jem)
June 30, 2017 Filing 659 Letter from Joseph M. Alioto to Judge Peter G.Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re #658 Letter. (ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
June 23, 2017 Filing 658 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J., In Response to RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' June 20 Letter re #656 Letter. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2017 Filing 657 Letter from Michael E. Patunas to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
June 20, 2017 Filing 656 Letter from Joseph M. Alioto to Judge Peter G.Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re #652 Letter. (ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2017 Filing 655 Letter from David C. Kistler re #654 Letter. (KISTLER, DAVID)
June 20, 2017 Filing 654 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re #652 Letter. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 15, 2017 Set Deadlines for the #653 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
June 15, 2017 Filing 653 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez, #2 Certification of Renae D. Steiner, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 14, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2017 at 1:00 PM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Eleonore Ofosu- Antwi, Esq Walsh Firm will place the conference call into Chambers at (609)989-0508). (Re: Counsel should be ready to discuss the issue involving diversity jurisdiction between the parties in view of the stipulation submitted on June 6, 2017 (Dkt. No. 652). (RP Healthcare Parties only).(dh, )
June 6, 2017 Filing 652 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J., Enclosing Stipulation on Diversity. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 2, 2017 Filing 651 Letter from Daiichi Sankyo Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Letter of Daiichi Sankyo Defendants)(KISTLER, DAVID)
May 30, 2017 Filing 650 Letter from Joseph M. Alioto re #648 Order, #649 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
May 26, 2017 Filing 649 Letter from Daiichi Sankyo Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Transcript of November 15, 2013 Status Conference)(KISTLER, DAVID)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER that Daiichi Sankyo defendants are to submit a letter to the Court on the issues of personal jurisdiction and standing, and notating the relevant docket entries directed to these issues by 5/26/2017. Plaintiffs are to respond to Daiichi Sankyo defendants letter no later than 5/30/2017, and Daiichi Sankyo defendants may reply by 6/2/2017. The parties are to submit a joint application on the issue of diversity jurisdiction by 6/2/2017. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/25/2017. (mps)
May 23, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Plaintiff's counsel will place conference call into chambers at (609)989-0508).(dh, )
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER Substituting Interim Co-Lead Counsel. J. Douglas Richards of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC, who was appointed as Interim Co-Lead Counsel by #109 Order dated 8/10/2012 is withdrawn as Interim Co-Lead Counsel on behalf of End-Payor Class Plaintiffs. Sharon K. Robertson of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC, is appointed as Interim Co-Lead Counsel on behalf of End-Payor Class Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/3/2017. (mps)
March 31, 2017 Filing 646 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Substituting Counsel)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 6, 2017 Filing 645 NOTICE of Change of Address by JAYNE ARNOLD GOLDSTEIN (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
July 15, 2016 Filing 644 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MAYRA VELEZ TARANTINO terminated. (eaj, ) Modified on 8/1/2016 (eaj, ).
June 15, 2016 Filing 643 NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA)
May 31, 2016 Filing 642 NOTICE by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC of Counsel Change of Law Firm (WALSH, LIZA)
May 13, 2016 Filing 641 NOTICE by ANNE T. REGAN of Withdrawal of Appearance (REGAN, ANNE)
March 8, 2016 Filing 640 NOTICE by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BAKERS LOCAL 433 HEALTH FUND, NANCY BILLINGTON, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS' LOCAL UNION NO. 5, OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, James Clayworth, R.Ph., Edward Czarnecki, Jean Ellyne Dougan, ECKERD CORPORATION, EDWARD ELLENSON, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, GIANT EAGLE, INC., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., HEB GROCERY CO. LP, NEIL HIRSCH, Emilie Heinle, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Health Insurance Indemnity Company d/b/a Bluecross Blueshield of Louisiana, MAXI DRUG, INC. D/B/A BROOKS PHARMACY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MARYLAND, MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Prudence Lise Miller, NEW YORK HOTELS TRADE COUNSIL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUNDS, HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, INC., Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Professional Drug Company, Inc., RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., RP Healthcare, Inc., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., THE BERGEN MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUND, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129), VALUE DRUG COMPANY, Philip E. Wolfson -- Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (SAUDER, JOSEPH)
March 7, 2016 Filing 639 NOTICE by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BAKERS LOCAL 433 HEALTH FUND, EDNA BELL, NANCY BILLINGTON, HAROLD F. BLAKER, JR, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS' LOCAL UNION NO. 5, OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., RETA COBURN, Chimes Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), James Clayworth, James Clayworth, R.Ph., Edward Czarnecki, JUDITH DEPIPPO, Jean Ellyne Dougan, ECKERD CORPORATION, EDWARD ELLENSON, JACK EUGSTER, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, GIANT EAGLE, INC., SID GILREATH, GREATER METROPOLITAN HOTEL EMPLOYERS-EMPLOYEES HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc. (12-5129), Graphic Communications Local 1B Health and Welfare Fund "A", HEB GROCERY CO. LP, NEIL HIRSCH, Emilie Heinle, Sandra Hellgren, Richard Holden, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, KROGER CO., THE, DARLENE LEWIS, ANDREW LIVEZEY, LOCAL 17 HOSPITALITY BENEFIT FUND, JOHN LUCE, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, Louisiana Health Insurance Indemnity Company d/b/a Bluecross Blueshield of Louisiana, Gerald Lutz, MAXI DRUG, INC. D/B/A BROOKS PHARMACY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MARYLAND, MC-UA LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, DENISE MCCLINTIC, MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC., MEIJER INC., KATY MYERS MINER, MINNEAPOLIS AUTO DEALERS EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUND, Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc., Prudence Lise Miller, ALEC NAIMAN, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD, NEW YORK HOTELS TRADE COUNSIL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUNDS, HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, INC., EMILY NEWHOUSE, FRANK PALTER, DAVID PAVEL, CYNTHIA POND, Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc., Professional Drug Company, Inc., CATHERINE RAY, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., RAY ROY, RP Healthcare, Inc., SAFEWAY INC., JEFFREY P. SANTACARGELO, MICHAEL WILSON SAUL, W. PATRICK SCHNEESE, JOSEPH V. SICA, STEPHEN DEWAYNE SIMMONS, TIMOTHY S. SMITH, STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., CARLEY SULLIVAN, SUPERVALU INC., Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, LUCIA TEJEDA, THE BERGEN MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUND, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Tilley Apothecaries, Inc., VALUE DRUG COMPANY, WALGREEN CO., DONNA WENTZEL, DOROTHY WILLARD, THOMAS WILLIAMS -- Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (SCHELKOPF, MATTHEW)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER granting the request of Jasper Smith Olson, P.C. and Cynthia K. Smith to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/19/2016. (mmh)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER granting #636 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney CHARLES F. BARRETT terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
September 21, 2015 Set Deadlines for the #636 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 10/19/2015 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
September 18, 2015 Filing 636 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.(12-2417). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BARRETT, CHARLES)
June 12, 2015 Filing 635 NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA)
April 30, 2015 Filing 634 NOTICE by MEIJER INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC. OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION FOR COUNSEL LINDA P. NUSSBAUM (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 6, 2015 Filing 633 MOTION to Withdraw appearance of Adam Steinfeld by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 31, 2015 Filing 632 NOTICE by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., Professional Drug Company, Inc., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #631 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, #455 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, #566 Memorandum, #447 Order on Motion to Compel,,, #567 Order,, AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL (PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER denying # 583 Motion to Alter Judgment and Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/16/2015. (eaj)
February 25, 2015 Filing 630 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RUKHSANAH L. SINGH terminated. (SINGH, RUKHSANAH)
February 13, 2015 Filing 629 Letter from PETER S. PEARLMAN TO THE HONORABLE PETER G. SHERIDAN, USDJ. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
February 12, 2015 Filing 628 NOTICE by PFIZER INC. of Sheryn Alexander Name Change (WALSH, LIZA)
January 6, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the LETTER ORDER attached to docket entry # 627 filed by the Clerk's office on 1/6/2015 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jjc)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 627 LETTER ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 1/8/2015 at 10:30 am; Plaintiff is to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/5/2015. (jjc)
December 2, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the # 625 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph Alioto on 12/1/2014. Please be advised, that although an order was not entered in the member case, since this is an MDL the Notice of Appeal should have been filed in the member case using the event Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) and Notice (Other) in this case. The Clerk's Office has refiled this document in member case 12-cv-5129 and Counsel is not required to file anything further. The Notice of Appeal in this case has been terminated. (mmh)
December 1, 2014 Filing 626 NOTICE by RP Healthcare, Inc. of Appeal filed in 12cv5129. (mmh)
December 1, 2014 Filing 625 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to # 610 Order,, by RP Healthcare, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-6076398. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
November 25, 2014 Filing 624 NOTICE by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MARYLAND, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD, Louisiana Health Insurance Indemnity Company d/b/a Bluecross Blueshield of Louisiana, BAKERS LOCAL 433 HEALTH FUND, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, NEW YORK HOTELS TRADE COUNSIL EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUNDS, HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, INC., Edward Czarnecki, Emilie Heinle, FRANK PALTER, ANDREW LIVEZEY, EDWARD ELLENSON, Jean Ellyne Dougan, NANCY BILLINGTON re # 601 Order,, # 455 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, NOTICE OF APPEAL (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 25, 2014 Filing 623 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel that the monthly meetings are suspended until further order of the Court (PGS) (eaj)
November 20, 2014 Filing 622 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J., Regarding the Status of Motions. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 20, 2014 Filing 621 Clerk's Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Theresa L. Burnett, Chief Deputy on 11/20/14. (ck)
November 18, 2014 Filing 620 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER granting # 596 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/18/2014. (mmh)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 618 LETTER ORDER dismissing as moot the # 57 Motion FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING DIRECT FILING NUNC PRO TUNC. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/17/2014. (eaj)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation; all proceedings in this civil action, including the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Judgment (d.e. # 583 ) are stayed until 2/16/2015. The parties shall notify the Court of the status of this matter immediately after the mediation has concluded, or by 2/18/2015. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/17/2014. (mmh)
November 14, 2014 Filing 616 Transcript of MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 4/3/2014, before Judge PETER G. SHERIDAN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Frank Gable (856-889-4761). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 12/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2015. (eaj)
November 14, 2014 Filing 615 Transcript of MOTION HEARING held on 3/6/2014, before Judge PETER G. SHERIDAN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Frank Gable (856-889-4761). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 12/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2015. (eaj)
November 14, 2014 Filing 614 Transcript of MOTION HEARING held on 7/24/2013, before Judge PETER G. SHERIDAN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Frank Gable (856-889-4761). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 12/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2015. (eaj)
November 14, 2014 Filing 613 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Sheridan re End-Payor Specific Issues. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Monthly Status Conference set for 12/4/2014 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
November 6, 2014 Filing 612 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2014 re # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., Motions Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2014: # 1 Affidavit) (dh).
