Sawyer v. Prack et al
Plaintiff: |
Trazz Sawyer |
Defendant: |
Albert Prack, D. Phelix, D. Richards, S. Langdon, Mulverhill, John Doe #1, John Doe #3 and John Doe #2 |
Case Number: |
9:2014cv01198 |
Filed: |
October 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Cayuga |
Presiding Judge: |
David E. Peebles |
Presiding Judge: |
David N. Hurd |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
118
DECISION AND ORDER that plaintiff's motion for a new trial and for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 110 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge David N. Hurd on 3/28/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal )
|
February 5, 2018 |
Filing
87
AMENDED DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Paragraph 4 of the September 28, 2016 Decision & Order (ECF No. 42 ) is amended to read as follows: "plaintiff's excessive force claim, if any, against defendants Richards and Langdon is DI SMISSED WITH PREJUDICE regarding the alleged use of excessive force in the Special Housing Unit at Bare Hill Correctional Facility on October 1, 2011 and defendants' motion is DENIED regarding the alleged use of excessive force against defenda nts Richards and Langdon outside the music room and hallway at Bare Hill Correctional Facility on October 1, 2011"; (2) the testimony at trial shall be limited to the alleged use of excessive force by defendants Richards and Langdon outside th e music room and hallway at Bare Hill Correctional Facility on October 1, 2011 and any injuries plaintiff may have sustained from that event; and (3) any testimony regarding the alleged use of force in the Special Housing Unit at Bare Hill Correctional Facility on October 1, 2011 and any injuries plaintiff may have sustained from that event is PRECLUDED. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/5/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing
42
DECISION AND ORDER: Based upon a de novo review of the portions of the Report- Recommendation to which plaintiff objected, the 40 Report-Recommendation is accepted and adopted in all respects. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Therefore, it is ORDE RED that: (1) Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 35 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; (2) Plaintiff's due process claim asserted against defendants Phelix and Prack is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (3) Plaintiff's e xcessive force claims asserted against the John Doe defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (4) Defendants' motion with regards to plaintiff's excessive force claims against defendants Richards and Langdon is DENIED and such claims remain; (5) Defendants Phelix, Prack, John Doe #1, John Doe #2 and John Doe #3 are DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/28/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?