Foster et al v. City of New York, New York
Plaintiff: Rozana Mandelberg, Frederick Savory, Delores Johnson, Marcelyn Dupree, Debora Junior, Kathleen Dyett, Gertie Augusto, Florence Ekpenyong, Tajudeen Omamuga, Nivedita Komar, Nalini Seeballack, Katarzyna Lis-Johnson, Camille Williams-Cooper, Miguelina Reyes, Joseph Zhu, Juanita Fuller, Desiree Blackwood, Evelin Diaz, Rosemarie Wiggins, Akm Amran, Kalyani Natarajan, Tyease Gatewood, Mahmud Shamsuddin, Michelle Baylor, Muriel Dawson, Takina Robinson, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Tisha Benbow, Judith Thune, Darlene Breland, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Stacy Ann Brown, Kim Stephens, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Tiffany Moore, Rebecca Marquez, Emily Fayomi, Adeline Joseph-Senat, Belkis Torres-Morales, Kabir Adiro, Martina Williams, Edna Butler, Cheril John, Chantel Carter, Elina Kvasha, Irenna Orzikh, Tony Edwards, Melda Bashien, Anna Guillen, Sholakunmi Olukogbon, Dawn Tyson-Djire, Ashlei Donawa, John Parks, Latoya Reina, Barbara Victor, Stephanie Isaacs, Maria Pimental, Yesenia DelValle, Maria Mendoza, Shanda Oliver, Erica Hawkins, Alfred Gonzalez, Cecilia Nwachukwu, Isabella Bishop-George, Pamela Alfred, Margaret Otone, Aisolen Marcial, Maria Taveras, Cheryl Melton, Sean Scott-Charles, Sabrina Little, Daiana Esquea, Juanita Ancrum, Veronika Lodzheuskaya, Lennin Lluveres, Merlin Larocque, Tasha Millner, Ophelia Inniss, Karen Sawyer-Barro, Aziza Zaid, Crisania Leiva, Jacqueline Fuentes, Kerrice Holmes, Claudette Grizzalti, Maurice Day, Joanna Polidura, Shemika McNeil, Minam Hernandez, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Jonelle Bristol, Marie Louis, Michelle Sellare, Judith Michel-Jones, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Soraya Peralta, Caroline Hogans, Jenise Brown, Adefunke Lawson, Willie Mae Wright, Maria Gonzalez, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Anita Newsome, Sodelyne Joseph, Maureen Newland, Mary Akarumeh, Bettie Lane, Yolette Lissade, Aliseia Marcelle, Haneef Sheeko, Lavon Jenkins, Alberto Estrada, Lennox-Ann Samerson, Lea Marshall, Cerissa Wright, Denise Sloan-Gates, Lashelle Riley, Jellicia Simpson, Gladys Castillo, Reginald Jean-Louis, Naresh Bhowmik, Luisa Felix, Nicole Barker, Teresa Ornas, Vashti Wilfred, Roseann Henry, Alecia Carentz, Laura Barnes, Nadia El-Saieh, Brenda Boyce, Dawda Bah, Lamar Ellerbe, Tazia Hunter, Maria Figueroa, Michel Crawford, Ulafayette Crump, Lorena Velasquez, Yoselin Perdomo, Barbara Thomas, Eliana Bauta, Jesse Almonte, Aureole Blanding, Donna Farray, Nancy Reyes, Lorraine Frazier, Deborah Graham, Cathy Baker, Eldora Logan, Omo Esere, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Roxanne Dixon, Marcella Sapp, Milton Medua, Lillie Rich, Luz Gonzalez, Ivory Lee, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Erik Mendez, George Grellet, Dean Martinez, Tameka Jones, Emily Arowolo, Cherita Jones, Eliana De La Cruz, Aknaris Padilla, Juana Colon-Rivera, LaWanda Joyner, Marie Grant, Maryem Elghazi, Mark Meachem, Katrina Sellars, Rafael Valerio, Natalie Colon, Latasha Dyer, Sharon Welch, Johnson Komolate, Jennifer Ross and Karen Douglas
Case Number: 1:2014cv04142
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: James C Francis
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331fl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit re: #187 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #190 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of Pestana Depo)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying #192 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal. The application is denied. The Lugosch standard for sealing is not met. The testimony at issue was taken because the City sought to rely on the advise of its lawyer and thus waived the privilege. The fact that testimony involves a waiver of the attorney-client privilege does not support a request for sealing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2019) (jca)
April 12, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Molly Ann Elkin on behalf of Keisha Foster. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Elkin, Molly)
April 12, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Diana J. Nobile on behalf of Keisha Foster. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Nobile, Diana)
April 12, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Keisha Foster. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Block, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David William Ricksecker on behalf of Keisha Foster. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Ricksecker, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory Keith McGillivary on behalf of Keisha Foster. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (McGillivary, Gregory)
March 19, 2019 Filing 194 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated March 19, 2019 re: Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Providing Notice of Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 193 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated March 18, 2019 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Finding that Plaintiffs Are Similarly Situated. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order, Perry v. City of New York)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Filing 192 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 10/5/2018. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory McGillivary, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 191 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support re: #186 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated Under the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Hearing Transcripts, #2 Exhibit 2. Trial Plan, #3 Exhibit 3. Chart of Plf. Testimony Re: Preapproval, #4 Exhibit 4. Chart of Plf. Testimony Re: Management Knowledge, #5 Exhibit 5. All Staff Bulletin - 4/30/2015, #6 Exhibit 6. Covington 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit 7. Marin 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8. Pestana 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit 9. Thomas 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit 10. Simpson 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11. Almanzar Deposition Transcript, #12 Exhibit 12. Ambris Deposition Transcript, #13 Exhibit 13. Awuah Deposition Transcript, #14 Exhibit 14. Baird Deposition Transcript, #15 Exhibit 15. Barnes-Kerr Deposition Transcript, #16 Exhibit 16. Bass Deposition Transcript, #17 Exhibit 17. Bonilla Deposition Transcript, #18 Exhibit 18. Carter Deposition Transcript, #19 Exhibit 19. Carter-Johnson Deposition Transcript, #20 Exhibit 20. Clerphon Deposition Transcript, #21 Exhibit 21. Davis Deposition Transcript, #22 Exhibit 22. Davis-Browne Deposition Transcript, #23 Exhibit 23. Dorsaint Deposition Transcript, #24 Exhibit 24. Elshorbagi Deposition Transcript, #25 Exhibit 25. Epps Deposition Transcript, #26 Exhibit 26. Fontaine Deposition Transcript, #27 Exhibit 27. Foster Deposition Transcript, #28 Exhibit 28. Gallardo Deposition Transcript, #29 Exhibit 29. Gomez Deposition Transcript, #30 Exhibit 30. Gonzalez Deposition Transcript, #31 Exhibit 31. Hawkins Deposition Transcript, #32 Exhibit 32. Johnson Deposition Transcript, #33 Exhibit 33. Jones Deposition Transcript, #34 Exhibit 34.Kippins Deposition Transcript, #35 Exhibit 35. Lebron Deposition Transcript, #36 Exhibit 36. Massey Deposition Transcript, #37 Exhibit 37. Nealy Deposition Transcript, #38 Exhibit 38. Nwanna Deposition Transcript, #39 Exhibit 39. Perez Deposition Transcript, #40 Exhibit 40. Phillip Deposition Transcript, #41 Exhibit 41. Pratts Deposition Transcript, #42 Exhibit 42. Reed Deposition Transcript, #43 Exhibit 43. Salemi Deposition Transcript, #44 Exhibit 44. Savchik Deposition Transcript, #45 Exhibit 45. Smalls Deposition Transcript, #46 Exhibit 46. Tillet Deposition Transcript, #47 Exhibit 47. Tunca Deposition Transcript, #48 Exhibit 48. White Deposition Transcript, #49 Exhibit 49. Whitfield Deposition Transcript, #50 Exhibit 50. Williams Deposition Transcript, #51 Exhibit 51. Worrell-Turley Deposition Transcript, #52 Exhibit 52. Marin 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 190 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #186 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 189 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman in Opposition re: #186 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated Under the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G-K, #3 Exhibit L-M (Part 1), #4 Exhibit M (Part 2) - O, #5 Exhibit P-S, #6 Exhibit T-V, #7 Exhibit W-Z, #8 Exhibit AA-DD, #9 Exhibit EE-HH, #10 Exhibit II-MM, #11 Exhibit NN-QQ, #12 Exhibit RR-UU, #13 Exhibit VV-ZZ, #14 Errata AAA-BBB)(Ekelman, Felice)