November 5, 2014 Filing 611 Letter from Barry L. Refsin re # 602 Notice (Other). (REFSIN, BARRY)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER that the Motion of Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. is GRANTED as to the RP Health care Plaintiffs; that Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner-Lambert Co. and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, is GRANTED as to the RP Healthcare Plaintiffs; that the First Amended Complaint of plaintiff the RP Healthcare Plaintiffs # 262 be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/5/2014. (jjc)
November 5, 2014 Filing 609 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel to provide the status of the listed cases within ten days. (PGS) (jjc)
November 5, 2014 Filing 608 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re # 602 Notice (Other). (WALSH, LIZA)
November 5, 2014 Filing 607 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Sheridan re attendance at hearing on November 6, 2014. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 4, 2014 Filing 606 Letter from Michael E. Patunas to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan re # 602 Notice (Other). (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 4, 2014 Filing 605 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ re # 602 Notice (Other). (PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 3, 2014 Filing 604 Letter from Gil D. Messina re Set/Reset Hearings, # 602 Notice (Other), # 570 Scheduling Order,,. (MESSINA, GIL)
November 3, 2014 Filing 603 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment (CECCHI, JAMES)
November 3, 2014 Filing 602 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel that the only agenda item for the monthly meeting, on 11/6/2014, is the motion to amend the judgment in order to amend the Complaint(PGS) (jjc)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER that the Motion of Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. is GRANTED as to the End-Payor Class Plaintiffs; that the Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner-Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, for an Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is GRANTED as to the End-Payor Class Plaintiffs; that the Amended Complaint of plaintiff the End-Payor Class Plaintiffs be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/30/2014. (jjc)
October 30, 2014 Filing 600 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to William T. Walsh, Clerk of Court. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 29, 2014 Filing 599 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lipitor 3d Cir. Order 102414)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 28, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 596 MOTION to Seal portions of Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Judgment and for Leave to Amend . Motion set for 12/1/2014 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
October 27, 2014 Filing 598 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Redacted) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
October 27, 2014 Filing 597 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Confidential - Filed Under Seal) (WALSH, LIZA)
October 27, 2014 Filing 596 MOTION to Seal portions of Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Judgment and for Leave to Amend by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Statement Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(4), # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting # 586 Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/27/2014. (eaj)
October 24, 2014 Filing 594 BRIEF in Supplement of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 586) (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Supplemental Certification of Michael E. Patunas, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Theresa L. Burnett on 10/16/2014. (mxl)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 LETTER ORDER that Defendants are granted a one-week extension until 10/27/2014 to respond to the # 583 Motion to Amend the Judgment and for Leave to Amend; granting a one-week extension until 11/3/2014 for Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to file a reply in support of the Motion. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/16/2014. (jjc)
October 15, 2014 Filing 591 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment . (WALSH, LIZA)
October 14, 2014 Filing 590 Letter from Adam Steinfeld. (STEINFELD, ADAM)
October 14, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the # 589 Notice of Appeal filed by Peter Pearlman on 10/10/2014. Please be advised, that although an order was not entered in the member case, since this is an MDL the Notice of Appeal should have been filed in the member case using the event Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) and Notice (Other) in this case so as not to be charged the filing fee twice. The Clerk's Office has refiled this document in member case 11-cv-6774 and Counsel is not required to file anything further. The Notice of Appeal in this case has been terminated.(mmh)
October 13, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the Notice of Appeal # 588 and # 589 filed by Adam Steinfeld and Peter Pearlman on 10/10/2014. When filing a Notice of Appeal, you should file a copy of the appeal using Notice (other) in this case, and file the actual Notice of Appeal in each member case. Please refile your Notice of Appeal in the member case. (jjc)
October 10, 2014 Filing 589 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to # 455 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, # 566 Memorandum, # 447 Order on Motion to Compel,,, # 567 Order,, by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-5985663. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 10/10/2014. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 10, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment . Motion set for 11/3/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
October 10, 2014 Filing 588 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to # 573 Order, # 455 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, # 566 Memorandum by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-5985327. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (STEINFELD, ADAM)
October 10, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 586 MOTION to Seal Document # 585 Brief in Support of Motion, . Motion set for 11/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
October 10, 2014 Filing 587 NOTICE by GIANT EAGLE, INC. re # 572 Order, Notice of Appeal (CAIN-MANNIX, MOIRA)
October 10, 2014 Filing 586 MOTION to Seal Document # 585 Brief in Support of Motion, by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement In Lieu of Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 10, 2014 Filing 585 BRIEF in Support filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re # 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Amended Complaint)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 10, 2014 Filing 584 NOTICE by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO. re # 571 Order,, Notice of Appeal (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
October 10, 2014 Filing 583 MOTION to Alter Judgment by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 10, 2014 Filing 582 NOTICE by ECKERD CORPORATION, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, MAXI DRUG, INC. D/B/A BROOKS PHARMACY, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC, re # 569 Order,, # 455 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, # 566 Memorandum Notice of Appeal (REFSIN, BARRY)
October 7, 2014 Filing 581 Letter from Gil D. Messina Submitting Supplemental Authority re # 540 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (Corrective Filing) , # 580 Brief, # 570 Scheduling Order,,. (MESSINA, GIL)
September 29, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Monthly Status Conference set for 10/2/2014 at 10:00 AM is adjourned to 11/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
September 26, 2014 Filing 580 BRIEF of RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Regarding the Legal Effect of the Court's Memorandum and Order on the RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
September 26, 2014 Filing 579 BRIEF of End-Payor Plaintiffs Regarding the Legal Effect of the Court's Memorandum and Order on End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 26, 2014 Filing 578 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail re: # 89 , # 566 , # 567 , # 568 and # 570 sent to Thomas Paul Pier (jjc)
September 26, 2014 Filing 577 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail re: # 89 , # 566 , # 567 , # 568 and # 570 sent to Angelina Alioto-Grace (jjc)
September 19, 2014 Filing 576 BRIEF Regarding The Legal Impact Of The Court's Memorandum and Order On The RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
September 19, 2014 Filing 575 BRIEF Regarding The Legal Impact Of The Court's Memorandum and Order On The End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
September 16, 2014 Filing 574 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ALLYN ZISSEL LITE terminated. (LITE, ALLYN)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER Granting the Motion of Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. as to Plaintiff Meijer; Granting the Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC as to Defendant Meijer; Dismissing the Amended Complaint of Meijer. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER Granting the Motion of Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. as to Plaintiff Giant Eagle; Granting the Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC as to Defendant Giant Eagle; Dismissing the Amended Complaint of Giant Eagle. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 571 MDL ORDER ORDERED that the Motion of Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. is GRANTED as to the Walgreens Plaintiffs; and it is further ORDERED that the Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, for an Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 2(b)(6) is GRANTED as to the Walgreens Plaintiffs; and it is further ORDERED that the Amended Complaint of plaintiffs Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Safeway Inc. Supervalu. Inc. and HEB Grocery Co. LP [ECF No. 468] be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (kas ) Modified on 9/16/2014 (dm).
