Warner v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: McKenna G Warner
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00385
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by K. Lamb Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff McKenna G Warner. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (Vital, R)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Of America/U.S. Attorney and Ohio Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sct) Modified docket text on 6/10/2019 (eh).
May 24, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by McKenna G Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Vital, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKenna G Warner
Represented By: R Matthew Vital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?