JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association v. Buckner et al

Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Defendant: Scherzinger Corporation, Renee A. Buckner, Amtrust, Lorin K Buckner, Eugene Strimling, Alphons M. Veldhuis, Shirta Hines and Christopher Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00025
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Timothy S Black
2 Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This case is before the Court on Defendant Lorin Buckner's motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order remanding this case to the Butler County Court of Common Pleas (Doc. 11). Mr. Buckner argues remand was inappropriate because the parties are diverse. This argument is not well-taken because Mr. Buckner admits he "is a citizen of the State of Ohio for purposes of diversity jurisdiction" and 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) expressly states civil actions "may not be removed if any of the parties in interest... is a citizen of the State in which such action is brought." Accordingly, Mr. Buckner's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/14/19. (rrs)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Reconsideration of Order ____; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of ____; Exhibits by Defendant Lorin K Buckner. (eh)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (rrs)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This case is before the Court on Defendant's Emergency Motion to Enforce the Federal Order/Stay (Doc. 9). Defendant's motion purports to argue that there is a "federal stay" of the underlying foreclosure action because Defendant filed a notice of removal. Defendant's argument is not well-taken. 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) states that, when a defendant files a notice of removal in state court, "the State court shall proceed no further unless and until the case is remanded." On 1/16/19, this Court remanded this case to the Butler County Court of Common Pleas. (Doc. 8). Accordingly, any "federal stay" no longer exists, and Defendant's Emergency Motion (Doc. 9) is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/16/19. (rrs)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for an Order for Show Cause Hearing to Enforce the Federal Order/Stay by Defendant Lorin K Buckner. (eh)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/16/19. (rrs)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 State Court Record received from Defendant Lorin K. Buckner. (Attachments: #1 Record, Part 2) (eh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order originally filed 1/8/2019 in Butler County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. CV2010 01 0035) by Defendant Lorin K Buckner. (eh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint originally filed 5/29/2015 in Butler County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2010 01 0035) filed by Amtrust. (eh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint originally filed 1/19/2010 in Butler County Municipal Court (Case No. CV 2010010035) by Lorin K Buckner. (eh) (eh).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/8/19. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 1/6/2010 in Butler County Court of Common Pleas by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association against all defendants. (eh)
January 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN035856 (eh)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number CV 2010 010035 filed by Lorin K Buckner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association v. Buckner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scherzinger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee A. Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust
Represented By: Stacey M. Piepmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorin K Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Strimling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphons M. Veldhuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirta Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?