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 570 SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, RanbaxyPharmaceuticals Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Wamer-Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, shall submit additional briefing as to the legal effect of the # 566 Memorandum and # 567 Order on the Amended Complaint of the RP Healthcare Plaintiffs, on or before 9/19/2014; that the RP Healthcare Plaintiffs shall file any response to same on or before 9/26/2014; that oral argument as to these issues shall be held on 10/2/2014 at 10:00 AM - Trenton Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (jjc)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MDL ORDER: ORDERED that the Motion of Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. is GRANTED as to the Rite Aid Plaintiffs; and it is further ORDERED that the Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner- Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, for an Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is GRANTED as to the Rite Aid Plaintiffs; and it is further ORDERED that the Amended Complaint of plaintiffs Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs.Corp., JCQ (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc. d/b/a Brooks Pharmacy, and Eckerd Corporation be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (kas ) Modified on 9/16/2014 (dm).
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 568 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, RanbaxyPharmaceuticals Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner-Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, shall submit additional briefing as to the legal effect of Memorandum # 566 and Order # 567 , as well as the Memorandum and Order # 455 , on the Amended Complaint of the End-Payor Class Plaintiffs; that the End-Payor Class Plaintiffs shall file any response to same on or before 9/26/2014; that Oral Argument as to these issues shall be held on 10/2/2014 at 10:00 AM - Trenton Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter Sheridan. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (jjc)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER that the Motion of Defendants Ranbaxy, Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited, andRanbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. is GRANTED as to the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs; that the Motion of Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner-Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, for an Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is GRANTED as to the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs; that the Amended Complaint # 472 of plaintiffs Stephen L. LaFrance Holdings. Inc., Burlington Drug Co., Inc.. Value Drug Company, Professional Drug Company, Inc.. Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., and American Sales Company LLC be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (jjc)
September 12, 2014 Filing 566 MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/12/2014. (jjc)
September 12, 2014 Filing 565 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 564 LETTER ORDER that Cohn Lifland's letter brief # 562 is stricken for reasons set forth in this letter. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/11/2014. (jjc)
September 10, 2014 Filing 563 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan re # 562 Letter. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 9, 2014 Filing 562 STRICKEN Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ re # 560 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(PEARLMAN, PETER) Modified on 9/11/2014 to indicate STRICKEN per # 564 Letter Order(jjc, ).
September 9, 2014 Filing 561 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Sheridan. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 5, 2014 Filing 560 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
August 25, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Monthly Status Conference set for 9/4/2014 is adjourned to 10/2/2014 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Re: Pending the decision on the motions to dismiss).
July 3, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Change of Address # 559 submitted by Peter Pearlman, Esq. on 7/2/2014 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (gxh)
July 2, 2014 Filing 559 NOTICE of Change of Address by PETER S. PEARLMAN (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 5, 2014 Filing 558 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Status Conference held on 6/5/2014. (Ordered that the monthly status conference shall resume on September 4, 2014 at 10:00 a.m.) (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dh, )
June 3, 2014 Filing 557 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan Regarding Proposed Time Limits for the June 5, 2014 Hearing. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 22, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/5/2014 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
May 1, 2014 Filing 556 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Status Conference held on 5/1/2014. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dh, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 555 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan Regarding the May 1, 2014 Hearings. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 28, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Withdraw from NEF as to Case # 554 filed by Peter Pearlman on 4/25/2014 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice (Other). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Notice of Withdraw from NEF as to Case USING the event Notice of Withdraw from NEF as to Case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc)
April 25, 2014 Filing 554 NOTICE by VALUE DRUG COMPANY OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF STEPHANIE K. HINES (PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 18, 2014 Filing 552 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc. re # 540 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (Corrective Filing) (MESSINA, GIL)
April 10, 2014 Filing 551 JUDICIAL NOTICE to Counsel (PGS) (jjc)
April 7, 2014 Filing 550 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 540 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (Corrective Filing) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 3, 2014 Filing 553 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 4/3/2014. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2014: # 1 Appendix) (dh).
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 549 LETTER ORDER that all motions listed below the paragraph which opens as "The Parties agree the following motions to dismiss are not actively pending" are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/3/2014. (jjc)
April 2, 2014 Filing 548 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Neill W. Clark to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-5602505.) (PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 2, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Peter Pearlman on 4/1/2014 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjc)
April 1, 2014 Filing 547 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Neill W. Clark to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
March 31, 2014 Filing 546 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan Regarding April 3, 2014 Hearing. (WALSH, LIZA)
March 21, 2014 Filing 545 BRIEF in Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Submission Seeking Reconsideration of this Court's Ruling Concerning the Damages Period (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 21, 2014 Filing 544 Letter from Liza M. Walsh In Response to End-Payor Class Plaintiffs and Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' March 14, 2014 Letters Regarding In re Nexium re # 535 Letter, # 537 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 20, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on Notice of Motion # 540 Plaintiffs RP Healthcare, et al for Certification (28:1292(b))on 5/1/2014 at 10:00 AM.
March 20, 2014 Filing 543 Letter re # 537 Letter, # 536 Notice (Other). (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
March 18, 2014 Filing 542 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan Providing Source Books Containing Statutes and Cases. (WALSH, LIZA)
March 17, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 540 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (Corrective Filing) . Motion set for 4/21/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
March 17, 2014 Filing 541 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail RE: ORDER # 529 , # 530 AND # 531 sent to JUSTIN J. WOLOSZ (jjc)
March 17, 2014 Filing 540 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (Corrective Filing) by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gil D. Messina, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
March 17, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Certification and attachments # 539 submitted by Gil Messina on 3/15/2014 contains improper signatures. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc)
March 15, 2014 Filing 539 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gil D. Messina, # 2 Legal Memorandum, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
March 14, 2014 Filing 538 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 14, 2014 Filing 537 Letter from Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
March 14, 2014 Filing 536 NOTICE by BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC. of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Concerning the Damages Period Applicable to Plaintiffs' Reverse Payment Allegations (HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
March 14, 2014 Filing 535 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Sheridan Regarding In Re Nexium Decision. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 14, 2014 Filing 534 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Sheridan providing source books containing statutes and cases. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 11, 2014 Filing 533 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints (Redacted) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 6, 2014 Filing 532 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2014 re # 516 MOTION to Amend/Correct End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, JAMES BRIODY, Sandra Hellgren, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, PATRICIA BRIODY, Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, NEIL HIRSCH, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., # 494 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand filed by PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, # 491 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints filed by PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, # 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Ordered motions reserved). (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2014: # 1 Appendix) (dh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2014: # 2 Affidavit) (dh).
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER that Defendants' # 525 Motion to Seal portions of the Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Pfizer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/6/2014. (jjc)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER that the unredacted version Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Brief in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss and Exhibits I through L to the Declaration of Gregory T. Arnold are hereby sealed # 513 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/6/2014. (jjc)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER that RP will have 15 minutes to be heard; that Defendants will have 15 minutes to respond. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/5/2014. (jjc)
March 4, 2014 Filing 528 Letter from Timothy A. C. May. (MAY, TIMOTHY)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 527 LETTER ORDER that Defendants will have one hour (collectively) to argue all motions to dismiss and Plaintiffs will have one hour to respond on 3/6/2014. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/4/2014. (jjc)
March 3, 2014 Filing 526 Letter from Liza M. Walsh Regarding Proposed Time Limits for the March 6, 2014 Oral Argument. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 10, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 525 MOTION to Seal the Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Pfizer Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard . Motion set for 3/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
February 7, 2014 Filing 525 MOTION to Seal the Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Pfizer Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(4), # 2 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 7, 2014 Filing 524 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 7, 2014 Filing 523 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re # 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 7, 2014 Filing 522 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re # 494 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 7, 2014 Filing 521 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 494 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 6, 2014 Filing 520 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 2/6/2014. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER denying # 418 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/6/2014. (jjc)
February 6, 2014 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 2/6/2014. (ce3)
February 4, 2014 Filing 518 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 516 MOTION to Amend/Correct End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 4, 2014 Filing 517 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 514 MOTION to Strike by End-Payor Plaintffs to Strike Pfizer's Implied Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 21, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 516 MOTION to Amend/Correct End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Motion set for 2/18/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 21, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 514 MOTION to Strike by End-Payor Plaintffs to Strike Pfizer's Implied Request for Judicial Notice . Motion set for 2/18/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 21, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 513 MOTION to Seal Document # 509 Brief in Opposition to Motion, # 512 Exhibit (to Document), . Motion set for 2/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 21, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 513 MOTION to Seal Document # 509 Brief in Opposition to Motion, # 512 Exhibit (to Document), , # 516 MOTION to Amend/Correct End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Motion set for 2/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
January 21, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 514 MOTION to Strike by End-Payor Plaintffs to Strike Pfizer's Implied Request for Judicial Notice . Motion set for 2/18/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
