Indiana, State of et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of, North Dakota, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Idaho, State of, Iowa, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, Commonwealth of and Wyoming, State of
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Troy A. Miller, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Tae Johnson, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Raul Ortiz, U.S. Border Patrol, Merrick Garland, U.S. Department of Justice, David Neal and Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv00106
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants' Answer due by 9/06/2023. (BG)
July 24, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, (Unopposed) by Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States of America, Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U.S. Border Patrol, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Shinners, Katherine)
July 24, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Shinners on behalf of All Defendants (Shinners, Katherine)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Theodore J. Wold. (sc)
June 23, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Theodore J. Wold (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2692526) by Idaho, State of. (sc)
June 16, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Turner on behalf of Idaho, State of (Turner, Joshua)
June 15, 2023 Filing 47 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Alaska, State of. (jb)
June 15, 2023 Filing 46 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Missouri, State of. (jb)
June 13, 2023 Filing 45 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Utah, State of. (jb)
June 13, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Bates on behalf of Utah, State of (Bates, Christopher)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cori M. Mills. (sc)
June 12, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cori M. Mills (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2687002) by Alaska, State of. (Mills, Cori) Modified to add receipt number on 6/12/2023 (sc).
June 12, 2023 Filing 41 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oklahoma, State of. (mf)
June 12, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Lanahan on behalf of Missouri, State of (Lanahan, Maria)
June 12, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Divine on behalf of Missouri, State of (Divine, Joshua)
June 12, 2023 Filing 38 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Indiana, State of. (mf)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Robison. (sc)
June 9, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher A. Robison (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2684563) by Alaska, State of. (sc)
June 8, 2023 Filing 35 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Montana, State of. (jb)
June 8, 2023 Filing 34 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Iowa, State of. (jb)
June 8, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph David Spate on behalf of South Carolina, State of (Spate, Joseph)
June 6, 2023 Filing 32 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Wyoming, State of. (cjs)
June 5, 2023 Filing 31 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Virginia, Commonwealth of. (jb)
June 5, 2023 Filing 30 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kentucky, Commonwealth of. (jb)
June 5, 2023 Filing 29 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by New Hampshire, State of. (jb)
June 5, 2023 Filing 28 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Mississippi, State of. (jb)
June 5, 2023 Filing 27 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by North Dakota, State of. (jb)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
June 2, 2023 Filing 25 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Tennessee, State of. (mf)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin L. Matheny. (sc)
June 2, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin L. Matheny (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2681847) by Mississippi, State of. (Matheny, Justin) Modified to add receipt number on 6/2/2023 (sc).
June 2, 2023 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Notice of Direct Assignment as to Alaska, State of #7 and Idaho, State of #10 set for 6/15/2023 is CANCELLED. (sc)
June 2, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT as Alaska and #10 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT as to Idaho. Clerk's office restricted access. Parties are not yet represented. (sc)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Wyoming, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Virginia, Commonwealth of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Utah, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tennessee, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to South Carolina, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Oklahoma, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to New Hampshire, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Montana, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Missouri, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mississippi, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kentucky, Commonwealth of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Iowa, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 10 *RESTRICTED - PARTY NOT REPRESENTED YET* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Idaho, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb) Modified to restrict access on 6/2/2023 (sc).
June 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Florida, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Arkansas, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED - PARTY NOT REPRESENTED YET* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alaska, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb) Modified to restrict access on 6/2/2023 (sc).
June 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to North Dakota, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Indiana, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2023. (jb)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Manley. (sj)
June 1, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc Manley (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2680591) by Kentucky, Commonwealth of. (Manley, Marc) Modified on 6/1/2023 to add receipt number. (sj).
June 1, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States of America, Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U.S. Border Patrol, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jb)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States of America, Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U.S. Border Patrol, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001151) filed by Virginia, Commonwealth of, Indiana, State of, Montana, State of, Missouri, State of, South Carolina, State of, Mississippi, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Idaho, State of, Utah, State of, Iowa, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Tennessee, State of, Arkansas, State of, North Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of, Florida, State of, Alaska, State of. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana, State of et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Represented By: Betsy M DeNardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Philip Axt
Represented By: Drew H. Wrigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Represented By: Christopher Robison
Represented By: Cori Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho, State of
Represented By: Theodore J. Wold
Represented By: Joshua N. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Eric H Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky, Commonwealth of
Represented By: Marc Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi, State of
Represented By: Justin L. Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Represented By: Maria Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Brandon F. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Audrey A Weaver
Represented By: Garry M. Gaskins, II
Represented By: Gentner F Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Represented By: Joseph David Spate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee, State of
Represented By: Clark Lassiter Hildabrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah, State of
Represented By: Melissa Holyoak
Represented By: Christopher Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia, Commonwealth of
Represented By: Andrew N. Ferguson
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Ryan Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy A. Miller
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Ortiz
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Border Patrol
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neal
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States of America
Represented By: Christina P. Greer
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?