Obergefell et al v. Kasich et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: James Obergefell and John Arthur
Defendant: John Kasich, Mike DeWine and Camille Jones
Case Number: 1:2013cv00501
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 78 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of filing transcripts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. July 22nd Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B. October 30th Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C. December 18th Hearing Transcript) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
April 16, 2014 77 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 68 Notice of Appeal filed by Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. substituting Lance D. Himes, Interim Director of the Ohio Department of Health, for Theodore Wymyslo as appellant. (sct1)
March 24, 2014 76 NOTICE by Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. re 66 Permanent Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Dr. Theodore Wymyslo) (Coontz, Bridget)
March 21, 2014 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Stackpole for Defendant Camille Jones (Stackpole, Peter)
February 13, 2014 74 Transcript of Proceedings (Motion to Dismiss) held on Wednesday, October 30, 2013, before Judge Timothy S. Black. 34 Pages. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jodie Perkins (Official), Telephone number 513-564-7500. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 3/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2014. (mr1)
February 10, 2014 73 Transcript of Proceedings (Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction) held on Wednesday, December 18, 2013, before Judge Timothy S. Black. 60 pages. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jodie Perkins (Official), Telephone number 513-564-7500. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (mr1)
February 7, 2014 72 Transcript of Proceedings (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) held on Monday, July 22, 2013, before Judge Timothy S. Black. 45 Pages. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jodie Perkins (Official), Telephone number 513-564-7500. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (mr1)
February 7, 2014 71 NOTICE by Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. re 70 MOTION for Attorney Fees Agreed Stay of Plaintiffs' Motion (Coontz, Bridget)
February 6, 2014 70 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell. (Attachments: # 1 Gerhardstein Declaration, # 2 Branch Declaration, # 3 Meeks Declaration) (Branch, Jennifer)
February 6, 2014 69 Transcript of Proceedings (Informal Status Conference) held on Friday, July 19, 2013, before Judge Timothy S. Black. 15 pages. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary Ann Ranz (Official), Telephone number 513-564-7500. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 2/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2014. (mr1)
January 17, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 100CIN021028 re 68 Notice of Appeal filed by Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. (lk)
January 16, 2014 68 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D.. Filing fee $ 505. (Coontz, Bridget)
December 23, 2013 67 CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING FINAL ORDER 65 AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION 66 . (mr1)
December 23, 2013 66 DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/23/2013. (mr1)
December 23, 2013 65 Featured Case FINAL ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/23/2013. (mr1)
December 20, 2013 64 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Kitchen v. Herbert-Supplemental Authority) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
December 18, 2013 Minute entry: This civil action came before the Court on oral argument re: Motion for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment (Doc. 53 ) on 12/18/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys Al Gerhardstein, Jacklyn Martin, Lisa Meeks and Jennifer Branch appeared with Plaintiffs James Obergefell, David Michener and Robert Grunn. Attorneys Bridget Coontz, Zachery Keller and Ryan Richard appeared on behalf of the State of Ohio Defendants. Attorney Aaron Herzig appeared on behalf of the City of Cincinnati Defendants. Arguments were heard. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
December 16, 2013 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L. Richardson for Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. (Richardson, Ryan)
December 9, 2013 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Whitewood Order, # 2 Exhibit B-Excerpt of Perry Trial Transcript) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
November 26, 2013 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER: This civil action is before the Court on Amicus Citizens for Community Values' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae (Doc. 60 ). As it is unopposed and for good cause shown, this motion is hereby GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/26/2013. (mr1)
November 25, 2013 61 BRIEF re 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Amicus Citizens for Community Values. (La Rue, Joseph)
November 25, 2013 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Amicus Citizens for Community Values. (La Rue, Joseph)
November 25, 2013 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amicus Citizens for Community Values. (La Rue, Joseph)
November 25, 2013 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. La Rue for Amicus Citizens for Community Values (La Rue, Joseph)
November 20, 2013 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER: This civil action is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Until December 9, 2013 (Doc. 57 ). As it is unopposed and for good cause shown, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction on or before 12/9/13. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/20/2013. (mr1)
November 20, 2013 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 56 Response in Opposition to Motion New date requested 12/9/2013. by Plaintiffs Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
November 18, 2013 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment filed by Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D.. (Coontz, Bridget)
November 15, 2013 55 Supplemental ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint filed by Theodore Wymyslo, M.D.. (Coontz, Bridget)
November 1, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. THEODORE WYMYSLO. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/1/2013. (mr1)
October 30, 2013 Minute Entry: This civil action came before the Court on 10/30/13 at 1:30 p.m. for oral argument on Defendant Dr. Theodore Wymyslo's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 38 ). Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Adam Gerhardstein, and Jacklyn Martin appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs, along with Plaintiffs James Obergefell and Robert Grunn. Attorneys Bridget Coontz and Zachery Keller appeared on behalf of Defendant Wymyslo. Attorney Aaron Herzig appeared on behalf of Defendant Jones. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
October 29, 2013 53 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiffs Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell. Responses due by 11/18/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 29, 2013 52 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Compliance with Court Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Death, John Arthur, # 2 Exhibit B, Certificate of Death, William Herbert Ives) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2013: # 3 Exhibit A) (mr1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2013: # 4 Exhibit B) (mr1). Modified to remove unredacted death certificates and upload redacted death certificates and regenerate NEF on 11/1/2013 (mr1).