January 17, 2014 Filing 516 MOTION to Amend/Correct End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 3 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 17, 2014 Filing 515 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund re # 494 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand , # 491 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa J. Rodriguez, # 2 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 17, 2014 Filing 514 MOTION to Strike by End-Payor Plaintffs to Strike Pfizer's Implied Request for Judicial Notice by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund. Responses due by 2/4/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 17, 2014 Filing 513 MOTION to Seal Document # 509 Brief in Opposition to Motion, # 512 Exhibit (to Document), by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement In Lieu of Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 17, 2014 Filing 512 Exhibit to # 511 Declaration, by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 17, 2014 Filing 511 DECLARATION of Gregory T. Arnold re # 509 Brief in Opposition to Motion, # 510 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 17, 2014 Filing 510 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint , # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints , # 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (Redacted Version) (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 17, 2014 Filing 509 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint , # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints , # 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 17, 2014 Filing 508 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ECKERD CORPORATION, GIANT EAGLE, INC., HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, KROGER CO., THE, MAXI DRUG, INC. D/B/A BROOKS PHARMACY, MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO. re # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints , # 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints Indidivual Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
January 17, 2014 Filing 507 NOTICE by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund of Change of Firm Name (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
January 13, 2014 Filing 506 NOTICE by BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS' LOCAL UNION NO. 5, OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND of Withdrawal of Appearance of Penelope D. Abdiel (SCOLNICK, JUDITH)
January 7, 2014 Filing 505 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice E. Kent Hirsch to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 7, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to E. Kent Hirsch: $ 150, receipt number TRE039712 (eaj)
December 31, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Lisa Rodriguez on 12/31/2013 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. (mmh)
December 31, 2013 Filing 504 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice E. Kent Hirsch to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 503 LETTER ORDER adjourning the status conference that was set for 1/2/2014. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/30/2013. (eaj)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to E. Kent Hirsch, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/30/2013. (eaj)
December 26, 2013 Filing 501 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Peter G. Sheridan Regarding January 2, 2014 Status Conference. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 19, 2013 Filing 500 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 18, 2013 Filing 499 Letter from Gil D. Messina re # 497 Letter, # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma , # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint . (MESSINA, GIL)
December 18, 2013 Filing 498 NOTICE of Appearance by ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI on behalf of PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC (OFOSU-ANTWI, ELEONORE)
December 17, 2013 Filing 497 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 5, 2013 Filing 496 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2013 re # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma filed by RP Healthcare, Inc., Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (dh, )
December 4, 2013 Filing 495 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 27, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 494 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand . Motion set for 1/6/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
November 27, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints . Motion set for 1/6/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
November 27, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 491 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand . Motion set for 1/6/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
November 27, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints . Motion set for 1/6/2014 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
November 26, 2013 Filing 494 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 26, 2013 Filing 493 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Amended Complaints by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Exhibits 1-21, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 26, 2013 Filing 492 AMENDED DOCUMENT by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Amendment to # 491 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand (Corrected Proposed Form of Order) . (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 26, 2013 Filing 491 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 26, 2013 Filing 490 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 25, 2013 Filing 489 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 24, 2013 Filing 488 Letter from Gil D. Messina in Response to Letter of Defendants' Counsel and "Timeline & Background" re # 485 Letter, Set/Reset Hearings, # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma . (MESSINA, GIL)
November 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Discussion of Case Matters set for 3/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Following Discussion - Oral arguments on all Motions to Dismiss). (dh, )
November 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Discussion of Case Matters 12/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Following Discussion - Hearing on Motion # 418 to Remand to the Superior Court of California of Sonoma by RP Healthcare, Inc.) (dh, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER: Defendant's Motions to Dismiss due by 11/26/2013; opposition due 1/17/2014; reply due 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/22/2013. (mmh)
November 21, 2013 Filing 486 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
November 19, 2013 Filing 485 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. re # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma . (WALSH, LIZA)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER that a monthly status conference shall be held on the first Thursday of each month commencing in December 2013 through the termination of this litigation, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 4E, excluding the months of July and August. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/18/2013. (eaj)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting # 289 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint against Defendants Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. and Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited; Terminating Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint # 242 as moot. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/18/2013. (eaj)
November 15, 2013 Filing 484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2013 re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD, (Granted) # 242 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD (Moot). (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dh, )
November 15, 2013 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 11/15/2013. (ce3)
November 14, 2013 Filing 481 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joseph Serino. Jr. for by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Serino, Jr., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 14, 2013 Filing 480 Letter from Gil D. Messina on Behalf of RP Healthcare Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment (Letter to Court of Sept. 16, 2013))(MESSINA, GIL)
November 13, 2013 Filing 479 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 4, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Discussion of case matters including but not limited to procedure on motions to dismiss, initiation of mediation and establishment of regular status conferences on 11/15/2013 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 478 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL MORRIS BUCHMAN (BUCHMAN, MICHAEL)
October 25, 2013 Filing 477 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting # 460 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Neill W. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/22/2013. (eaj)
October 15, 2013 Filing 475 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) by End Payor Plaintiffs against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), NEIL HIRSCH, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, JAMES BRIODY, A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, PATRICIA BRIODY, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, Sandra Hellgren. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA) (Main Document 475 replaced on 2/7/2014) (ce3).
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 474 LETTER ORDER extending the deadline to file a Second Amended Complaintuntil 10/14/2013. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/10/2013. (eaj)
October 14, 2013 Filing 473 AMENDED DOCUMENT by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund. Amendment to # 467 Order on Motion to Seal SEALED End Payor Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 14, 2013 Filing 472 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) against PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 14, 2013 Filing 471 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, filed by MEIJER INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC..(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 14, 2013 Filing 470 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by GIANT EAGLE, INC..(CAIN-MANNIX, MOIRA)
October 14, 2013 Filing 469 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, filed by RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, ECKERD CORPORATION, MAXI DRUG, INC. D/B/A BROOKS PHARMACY, RITE AID CORPORATION, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC.(REFSIN, BARRY)
October 14, 2013 Filing 468 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, filed by WALGREEN CO., SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., KROGER CO., THE, HEB GROCERY CO. LP.(CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting # 454 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/10/2013. (eaj)
October 7, 2013 Filing 466 Letter from Moira Cain-Mannix to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ. (CAIN-MANNIX, MOIRA)
October 7, 2013 Filing 465 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 464 LETTER ORDER that counsel for Plaintiff will have until 10/7/2013 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/5/2013. (jjc)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 LETTER ORDER extending time for Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/4/2013. (kas, )
October 3, 2013 Filing 462 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez, Esquire. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 3, 2013 Filing 461 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq. to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 25, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 460 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO NEILL W. CLARK . Motion set for 10/21/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
September 25, 2013 Filing 460 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO NEILL W. CLARK by ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT AS TO WHY NO BRIEF IS NECESSARY, # 2 CERTIFICATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, # 3 CERTIFICATION OF NEILL W. CLARK, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 17, 2013 Filing 459 Letter from D. Kistler to Judge Sheridan regarding the effect of the September 5,2013 Memorandum and Order re # 455 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,. (KISTLER, DAVID)
September 16, 2013 Filing 458 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re Docket Annotation,,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
September 16, 2013 Filing 457 Letter from from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Sheridan on behlaf of End-Payor Plaintiffs and proposed End-Payor Class re Docket Annotation,,. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 16, 2013 Filing 456 Letter from Gil D. Messina on Behalf of RP Healthcare Plaintiffs in Response to Court's Docket Notice re Docket Annotation,,. (MESSINA, GIL)
September 5, 2013 Notice to the Indirect Purchaser Group and Defendants: Please refer to my Memorandum and Order (ECF 455) concerning the motion to dismiss by the Direct Purchaser Group. The law set forth in the Memorandum most likely applies to the indirect purchaser group complaint.I request that the parties confer and determine which allegations of the indirect purchaser groups complaint are dismissed and which apply to the reverse payment allegations. If the parties can formulate a proposed form of Order, please do so. The response to this notice to the parties is due September 16, 2013. Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 246 Motion to Dismiss; Ordering that the claims in the Direct Purchaser Complaints are dismissed to the extent they are based on anything but the Pfizer/Ranbaxy settlement agreement; Denying without prejudice insofar as it seeks to dismiss claims in the Direct Purchaser Complaints based on the Pfizer/Ranbaxy settlement agreement; granting # 435 Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion to Amend; Ordering that the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff may file amended complaints consistent with this Opinion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/5/2013. (eaj)
August 28, 2013 RESET Deadlines as to # 454 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Complaint . Motion set for 10/7/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
August 28, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 454 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Complaint . Motion set for 9/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
August 27, 2013 Filing 454 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Complaint by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
August 27, 2013 Filing 453 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC. re # 435 MOTION to Amend/Correct DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter S. Pearlman)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 27, 2013 Filing 452 NOTICE by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund of Change of Firm Affiliation (ACCHIONE, NICOLE)
August 27, 2013 Filing 451 NOTICE by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund of Change of Firm Affiliation (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
August 22, 2013 Filing 450 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129) re # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma Sur-reply of RP Healthcare Plaintiffs with Attached Order of the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to CVS Caremark Corporation. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/21/2013. (eaj)
August 21, 2013 Filing 448 Letter from B. Refsin re # 435 MOTION to Amend/Correct DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT . (REFSIN, BARRY)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting End-Payor Plaintiffs # 377 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part # 378 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Compel as set forth in the Memorandum; Ordering Defendants to produce responsive documents within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/20/2013. (eaj)
August 20, 2013 Filing 446 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 435 MOTION to Amend/Correct DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
August 20, 2013 Filing 445 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to CVS Caremark Corporation by CVS Caremark Corporation. (PLUNKETT, STUART)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying Mylans # 399 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/19/2013. (eaj)
