Moore v. Lassiter et al
Plaintiff: Benson Moore
Defendant: FNU Slater, FNU Ayscue, Norma Melton, FNU Hubett, Kenneth Lassiter, Jeffery Patane, FNU Grindstaff, Dora Plummer, FNU Williams, Tierra Catlett, FNU Shepard, J. Campbell, Mike Slagle, Joshua McKinney, John Doe 2, Valerie Johns, Kevin Chung, Joseph Valliere, Katy Poole, George Soleman, Charlotte Evans, FNU Davis, Kella Phillips, Trisha Jordan, Francis Labore, Robert Mask, John Doe 3, Dexter Gibbs, Brandon Barrier, Carol Bosholm, Ruth Long, Paula Smith, Melanie Alvarado, Jane Doe 1, Clarence Ellis, FNU Richardson and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2020cv00058
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns on 2/24/20. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth)
February 24, 2020 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 2 (rth)
February 24, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. (rth)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00774. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
February 21, 2020 NOTICE of Manual Mailing #12 ORDER AND JUDGMENT in paper form from the Clerk's Office addressed to BENSON MOORE, #0584589, MOUNTAINVIEW CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 545 AMITY PARK ROAD, SPRUCE PINE, NC 28777. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 2/21/2020. The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation and the claims in the complaint related to the plaintiff's transfer from Piedmont Correctional Institution to Mountain Correctional Institution, violations of 18 U.S.C. 242, violations of "State Statute 735-40.7(5) and 90.22.21(A)," and alleged failures to comply with health service policies of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. All claims related to Defendants Paula Smith, Dora Plummer, George Solomon, Joseph Valliere, Katy Poole, Nurse Richardson, Carol Bosholm, Kevin Chung, Jane Doe #1, John Doe #1, Francis Labore, Melanie Alvardo, Ruth Long, Nurse Williams, Valerie Johns, Clarence Ellis, Doctor Davis, Charlotte Evans, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Nurse Ayscue, Nurse Hubett, and Nurse John Doe #1 are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The remaining claims against defendants Kenneth Lassiter, Tierra Catlett, Trisha Jordan, Mike Slagle, Dexter Gibbs, Robert Mask, Norma Melton, Kella Phillips, Ms. Slater, Donald Grindstaff, Jeffrey Patane, Brandon Barrier, Sergeant Shepard, Joshua McKinney, or Nurse J. Campbell are not dismissed but are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina for all further proceedings. The plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint (Doc. #11 ) is DENIED without prejudice to it being raised in the Western District after transfer. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Case no longer referred to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Update #2 Complaint, filed by BENSON MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
February 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED RE: #10 Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, #8 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #8 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff BENSON MOORE. Response to Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)[Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 NOTICE of Manual Mailing re #8 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, #9 Notice of Mailing Recommendation, in paper form from the Clerk's Office to BENSON MOORE 0584589 MOUNTAINVIEW CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 545 AMITY PARK ROAD SPRUCE PINE, NC 28777. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2020. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 1/27/2020. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/09/2020. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/09/2020; that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. IT IS RECOMMENDED that claims in the Complaint related to Plaintiff's transfer from Piedmont Correctional Institution to Mountain Correctional Institution, violations of 18 U.S.C. 242, violations of "State Statute 735-40.7(5) and 90.22.21(A)," and alleged failures to comply with health service policies of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A for being frivolous or malicious or for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that all claims related to Defendants Paula Smith, Dora Plummer, George Solomon, Joseph Valliere, Katy Poole, Nurse Richardson, Carol Bosholm, Kevin Chung, Jane Doe #1, John Doe #1, Francis Labore, Melanie Alvardo, Ruth Long, Nurse Williams, Valerie Johns, Clarence Ellis, Doctor Davis, Charlotte Evans, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Nurse Ayscue, Nurse Hubett, and Nurse John Doe #1 be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A for being frivolous or malicious or for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this action not be dismissed as to any remaining claims against Defendants Kenneth Lassiter, Tierra Catlett, Trisha Jordan, Mike Slagle, Dexter Gibbs, Robert Mask, Norma Melton, Kella Phillips, Ms. Slater, Donald Grindstaff, Jeffrey Patane, Brandon Barrier, Sergeant Shepard, Joshua McKinney, or Nurse J. Campbell, but that the claims against them, which are the only claims remaining in the case, be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina for all further proceedings. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Case no longer referred for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 31, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION entitled "Motion to overcome the Affidavit of Merit Requirement under the Common Knowledge Rule" filed by BENSON MOORE. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by BENSON MOORE. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION entitled "Declaration in support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction" filed by Plaintiff BENSON MOORE. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM entitled "Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction" filed by Plaintiff BENSON MOORE. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION entitled "Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order" filed by BENSON MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BENSON MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by BENSON MOORE. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 2/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Lassiter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ayscue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hubett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Patane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Grindstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Slagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Valliere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Soleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kella Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Labore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mask
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Barrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Bosholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?