Dingle v. Baggett et al
Plaintiff: Randy Dingle
Defendant: Brenda Englis, Patricia Ellen Watson Dingle, Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Elizabeth James Kilgore, David E. Moore, Jr., Joe Utley, Richard Jenkins, Larry Freeman, Larry Lancaster, Gina V. Hawkin, Maynor Connell, Nichole Hoking, Terry Ray, John Holley, Eugene Benjamin Carter, Jeffery Jerome Spivey, Megan Chavis, Talmage S. Baggett, Charles Evans, Stephen C. Stokes, Maxin Denise Melvin, Jason L. Harrell, William Rob Lewis, Bill Butler, Jessica Boon, Mark Rowden, Ronnie Mitchell, Ollie Hopkins, R. Gregg Edwards, Lieutenant Morrison, Darren R. Whitehurst, T Cooper, Deputy Murphy, Clavion Morning, Addie Lee Smallwood, James Edward Spivey, Francis Keith Spivey, Arleathia Cross, Danica Lawson Dingle, Ellen B. Hancox, W. Marshall Faircloth, Glenn C. Adams, Earl Moose Butler, Linwood Edwards, Hubert A. Peterkin, Jacquelyn Faye Carter, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Michael B. Stein, Joseph N. Callaay, Ennis W. Wright, William R. West, Jr., Linwood James, Jimmy Keefe, W. R. Darden, Deputy Walden, Jeannette M. Council, Johnnie Mack Spivey, Don William, Michael C. Boose, Natashia Dingle, Peter Ellison Dingle, William Dancy, Torry Jessup, Carl Wall, Tim Manning, Bruce Bullock, Meryl Carter Maynor, Alonzo Dingle, Benjamin James, Lee Warren, Dennis Peterson, Timothy J. Peterkin, Tardra Adams, Donald Melvin and Gina V. Hawkins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00425
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 91 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #89 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 12/16/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 90 Memorandum in Support regarding #89 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William Dancy. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William Dancy. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 88 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Dancy (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Holley. (Wood, Bradley)
November 22, 2019 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hubert A. Peterkin. (Wood, Bradley)
November 20, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Darren Whitehurst filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Statement by Mr. Dingle regarding when Mr. Whitehurst received his complaint/summons, #2 Mr. Whitehurst's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 84 Certificate of Service filed by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright regarding #79 Answer to Complaint, #78 Memorandum in Support,, #77 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (F.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) . (Mitchell, Ronnie)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Carl Wall answer due 1/19/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/19/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 19, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Carl Wall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Nichols, Bryan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Charge of Resisting Public Officer against Patricia Dingle, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 80 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #77 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (F.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)). Response due by 12/12/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Corrected Rule 12 Letter (Corrected date)) (Sellers, N.).
November 18, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 78 Memorandum in Support regarding #77 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (F.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 77 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (F.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Peterkin Oath of Office Sheriff, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.) Modified on 11/19/2019 - changed docket entry relationship. Response to The motion at #36 rather than the motion at #30 . (Sellers, N.)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Talmage S. Baggett answer due 12/16/2019; Ellen B. Hancox answer due 12/16/2019; William Rob Lewis answer due 12/16/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/18/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 74 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint filed by Talmage S. Baggett, Ellen B. Hancox, William Rob Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Anna) Modified on 11/15/2019 - changed motion type. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance filed by Anna M Davis on behalf of Talmage S. Baggett, Ellen B. Hancox, William Rob Lewis. (Davis, Anna)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jason L. Harrell answer due 12/18/2019; Tim Manning answer due 12/18/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/15/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jason L. Harrell, Tim Manning. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smalling, Kyle) Modified on 11/15/2019 - changed motion type. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 70 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tim Manning (Smalling, Kyle)
November 15, 2019 Filing 69 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason L. Harrell (Smalling, Kyle)
November 15, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle Abraham Smalling on behalf of Jason L. Harrell, Tim Manning. (Smalling, Kyle)
November 14, 2019 Filing 67 Certificate of Service filed by Carl Wall regarding #66 Notice of Appearance (Amended) Certificate of Service to include all Defendants. (Nichols, Bryan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan G. Nichols on behalf of Carl Wall. (Nichols, Bryan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 65 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 12/7/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P. O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Darren R. Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #28 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 62 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 11/30/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P. O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 61 Memorandum in Support regarding #60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gina V. Hawkins. (Whyte, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gina V. Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Whyte, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 59 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 11/29/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support regarding #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph A. Bledsoe, III. (Hooper, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph A. Bledsoe, III. (Hooper, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 56 Financial Disclosure Statement by Joseph A. Bledsoe, III (Hooper, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Heller Hooper on behalf of Joseph A. Bledsoe, III. (Hooper, Thomas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 54 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #52 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/23/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 53 Memorandum in Support regarding #52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley, Lee Warren. (Hasty, Robert)