August 20, 2013 Filing 443 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re # 435 MOTION to Amend/Correct DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 LETTER ORDER that RPH may respond in no more than three (3) pages. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/14/2013. (jjc)
August 14, 2013 Filing 441 NOTICE by ECKERD CORPORATION, GIANT EAGLE, INC., HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO. Notice of Correction Regarding D.E. 439 (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
August 14, 2013 Filing 440 NOTICE by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC. Individual Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Amend (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
August 14, 2013 Filing 439 NOTICE by ECKERD CORPORATION, GIANT EAGLE, INC., HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO. Individual Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Amend (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
August 12, 2013 Filing 438 Letter from RP Healthcare Plaintiffs re # 437 Order. (MESSINA, GIL)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 LETTER ORDER that a sur-reply may be filed on or before 8/22/2013. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/8/2013. (eaj)
August 8, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 435 MOTION to Amend/Correct DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT . Motion set for 9/3/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
August 7, 2013 Filing 436 Letter from RP Healthcare Plaintiffs re # 380 MOTION to Compel , # 247 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) as to Defendants Blue Shield of California and CVS Caremark Corporation . (MESSINA, GIL)
August 7, 2013 Filing 435 MOTION to Amend/Correct DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, # 2 DECLARATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, # 3 Exhibit A TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 4 Exhibit 1 TO EXHIBIT A TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 5 Exhibit B TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 6 Exhibit C TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 7 Exhibit D TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 8 Exhibit E TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 9 Exhibit F TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 10 Exhibit G TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 11 Exhibit H TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 12 Exhibit I TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 13 Exhibit J TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 14 Exhibit K TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 15 Exhibit L TO PEARLMAN DECLARATION, # 16 Text of Proposed Order, # 17 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 1, 2013 Filing 434 Letter from RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Objecting to Defendants' Sur-reply re # 433 Letter, # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma . (MESSINA, GIL)
August 1, 2013 Filing 433 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re # 431 Reply to Response to Motion. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 29, 2013 Filing 431 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by RP Healthcare, Inc. re # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
July 26, 2013 Filing 430 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re # 429 Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 25, 2013 Filing 429 Letter from Gil D. Messina with Supplemental Submission re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental submission with leave of Court of Opinion and Order in U.S. v. Apple, Inc.)(MESSINA, GIL)
July 24, 2013 Filing 432 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2013 re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD, (Motion Reserved) # 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., (Motion Reserved) # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint filed by RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED,(Motion Reserved) # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, (Motion Reserved) # 247 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) as to Defendants Blue Shield of California and CVS Caremark Corporation filed by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE, (Motion Reserved) # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., (Motion Reserved) # 242 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD, (Motion Reserved) # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints filed by PFIZER INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., (Motion Reserved) # 243 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint And RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Complaint filed by RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, (Motion Reserved) # 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE. (Motion Reserved) (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dh, )
July 23, 2013 Filing 428 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 22, 2013 Filing 427 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma on Behalf of Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 18, 2013 Filing 426 Transcript of MOTION HEARING held on 6/28/2013, before Judge DOUGLAS E. ARPERT. Court Reporter/Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. ((215) 862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2013. (mmh)
July 12, 2013 Filing 425 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint , # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints (Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Pfizer's Motion to Dismiss All Complaints) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 12, 2013 Filing 424 BRIEF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PFIZER AND RANBAXY'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS (PEARLMAN, PETER)
July 12, 2013 Filing 423 RESPONSE to Motion filed by JAMES BRIODY re # 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint , # 243 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint And RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Complaint SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 12, 2013 Filing 422 BRIEF Ranbaxy Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motions to Dismiss (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
July 12, 2013 Filing 421 Letter from D. Kistler. (KISTLER, DAVID)
July 12, 2013 Filing 420 BRIEF (Supplemental) (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
July 12, 2013 Filing 419 Letter from Stuart C. Plunkett. (PLUNKETT, STUART)
July 12, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma . Motion set for 8/5/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
July 11, 2013 Filing 418 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma by RP Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - In reference to the Notice of Change of Address # 417 filed by Michael Buchman on 7/1/2013, counsel is advised to MAINTAIN YOUR ACCOUNT. Instructions on how to maintain your account can be found on our website www.njd.uscourts.gov -> CM/ECF -> USER GUIDE > INFORMATION. (eaj)
July 1, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL MORRIS BUCHMAN (BUCHMAN, MICHAEL)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI)(ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/28/2013. (gxh)
June 28, 2013 Filing 415 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2013 re # 399 MOTION to Intervene filed by MATRIX LABORATORIES LIMITED, MATRIX LABORATORIES INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN INC., # 377 MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery by Pfizer Defendants filed by Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, JAMES BRIODY, Sandra Hellgren, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, PATRICIA BRIODY, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, NEIL HIRSCH, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, # 380 MOTION to Compel filed by James Clayworth, R.Ph., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc., Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc., Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., RP Healthcare, Inc., # 378 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS filed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC.. Decision reserved. ( Digitally Recorded.) (ce3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2013: # 1 COUNSEL APPEARANCES) (ce3).
June 27, 2013 Filing 414 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re # 379 Brief in Opposition to Motion, # 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol . (Attachments: # 1 Agreement Establishing Protocol for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting # 405 Mylan's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in support of its Motion for Intervention and for Protective Order # 399 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/24/2013. (eaj)
June 24, 2013 Filing 412 BRIEF in Further Support of RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate's Protective Order (Dkt. 323) and Discovery Confidentiality Order (Dkt. 346) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MAY, TIMOTHY)
June 21, 2013 Filing 411 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOSEPH M. ALIOTO (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2013 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEILA RAFTERY WIGGINS on behalf of MATRIX LABORATORIES INC., MATRIX LABORATORIES LIMITED (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 20, 2013 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEILA RAFTERY WIGGINS on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 LETTER ORDER that counsel may submit a 15 page supplemental briefing on the Motions by 7/12/2013; Oral Argument will be held on the Motions to Dismiss on 7/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 6/19/2013. (eaj)
June 19, 2013 Filing 407 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 17, 2013 Filing 406 BRIEF on Behalf of Defendants in Opposition to RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Notice of Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Protective Order and Discovery Confidentiality Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Exhibits A-B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 17, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 380 MOTION to Compel , # 378 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS , # 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol , # 399 MOTION to Intervene , # 377 MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery by Pfizer Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. (ce3)
June 13, 2013 RE-Set Deadlines as to # 405 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum . Motion set for 6/17/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (kas, )
June 11, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 405 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum . Motion set for 6/17/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
June 10, 2013 Filing 405 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by MATRIX LABORATORIES INC., MATRIX LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Reply Memorandum, # 3 Certificate of Service)(CAFFREY, SHARON)
June 3, 2013 Filing 404 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund re # 399 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Opposition)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 3, 2013 Filing 403 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re # 399 MOTION to Intervene (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 31, 2013 Filing 402 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129). Amendment to # 401 Notice (Other),, to Correct Title of Memorandum of Law on Caption Page . (MESSINA, GIL)
May 30, 2013 Filing 401 NOTICE by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc., Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc., RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129) re # 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order, # 323 Order,, Notice of Objections to Magistrate's Protective Order and Discovery Confidentiality Order (Attachments: # 1 Memrandum of Law, # 2 Declaration of Gil D. Messina, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs request to file a short reply in further support of Plaintiffs # 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/17/2013. (eaj)
May 17, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 399 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 6/17/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
May 17, 2013 Filing 399 MOTION to Intervene by MATRIX LABORATORIES INC., MATRIX LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CAFFREY, SHARON)
May 17, 2013 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Oral argument scheduled for May 23, 2013 at 11:00 A.M. HAS BEEN ADJOURNED. (ce3)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 398 LETTER ORDER denying RP Healthcare's request to prosecute and proceed with their case. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/16/2013. (eaj)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 397 LETTER ORDER that the Court will await the decision in FTC v. Actavis before deciding the motions to dismiss, any request for additional briefing after the FTC decision is released maybe made at that time. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/16/2013. (eaj)
May 16, 2013 Filing 396 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, USMJ re # 379 Brief in Opposition to Motion, # 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol . (Attachments: # 1 REPLY MEMORANDUM)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying # 329 RP Healthcare's Motion for Reconsideration of the Protective Order; denying # 357 RP Healthcare's Motion for Reconsideration of the Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/16/2013. (gxh)
May 16, 2013 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY MARION HENNINGS on behalf of BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY (HENNINGS, KIMBERLY)
May 15, 2013 Filing 393 Letter from Gil D. Messina to Judge Sheridan on Behalf of RP Healthcare Plaintiffs re # 385 Order. (MESSINA, GIL)
May 15, 2013 Filing 392 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, USDJ. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
May 14, 2013 Filing 391 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 12, 2013 Filing 389 Letter from RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Counsel Advising that Motion to Compel versus Blue Shield of California is Moot re # 380 MOTION to Compel . (MESSINA, GIL)
May 9, 2013 Filing 388 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 377 MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery by Pfizer Defendants , # 378 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS on Behalf of Defendants Pfizer and Ranbaxy (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 9, 2013 Filing 387 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CVS Caremark Corporation re # 380 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLUNKETT, STUART)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 386 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal as to Blue Shield of California (Civil Action No. 12-5129). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/8/2013. (eaj)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 LETTER ORDER to the parties to respond to the Court by 5/15/2013 if they feel it would be better to delay oral argument. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/8/2013. (eaj)
May 7, 2013 Filing 384 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Blue Shield of California by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 LETTER ORDER granting Defendants request for an extension of time to file their opposition to the # 377 , # 378 & # 380 MOTIONS to Compel until 5/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/6/2013. (eaj) Modified on 5/8/2013 (eaj, ).
