Mazur et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Paul Mess, Dennis McEntee, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno, Anthony Modafferi, Craig Mondello, Robert Melendez, John McDonald, Efrain Mojica, Everett McCain, Edward McNamara, Robert McCarren Jr, David Mills, Ray Melcer, James McGarrigle, Daniel McCarthy, Madeline Melendez, Hilda Merle, Gail Millman, Luis Mendizabal, Mark R Mazur, Thomas Mikoleski, Cristian Morales, Brian McKillop, Richard Miller, William McVicar, Christopher Miller, Antonio Monaco Jr., Noel Mitchell, David Morales, Jose Montalvo, Peter Midgley, Scott McCarthy, Johanny Monegro, Joseph Mitchell, Christopher Mone, Jeffrey Membel, Joseph Monte, William Meaney, Michael McGarry, Nancy Mercado, William Mincher, Edwin Morales, James Monahan, James McCann, John Mee, John Milonas, Michael Milmore, John McGrail, John McGill, Robert Molinaro, Segundo Montenegro, William Melendez, Patrick McQuade, Todd Metro, Brian McCrodden, Michael Moore, James McAlevey, Christopher Miro, Sean McNellis, Amanda Mogro, John Mitchell, Farokh Mehta, Nathaniel Moore, Paul Moehring, Evelyn Mercado, Luis Mendez, Jr., Michael McPartland, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Philip Miano, Felicia Morales, Hukm Moore, Nelson Molina, Solomon Mitchell, Eric Mendez, Patrick Monitello, Susan Meyer, Armando Molina, James McCabe, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, Michael McDaniel, Richard McSpedon, Jerry C Moore Jr, Luciano Melfi, John Mazzeo, Terrence McKay, Janice McDaniel, Bartolomeo Monda, John McEachern, Yesica Montesdeoca, Brian McGuinness, John Merry, Dennis McClean, Richard McCahey, Marty Messina, Amy Monroe, Kevin Meehan, Gregory Melita and Jerry C. Jr. Moore
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11992
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pc)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #9 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Jerry C. Jr. Moore, Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno. (Wang, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Richard McSpedon, Patrick McQuade, Yesica Montesdeoca, David Mills, Michael McGarry, Solomon Mitchell, Richard McCahey, James Monahan, John McKenna, Pasquale Morena, John McEachern, Anthony Modafferi, Michael McDaniel, Gregory Melita, Todd Metro, Johanny Monegro, Amanda Mogro, Michael McKenna, Cristian Morales, Philip Miano, Richard Miller, James McGarrigle, Hukm Moore, Segundo Montenegro, Robert McCarren Jr, Michael McPartland, William Meaney, Daniel McCarthy, Michael Moore, Robert Molinaro, Luis Mendizabal, Jose Montalvo, Nelson Molina, Jerry C. Jr. Moore, John Milonas, Edward McNamara, Evelyn Mercado, Ray Melcer, Michael Milmore, Edwin Morales, Peter Midgley, Robert Melendez, Scott McCarthy, Janice McDaniel, Bartolomeo Monda, John Merry, Christopher Miller, Susan Meyer, Paul Moehring, William Mincher, Jeffrey Membel, Amy Monroe, Armando Molina, Dennis McEntee, Gail Millman, Marty Messina, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, John Mazzeo, John McDonald, Mark R Mazur, Joseph Monte, Sean McNellis, Mario Moreno, Craig Mondello, Terrence McKay, Brian McKillop, Christopher Mone, Efrain Mojica, Madeline Melendez, Brian McCrodden, Noel Mitchell, Thomas Mikoleski, Nancy Mercado, Brian McGuinness, Paul Mess, Antonio Monaco Jr., John McGill, William Melendez, Eric Mendez, John McGrail, Dennis McClean, David Morales, James McCabe, Patrick Monitello, James McAlevey, John Mee, Nathaniel Moore, James McCann, Hilda Merle, Luis Mendez, Jr., Everett McCain, Farokh Mehta, Felicia Morales, Brian McAllister, William McVicar, Kevin Meehan, Luciano Melfi, Daniel McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1)(Wang, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Kevin S. Wang dated 01/02/2019 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jerry C. Jr. Moore, Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno.(Wang, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Kevin S. Wang dated 01/02/2019 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jerry C. Jr. Moore, Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno.(Wang, Kevin)
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kevin Shi Yi Wang to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 20, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 3- MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). (dnh)
December 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 20, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Shi Yi Wang. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kevin Shi Yi Wang to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Jerry C Moore Jr. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin Shi Yi Wang. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jerry C Moore Jr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING SUMMONS REQUEST - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Jerry C Moore Jr, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno. (Wang, Kevin) Modified on 12/20/2018 (dnh).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Kevin Wang dated 12/19/18 re: Request for inclusion in 03-md-1570. Document filed by Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Jerry C Moore Jr, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno.(Wang, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Kevin Wang dated 12/19/18 re: Request for inclusion in 03-md-1570. Document filed by Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Jerry C Moore Jr, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno.(Wang, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Mark R Mazur, John Mazzeo, James McAlevey, Brian McAllister, Daniel McCabe, James McCabe, Richard McCahey, Everett McCain, James McCann, Robert McCarren Jr, Daniel McCarthy, Scott McCarthy, Dennis McClean, Brian McCrodden, Janice McDaniel, Michael McDaniel, John McDonald, John McEachern, Dennis McEntee, James McGarrigle, Michael McGarry, John McGill, John McGrail, Brian McGuinness, Terrence McKay, John McKenna, Michael McKenna, Brian McKillop, Edward McNamara, Sean McNellis, Michael McPartland, Patrick McQuade, Richard McSpedon, William McVicar, William Meaney, John Mee, Kevin Meehan, Farokh Mehta, Ray Melcer, Madeline Melendez, Robert Melendez, William Melendez, Luciano Melfi, Gregory Melita, Jeffrey Membel, Eric Mendez, Luis Mendez, Jr., Luis Mendizabal, Evelyn Mercado, Nancy Mercado, Hilda Merle, John Merry, Paul Mess, Marty Messina, Todd Metro, Susan Meyer, Philip Miano, Peter Midgley, Thomas Mikoleski, Christopher Miller, Richard Miller, Gail Millman, David Mills, Michael Milmore, John Milonas, William Mincher, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, Noel Mitchell, Solomon Mitchell, Anthony Modafferi, Paul Moehring, Amanda Mogro, Efrain Mojica, Armando Molina, Nelson Molina, Robert Molinaro, Antonio Monaco Jr., James Monahan, Bartolomeo Monda, Craig Mondello, Christopher Mone, Johanny Monegro, Patrick Monitello, Amy Monroe, Jose Montalvo, Joseph Monte, Segundo Montenegro, Yesica Montesdeoca, Hukm Moore, Michael Moore, Nathaniel Moore, Jerry C Moore Jr, Cristian Morales, David Morales, Edwin Morales, Felicia Morales, Pasquale Morena, Mario Moreno.