October 28, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral argument re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is set for 10/30/2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1 - Cincinnati before Judge Timothy S. Black. The parties' arguments should focus on the issues of (1) whether the Court can rely on the affidavits of Mr. Grunn and Mr. Obergefell in deciding the Motion to Dismiss; (2) whether a close relationship exists between Mr. Grunn and the parties whose rights he is attempting to vindicate; and (3) whether Mr. Grunn can state a first-party § 1983 claim based on his own rights. (mr1)
October 25, 2013 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER: This civil action is before the Court on Defendant Dr. Theodore Wymyslo's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 38 ). The Court hereby orders that the parties present oral argument on the motion on the record by telephone or in Court, 15 minutes a side, on a date, preferably next week, to be determined forthwith. The parties' arguments should focus on the issues of (1) whether the Court can rely on the affidavits of Mr. Grunn and Mr. Obergefell in deciding the Motion to Dismiss; (2) whether a close relationship exists between Mr. Grunn and the parties whose rights he is attempting to vindicate; and (3) whether Mr. Grunn can state a first-party § 1983 claim based on his own rights. Counsel shall forthwith jointly confer with Courtroom Deputy Mary Rogers at 513-564-7640 on the selection of a date and time for this oral argument, and whether by telephone or in Court. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/25/2013. (mr1)
October 22, 2013 51 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Death of Plaintiff John Arthur (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 21, 2013 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D.. (Coontz, Bridget)
October 16, 2013 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 14, 2013 48 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of filing Declaration of James Obergefell re Funeral Director (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Obergefell re Funeral Director) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 11, 2013 47 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of Gary M. Segura (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, Segura CV, # 3 Exhibit B, Segura Sources) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 46 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of Letitia Anne Peplau (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, Peplau CV, # 3 Exhibit B, Peplau Bibliography) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 45 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of Bernard L. McKay (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 44 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of Joanna L. Grossman (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-Grossman CV, # 3 Exhibit B, Family Law Columns, # 4 Grossman Bibliography) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 43 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of Megan Fulcher (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 42 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of George Chauncey (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Chauncey CV, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Chauncey Bibliography) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 41 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell of Filing Expert Report of Susan J. Becker (Attachments: # 1 Expert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Becker Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Becker Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Becker Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Becker Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Becker Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Becker Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Becker Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Becker Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Becker Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Becker Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Becker Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Becker Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Becker Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Becker Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Becker Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit Becker Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Becker Exhibit Q) (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachery Paul Keller for Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. (Keller, Zachery)
October 11, 2013 39 ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint filed by Theodore Wymyslo, M.D.. (Coontz, Bridget)
October 11, 2013 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Theodore Wymyslo, M.D.. Responses due by 11/4/2013 (Coontz, Bridget)
October 11, 2013 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Theodore Wymyslo, M.D. on 9/26/2013, answer due 11/25/2013. (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 11, 2013 36 ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint filed by Camille Jones. (Herzig, Aaron)
October 10, 2013 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Camille Jones on 9/26/2013, answer due 11/25/2013. (Martin, Jacklyn)
October 8, 2013 34 DECLARATION of Robert Grunn filed in Support of Amended Complaint 33 by Plaintiffs John Arthur, Robert Grunn, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert Grunn) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse) Modified to clarify text and create link on 10/9/2013 (tt).