September 6, 2018 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #186 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
September 6, 2018 Filing 187 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #186 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 186 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #184 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2018) (ne)
September 4, 2018 Filing 184 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated September 4, 2018. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(Nobile, Diana)
August 6, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/19/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
August 6, 2018 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/19/2018 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018.(Siwik, Christine)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to briefing concerning the issue of whether Plaintiffs in these two actions are "similarly situated": 1. Plaintiffs' briefs are due on July 2, 2018; 2. Defendant's briefs are due on August 23, 2018; and 3. Plaintiffs' replies, if any, are due on September 6, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the page limit will be extended to 30 pages for Plaintiffs' moving briefs and Defendant's opposition papers. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 7/2/2018., Responses due by 8/23/2018, Replies due by 9/6/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/20/2018) (ama)
June 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 6/19/2018. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (mr)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying #163 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. For the reasons stated above, the City's motion to certify this Court's September 30, 2017 Summary Judgment Order for interlocutory appeal is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. No. 163 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. no. 159 in 14 Civ. 9220). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/18/2018) (mro)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for May 10, 2018 is adjourned to June 19, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 6/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/9/2018) (cf)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for April 24, 2018 is adjourned to May 10, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 5/10/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/23/2018) (rj)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for April 11, 2018 is adjourned to April 24, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/10/2018) (cf)
March 28, 2018 Filing 176 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 3/28/2018 re: Reply to Defendant's March 27, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 27, 2018 Filing 175 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated March 27, 2018 re: Defendant's 1292(b) Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Perry v. City of New York, Case No. 13-01015, ECF Dkt. 168, (S.D.N.Y Mar. 26, 2018), #2 Lynch v. City of New York, Case No. 16-05677, ECF Dkt. 112, (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 12, 2018))(Ekelman, Felice)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for February 07, 2018 is adjourned to April 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Docketed in 14cv4142 and 14cv9220) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/6/2018) (ap)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for January 19, 2018 is adjourned to February 7, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/18/2018) (ama)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for January 05, 2018 is adjourned to January 19, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/4/2018) (cf)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #169 Motion for MacKenzie Fillow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2017) (mro)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for December 21, 2017 is adjourned to January 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/15/2017) (cf)
December 5, 2017 Filing 169 MOTION for MacKenzie Fillow to Appear Pro Hac Vice for City of New York. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit declaration in support of motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order granting motion)(Fillow, Mackenzie)
December 5, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #169 MOTION for MacKenzie Fillow to Appear Pro Hac Vice for City of New York. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 1, 2017 Filing 168 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated December 1, 2017 re: Trial Plan Proposals. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Summary Trial Plan, #2 Exhibit 1 - Monroe v. FTS USA Verdict Form, #3 Exhibit 2 - Abadeer v. Tyson Order re. Bifurcation)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #162 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated November 28, 2017. Document filed by City of New York, New York. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 12/21/2017 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/29/2017) (rjm)
November 29, 2017 Filing 166 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #163 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
November 29, 2017 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #163 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nov. 2, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Decision, Perez v. City of NY, #3 Exhibit C - Status Report, Perez v. City of NY, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Settlement, Perez v. City of NY)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 29, 2017 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #163 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
November 29, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 28, 2017 Filing 162 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated November 28, 2017. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 16, 2017 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/2/2017 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 11/2/2017, ( Status Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (mr)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMO ENDORSED on re: (155 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF)(158 in 1:14-cv-4142-PGG-JCF) (155 in 1:14-cv-9220-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The conference will proceed as scheduled on Nov.2, 2017. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/1/2017) (js) Modified on 12/13/2017 (js).