(Wang, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wang, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16082286)Document filed by Richard McSpedon, Patrick McQuade, Yesica Montesdeoca, David Mills, Michael McGarry, Solomon Mitchell, Richard McCahey, James Monahan, John McKenna, Pasquale Morena, John McEachern, Anthony Modafferi, Michael McDaniel, Gregory Melita, Todd Metro, Johanny Monegro, Amanda Mogro, Michael McKenna, Cristian Morales, Philip Miano, Richard Miller, James McGarrigle, Hukm Moore, Segundo Montenegro, Robert McCarren Jr, Michael McPartland, William Meaney, Daniel McCarthy, Michael Moore, Robert Molinaro, Luis Mendizabal, Jose Montalvo, Jerry C Moore Jr, Nelson Molina, John Milonas, Edward McNamara, Evelyn Mercado, Ray Melcer, Michael Milmore, Edwin Morales, Peter Midgley, Robert Melendez, Scott McCarthy, Janice McDaniel, Bartolomeo Monda, John Merry, Christopher Miller, Susan Meyer, Paul Moehring, William Mincher, Jeffrey Membel, Amy Monroe, Armando Molina, Dennis McEntee, Gail Millman, Marty Messina, Christopher Miro, John Mitchell, Joseph Mitchell, John Mazzeo, John McDonald, Mark R Mazur, Joseph Monte, Sean McNellis, Mario Moreno, Craig Mondello, Terrence McKay, Brian McKillop, Christopher Mone, Efrain Mojica, Madeline Melendez, Brian McCrodden, Noel Mitchell, Thomas Mikoleski, Nancy Mercado, Brian McGuinness, Paul Mess, Antonio Monaco Jr., John McGill, William Melendez, Eric Mendez, John McGrail, Dennis McClean, David Morales, James McCabe, Patrick Monitello, James McAlevey, John Mee, Nathaniel Moore, James McCann, Hilda Merle, Luis Mendez, Jr., Everett McCain, Farokh Mehta, Felicia Morales, Brian McAllister, William McVicar, Kevin Meehan, Luciano Melfi, Daniel McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Wang, Kevin) Modified on 12/20/2018 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazur et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Mess
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McEntee
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasquale Morena
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Moreno
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Modafferi
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Mondello
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Melendez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McDonald
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Mojica
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett McCain
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward McNamara
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McCarren Jr
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mills
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Melcer
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGarrigle
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCarthy
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Melendez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Merle
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Millman
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Mendizabal
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark R Mazur
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mikoleski
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Morales
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McKillop
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Miller
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McVicar
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Monaco Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Morales
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Montalvo
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Midgley
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McCarthy
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanny Monegro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mone
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Membel
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Monte
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Meaney
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McGarry
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mercado
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mincher
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Morales
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Monahan
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCann
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mee
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Milonas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Milmore
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McGrail
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McGill
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Molinaro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Montenegro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Melendez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McQuade
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Metro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McCrodden
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McAlevey
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean McNellis
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Mogro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farokh Mehta
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Moore
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Moehring
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Mercado
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Mendez, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McPartland
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McKenna
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McKenna
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Miano
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Morales
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hukm Moore
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Molina
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mendez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Monitello
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Meyer
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Molina
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCabe
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McAllister
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCabe
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McDaniel
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McSpedon
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry C Moore Jr
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luciano Melfi
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mazzeo
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence McKay
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice McDaniel
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartolomeo Monda
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McEachern
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesica Montesdeoca
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McGuinness
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Merry
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McClean
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McCahey
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Messina
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Monroe
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Meehan
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Melita
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry C. Jr. Moore
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?