September 26, 2013 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Camille Jones, Theodore Wymyslo, M.D., filed by James Obergefell, David Brian Michener, John Arthur, Robert Grunn. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
September 25, 2013 Minute Entry and NOTATION ORDER: This civil action came on before the Court for a hearing by telephone on Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend the Complaint (Doc. 29 ) and Defendants Governor Kasich and Attorney General DeWine's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 30 ). Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jacklyn Martin, Lisa Meeks, Bridget Coontz, Zachery Keller, Ryan Richardson, and Aaron Herzig participated. For good cause shown, and as Defendants have indicated they do not oppose it, Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend the Complaint (Doc. 29 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint forthwith. Consequently, Defendants Kasich and DeWine's Motion to Dismiss is hereby terminated as MOOT. The state Defendant shall file a Motion to Dismiss as to the newly-added Plaintiff Robert Grunn on or before 10/11/13. Plaintiffs shall file their memorandum in opposition by 10/16/13. Defendants shall file their reply memorandum by 10/21/13. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
September 20, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing re 29 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, 30 MOTION to Dismiss: A Hearing by telephone is set for 9/25/2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
September 20, 2013 32 ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint filed by Camille Jones. (Herzig, Aaron)
September 19, 2013 31 ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint filed by Mike DeWine. (Coontz, Bridget)
September 19, 2013 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich. Responses due by 10/15/2013 (Coontz, Bridget)
September 19, 2013 29 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiffs John Arthur, David Brian Michener, James Obergefell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
September 17, 2013 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER: This civil action is before the Court on Assistant Attorney General Kristopher J. Armstrong's Motion to Withdraw As Co-Counsel for State Defendants Governor John Kasich and Attorney General Mike DeWine (Doc. 27 ). For good cause shown, the motion is hereby GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/17/2013. (mr1)
September 17, 2013 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachery Paul Keller for Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich (Keller, Zachery)
September 17, 2013 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Armstrong, Kristopher)
September 13, 2013 26 Featured Case ENTRY AND ORDER - The joint motion for extension of time for all Defendants to respond is hereby GRANTED. All Defendants are ordered to answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (ECF Doc. No. 24 ) by September 20, 2013. All other dates on the case management schedule will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/13/2013. (mr1)
September 13, 2013 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/20/2013. by Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich. (Coontz, Bridget)
September 4, 2013 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman. (jlw)
September 3, 2013 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Obergefell, John Arthur. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
September 3, 2013 23 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER as per David Michener. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/3/2013. (mr1)
September 3, 2013 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER: This civil action is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc. 20 ). For good cause shown and as Defendants have stipulated that they do not oppose it (Doc 22 ), this motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/3/2013. (mr1)
September 3, 2013 Minute Entry: This civil action came on before the Court for a hearing by telephone on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Re: David Michener (Doc. 21 ). Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jacklyn Martin, and Lisa Meeks participated on behalf of Plaintiffs, Attorney Bridget Coontz participated on behalf of the state Defendants, and Attorney Aaron Herzig participated on behalf of Defendant Jones. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
September 3, 2013 22 STIPULATION by Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
September 3, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: A hearing by telephone on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Re: David Michener is set for TODAY, 9/3/13, at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
September 3, 2013 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re David Michener by Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Michener TRO) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
September 3, 2013 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
August 30, 2013 Minute Entry: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 8/30/13 at 1:00 p.m. Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jacklyn Martin, Lisa Meeks, Jennifer Branch, Bridget Coontz and Aaron Herzig participated. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
August 30, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference by telephone is set for 8/30/2013 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Host Password: 4581; Security code: 123456 and wait on the line for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
August 13, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER OF EXTENSION OF THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/13/2013. (mr1)
August 13, 2013 Featured Case ORDER ESTABLISHING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Defendants' Answer/ Response: 9/13/2013. File Stipulations: 9/27/2013. All Parties File and Exchange Expert Declarations/Opinions. 10/11/2013. All Parties Exchange Rebuttal Expert Declarations/Opinion: 10/25/2013. Close of Discovery: 10/25/2013. Plaintiffs' Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction: 10/29/2013. Defendants' Response to Motion: 11/18/2013. Plaintiffs' Reply: 12/2/2013. Oral Argument on Motion: 12/18/2013 at 10:00 a.m., Cincinnati, Courtroom #1, Room 805. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/13/2013. (mr1)
August 13, 2013 Minute Entry and NOTATION ORDER: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 8/13/13 at 11:00 a.m. Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jennifer Branch, Jacklyn Martin, Lisa Meeks, Bridget Coontz, Ryan Richardson, and Terrance Nestor participated. The parties will confer and email a joint proposed order extending the temporary restraining order to chambers at Black_Chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. today, 8/13/13. The parties' joint case management plan, as adopted by the Court, will issue by separate entry. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
August 13, 2013 18 Joint Case Management Plan by Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich, Plaintiffs James Obergefell, Camille Jones, John Arthur. (Coontz, Bridget) Modified to include all filers on 8/14/2013 (eh1).