November 1, 2017 Filing 159 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 1, 2017 re: Opposition to City's Request for Adjournment of the Nov. 2, 2017 Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 1, 2017 Filing 158 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated November 1, 2017 re: Status Conference. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for November 3, 2017 is adjourned to November 2, 2017 at 4:15 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/31/2017) (cf)
October 12, 2017 Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated October 12, 2017 re: Joint letter regarding status update. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to Nov. 3, 2017 at 12:30 pm. Status Conference set for 11/3/2017 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/6/2017) (cf)
October 4, 2017 Filing 154 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated October 3, 2017. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #133 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF; denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion #137 Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF; granting in part and denying in part #132 Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF; granting in part and denying in part #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF. The parties' motions for summary judgment are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. To summarize, the Foster and De La Cruz Plaintiffs are granted as follows: (1) the FLSA's executive exemption does not apply to the Foster and De La Cruz Plaintiffs; (2) the City has violated the FLSA by failing to compensate Plaintiffs for time it suffered or permitted them to work before and after scheduled shifts, and during their unpaid lunch periods; (3) the City has violated the FLSA to the extent that meal allowances and night shift differentials have not been included in calculating the "regular rate of pay" that is relied on for purposes of computing overtime compensation; and (4) the City has violated the FLSA to the extent that it has "paid" compensatory time at a straight-time rate. Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment are otherwise denied. The City's cross-motions for summary judgment are granted as to the twenty-seven Foster and De La Cruz Plaintiffs who did not disclose their FLSA claims on their bankruptcy petitions. The City's cross-motions are otherwise denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 133, 137 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. Nos. 132, 135 in 14 Civ 9220). The Court will conduct a conference in these matters on October 17, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The parties will submit a joint letter to the Court by October 12, 2017, addressing how they believe these cases should proceed in light of this Court's summary judgment decision. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/30/2017) (mro)
September 30, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (mro)
August 11, 2017 Filing 152 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 8/11/2017 re: Response to City's August 9, 2017 Letter. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 9, 2017 Filing 151 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated August 8, 2017 re: Seventh Circuit Court's Auguist 3, 2017 Decision in Allen v. City of Chicago. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ekelman, Felice)
July 28, 2017 Filing 150 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated July 28, 2017 re: Docket Corrections in Summary Judgment Filings. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Statement of Additional Material Facts, #2 Attachment 2, Pt. 1 - App. Ex. 8 (CityTime Self-Paced Training), #3 Attachment 2, Pt. 2 - App. Ex. 8 (CityTime Self-Paced Training), #4 Attachment 2, Pt. 3 - App. Ex. 8 (CityTime Self-Paced Training))(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/13/2017) (mro)
March 1, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of FILING SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 56.1 STATEMENT IN ORDER TO FILE MISSING EXHIBIT "CC". Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CC)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 147 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated February 24, 2017 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 146 REPLY - DEFENDANT'S REBUTTAL TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFEDNANT'S LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 145 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 144 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 2/24/2017 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 143 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #133 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendant's Additional Facts)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Response to Rule 56.1 Statement)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 141 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #135 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #133 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 139 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A - L, #3 Exhibit M - N, #4 Exhibit O - T, #5 Exhibit U - Z, #6 Exhibit AA - AI, #7 Exhibit AJ - AP, #8 Exhibit AQ - AS, #9 Exhibit AT - AY, #10 Exhibit AZ - BC, #11 Exhibit BD-BE PART 1, #12 Exhibit BE PART 2 - BF, #13 Exhibit BG - PART 1, #14 Exhibit BG PART 2 - BH, #15 Exhibit BI - PART 1, #16 Exhibit BI - PART 2, #17 Exhibit BI - PART 3, #18 Exhibit BI - PART 4, #19 Exhibit BJ - BV, #20 Exhibit BW - CA, #21 Exhibit CB - PART 1, #22 Exhibit CB - PART 2, #23 Exhibit CB - PART 3, #24 Exhibit CD, #25 Exhibit CE - CF PART 1, #26 Exhibit CF PART 2 - CG, #27 Exhibit CH - CO, #28 Exhibit CP, #29 Exhibit CQ - EB, #30 Exhibit EC - EQ, #31 Exhibit ER - FB, #32 Exhibit FC - FJ, #33 Exhibit FK, #34 Exhibit FL, #35 Exhibit FM, #36 Exhibit FN, #37 Exhibit FO, #38 Exhibit FP, #39 Exhibit FQ, #40 Exhibit FR, #41 Exhibit FS, #42 Exhibit FT, #43 Exhibit FU)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 137 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Filing Appendix Including Supporting Declarations re: #133 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Louis Lanier (January 11, 2017), #2 Exhibit 2. Third Supplemental Report of Louis Lanier (December 23, 2016), #3 Exhibit 3. Memo on Authorizing and Allocating Overtime, #4 Exhibit 4. Phase One Plaintiffs Responses to Interrogatories No 3,10,11, #5 Exhibit 5. Email Exchange Between La-Toya Baird and CPM Phillip Simpson, #6 Exhibit 6. April 30, 2015 All Staff Bulletin, #7 Exhibit 7. Frances Ambris CityTime Timesheet Certification, #8 Exhibit 8. CityTime Self-Paced Training, #9 Exhibit 9. Email Exchange Between La-Toya Baird and CPM Phillip Simpson, #10 Exhibit 10. Email Exchange Between CPS Tuffarelli and CPM Simpson, #11 Exhibit 11. Email Exchange Between CPS Alberta Jenkins and CPM Simpson, #12 Exhibit 12. Email from Keisha Foster to CPM Phillip Simpson, #13 Exhibit 13. Expert Report of Dr. Christopher Erath (Part 1), #14 Exhibit 13.1 Expert Report of Dr. Christopher Erath (Part 2), #15 Exhibit 14. Declaration of Maikudi Okore, #16 Exhibit 15. Time and Leave Rules for the Administration for Children's Services, #17 Exhibit 16. ACS Casework Practices Manual (Part 1), #18 Exhibit 16.1 ACS Casework Practices Manual (Part 2), #19 Exhibit 17. Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices, #20 Exhibit 18. Declaration of Louis Lanier (February 10, 2017), #21 Exhibit 19. December 27, 2016 Order issued in Bland, et al. v. PNC Bank and Gokhberg, et al. v. PNC Bank, #22 Exhibit 20. Almanzar, Yasarina, #23 Exhibit 21. Ambris, Frances, #24 Exhibit 22. Awuah, Evelyn, #25 Exhibit 23. Baird, Le-Toya, #26 Exhibit 24. Barnes-Kerr, Michelle, #27 Exhibit 25. Bass, Athena, #28 Exhibit 26. Bonilla, Yendry, #29 Exhibit 27. Carter, Chantal, #30 Exhibit 28. Carter-Johnson, Lania, #31 Exhibit 29. Clerphon, Cindy, #32 Exhibit 30. Davis-Browne, Kellee, #33 Exhibit 31. Davis, Joshua, #34 Exhibit 32. Dorsaint, Geraldine, #35 Exhibit 33. Elshorbagi, Aida, #36 Exhibit 34. Epps, Falin, #37 Exhibit 35. Fontaine, Florence, #38 Exhibit 36. Foster, Keisha, #39 Exhibit 37. Gallardo, Cynthia, #40 Exhibit 38. Gomez, Pascual, #41 Exhibit 39. Gonzalez, Jessica, #42 Exhibit 40. Hawkins, Erica, #43 Exhibit 41. Johnson, Marcia, #44 Exhibit 42. Jones, Tanya, #45 Exhibit 43. Kippins, Tyrone, #46 Exhibit 44. Lebron, Wendy, #47 Exhibit 45. Massey, Jeremiah, #48 Exhibit 46. Nealy, Derika, #49 Exhibit 47. Nwanna, Okey, #50 Exhibit 48. Perez, Ruby, #51 Exhibit 49. Phillip, Diane, #52 Exhibit 50. Pratts, Taisha, #53 Exhibit 51. Reed, Patrina, #54 Exhibit 52. Salemi, Robert, #55 Exhibit 53. Savchik, Irina, #56 Exhibit 54. Smalls, Yoshica, #57 Exhibit 55. Tillet, Vincent, #58 Exhibit 56. Tunca, Yasenin, #59 Exhibit 57. White, Monet, #60 Exhibit 58. Whitfield, Charlene, #61 Exhibit 59. Williams, Maria, #62 Exhibit 60. Worrell, Paige, #63 Exhibit 61. Covington, Cynthia, #64 Exhibit 62. Dannenberg, Barbara, #65 Exhibit 63. Marin, Patricia (FLSA Training), #66 Exhibit 64. Marin, Patricia (Timekeeping), #67 Exhibit 65. Ospino, Madeleine, #68 Exhibit 66. Pestana, Georgia (Filed Under Seal), #69 Exhibit 67. Thomas, Charita, #70 Exhibit 68. Simpson, Phillip, #71 Exhibit 69. Wellman, Tracy, #72 Exhibit 70. Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, #73 Exhibit 71. Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #74 Exhibit 72. Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support of Plaintiffs Appendix and Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, #75 Certificate of Service)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 135 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #133 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 23, 2016 Filing 132 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #131 Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/23/2016) (mro)
December 22, 2016 Filing 131 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated December 22, 2016 re: Request to Enlarge Memorandum of Law Page Limit. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for December 1, 2016 is adjourned sine die. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to the parties' motions for summary judgment: 1. Parties' motions are due on January 13, 2017; 2. Opposition papers are due on February 10, 2017; and 3. Replies, if any, are due on February 24, 2017. (Motions due by 1/13/2017., Responses due by 2/10/2017, Replies due by 2/24/2017.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/28/2016) (cf)
November 23, 2016 Filing 129 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 23, 2016 re: Opposition to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter (Summary Judgment). Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2016 Filing 128 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 23, 2016 re: Opposition to Plaintiff's Pre-motion Letter Regarding Summary Judgment. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 18, 2016 Filing 127 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 18, 2016 re: Pre-motion Letter (Summary Judgment). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 18, 2016 Filing 126 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 11/18/2016 re: Pre-Motion Letter (Summary Judgment). Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 15, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a DECISON proceeding held on 10/27/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 15, 2016 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/27/2016 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for December 1, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to December 1, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York.(Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/15/2016) (cf)
