Adams County et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Elmore County, Boise County, Latah County, Blaine County, Owyhee County, Adams County, Bonneville County, Cassia County, Caribou County, Payette County and Minidoka County
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., H. D. Smith Holding Company, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Kroger Co., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Miami-Luken Inc, Walmart Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Walgreen Co., Rite Aid of Maryland, Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Anda, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Albertsons LLC, Auburn Pharmaceutical Company, Thrifty Payless, Inc., Smith's Food & Drug, Inc. d/b/a Peyton's Phoenix, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics, Henry Schein, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SpecGX LLC and KVK-Tech, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op46062
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Service Acknowledged by Richard Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, and David Sackler; Beverly Sackler, Richard Sackler, and Jonathan Sackler as trustees of the Raymond Sackler Trust on 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hanly, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 Service Acknowledged by Stuart Baker on Stuart Baker filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hanly, Paul)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Gretchen N. Miller filed by on behalf of SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics. (Miller, Gretchen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics. (Citera, Francis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Francis A. Citera filed by on behalf of SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics. (Citera, Francis)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Gretchen N. Miller filed by on behalf of Albertsons LLC. (Miller, Gretchen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Albertsons LLC. (Citera, Francis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Francis A. Citera filed by on behalf of Albertsons LLC. (Citera, Francis)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Albertsons LLC, Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Auburn Pharmaceutical Company, Insys Therapeutics Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Smith's Food & Drug, Inc. d/b/a Peyton's Phoenix, SpecGX LLC, SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics, Thrifty Payless, Inc.. (P,R)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hanly, Paul)
May 9, 2019 Party Omnicare Distribution Center LLC added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hanly, Paul)
May 9, 2019 Party KVK-Tech, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., SpecGX LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics, Albertsons LLC, Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Auburn Pharmaceutical Company, Henry Schein, Inc., Smith's Food & Drug, Inc. d/b/a Peyton's Phoenix and Thrifty Payless, Inc. added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hanly, Paul)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Amended complaint Short Form against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) KVK Tech, Inc. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. Sandoz, Inc. SpecGX LLC West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics Albertsons LLC Anda, Inc. Associated Pharmacies Auburn Pharmaceutical Henry Schein Inc. Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. Thrifty Payless Beverly Sackler David A. Sackler Ilene Sackler Lefcourt Jonathan D. Sackler Kathe A. Sackler Mortimer D. A. Sackler Richard S. Sackler Theresa Sackler Stuart Baker Raymond Sackler Trust Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L. P. Rhodes Technologies Rhodes Technologies Inc. P.F. Laboratories, Inc. Filed by Adams County. (Hanly, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation & Order of dismissal or defendant Miami-Luken Inc. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/22/19. (P,R)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal of Miami-Luken, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hanly, Paul)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Idaho. Case number 1:18-cv-00360. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of Ohio re MDL No. 2804 CTO-53 (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) [Transferred from idd on 9/13/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER- CTO-53 re MDL No. 2804 by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Text Only Entry Minute Order)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) [Transferred from idd on 9/13/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1774163.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Jarom) [Transferred from idd on 9/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams County et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons LLC
Represented By: Francis A. Citera
Represented By: Gretchen N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug, Inc. d/b/a Peyton's Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics
Represented By: Francis A. Citera
Represented By: Gretchen N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmore County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boise County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latah County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owyhee County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonneville County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassia County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribou County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payette County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minidoka County
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?