August 9, 2013 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Talmadge Meeks for Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell (Meeks, Lisa)
July 30, 2013 16 Featured Case EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/30/2013. (mr1)
July 30, 2013 Minute Entry, NOTATION ORDER, and NOTICE of Telephone Conference: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 7/30/13 at 8:30 a.m. Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jennifer Branch, Jacklyn Martin, Bridget Coontz, and Aaron Herzig participated. Pursuant to Rule 65(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and by agreement of the parties, the expiration of the temporary restraining order (Doc. 14 ) is hereby extended to 8/19/13 at 5:00 p.m., in order to facilitate the parties' further negotiations of a proposed litigation calendar for resolution. A separate Order of extension shall issue. A status conference by telephone is set for 8/13/13 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
July 30, 2013 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Camille Jones on 7/24/2013, answer due 9/23/2013. (Martin, Jacklyn)
July 25, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference by telephone set for 7/31/2013 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 7/30/2013 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
July 24, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference by telephone set for 7/31/2013 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
July 22, 2013 Minute Entry: This civil action came before the Court for a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 3) on 7/22/13 at 1:30 p.m. Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jennifer Branch, and Jacklyn Martin appeared for Plaintiffs, along with Plaintiff James Obergefell. Attorneys Bridget Coontz and Kristopher Armstrong appeared for Defendants Kasich and DeWine. Attorney Aaron Herzig appeared for Defendant Jones. Mr. Obergefell provided sworn testimony. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
July 22, 2013 14 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/22/2013. (mr1)
July 22, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Doc. 3 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/22/2013. (mr1)
July 22, 2013 12 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Filing Revised Proposed TRO (Branch, Jennifer)
July 22, 2013 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Blank Certificate of Death) (Coontz, Bridget)
July 22, 2013 10 RESPONSE to Motion re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Camille Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Herzig, Aaron)
July 22, 2013 9 HEARING MEMORANDUM re MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (doc. 3 ) by Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse) Modified to edit text on 7/22/2013 (mr1).
July 19, 2013 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance A Nestor for Defendant Camille Jones (Nestor, Terrance)
July 19, 2013 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendant Camille Jones (Herzig, Aaron)
July 19, 2013 Minute Entry and Notice of Hearing: This civil action came on before the Court on 7/19/13 at 2:30 p.m. for an informal status conference by telephone pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 65.1. Attorneys Alphonse Gerhardstein, Jacklyn Martin, Jennifer Branch, Bridget Coontz, Kristopher Armstrong, Damian Sikora, Terry Nestor, and Aaron Herzig participated. All parties shall submit briefing on the pending TRO. (Doc. 3). Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a supplemental memorandum and Defense counsel shall file memoranda contra on or before 7/22/13 at 11:00 a.m. This civil action is set for oral argument on the TRO on 7/22/13 at 1:30 p.m. in Cincinnati Courtroom 805. (Court Reporter Mary Ann Ranz, Official.) (jlw)
July 19, 2013 Notice of Hearing: Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 65.1, this civil action is set for an informal conference by telephone on 7/19/13 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mtw)
July 19, 2013 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher J Armstrong for Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich (Armstrong, Kristopher)
July 19, 2013 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget C Coontz for Defendants Mike DeWine, John Kasich (Coontz, Bridget)
July 19, 2013 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacklyn Gonzales Martin for Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell (Martin, Jacklyn)
July 19, 2013 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James Obergefell, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Arthur, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
July 19, 2013 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein for Plaintiffs John Arthur, James Obergefell (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
July 19, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4186919), filed by James Obergefell, John Arthur. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Branch, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obergefell et al v. Kasich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Obergefell
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jacklyn Gonzales Martin
Represented By: Lisa Talmadge Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Arthur
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jacklyn Gonzales Martin
Represented By: Lisa Talmadge Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kasich
Represented By: Kristopher J Armstrong
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: Kristopher J Armstrong
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Jones
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Represented By: Terrance A Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?