October 27, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 10/27/2016. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (mr)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: that the conference in these matters previously scheduled for 10/18/2016 is adjourned to 10/27/2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 10/27/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/17/2016) (tro)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to Oct. 18, 2016 at 10:30 A.M. (Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/5/2016) (cla)
September 27, 2016 Filing 120 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated 9/27/2016. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying #87 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. On February 22, 2016, Defendant City of New York moved to disqualify Plaintiffs' counsel in both of these related actions. (Dkt. No. 87 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. No. 84 in 14 Civ. 9220) For reasons that will be set forth on the record at the conference scheduled below, Defendant's motions are denied. It is hereby ORDERED that there shall be a conference in these matters on October 12, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. No. 87 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. No. 84 in 14 Civ. 9220). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/26/2016) (kl)
September 26, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/12/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (kl)
August 26, 2016 Filing 118 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated August 26, 2016 re: Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel (DKT 84-89). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REVISED ORDER DISMISSING NON-COMPLIANT PLAINTIFFS WITH PREJUDICE: granting #112 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss seven Non- Complaint Plaintiffs with prejudice for failing to appear for deposition, as directed by the Court's Orders dated March 14, 2016 and May 4, 2016, is hereby GRANTED. These Phase- One Plaintiffs are: (1) Ahmad Bader, (2) Daisy Cama, (3) Nadine Evans, (4) Atille Forbes, (5) Sonya Little, (6) Katherine Maldonado, and (7) Jennifer Telford. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/23/2016) (ama)
August 19, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (kl)
August 19, 2016 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. (Supplemental Declaration) in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs.. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 115 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs. . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs. . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs.. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (109 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Eliana De La Cruz, (110 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Keisha Foster. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The next conference in these cases will take place on Dec. 1, 2016 at 10:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 11/21/2016., Motions due by 1/13/2017., Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/19/2016) (kl)
August 10, 2016 Filing 110 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated August 10, 2016 re: Status Update. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 7/6/2016, ( Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2016 at 05:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Jerry Harrison) (mr)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #108 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated June 8, 2016 re: Request to Reschedule July 7, 2016 Status Conference. Document filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. So ordered. The conference will proceed on July 6, 2016 at 11:30. (Status Conference set for 7/6/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/10/2016) (rjm)
June 8, 2016 Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated June 8, 2016 re: Request to Reschedule July 7, 2016 Status Conference. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
June 3, 2016 Filing 107 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #106 Pre Motion Letter Dismissal of Plaintiffs who have Failed to Comply with Discovery. filed by Keisha Foster. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/2/2016) (tro)
June 2, 2016 Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated June 2, 2016 re: Response to Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #104 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to July 7, 2016 at 11:00 A.M. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 104. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Discovery due by 7/1/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/1/2016) (kl)
June 1, 2016 Filing 104 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated June 1, 2016., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated June 1, 2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 27, 2016 Filing 103 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B Ekelman, Esq. re: Pre Motion Letter Dismissal of Plaintiffs who have Failed to Comply with Discovery. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #100 Motion for Steven J. Seidenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 100. SO ORDERED. Attorney Steven Joshua Seidenfeld terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/13/2016) (kl)
May 12, 2016 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Steven J. Seidenfeld in Support re: #100 MOTION for Steven J. Seidenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Seidenfeld, Steven)
May 12, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION for Steven J. Seidenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Seidenfeld, Steven)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to June 9, 2016 at 12:30pm. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 97. (Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/4/2016) (spo)
May 4, 2016 Filing 98 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #96 Letter re: Outstanding Discovery, filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/4/2016) (spo)
May 4, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/1/2016. (spo)
May 3, 2016 Filing 97 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated May 3, 2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 3, 2016 Filing 96 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated May 3, 2016 re: Outstanding Discovery. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting #94 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is Granted. The April 7, 2016 conference is adjourned to May 5, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 93 and 94 in 14-cv-4142 and Dkt. No. 90 and 91 in 14-cv-9220. SO ORDERED.( Discovery due by 5/1/2016., Status Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/14/2016) (ama)
March 11, 2016 Filing 94 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Reschedule addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 3/11/2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 11, 2016 Filing 93 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 3/11/2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 22, 2016 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #87 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary and Supporting Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Ronald Cook)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 22, 2016 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelamn, Esq. (Reply Decalaration) in Support re: #87 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-12)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 90 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #87 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. in Support re: #87 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-18)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #87 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 87 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #69 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robin Burroughs dated 12/11/2015 re: Permission to Withdraw as Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/16/2016) (adc)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #81 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated February 2, 2016. The Application is granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 81 in Foster, 14 Civ. 4142 and Dkt. No. 79 in De la Cruz, 14 Civil 9220. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/9/2016) (adc)
February 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/12/2016. Replies due by 2/22/2016. (adc)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act. The plaintiffs' motions to compel (Docket no. 57 in Foster v. City of New York, 14 Civ. 4142; Docket no. 56 in De la Cruz v. City of New York, No. 14 Civ. 9220) are granted in part and denied in part as discussed above. Within fourteen days of the date of this order, the defendant shall (1) produce the documents over which it has waived privilege, (2) serve a supplemented privilege log, and (3) designate a Rule 30(b)(6) witness. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/5/2016) Copies Sent By Chambers. (adc)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conferences are adjourned to April 7, 2016 at 10:15 A.M. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 82 in 14 Civ 4142 and Dkt. No. 80 in 14 Civ. 9220. Status Conference set for 4/7/2016 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/2/2016) (mro)
February 2, 2016 Filing 82 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated February 2, 2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 2, 2016 Filing 81 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated February 2, 2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated January 21, 2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster. The Application is granted. So ordered. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 79 in Foster and Dkt. No. 77 in De La Cruz. (Discovery due by 3/11/2016). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/28/2016) (rjm)
January 21, 2016 Filing 79 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated January 21, 2016. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 12, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 12/22/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 12, 2016 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/22/2015 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 23, 2015 Filing 76 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Defendant's First Privilege Log)(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Defendant's motions to disqualify Plaintiffs' counsel: Defendant's motions are due on January 22, 2016. Plaintiffs' oppositions are due on February 8, 2016. Defendant's replies, if any, are due on February 16, 2016. (Motions due by 1/22/2016., Responses due by 2/8/2016, Replies due by 2/16/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/22/2015) (kko)
December 22, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 12/22/2015. (Court Reporter Sonya Huggins) (mr)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that there shall be a conference in these matters on December 22, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/18/2015) (kko)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #68 Motion for David Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2015) (cdo) Modified on 12/22/2015 (cdo).