May 3, 2013 Filing 382 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 30, 2013 Filing 381 NOTICE by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, WALGREEN CO. INDIVIDUAL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS JOINDER IN DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 29, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 380 MOTION to Compel . Motion set for 5/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
April 29, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 378 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS . Motion set for 5/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
April 26, 2013 Filing 380 MOTION to Compel by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-K, # 2 Declaration of Gil D, Messina, # 3 Memorandum of Law, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(MESSINA, GIL)
April 26, 2013 Filing 379 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol on Behalf of Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Exhibits A-D, # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 26, 2013 Filing 378 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants' to Produce Certain Categories of Documents, # 2 Declaration of Gregory T. Arnold in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, # 3 Declaration of Peter S. Pearlman in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants' to Produce Certain Categories of Documents, # 4 Exhibit A to Pearlman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Pearlman Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to Pearlman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit D to Pearlman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit E to Pearlman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F to Pearlman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Pearlman Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Pearlman Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Pearlman Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to Pearlman Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to Pearlman Declaration, # 15 Exhibit L to Pearlman Declaration, # 16 Exhibit M to Pearlman Declaration, # 17 Exhibit N to Pearlman Declaration, # 18 Exhibit O to Pearlman Declaration, # 19 Exhibit P to Pearlman Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Q to Pearlman Declaration, # 21 Exhibit R to Pearlman Declaration, # 22 Exhibit S to Pearlman Declaration, # 23 Text of Proposed Order, # 24 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 26, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 377 MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery by Pfizer Defendants . Motion set for 5/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
April 26, 2013 Filing 377 MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery by Pfizer Defendants by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Declaration of David Woodward, Esq., # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
April 25, 2013 Filing 376 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam Steinfeld to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4971402.) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 25, 2013 Filing 375 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Linda P. Nussbaum to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4971378.) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting # 369 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Steinfeld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/23/2013. (eaj)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting # 368 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Linda P. Nussbaum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/23/2013. (eaj)
April 23, 2013 Filing 372 Transcript of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/1/2013, before Judge DOUGLAS E. ARPERT. Court Reporter/Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. ((215) 862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 5/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2013. (gxh)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding consolidation and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/19/2013. (gxh)
April 18, 2013 Filing 370 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 18, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 369 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , # 368 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
April 17, 2013 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, # 2 Certification of Adam Steinfeld, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 17, 2013 Filing 368 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, # 2 Certification of Linda P. Nussbaum, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 15, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol . Motion set for 5/23/2013 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. (jjc)
April 12, 2013 Filing 367 MOTION Entry of ESI Protocol by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, GEORGE AYOOBS, EDNA BELL, NANCY BILLINGTON, HAROLD F. BLAKER, JR, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS' LOCAL UNION NO. 5, OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, RETA COBURN, EDWIN CZARNECKI, EDWARD ELLENSON, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, GREATER METROPOLITAN HOTEL EMPLOYERS-EMPLOYEES HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Graphic Communications Local 1B Health and Welfare Fund "A", EMILIE HIENLE, NEIL HIRSCH, Richard Holden, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN,, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, ANDREW LIVEZEY, LOCAL 17 HOSPITALITY BENEFIT FUND, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE INDEMNITY COMPANY, JOHN LUCE, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, Gerald Lutz, MC-UA LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, DENISE MCCLINTIC, KATY MYERS MINER, MINNEAPOLIS AUTO DEALERS EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUND, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, FRANK PALTER, DAVID PAVEL, CYNTHIA POND, PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., JCG (PGC) USA, LLC,, ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., RAY ROY, JEFFREY P. SANTACARGELO, MICHAEL WILSON SAUL, W. PATRICK SCHNEESE, TIMOTHY S. SMITH, STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., Southeast Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, VALUE DRUG COMPANY, DONNA WENTZEL. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ESI Protocol)(CECCHI, JAMES)
April 9, 2013 Filing 366 NOTICE of Change of Address by LEE ALBERT (ALBERT, LEE)
April 9, 2013 Filing 365 NOTICE by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM AFFILIATION AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/3/2013. (eaj)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER I. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/2/2013. (eaj)
April 1, 2013 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2013. (Digitally Recorded.) (ce3)
April 1, 2013 Filing 362 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 357 MOTION for Reconsideration re # 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order on Behalf of Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 22, 2013 Filing 361 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph R. Saveri to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 21, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Joseph R. Saveri: $ 150, receipt number TRE031134 (eaj)
March 18, 2013 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT on behalf of Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BENNETT, NATALIE)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/13/2013. (eaj)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Joseph R. Saveri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/13/2013. (eaj)
March 13, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 357 MOTION for Reconsideration re # 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order . Motion set for 4/15/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
March 12, 2013 Filing 357 MOTION for Reconsideration re # 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order by Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Timothy A. C. May, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(MAY, TIMOTHY)
March 12, 2013 Filing 356 APPLICATION/PETITION for Joseph R. Saveri to be admitted pro hac vice for by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez, # 2 Certification of Joseph R. Saveri, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
March 11, 2013 Filing 355 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David P. Germaine to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 11, 2013 Filing 354 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph M. Vanek to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 8, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Joseph M. Vanek and David P. Germaine: $ 300, receipt number TRE030772 (eaj)
March 6, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE by ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND of Withdrawal of Appearance of Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman (LONGER, FRED)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 LETTER ORDER that the Court's # 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order is intended to apply to all parties including RP Healthcare. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/4/2013. (eaj)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting # 332 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph Vanek. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/5/2013. (eaj)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting # 331 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Germaine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/5/2013. (eaj)
March 5, 2013 RESET Deadlines as to # 329 MOTION for Reconsideration of February 8, 2013, Order . Motion set for 3/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
March 4, 2013 Filing 349 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 329 MOTION for Reconsideration of February 8, 2013, Order (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 4, 2013 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL JANE GALLAGHER on behalf of DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD (GALLAGHER, RACHEL)
February 28, 2013 Filing 347 Letter from Gil D. Messina Requesting Clarification of Discovery Confidentiality Order re # 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order. (MESSINA, GIL)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/25/2013. (eaj)
February 22, 2013 Filing 345 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 22, 2013 Filing 344 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE, CVS Caremark Corporation re # 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
February 22, 2013 Filing 343 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Exhibits A-D, # 2 Exhibit E - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit E - Part 2, # 4 Exhibits F-K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M - Part 1, # 7 Exhibit M - Part 2, # 8 Exhibits N-O, # 9 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 22, 2013 Filing 342 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2013 Filing 341 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re # 243 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint And RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Complaint (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2013 Filing 340 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2013 Filing 339 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC re # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 22, 2013 Filing 338 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (KISTLER, DAVID)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 LETTER ORDER granting Defendants request to file a consolidated, overlength brief in further support of Ranbaxy's Motions to Dismiss # 243 and # 244 . Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/21/2013. (eaj)
February 20, 2013 Filing 336 Letter from Michael E. Patunas on behalf of the Ranbaxy defendants requesting leave to file overlength reply brief. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 LETTER ORDER granting "Pfizer" Defendants request to file 2 overlength briefs in support of the Motions to Dismiss # 246 and # 245 . Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/20/2013. (eaj)
February 20, 2013 Filing 334 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 19, 2013 Filing 333 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order, # 2 Declaration of Charles Barrett, # 3 Declaration of Jonathan D. Janow, # 4 Declaration of Christopher J. Kelly, # 5 Declaration of David S. Nalven, # 6 Declaration of Joseph Opper, # 7 Declaration of Monica Rebuck, # 8 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, # 9 Declaration of Eric J. Wiesner)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 19, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 332 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
February 19, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
February 19, 2013 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, # 2 Affidavit of Joseph M. Vanek, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
February 19, 2013 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, # 2 Affidavit of David P. Germaine, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
February 15, 2013 Filing 330 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez, Esq. re: proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 15, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 329 MOTION for Reconsideration of February 8, 2013, Order . Motion set for 3/18/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
February 14, 2013 Filing 329 MOTION for Reconsideration of February 8, 2013, Order by RP Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER I denying RP Healthcare Plaintiff's request for the issuance of an independent, expedited Case Management Order; Ordering a Proposed Protective Order is to be submitted by 2/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/14/2013. (eaj) Modified on 2/15/2013 (eaj, ).