October 30, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley, Lee Warren. (Hasty, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 51 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 11/22/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian F. Castro on behalf of John Holley. (Castro, Brian)
October 29, 2019 Filing 49 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Holley (Wood, Bradley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance filed by Bradley Owen Wood on behalf of John Holley. (Wood, Bradley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 47 Memorandum in Support regarding #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Holley. (Wood, Bradley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Holley. (Wood, Bradley)
October 28, 2019 Filing 45 Financial Disclosure Statement by Timothy J. Peterkin (Marshall, Antoine)
October 28, 2019 Filing 44 Document: Certified Mail Receipts filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts "All 3 refuse to Accept", #2 Certified Mail Receipts, #3 Certified Mail Receipts, #4 Certified Mail Receipts, #5 Certified Mail Receipts "Both Refuse to Accept", #6 Certified Mail Receipts, #7 Certified Mail Receipts "Refuse" "Delivery Attempted" "??? Delivery Attempted", #8 Certified Mail Receipts, #9 Certified Mail Receipts, #10 Certified Mail Receipts "Refuse, Refuse, Return", #11 Certified Mail Receipt, #12 Certified Mail Receipt, #13 Certified Mail Receipts, #14 USPS Receipts, #15 USPS Receipts, #16 USPS Receipts, #17 USPS Receipts) (Sellers, N.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 43 Document: Copies of envelopes returned to Mr. Dingle filed by Randy Dingle. (Sellers, N.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 42 Document: Proof of Service as to Glenn Adams, Jimmy Keefe, W. Marsall Faircloth, Jeffrey Jerome Spivy, Larry Lancaster, Charles Evans, John Holley, Ronnie Mitchell, Sheriff Department Ennis W. Wright, Torry Jessup, Joe Utley, Francis Keith Sprivey, Michael C. Boose, and Jeannette M. Council filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 41 Document: Letter to Mr. Derrenbacher filed by Randy Dingle. (Sellers, N.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 39 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 11/18/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 38 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hubert A. Peterkin (Wood, Bradley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support regarding #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hubert A. Peterkin. (Wood, Bradley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hubert A. Peterkin. (Wood, Bradley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Bradley Owen Wood on behalf of Hubert A. Peterkin. (Wood, Bradley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian F. Castro on behalf of Hubert A. Peterkin. (Castro, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 33 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #30 First MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of answer. Response due by 11/16/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer. Response due by 11/15/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support of motion to dismiss in lieu of answer filed by Timothy J. Peterkin. (Marshall, Antoine)
October 23, 2019 Filing 30 First MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of answer filed by Timothy J. Peterkin. (Marshall, Antoine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support regarding #28 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer filed by Torry Jessup. (Congleton, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer filed by Torry Jessup. (Congleton, John)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gina V. Hawkins answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/22/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 22, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Regarding Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Regarding Complaint filed by Gina V. Hawkin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time) (Whyte, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Service filed by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright regarding #24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,, #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint . (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tardra Adams answer due 11/18/2019; Jessica Boon answer due 11/18/2019; Earl Moose Butler answer due 11/18/2019; T Cooper answer due 11/18/2019; Brenda Englis answer due 11/18/2019; Nichole Hoking answer due 11/18/2019; Richard Jenkins answer due 11/18/2019; Mickey Locklear answer due 11/18/2019; Sergeant Manning answer due 11/18/2019; Ronnie Mitchell answer due 11/18/2019; Clavion Morning answer due 11/18/2019; Lieutenant Morrison answer due 11/18/2019; Deputy Murphy answer due 11/18/2019; Dennis Peterson answer due 11/18/2019; Terry Ray answer due 11/18/2019; Deputy Walden answer due 11/18/2019; Don William answer due 11/18/2019; Ennis W. Wright answer due 11/18/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/18/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P. O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gina V. Hawkin (Whyte, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Rose Whyte on behalf of Gina V. Hawkin. (Whyte, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PDF of Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Deputy Walden, Don William, Ennis W. Wright. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Glenn C. Adams answer due 11/12/2019; Michael C. Boose answer due 11/12/2019; Jeannette M. Council answer due 11/12/2019; Charles Evans answer due 11/12/2019; W. Marshall Faircloth answer due 11/12/2019; Jimmy Keefe answer due 11/12/2019; Larry Lancaster answer due 11/12/2019; Joe Utley answer due 11/12/2019; Lee Warren answer due 11/12/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P.O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of Ennis W. Wright. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 17, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Order regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint Order for Extension of time filed by Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley, Lee Warren. (Hasty, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley, Lee Warren. (Hasty, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert A. Hasty, Jr on behalf of Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley, Lee Warren. (Hasty, Robert) Modified on 10/16/2019 - Removed Talmage Baggett as a filer. (Sellers, N.)