December 14, 2015 Filing 72 DECLARATION in Opposition re: #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2015 Filing 71 DECLARATION in Opposition re: #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Brecher, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2015 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2015 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robin Burroughs dated 12/11/2015 re: Permission to Withdraw as Counsel. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(Burroughs, Robin)
December 10, 2015 Filing 68 MOTION for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11722924. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ricksecker, David)
December 10, 2015 Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #66 Letter filed by City of New York, New York re: Request for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Discovery due by 1/23/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/9/2015) (kko)
December 10, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #68 MOTION for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11722924. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 3, 2015 Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated December 3, 2015 re: Request for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
December 3, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/28/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 3, 2015 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/28/2015 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Defendant's application to dismiss the following three (3) Plaintiffs with prejudice for failing to respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents by November 25, 2015 as directed by the Cami on November 18, 2015 is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiffs are as follows: (1) Jessica Gamble, (2) Olusola Karimu, and (3) Nicole Williams; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's application to dismiss the following two (2) Plaintiffs, with prejudice, for failing to provide a verification to Plaintiffs response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by November 25, 2015 as directed by the Court on November 18, 2015 is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiffs are as follows: (1) Marlene Bancharan and (2) Sheila McRae; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's application to dismiss the following two (2) Plaintiffs, without prejudice, that did not work in the job classifications covered by this lawsuit during the limitations period is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiffs are as follows: (1) Robert Weston, and (2) Earlnora King. SO ORDERED. Olusola Karimu, Sheila McRae, Robert Weston, Nicole Williams, Marlene Bancharan and Jessica Gamble terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/1/2015) (kko)
November 30, 2015 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 30, 2015 re: Discovery and Enclosing Proposed Order Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 24, 2015 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 11/24/15 re: Response to Defendant's 11/19/15 Letter. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (55 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Keisha Foster, (54 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Eliana De La Cruz. ENDORSEMENT: The schedule set forth above is adopted. (Motions due by 11/23/2015. Responses due by 12/14/2015. Replies due by 12/23/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/23/2015) (tn)
November 23, 2015 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support re: #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Keisha Foster. (McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 19, 2015 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 19, 2015 re: Request for Pre-motion Conference to Seek Permission to File Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Telephone Conference held on 11/18/2015. (mr)
November 18, 2015 Filing 55 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 18, 2015 re: Briefing Schedule - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #35 Motion for Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/17/2015) (rjm)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #34 Motion for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/17/2015) (rjm)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference will take place in this matter on November 18, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. Once both sides are on the line, counsel should contact Chambers at 212-805-0224. (Telephone Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 05:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/16/2015) (kko)
November 16, 2015 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 16, 2015 re: Request for Permission to File Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 13, 2015 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (wb)
November 13, 2015 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. (wb)
November 9, 2015 Filing 50 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #48 Letter filed by Keisha Foster. ENDORSEMENT: Please confer by telephone with the other side to see if agreement can be reached. If the parties cannot resolve the dispute, the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Briefing shall be in accordance with paragraphs 2.B through 2.G of this Court's Individual Practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/9/2015) (lmb) Modified on 11/12/2015 (lmb).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the FLSA pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/9/2015) (kko)
November 5, 2015 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 5, 2015 re: Pre-motion Letter. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is granted. Discovery due by 12/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/28/2015) (kko)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #43 Motion for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/28/2015) (kko)
October 27, 2015 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory McGillivary dated October 27, 2015 re: Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attached Letter)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 26, 2015 Filing 44 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 10/26/15. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 26, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Elkin, Molly)
October 26, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
October 23, 2015 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated October 23, 2015 re: Pre-motion Letter. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
October 20, 2015 Filing 41 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11528334. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Elkin, Molly) Modified on 10/20/2015 (sdi).
October 20, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #41 MOTION for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11528334. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sdi)
September 24, 2015 Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated September 24, 2015 re: Metadata and Connections Database. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
September 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 9/17/2015, ( Status Conference set for 2/4/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (mr)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York, (36 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. The Conference will proceed at 11:30 a.m. on July 9, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/08/2015) (ama)
July 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 7/9/2015, ( Status Conference set for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (mr)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York, (36 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. The Conference is adjourned to 11:00 a.m. on July 9, 2015. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 7/9/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/07/2015) (ama)
July 1, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Keisha Foster. (Block, Sarah)
July 1, 2015 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated July 1, 2015 re: Request to Reschedule Conference on July 9, 2015 at 10:00 am to Another Time on July 9, 2015. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
June 12, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION for Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11029392. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Robin)
June 12, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Diana Jane Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11029309. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Proposed Order)(Nobile, Diana)
June 12, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Diana Jane Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11029309. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
June 12, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11029392. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for May 28, 2015 will take place on July 9, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/22/2015) (ama)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT STIPULATION - PHASE ONE DISCOVERY: 1. Five percent of the Plaintiffs shall be deemed a "Phase I Plaintiff' for the purposes of this Joint Stipulation and will be selected by the parties first generating a randomized list of Plaintiffs through a computer program and then selecting the first name, and every twentieth Plaintiff (i.e., Plaintiffs 1, 20, 40, 60, etc.). 2. Within 30 days after the Phase I Plaintiffs are identified as provided for in paragraph 2 above, Defendants will provide to counsel for Plaintiffs a spreadsheet containing the title, work location, and date employment commenced and terminated (if applicable) for each Phase I Plaintiff. 3. Either party may select up to ten additional Phase I Plaintiffs within 120 days after this Stipulation is So Ordered by the Court. Additionally, within 45 days after this Stipulation is So Ordered by the Court, the Parties will confer to determine whether either party desires any additions or subtractions to the group of Phase I Plaintiffs and either promptly resolve the dispute or notify the Court so that any disputes can be resolved, as set forth within. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/21/2015) (ajs)
