JOHNSON et al v. TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ABARA JOHNSON, ANN HAYES, ANNIE SCOTT, ARSENIO NICHOLSON, ASHLEY STEVENS, BOBBY MARTIN, CARLA RANSOME, CATELYN CAUSBY, CEDRIC GERALD, CHARLES DEWBERRY, CHELSEY WILCOX, CHERI MILLER, CIERRA ROBINSON, CLARINE BROOKS, CORISSA STEELE, CORY SIMMONS, CURTIS ODOM, DERRICK FREEMAN, DONAIL HOBBS, FELICIA TOWNSEND, FERNANDO PEREZ, JASMINE MILLER, JEFFREY BLANTON, JEFFREY LEWIS, JENNIFER MOORE, JENNIFER MULLIS, JESSICA LOCKET, JOHN FREUDENBERG, KATARI MILLER, KENDRA MILLER, KENZIE LEWIS, KIMBERLY JACKSON, LARRY NEWKIRK, LASANDRA COBB, LATASHA DAVIS, MARCO STOCKS, MARCUS SHINN, MARY ALBRITTON, PATRICIA ARNETTE, RICKY JACKSON, RICKY STOWE, ROSE BARTON, SABRINA RICHARDSON, SAMANTHA INZAR, SHALATHIA GARRIS, SHARILYN RATLIFF, SHERLAND MCDUFFIE, TARREA HALL, TEREZ MITCHELL, THERESA MCNEIL, TIFFANY HALL, TONYA JOHNSON, TRENA ELLIS, TUNYA WISE, TYRONZIA CHAPMAN, UTEA WILLIAMS, VICTOR GAVIN, VINCENT AIKEN, VIRGINIA MANNING, WHITNEY CHAVIS, WILLIAM TAYLOR, WILLIE COXE and YASMINE MCMILLAN
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC. and TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00807
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Motion Referred RE: #19 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Jurisdictional) to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Marsh, Keah)
October 26, 2023 Oral Motion made by both parties at Motion Hearing in case 19cv489 on 10/26/23 with Judge Webster to continue Initial Pretrial Conference in this matter currently set for 11/21/23 in Durham until ruling on dispositive motions.. (Garrett, Kim)
October 26, 2023 ORAL ORDER issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/26/23 at motion hearing in case 19cv489, granting Oral Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference currently set for 11/21/23 until further notice. (Garrett, Kim)
October 24, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff ABARA JOHNSON, to Response to #19 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by ABARA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BROWN, ANDREW)
October 23, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Based on the representations to the Court and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion to Dismiss is extended until the Court can enter a scheduling order or thirty (30) days after the Court denies the request for jurisdictional discovery, whichever is later. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/23/2023.(Lee, Pedra)
October 19, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC re #22 Response to Motion. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 19, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Defendants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC re #20 Memorandum, filed by DONAIL HOBBS, ANN HAYES, SHERLAND MCDUFFIE, CATELYN CAUSBY, SAMANTHA INZAR, VINCENT AIKEN, ROSE BARTON, MARY ALBRITTON, WILLIAM TAYLOR, TONYA JOHNSON, LATASHA DAVIS, CURTIS ODOM, TEREZ MITCHELL, CHERI MILLER, THERESA MCNEIL, LARRY NEWKIRK, PATRICIA ARNETTE, WILLIE COXE, TIFFANY HALL, MARCO STOCKS, UTEA WILLIAMS, TRENA ELLIS, KENZIE LEWIS, WHITNEY CHAVIS, CARLA RANSOME, JENNIFER MULLIS, CORISSA STEELE, JOHN FREUDENBERG, ABARA JOHNSON, CHELSEY WILCOX, LASANDRA COBB, KENDRA MILLER, YASMINE MCMILLAN, TUNYA WISE, TARREA HALL, ASHLEY STEVENS, SHARILYN RATLIFF, FELICIA TOWNSEND, CORY SIMMONS, CIERRA ROBINSON, VICTOR GAVIN, SABRINA RICHARDSON, ARSENIO NICHOLSON, CEDRIC GERALD, JESSICA LOCKET, KIMBERLY JACKSON, MARCUS SHINN, RICKY STOWE, RICKY JACKSON, DERRICK FREEMAN, JENNIFER MOORE, TYRONZIA CHAPMAN, FERNANDO PEREZ, KATARI MILLER, SHALATHIA GARRIS, ANNIE SCOTT, BOBBY MARTIN, CLARINE BROOKS, CHARLES DEWBERRY, JASMINE MILLER, JEFFREY BLANTON, VIRGINIA MANNING, JEFFREY LEWIS, #19 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by DONAIL HOBBS, ANN HAYES, SHERLAND MCDUFFIE, CATELYN CAUSBY, SAMANTHA INZAR, VINCENT AIKEN, ROSE BARTON, MARY ALBRITTON, WILLIAM TAYLOR, TONYA JOHNSON, LATASHA DAVIS, CURTIS ODOM, TEREZ MITCHELL, CHERI MILLER, THERESA MCNEIL, LARRY NEWKIRK, PATRICIA ARNETTE, WILLIE COXE, TIFFANY HALL, MARCO STOCKS, UTEA WILLIAMS, TRENA ELLIS, KENZIE LEWIS, WHITNEY CHAVIS, CARLA RANSOME, JENNIFER MULLIS, CORISSA STEELE, JOHN FREUDENBERG, ABARA JOHNSON, CHELSEY WILCOX, LASANDRA COBB, KENDRA MILLER, YASMINE MCMILLAN, TUNYA WISE, TARREA HALL, ASHLEY STEVENS, SHARILYN RATLIFF, FELICIA TOWNSEND, CORY SIMMONS, CIERRA ROBINSON, VICTOR GAVIN, SABRINA RICHARDSON, JESSICA LOCKET, CEDRIC GERALD, ARSENIO NICHOLSON, KIMBERLY JACKSON, MARCUS SHINN, RICKY STOWE, RICKY JACKSON, JENNIFER MOORE, DERRICK FREEMAN, TYRONZIA CHAPMAN, KATARI MILLER, FERNANDO PEREZ, SHALATHIA GARRIS, BOBBY MARTIN, ANNIE SCOTT, CLARINE BROOKS, CHARLES DEWBERRY, JEFFREY BLANTON, JASMINE MILLER, VIRGINIA MANNING, JEFFREY LEWIS filed by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC. Replies due by 11/2/2023 (WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 16, 2023 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, ANDREW) Modified on 10/17/2023 to modify and remove duplicate text. (Garland, Leah)
October 16, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in support of #19 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (BROWN, ANDREW) Modified on 10/17/2023 to modify docket text. (Garland, Leah)
October 16, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Response to Motion due by 10/30/2023. (BROWN, ANDREW) Modified on 10/17/2023 to modify docket text. (Garland, Leah)
October 16, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Marsh, Keah)
October 6, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Subject to Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Christopher Dunn)(WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. Response to Motion due by 10/27/2023 (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/21/2023 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
September 28, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Complaint, by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney STACEY GILMAN on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3659054.) (GILMAN, STACEY)
September 25, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney LAUREN TALLENT on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3658981.) (TALLENT, LAUREN)
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANTHONY DURONE on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3658961.) (DURONE, ANTHONY)
September 25, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Bowers, Alexis)
September 25, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Bowers, Alexis)