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting # 320 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ANDREW E. AUBERTINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/13/2013. (eaj)
February 11, 2013 Filing 326 Letter from Allyn Z. Lite to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation And Order Regarding Briefing In Related Case)(LITE, ALLYN)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding briefing in related case, Rite Aid Corp, et al. v. Pfizer Inc. et al. , Civil Action No. 12-7561 (PGS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/11/2013. (gxh)
February 8, 2013 Filing 324 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER that RP Healthcares objections to the entry of a Protective Order are overruled and the Court directs that discovery with respect to its claims shall be subject to the terms of the Protective Order; Ordering that any outstanding dispute with respect to the terms of this Protective Order must be brought to the Court's attention in writing by 2/18/2013. Absent any such dispute, the Protective Order must be submitted to the Court for execution and filing by the same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/8/2013. (eaj)
February 6, 2013 Filing 322 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RP Healthcare, Inc. re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint AMENDED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
February 5, 2013 Filing 321 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RP Healthcare, Inc. re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
January 31, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 320 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO ANDREW E. AUBERTINE . Motion set for 2/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 31, 2013 Filing 320 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO ANDREW E. AUBERTINE by VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT AS TO WHY NO BRIEF IS NECESSARY, # 2 CERTIFICATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, # 3 CERTIFICATION OF ANDREW E. AUBERTINE, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 28, 2013 Filing 319 Letter from Joseph M. Alioto. (ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
January 25, 2013 Filing 318 Letter from Eric J. Wiesner re # 316 Letter, # 315 Letter, # 317 Letter, # 313 Letter. (WIESNER, ERIC)
January 25, 2013 Filing 317 Letter from Ranbaxy Defendants to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert in opposition to RP Healthcare plaintiffs' request that no protective order be entered re # 313 Letter. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
January 25, 2013 Filing 316 Letter from Christopher J. Kelly and Robert E. Bloch re # 313 Letter. (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 25, 2013 Filing 315 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re # 313 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 22, 2013 Filing 314 Transcript of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/11/2013, before Judge DOUGLAS E. ARPERT. Court Reporter/Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. ((215) 862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2013. (mmh)
January 18, 2013 Filing 313 Letter from Joseph M. Alioto. (ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule in re Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/17/2013. (eaj)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying # 172 the Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Directing the interim co-lead counsel of the end-payor group as to how they should proceed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/16/2013. (eaj)
January 16, 2013 Filing 312 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2013 re # 172 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC as Interim Co-Lead Counsel of the End-Payor Class filed by LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Denied). (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (Attachments: # 1 Appearance) (dh, )
January 16, 2013 Filing 309 Letter from Gil D. Messina to Judges Sheridan and Arpert for Briefing Schedule Order re # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , # 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MESSINA, GIL)
January 15, 2013 Filing 308 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A.F.L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, JAMES BRIODY, PATRICIA BRIODY, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Florida Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, JOHN GALLAGHER, NEIL HIRSCH, Sandra Hellgren, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 98, Laborers' International Union of North Local 17 Health and Benefit Fund, NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND(12-2608), NEW MEXICO UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION'S AND EMPLOYERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND re # 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint , # 243 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint And RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin N. Boley, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 3, # 3 Exhibit 4-8, # 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 15, 2013 Filing 307 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN SALES COMPANY INC., BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY re # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint , # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 15, 2013 Filing 306 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC., MEIJER INC., SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO. re # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint , # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
January 15, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Brief in Opposition # 305 submitted by Deborah Corbishley on 1/15/2013 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (eaj)
January 15, 2013 Filing 305 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, KROGER CO., THE, SAFEWAY INC., SUPERVALU INC., WALGREEN CO. re # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint , # 242 MOTION to Dismiss , # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
January 15, 2013 Filing 304 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Miranda Y. Jones to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 15, 2013 Filing 303 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Russell A. Chorush to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 15, 2013 Filing 302 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Janow, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4770873.) (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 LETTER ORDER granting the end-payor class plaintiffs request to file a consolidated opposition to the Motions to dismiss filed by Pfizer Defendants and Ranbaxy defendants not to exceed 80 pages in 14 point font. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/14/2013. (eaj)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Jonathan D. Janow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/14/2013. (eaj)
January 14, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Russell A. Chorush and Miranda Y. Jones: $ 300, receipt number TRE029015 (eaj)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 LETTER ORDER granting Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs request to file a consolidated opposition to the pending Motions to Dismiss by Pfizer defendants # 246 and the Ranbaxy defendants # 244 not to exceed 90 pages in 12 point font. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/11/2013. (eaj)
January 11, 2013 Filing 299 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2013. Order to follow. ( Digitally Recorded.) (ce3)
January 11, 2013 Filing 297 Letter from end-pay class plaintiffs. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 11, 2013 Filing 296 Letter from Michael E. Patunas to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. requesting pro hac vice admission of Jonathan D. Janow, Esq.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Michael E. Patunas, Esq., # 2 Certification of Jonathan D. Janow, Esq., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs, Walgreens and Meijer, request to file a over long brief in opposition to Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss (Civil Action Nos. 12-4115 and 12-4537). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/8/2013. (eaj)
January 10, 2013 Filing 294 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 10, 2013 Filing 293 Letter from Gil D. Messina and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Revised Proposed Case Management Order. (Attachments: # 1 RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Revised Proposed Case Management Order)(MESSINA, GIL)
January 10, 2013 Filing 292 Letter from David Kistler to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan. (KISTLER, DAVID)
January 10, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint . Motion set for 2/4/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 10, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint . Motion set for 2/4/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 10, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Motion set for 2/4/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 10, 2013 Set Deadlines as to # 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint . Motion set for 2/4/2013 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 9, 2013 Filing 291 Joint MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 9, 2013 Filing 290 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
January 9, 2013 Filing 289 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD. Responses due by 1/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, # 3 Declaration of David C. Kistler, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
January 9, 2013 Filing 288 MOTION to Dismiss RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 LETTER ORDER that the Court has not decided the issue of disqualifying counsel, and is submitting six recommendations for consideration. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/8/2013. (eaj) Modified on 1/10/2013 (eaj, ).
January 8, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Status Conference set for 1/8/2013 AT 3:30PM HAS BEEN ADJOURNED AND RESCHEDULED FOR 1/11/2013 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. It shall be Plaintiff's responsibility to set up and initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. (ce3)
January 8, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/16/2013 at 1:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (James R. Dugan, II, Esq. will place the conference call into Chambers at (609)989-0508). (dh, )
January 8, 2013 Filing 286 Letter from Scott E. Perwin. (CORBISHLEY, DEBORAH)
January 7, 2013 Filing 285 Letter from Gil D. Messina to Judges Sheridan and Arpert re RP Healthcare's Proposed Scheduling Order re # 270 Letter. (MESSINA, GIL)
January 3, 2013 Filing 284 Letter from Christopher J. Kelly regarding RP Healthcare plaintiffs' letter and proposed schedule re # 270 Letter. (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 3, 2013 Filing 283 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephanie K. Hines to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4749565.) (PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 27, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Wayne Parsons: $ 150, receipt number TRE028450 (eaj)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting # 265 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephanie K. Hines, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/27/2012. (eaj)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting # 264 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Russell A. Chorush and Miranda Y. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/27/2012. (eaj) Modified on 1/2/2013 (eaj, ).