November 26, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Katherine Hook on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Hook, Sarah)
November 26, 2014 Filing 30 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties must complete the first phase of fact discovery relating to approximately 5% of the Plaintiffs (Phase I Discovery) on or before November 23, 2015. The parties will negotiate a Joint Stipulation and proposed order that will be submitted for Court approval within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Depositions of fact witnesses for Phase I Discovery due by 11/23/2015. Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/20/2014) (tn)
November 14, 2014 Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #18 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Keisha Foster. Related document: #18 Amended Complaint, filed by Keisha Foster, #2 Complaint, filed by Kevin Pritchett, Keisha Foster, Jessica Reyes-Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix C - Consent Forms, #2 Appendix D - List of All Plaintiffs)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to perform the following tasks: 1. Establish a separate docket number for a severed case on behalf of the plaintiffs listed in Exhibit 1 to the plaintiff's' October 30, 2014 Notice of Filing. 2. Accept as filed the Complaint (Exh. 2 to Plaintiff's October 30, 2014 Notice of Filing) filed on behalf of current or former JOS and AJOS employees. For purposes of the statute of limitations, those plaintiffs listed in Exhibit 1 to the October 30, 2014 Notice of Filing will have the statute of limitations tolled for their claims as of the date they joined the Foster case.Enter all docket entries in Foster v. City of New York, C.A. No. 1 :14-cv-4142, under the docket number described in Paragraph 1. Plaintiff's will not be required to pay a second filing fee for the new docket number. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/11/2014) (ama)
November 13, 2014 Transmission to the Case Openings Clerk. Transmitted re: #27 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,, to the Case Openings Clerk for case processing. (ama)
November 12, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 11/12/2014, ( Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (mr)
October 30, 2014 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Documents Required by Court's September 10, 2014 Order served on City of New York on 10/30/14. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Ga
October 30, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of of Filing Documents Required by Court's September 10, 2014 Order. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary-Price, Michelle Gaskin, Carol Gaston, Verna Gaston, Tyease G
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION TO STAY DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT PENDING THE SEVERING OF THE CASE INTO SEPARATE MATTERS: THEREFORE, IT IS HEARBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that during the forty-five (45) day period that the deadline for defendant to file its answer to plaintiffs' amended complaint in the above referenced matter is stayed. SO ORDERED. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/17/2014) (ama)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for November 6, 2014 will take place on November 12, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York.SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 11/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/11/2014) (ama)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for September 11, 2014 will take place on November 6, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Conference set for 11/6/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/11/2014) (rjm)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: re: Letter #20 . ENDORSEMENT: The Parties Joint Proposal is Adopted by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/10/2014) (ama)
September 10, 2014 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 9/10/14 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary-Price, Michelle Gaskin, Carol Ga
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 11, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 9/11/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/28/2014) (kgo)
August 28, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/28/2014, ( Status Conference set for 9/11/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (mr)
August 27, 2014 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Keisha Foster. Related document: #2 Complaint, filed by Kevin Pritchett, Keisha Foster, Jessica Reyes-Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet), #2 Appendix B (Consent Forms, Part 1), #3 Appendix B (Consent Forms, Part 2), #4 Appendix B (Consent Forms, Part 3))(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 21, 2014 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 8/21/14 re: Status Letter in Compliance with 6/24/14 Order. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary
August 21, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. City of New York, New York served on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/7/2014. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Sulany Madrid; Lakeasha Williams; Mary Akarumeh; Abu Taslim; Eunice Rucker-Wolfe; Denise Johnson; Nelson Saavedra; Curstlinia Major; Shera Evans; Violet Moody; Kesha Jones; Arlene Holland; Jaqueline Raymomb; Zoila Lorenzo; Bette Durham; Akeem Onilenia; Linda Dennis; Genesis Ecclesiastes; Marie Delice-Sheppard; Andrea Deil; Suzanne Wiggins; Rafael Del Valle; Alexis Porter; Samuel Ofonagoro; Christina Pope-Travieso; Edward Green; Juanita Fuller; Raena McCarthy; Luisa Felix; Awilda Suarez; Tiffany Smith; Angela Gonzalez; Ivory Lee; Shirley Griffin; Wanda Ochshorn; Regina Sussmann; Luisa Haddock; Eliana De La Cruz; Josephine Colon; Jeannine Carter; Tina Johnson; Joselin Checo; Nonie Noel; Tonya Williams; Denise Emanuel; Brenda Stanley; Michelle Mireau; Olitan Adedapo; Natasha Glasgow; Christina Bermudez; Emmanuel Auguste; Dwight Vincent; Akita Jefferson; Nadhege Caze; Cynthia Serrano; Maria Luz Almonte; Svetlana Cernei; Titilayo Akuyemi; Jeffery Campbell; Diana Lee-Lewis; Marzan Fatema; Myriam Napoleon; Minerva Moreno-Roman; Josefina Infante; Carmen Cordero; Debora Junior; Jennifer Telford; Jaella Dopwell; Denise Trotter; Myrtle Petrus; Natasha Monchery-Polius; Paula McIntosh; Tommy Lau; Christian Paul; Norbert Wills ; Magdalena Leszko; Michelle Harris; Beverley Booker; Samantha Grabkowitz; Kembey Biewan; Tashawna Monestine; Atlanta Okhiria; Dawn Spiro; Lillian Irizary; Tremayne Bunche; Henry Bonilla; Joshua Finkelstein; Daniel Robinson; George Nathaniel; Haydee Medina; Jeannette Mota; Yasarina Almanzar; Aliseia Marcelle; Monet White ; Carrol Thomas; Sparkle Dixon; Valencia Pierre; Dorcas Avitabile; Donna Farray; Augustina Almonte; Teresa Ornas; Comlan Madou; Miriam Ramos-Ortiz; Nadine Lewis; Rozana Mandelberg; Althea Abrahams; Mariana Reveron; Dorothy Glover; Tavone Watts; Angeline Victor; Olasupo Kofoworola; Tasha Burke ; Tiffany Baylock; Shaunette Shebioba; Angela Andrew; Motiur Rahman; Latisha Fields; David Bartolo; Sidney Smalls; Massiel Cruz-Pichardo; Atiya Boyd; Burton Lewis; Siobhan Glynn; Andreina Molina; Abimbola Adeyeri; Marcia Moore; Otillo Moran; Daisy Davis; Karen Deans; Valanza Robinson; Tania Ellis; Tara Walden; Armenta Weekes; Evelyn Taylor; Jagdish Patel; Sheila McRae; Virginia Cureno; Robert Timmins; Krystle Oliver; Jerome Batts, Jr; Faith Oviasuyi-Brown; Deonarine Pitamber; Zuheidy Diaz; Tikema Milan; Deborah Davy; Betsaira Alvarez; Cliff Ali; Ewelina Lojek; Lillian Rodriguez; LaVone Wright; Sergio De La Cruz; Evelyn Dupree; Dana LaCasse; Jenesis Perez-Matos; Ayeasha Bishop; Rossella Abbate; Annette Rivera; Orian Shortt; Dean Martinez; Juan Estrada ; Stephanie Cutignola; Kristan Webb; Venita Sharper; Talia Herndon; Altagracia Brito; Bridgette Faustin; Aziza Zaid; Eunice Martin; Karen Sawyer-Barro; Cheryl Melton; Angela Hart; Terry Fulton; Karina Guerrero; Leona Velasquez; Ashley Johnson; Janelle Sargent; Keisha Foster ; Ordella Dunn; Irene Anderson; Afrika Archer; Esuabana Moses; Tiffany Arrington; Denise Sloan-Gates; Denise Robinson; Sharon Gayle; Juana Colon-Rivera; Siasha Rondon; Chris Williamson; Brian Ferguson; James Cameron; Carol Jones-Whitehorn; Patricia Phillips; Laura Barnes; Michelle Gillenwater; Khadesha Santana; Andra Cojoc; Sandra Heller; Shirley Odom; Danielle Bembury; Rachel Kemp; Juliet Walters; Lynn Parker; Rhina Singleton; Mirlande Cadet; Koren Adams; Gail Watson; Delisia Stewart; Olawabukola Oladoja; Marlene Wilson; Bernice Delgado; Alfred Johnson; Patricia Garrison; Catolina Lebron; Yasemin Tunca; Francis Donkor; Chevelle Robinson; Marie Louis; Julian Smith; Sonia Thomas; Nalini Seeballack; Marcia Patterson; Larita Holden; Heidi Lopez; Brenda Clarke; Barbara Jackson-Neville; Alba Segarra; Lonnie Reel, Jr; Newton Brown; Yvonne Talarico; Wendy Salazar; Jovan Romon ; Roseann Henry; Thomas Kamara; Jennifer Hampton; Christine Ellis; Michel Crawford; Kenia Olivero; Danielle Hall; Terethea Johnson; LaShonna Fullen; Mariluz Quinones; Laura Little; Felisha Audain; Tiffany