Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Hongwei Gao and Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, USA, FBI, US Department of State, William P Barr, Christopher Wray, The United States of America, U.S. Department of State, William P. Barr and Federal Bureau of Investigations
Case Number: 1:2019cv01021
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2019 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning.
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by All Plaintiffs (Vrapi, Olsi)
November 14, 2019 Alias Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (arp)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/30/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
November 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (arp)
November 4, 2019 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (ln)
November 4, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6777152 re #1 Complaint, filed by Hongwei Gao (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vrapi, Olsi)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Hongwei Gao. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Vrapi, Olsi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongwei Gao
Represented By: Olsi Vrapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Represented By: Olsi Vrapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?