September 25, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Bowers, Alexis)
September 22, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (State Court documents originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23cvs7279, issued on 08/16/2023, listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis)
September 22, 2023 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LARRY NEWKIRK, KIMBERLY JACKSON, FERNANDO PEREZ, YASMINE MCMILLAN, CARLA RANSOME, JENNIFER MULLIS, DERRICK FREEMAN, CORY SIMMONS, SAMANTHA INZAR, TYRONZIA CHAPMAN, JESSICA LOCKET, VICTOR GAVIN, WILLIAM TAYLOR, FELICIA TOWNSEND, CHARLES DEWBERRY, KENZIE LEWIS, LATASHA DAVIS, CHELSEY WILCOX, TARREA HALL, KATARI MILLER, THERESA MCNEIL, PATRICIA ARNETTE, RICKY STOWE, CHERI MILLER, VINCENT AIKEN, CORISSA STEELE, TONYA JOHNSON, WHITNEY CHAVIS, UTEA WILLIAMS, SHALATHIA GARRIS, DONAIL HOBBS, WILLIE COXE, TUNYA WISE, ANN HAYES, CURTIS ODOM, ABARA JOHNSON, KENDRA MILLER, JENNIFER MOORE, JOHN FREUDENBERG, RICKY JACKSON, CLARINE BROOKS, VIRGINIA MANNING, TEREZ MITCHELL, JEFFREY LEWIS, TRENA ELLIS, ROSE BARTON, JASMINE MILLER, SHARILYN RATLIFF, JEFFREY BLANTON, CIERRA ROBINSON, BOBBY MARTIN, ANNIE SCOTT, MARCO STOCKS, TIFFANY HALL, CEDRIC GERALD, SHERLAND MCDUFFIE, CATELYN CAUSBY, MARY ALBRITTON, ARSENIO NICHOLSON, LASANDRA COBB, MARCUS SHINN, SABRINA RICHARDSON, ASHLEY STEVENS. (State Court documents originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23cvs7279, listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal)(Bowers, Alexis)
September 22, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE HOLDINGS, INC. for TMX FINANCE LLC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 22, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE LLC for TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 22, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE, LLC for TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE, LLC for TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE LLC for TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE LLC for TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 9/22/2023 to correct the party name of who the corporate parent is for. (Bowers, Alexis)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE LLC for TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23cvs7279 against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3657798.)(Related Case # 19-cv-489, 19-cv-490, 22-cv-971, 23-cv-408, 22-cv-833, 23-cv-34, 23-cv-246), filed by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 9/22/2023 to add state court information. (Bowers, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON et al v. TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABARA JOHNSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN HAYES
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE SCOTT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARSENIO NICHOLSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY STEVENS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY MARTIN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA RANSOME
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATELYN CAUSBY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDRIC GERALD
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES DEWBERRY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHELSEY WILCOX
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERI MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIERRA ROBINSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARINE BROOKS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORISSA STEELE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY SIMMONS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS ODOM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK FREEMAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONAIL HOBBS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA TOWNSEND
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO PEREZ
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINE MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY BLANTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY LEWIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MOORE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MULLIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA LOCKET
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FREUDENBERG
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATARI MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDRA MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENZIE LEWIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY JACKSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY NEWKIRK
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASANDRA COBB
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATASHA DAVIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCO STOCKS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS SHINN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ALBRITTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ARNETTE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY JACKSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY STOWE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE BARTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA RICHARDSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA INZAR
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHALATHIA GARRIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARILYN RATLIFF
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERLAND MCDUFFIE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARREA HALL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEREZ MITCHELL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA MCNEIL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY HALL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA JOHNSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRENA ELLIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUNYA WISE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONZIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTEA WILLIAMS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR GAVIN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT AIKEN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA MANNING
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITNEY CHAVIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TAYLOR
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE COXE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASMINE MCMILLAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE LLC
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?