Ward; Deborah Winfrey; Clarence Thomas; Veronique Streeter; Zaidn Miranda; Nicole Desantis; Glendora Osborne; Veronika Lodzheuskaya; Maria Gonzalez; Rose Burke ; Maria Diaz; James Alapat; Sandra Ramos; April Lestansky; Dominque Cunningham; Joan Butcher; Takiyah St. Louis; Illene Robinson; Amanda King; Tanya Hatcher; Carmen Charriez; Kenneth Walker; Mahmud Shamsuddin; Sonia Satchell; Leslyn Eastmond; Maryann Obilor; Edward Murray; Ethelyn McCalla; Argenis Aristizabal; Cindy Raoul; Mona Ford; Martina Williams; Shondell Archibald; Diane Richardson-Phillip; Tanesha Mosley; Takiya Green; Jude George; Gregory Davis; Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari; Luiza Marke; Karen Jeanty-Byer; Marie Morro; Natasha Simmons; Bridgette Manigault; Letecia White; Altagracia Pena; Christine Onwu-Okpala; Dawn Graham; Frances Ambris; Gladys Castillo; Patricia Somersall; Janet Graham; Doris Taylor-Aiken; William Carrion; Bernadette Jayco; Suxian Wu; Andrea Thomas; Akm Amran; Melissa Enyiema; Eliana Bauta; Amarilis Batista; Marcella Figueroa; Monique Thorne; Angela Garcia; Barbara Harris; Deyanira De Los Santos; Irenna Orzikh; Tiffany Broadwater; Derika Nealy; Marie Bernard; Elaine Smalls; Varda Snape; Ana Perez; Venus Mercer; Ani Emenogu; Yvonne Palmer; Fatimah Latif; Hemangini Thakar; Titilayo Osindero; Cesarina Martinez; Sandra Howell-Jones; Oladipo Fayemi; Ana Nunez-Martinz; Modesta Baltazar; Carmen Smith ; Chantel Carter; Tyease Gatewood; Linda Shorts; Cynthia Williams; Gloria Triblet; Raphael Oliver; Aureole Blanding; Yvetter LeCraft; Jacquene Fairclough; Tyanda Edwards; Patricia Horsford; Darlene Breland; Constantia Brown; Victoria Cirigliano-Doria; Anthony Baskerville; Anita Newsome; Beverly Wilson; Nolvia Alvarez; Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth; Burton Lewis, III; Marlenny Estevez; Diana Gray; Richard Bond; Janet Hughes; Daphne Perry; Monique Gibbs; Lisa Samuels; Shawnte Moore; Israel Blanco; Annmarie Robinson-Warren; Carla Casseus; Tracie Armstrong; Giovanna Benitez; Delia Samuels; Ezequiel Balbuena; Miguelina Acevedo; Chanize Clark; Ursula Goldson; Christine Spence; Ebone Gedeon; Justin Jarvis; Georgette Lawrence ; Terry Montanez; Rebecca Marquez; Derrick Hawkins; Gerardo Duran; Christine Cornwall; Brenda Defares; Jeannie Salcedo; Carol Gaston; Sariya Brown; Lijia Sinclair; Emmanuel Sledge; Moronke Eromosele; Bonita Johnson; Verna Gaston; Carla-Lelani Samms-Lezzama; Sharon Welch ; Elizabeth Melendez; Shemika McNeil; Daryl Gittens; Obi Chife; Cheri Coleman; Crisania Leiva; Pamela Miller; Nathaniel Koszer; Kerry Rush; Joan Higgins; Leslie Velasquez; Marcella Sapp; Daphne Caldwell; David Bracero; Jerome Pope; Aletnea Francis; Dana Weber; Karen Douglas; Rosa Parra; Telee Brown; Lamar Staton; Michael Domingo; Brandon Zager; Gertie Augusto; Morufu Animashaun; Maritza Quinones; Ginette Coppex; Ronald Adams; Rolando Roman; Ayana Pair; Annie McClain; Anatoly Frenkel; Emiliya Revich; Paul Oyeinole; Thandera Knight; Nilsa Demorizi; Erica Fernandez; Marie Silien; Elizabeth Rivera; Joy Brewster; Joanna Polidura; Elina Kvasha; Steven Hernandez; Myrna Alexandre; Avon Wilson-Pinckney; Donna Howard; Patricia Miller; Cheryl Shelton; Beverly Russell; Shavonne Daniels-Martin; Oluwasegun Filani; Melvin Irby; Edna Guevara; Aida Elshorbagi; Rosa Hernandez; Lola Ingram; Shatina Brown ; Eileen Alston; Latachia Wright; Jennifer Toussaint; Alexandra Echeverri; Christina Nazario; Maryem Elghazi; Whinston Morris; Yvonne Reynolds; Curtis Addah; Michelle Sellare; Melissa Thompson; Bertha Adedapo; Jonelle Bristol; Calen Daniel; Leslie Johns; Chanel Stokes; Dawda Bah; Tanya Reyes; Scott McCall; Farzana Yasmeen; Erik Mendez; Tiffany Covington; Shiela Alieva; Nicole Barker; Joann Sayed; Janet Fernandez; Shakeena Lesane; Evelyn Awuah; Hang Youssef; Gwendolyn Shannon; Bessie Rodriguez; Alphonse Rimpel; Michelle Chapoteau; Kristina Perez; Edwin George; Malika Davis; Jennifer Ross; Zuleyka Morales-Francis; Kim Jeter; Cynthia Murden; Shameka Smalls; Tanya Jones; Alia Khatari; Maurice Day; Nielandra Thomas; Viktoria Sirota; Miguel Garcia, Jr; Vivene Simpson; Andrea Patterson; Kendrah Johnson; Clarita Garcia; Yarjaira Galindez; Craig McCosker; Shemain Webb-Alexander; Yoselin Perdomo; Tasha Lopez; Lorena Velasquez; Ivy Smith; Trevor Bedeau; Rafael Valerio; Vickie Matheny; Cecilia Malone; George Grellet; Samantha Kitt; Diana Carlo; Sodelyne Joseph; Digna Hoyos; Darnley Thomas ; Terrice Bell; Olaguea Boyo-Bankle; Lashawn Clark; Selasi Denu; Lisa St. Cloud; Marie Bassene-Diedhiou; Crystal Hussein; Veronica Moreno; Amar Moody; Sean Scott-Charles; Janice McNeil; Evelyn Hernandez; Cherita Jones; Crystal Wallace; Francica Williams; Yesenia Pagan; Cleante Jean; Teresa Rodriguez; Catherine Armen; Jellicia Simpson; Deborah Olukogbon; Melda Bashien; Carmelitta Cunningham; Liliya Ladyzhenskya; Patricia Cooper-Small; Deborah Rozier; Ferdine Polynice; Cathy Camacho; Darryl Thomas; Lenire Holmes; Cheryl Leone; Kenneth Romero; Jean Rollan; Wanda Lawrence; Ophelia Inniss; Dana Augustin ; Danielle Harper; Marie Jadotte; Tracy Diaz; Marilyn Mizzell; Sherie Maxwell; Jacqueline Gordon; Florine Sills; Shatonja Carter; Samuel Roker; Diane Ramos; Tracey Mitchell; Carmen Libran; Katherine Maldonado; Sharmilla Girdharrie; Janice Williams; Ngozika Frank; Tishana Valentine; Ann Cato; Yomyra Lopez; Kevin Pritchett; Latisha Gonzalez; Darlene Sullivan; Carolyn Frazier; Sharina Edwards; Nataliya Zhmiyevskaya; Daiana Esquea; Carlos Espinal; Billie Flores; Renee Hernandez; Tamara Stewart; Shayne Roberts ; Elizabeth Akinyemi; Chrisida Bourne; Brenda Thomas; Ronald Johnson, Jr; Muriel Dawson; Faye Blue; Elizabeth Osuala; Annie Anderson; Tanya Bynes-Covington; Glenda Colon; Evelyn Ortiz-Hardy; Joanna Kellman; Cassandra Fonollosa; Elsa Toro; Sharon Jackson; Shelee Parker-Jones; Natasha Lyons; Maria Mariani; Catherine Wilkins; Alexandra Remond; Rae Phillips; Denise Foster; Tangier Wallace; Sherryl Reese; Idowu Kingsley; Gloria Ormsby; Ilicia Allen; Cecilia Nwachukwu; Roberta Martin; Nurys Gonzalez; Cynthia Depeiza; Fatima Diaz; Sofia Diggs; Tracey Jimenez; Kathleen Bes
August 12, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey W. Brecher on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Simeon Gross on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Gross, Adam)
August 12, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Joshua Seidenfeld on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Seidenfeld, Steven)
August 12, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felice B. Ekelman on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/11/2014) (kgo)
August 11, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9983103. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 8, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9983103. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary, #2 Exhibit 1: Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 7, 2014 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(O'Connor, Andrea)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The Conference is adjourned to August 28, 2014 at 11:30 A.M. The Clerk will terminate the motion (Dkt. #7) (Initial Conference set for 8/28/2014 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/18/2014) (kgo)
July 17, 2014 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for August 21, 2014 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 7/17/2014. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 24, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/21/2014 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/24/2014) (kgo)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion (New York answer due 8/7/2014.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/20/2014) (kgo)
June 19, 2014 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrea O'Connor dated June 19, 2014. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(O'Connor, Andrea)
June 17, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Mary O'Connor on behalf of City of New York, New York. (O'Connor, Andrea)
June 9, 2014 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of New York, New York. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401097216)Document filed by Keisha Foster, Jessica Reyes-Peterson, Kevin Pritchett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(jd)
June 9, 2014 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jd)
June 9, 2014 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, New York. (jd)
June 9, 2014 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (jd)
June 9, 2014 Case Designated ECF. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. City of New York, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozana Mandelberg
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Savory
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelyn Dupree
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Junior
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dyett
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertie Augusto
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Ekpenyong
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tajudeen Omamuga
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nivedita Komar
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nalini Seeballack
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarzyna Lis-Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Williams-Cooper
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguelina Reyes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Zhu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Fuller
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Blackwood
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelin Diaz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Wiggins
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akm Amran