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Antoine Marshall on behalf of Timothy J. Peterkin. (Marshall, Antoine)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Service filed by Torry Jessup regarding #12 Notice of Appearance . (Congleton, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by John W. Congleton on behalf of Torry Jessup. (Congleton, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 10/31/2019. Sent to Randy Dingle at P. O. Box 9485 Fayetteville, NC 28312 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael B. Stein. (Stein, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael B. Stein. (Stein, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael B. Stein (Stein, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Barry Stein on behalf of Michael B. Stein. (Stein, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Case reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III. (Hockaday, A.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-425-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/27/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Randy Dingle, P. O. Box 9485, Fayetteville, NC 28312.) (Collins, S.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glenn C. Adams, Tardra Adams, Talmage S. Baggett, Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Michael C. Boose, Bruce Bullock, Bill Butler, Earl Moose Butler, Joseph N. Callaay, Eugene Benjamin Carter, Jacquelyn Faye Carter, Megan Chavis, Maynor Connell, T Cooper, Jeannette M. Council, Arleathia Cross, William Dancy, W. R. Darden, Alonzo Dingle, Danica Lawson Dingle, Natashia Dingle, Patricia Ellen Watson Dingle, Linwood Edwards, R. Gregg Edwards, Brenda Englis, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Larry Freeman, Ellen B. Hancox, Jason L. Harrell, Gina V. Hawkin, Nichole Hoking, John Holley, Benjamin James, Linwood James, Richard Jenkins, Torry Jessup, Jimmy Keefe, Elizabeth James Kilgore, Larry Lancaster, William Rob Lewis, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Tim Manning, Meryl Carter Maynor, Donald Melvin, Maxin Denise Melvin, Ronnie Mitchell, David E. Moore, Jr, Clavion Morning, Lieutenant Morrison, Deputy Murphy, Hubert A. Peterkin, Timothy J. Peterkin, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Mark Rowden, Addie Lee Smallwood, Francis Keith Spivey, James Edward Spivey, Jeffery Jerome Spivey, Johnnie Mack Spivey, Michael B. Stein, Stephen C. Stokes, Joe Utley, Deputy Walden, Carl Wall, Lee Warren, William R. West, Jr, Darren R. Whitehurst, Don William, Ennis W. Wright. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Randy Dingle. (Rudd, D.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Randy Dingle. (Rudd, D.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number RAL074313), filed by Randy Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dingle v. Baggett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Englis
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ellen Watson Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III
Represented By: Thomas Heller Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth James Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Utley
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jenkins
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lancaster
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina V. Hawkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maynor Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Hoking
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Ray
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Holley
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Represented By: Bradley Owen Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Benjamin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Jerome Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Chavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talmage S. Baggett
Represented By: Anna M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Evans
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxin Denise Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason L. Harrell
Represented By: Kyle Abraham Smalling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rob Lewis
Represented By: Anna M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Boon
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Mitchell
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gregg Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Morrison
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren R. Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Cooper
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Murphy
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clavion Morning
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addie Lee Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edward Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Keith Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arleathia Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danica Lawson Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen B. Hancox
Represented By: Anna M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Marshall Faircloth
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn C. Adams
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Moose Butler
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linwood Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert A. Peterkin
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Represented By: Bradley Owen Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Faye Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Locklear
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Manning
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Stein
Represented By: Michael Barry Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N. Callaay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis W. Wright
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. West, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linwood James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Keefe
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. R. Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Walden
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette M. Council
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Mack Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don William
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Boose
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natashia Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ellison Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dancy
Represented By: Christopher J. Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torry Jessup
Represented By: John W. Congleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Wall
Represented By: Bryan G. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Manning
Represented By: Kyle Abraham Smalling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meryl Carter Maynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Warren
Represented By: Robert A. Hasty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Peterson
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Peterkin
Represented By: Antoine Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tardra Adams
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina V. Hawkins
Represented By: Michael Rose Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?