December 26, 2012 Clerk`s Text Order - The document # 280 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2013. (jjc)
December 21, 2012 Filing 280 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Attorney MICHAEL E. PATUNAS for RANBAXY, MICHAEL E. PATUNAS for RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, MICHAEL E. PATUNAS for RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., added. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2012 Filing 279 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Regarding Status Update. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
December 21, 2012 Clerk`s Text Order - The document # 278 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CVS Caremark Corporation has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2013. (jjc)
December 21, 2012 Clerk`s Text Order - The document # 277 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2013. (jjc)
December 21, 2012 Clerk`s Text Order - The document # 276 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2013. (jjc)
December 21, 2012 Clerk`s Text Order - The document # 275 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2013. (jjc)
December 20, 2012 Filing 278 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ERIC JASON WIESNER for CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, added. (WIESNER, ERIC)
December 20, 2012 Filing 277 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to California Physicians' Service, Inc. d/b/a Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company.. (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2012 Filing 276 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Ireland, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner-Lambert Co., and Warner-Lambert Co. LLC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 20, 2012 Filing 275 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. and Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited. Attorney DAVID C. KISTLER for DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., DAVID C. KISTLER for Daiichi Sankyo, LTD, added. (KISTLER, DAVID)
December 20, 2012 Filing 274 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Judge Walls Case re # 268 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 19, 2012 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by EKATERINA SCHOENEFELD on behalf of Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129) (SCHOENEFELD, EKATERINA)
December 19, 2012 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by GIL D. MESSINA on behalf of Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129) (MESSINA, GIL)
December 19, 2012 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY A.C. MAY on behalf of Chimes Pharmacy, Inc., James Clayworth, R.Ph., Golden Gate Pharmacy Services, Inc., Marin Apothecaries, Inc., Tony Mavrantonis, R.Ph., Meyers Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), Pediatric Care Pharmacy, Inc. (12-5129), RP Healthcare, Inc., Tilley Apothecaries, Inc. (12-5129) (MAY, TIMOTHY)
December 17, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Status Conference set for 12/20/2012 AT 3:30PM HAS BEEN ADJOURNED AND RESCHEDULED FOR 1/8/2013 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. It shall be Plaintiffs responsibility to set up and initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. (ce3)
December 15, 2012 Filing 270 Letter from Gil D. Messina for RP Healthcare Plaintiffs and Proposed Scheduling Order. (MESSINA, GIL)
December 14, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by GIL D. MESSINA on behalf of RP Healthcare, Inc. (MESSINA, GIL)
December 14, 2012 Filing 268 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 14, 2012 Filing 267 Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez enclosing proposed CMO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 14, 2012 Filing 266 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Proposed Scheduling. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 14, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 265 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO STEPHANIE K. HINES . Motion set for 1/7/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
December 13, 2012 Filing 265 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO STEPHANIE K. HINES by VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT AS TO WHY NO BRIEF IS NECESSARY, # 2 CERTIFICATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, # 3 CERTIFICATION OF STEPHANIE K. HINES, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 13, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 264 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO RUSSELL A. CHORUSH AND MIRANDA Y. JONES OF HEIM, PAYNE & CHORUSH . Motion set for 1/7/2013 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc)
December 12, 2012 Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO RUSSELL A. CHORUSH AND MIRANDA Y. JONES OF HEIM, PAYNE & CHORUSH by BURLINGTON DRUG CO., INC., VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT AS TO WHY NO BRIEF IS NECESSARY, # 2 CERTIFICATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, # 3 CERTIFICATION OF RUSSELL A. CHORUSH, # 4 CERTIFICATION OF MIRANDA Y. JONES, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 12, 2012 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the Clerks previous Quality Control message dated 12/10/2012, it was entered in the incorrect case. (eaj, )
December 10, 2012 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter (Proposed Order) # 51 submitted by 12/10/2012 on William C. Baton must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (eaj)
December 10, 2012 Filing 263 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice J. Douglas Richards to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 10, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to J. Douglas Richards: $ 150, receipt number TRE027939 (eaj)
December 7, 2012 Filing 262 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RP Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(ALIOTO, JOSEPH)
December 5, 2012 Filing 261 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Katherine A. Helm to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KISTLER, DAVID)
December 5, 2012 Filing 260 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Noah M. Leibowitz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KISTLER, DAVID)
December 5, 2012 Filing 259 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Henry B. Gutman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KISTLER, DAVID)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION AND ORDER that all Plaintiff's time to file papers in opposition to all of the pending motions to dismiss is hereby extended to 1/15/2013, Defendants' time to reply is extended to 2/22/2013. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/5/2012. (eaj)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting # 230 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wayne Parsons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/4/2012. (eaj)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting # 235 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to D. Mitchell Garrett, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/4/2012. (eaj) Modified on 12/6/2012 (eaj, ).
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting # 231 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen M. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/4/2012. (eaj)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting # 229 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Douglas Richards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/4/2012. (eaj)
December 3, 2012 Filing 253 NOTICE of Change of Address by DIANNE M. NAST (NAST, DIANNE)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 LETTER ORDER that the same briefing schedule as in Case Management Order No. 1 applies. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/3/2012. (eaj)
November 30, 2012 Filing 251 Letter from Jamie L. Miller. (MILLER, JAMIE)
November 30, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Henry B. Gutman, Noah M. Leibowitz and Katherine A. Helm: $ 450, receipt number NEW015252 (eaj)
November 28, 2012 Filing 250 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jackson D. Bigham to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 28, 2012 Filing 249 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian M. Sund to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Brian M. Sund and Jackson D. Bingham: $ 300, receipt number TRE077313 (eaj)
November 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Randy Renick, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE027368. (gxh)
November 20, 2012 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLYN ZISSEL LITE on behalf of RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (LITE, ALLYN)
November 19, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Gary S. Nitsche: $ 150, receipt number TRE027276 (eaj)
November 19, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 247 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) as to Defendants Blue Shield of California and CVS Caremark Corporation . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 19, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 19, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 19, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 19, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 243 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint And RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Complaint . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 19, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 242 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 16, 2012 Filing 247 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) as to Defendants Blue Shield of California and CVS Caremark Corporation by CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE. Responses due by 12/31/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss as to Defendants Blue Shield of California and CVS Caremark Corporation, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
November 16, 2012 Filing 246 MOTION to Dismiss All Direct Purchaser Complaints by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Brendan G. Woodard, Ex. 1-6, # 3 Ex. 7-11, # 4 Ex. 12-16, # 5 Ex. 17-18, # 6 Ex. 19-22, # 7 Ex. 23-24, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 16, 2012 Filing 245 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and RP Healthcare Plaintiffs' Complaint by PFIZER INC., PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, WARNER-LAMBERT CO., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 16, 2012 Filing 244 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 16, 2012 Filing 243 MOTION to Dismiss End-Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint And RP Healthcare Plaintiffs Complaint by RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
November 16, 2012 Filing 242 MOTION to Dismiss by DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., Daiichi Sankyo, LTD. Responses due by 12/31/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration of Y. Aoyagi, # 3 Declaration of A. Mann, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) of Daiichi Sankyo Inc., # 6 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) of Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited, # 7 Certificate of Service)(KISTLER, DAVID)
November 16, 2012 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by MAYRA VELEZ TARANTINO on behalf of RANBAXY, RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (TARANTINO, MAYRA)
November 16, 2012 Filing 240 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher Lometti to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 15, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Christopher Lometti: $ 150, receipt number TRE027097 (eaj)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MDL LETTER ORDER granting counsel's request for leave to file two overlength briefs, not to exceed 60 pages in 14-point Times New Roman font, in support of the forthcoming Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/14/2012. (gxh)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting # 219 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jackson D. Bigham, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/13/2012. (gxh)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting # 218 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian M. Sund, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/13/2012. (gxh)
November 14, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 235 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice D. Mitchell Garrett Jr. . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gxh)
November 14, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 231 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Smith . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gxh)
November 14, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 230 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wayne Parsons . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gxh)
November 13, 2012 Filing 236 Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice D. Mitchell Garrett Jr. by STEPHEN DEWAYNE SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Permitting D. Mitchell Garrett Jr. to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certification of Alexa D'Amato Barrera, # 3 Certification of D. Mitchell Garrett Jr., # 4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, # 5 Certification)(BARRERA, ALEXA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 234 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John J. Rausch: $ 150, receipt number TRE024932 (eaj) to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BARRERA, ALEXA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 233 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice D. Michael Noonan: $ 150, receipt number TRE024892 (eaj) to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BARRERA, ALEXA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 232 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Richard G. Kirchner (Receipt Number: TRE024950) to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BARRERA, ALEXA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Smith by STEPHEN DEWAYNE SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Permitting Stephen M. Smith to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certification of Alexa D'Amato Barrera, # 3 Certification of Stephen M. Smith, # 4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, # 5 Certificate of Service)(BARRERA, ALEXA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wayne Parsons by STEPHEN DEWAYNE SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Permitting Wayne Parsons to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certification of Alexa D'Amato Barrera, # 3 Certification of Wayne Parsons, # 4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, # 5 Certificate of Service)(BARRERA, ALEXA)
November 13, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 229 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney J. Douglas Richards . Motion set for 12/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 13, 2012 Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney J. Douglas Richards by NEIL HIRSCH. (Attachments: # 1 Statement, # 2 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez, # 3 Certification of J. Douglas Richards, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 12, 2012 Filing 228 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Tutorial Session re # 214 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Agenda For Tutorial)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 12, 2012 Filing 227 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Justin N. Boley, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 12, 2012 Filing 226 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bethany R. Turke to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 12, 2012 Filing 225 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kenneth A. Wexler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 9, 2012 Filing 224 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anne T. Regan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 9, 2012 Filing 223 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David M. Cialkowski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting # 201 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Lometti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/9/2012. (eaj)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting # 202 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Henry B. Gutman, Noah M. Leibowitz and Katherine A. Helm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/9/2012. (eaj)
November 8, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Kenneth A. Wexler, Justin N. Boley and Bethany R. Turke: $ 450, receipt number TRE026857 (eaj)
November 8, 2012 Filing 220 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ephraim Gerstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
November 8, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Anne Regan and David Cialkowski: $ 300, receipt number TRE026802 (eaj)
November 8, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Ephraim Gerstein: $ 150, receipt number TRE026807 (eaj)
November 8, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 219 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jackson D. Bigham . Motion set for 12/3/2012 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 8, 2012 Set Deadlines as to # 218 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brian M. Sund . Motion set for 12/3/2012 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
November 7, 2012 Filing 219 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jackson D. Bigham by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Statement as to Wh No Brief is Necessary, # 2 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez, # 3 Certification of Jackson D. Bigham, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 7, 2012 Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brian M. Sund by Bakers Local 433 Health Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, # 2 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez, # 3 Certification of Brian M. Sund, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 2, 2012 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Document Request # 217 submitted by James Dombroski, Esq. on 11/1/2012 is not filed pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (gxh)
October 31, 2012