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalyani Natarajan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyease Gatewood
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmud Shamsuddin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Baylor
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muriel Dawson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takina Robinson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivene Abdur-Rashid
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Benbow
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Thune
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Breland
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anmane-Yeboah
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Cleckley-Cooke
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Ann Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Stephens
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Evulukwu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Moore
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Marquez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Fayomi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeline Joseph-Senat
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belkis Torres-Morales
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kabir Adiro
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Butler
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheril John
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Carter
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elina Kvasha
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irenna Orzikh
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Edwards
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melda Bashien
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Guillen
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sholakunmi Olukogbon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Tyson-Djire
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlei Donawa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Parks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Reina
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Victor
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Isaacs
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Pimental
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia DelValle
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mendoza
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanda Oliver
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Hawkins
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Gonzalez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Nwachukwu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Bishop-George
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Alfred
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Otone
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aisolen Marcial
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Taveras
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Melton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Scott-Charles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Little
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daiana Esquea
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Ancrum
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronika Lodzheuskaya
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennin Lluveres
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlin Larocque
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Millner
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ophelia Inniss
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sawyer-Barro
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziza Zaid
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crisania Leiva
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Fuentes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerrice Holmes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Grizzalti
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Day
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Polidura
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shemika McNeil
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minam Hernandez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelaine Desina-Chatoo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonelle Bristol
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Louis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sellare
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Michel-Jones
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massiel Cruz-Pichardo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soraya Peralta
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Hogans
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenise Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adefunke Lawson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Wright
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gonzalez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Casimiro-Deleon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Newsome
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sodelyne Joseph
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Newland
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Akarumeh
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettie Lane
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolette Lissade
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliseia Marcelle
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haneef Sheeko
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavon Jenkins
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Estrada
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennox-Ann Samerson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Marshall
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cerissa Wright
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Sloan-Gates
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashelle Riley
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jellicia Simpson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Castillo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Jean-Louis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naresh Bhowmik
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Felix
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Barker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ornas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vashti Wilfred
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseann Henry
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alecia Carentz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Barnes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia El-Saieh
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Boyce
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawda Bah
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Ellerbe
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tazia Hunter
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Figueroa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Crawford
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulafayette Crump
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Velasquez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoselin Perdomo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Thomas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana Bauta
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Almonte
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aureole Blanding
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Farray
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Reyes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Frazier
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Graham
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Baker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldora Logan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omo Esere
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Bynes-Covington
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Dixon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Sapp
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Medua
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Rich
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Gonzalez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivory Lee
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Cucchiaro
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Mendez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Grellet
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Martinez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Jones
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Arowolo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherita Jones
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana De La Cruz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aknaris Padilla
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Colon-Rivera
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaWanda Joyner
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Grant
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryem Elghazi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Meachem
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Sellars
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Valerio
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Colon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Dyer
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Welch
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Komolate
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ross
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Douglas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?