Torres v. Ishee, et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres
Defendant: Mark Ervin, Greg Swink, FNU Bullis, Todd Ishee, FNU Suttles, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, David Cothron, Ben Carver and FNU Suttle
Case Number: 1:2021cv00068
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (rhf) Modified file date on 4/29/2021 (rhf).
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (rhf)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres regarding Grievance. (Attachments: #1 Grievance, #2 Envelope)(rhf)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 04/08/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Miscellaneous Filing by Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. Re: Attaching Two-Step Responses to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Freedom of Information Act Request, #2 Grievance Forms, #3 Envelope) (hms)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kby)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by NCDPS on behalf of Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. (hms)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Bullis, Ben Carver, David Cothron, Mark Ervin, Todd Ishee, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, FNU Suttles, Greg Swink, filed by Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Envelope) (hms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Ishee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Swink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bullis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Suttles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cothron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Suttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Anthony Lee Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?