Disability Rights NC v. North Carolina Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Disability Rights NC
Defendant: North Carolina Board of Elections, Jeff Carmon, III, Karen Brinson Bell, Damon Circosta, Stella Anderson, Tommy Tucker and Stacy Eggers, IV
Case Number: 5:2021cv00361
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/2/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 2, 2021 REMINDER TO COUNSEL. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support regarding #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Steed, Terence)
November 1, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Steed, Terence)
October 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Steed, Terence)
October 1, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
October 1, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including November 1, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/1/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tommy Tucker (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stacy Eggers, IV (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Damon Circosta (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Damon Circosta (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeff Carmon, III (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina Board of Elections (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Karen Brinson Bell (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stella Anderson (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Steed, Terence)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Complaint, Summonses, Notices of Appearance, Corporate Disclosure filed by Disability Rights NC served on Defendants on 9/10/21. (Grafstein, Lisa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Holly Anne Stiles on behalf of Disability Rights NC. (Stiles, Holly)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Disability Rights NC (Grafstein, Lisa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Grafstein on behalf of Disability Rights NC. (Grafstein, Lisa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT L65 5:21-cv-361 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6222766.), filed by Disability Rights NC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for North Carolina State Board of Elections, #3 Proposed Summons Summons For D. Circosta, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for J. Cameron, #5 Proposed Summons Summons for K.B. Bell, #6 Proposed Summons Summons for S. Anderson, #7 Proposed Summons Summons for S. Eggers, #8 Proposed Summons Summons for T. Tucker) (Grafstein, Lisa)
September 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that when adding parties at case opening not to use all caps for names or party text information. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Disability Rights NC v. North Carolina Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights NC
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Board of Elections
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carmon, III
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Circosta
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Tucker
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Eggers, IV
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?