United States Of America v. Staggs et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Stephanie Staggs and Ronnie Staggs
Case Number: 1:2019cv00631
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Document #5 reissued by regular and by certified mail this date by Clerk to correct address of defendants Ronnie and Stephanie Staggs. (art)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Certified Mail sent to Ronnie & Stephanie Staggs re: doc. #5 Order to Show Cause. (cb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronnie & Stephanie Staggs re: doc. #5 Order to Show Cause. (cb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Contempt of Court. Show Cause Hearing set for Wed., 10/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 708 - Cincinnati before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Clerk of Court is Directed to issue this order via regular and certified mail to respondents Ronnie Staggs and Stephanie Staggs. It is further Ordered that a copy of this Order be personally served upon respondents Ronnie Staggs and Stephanie Staggs by an official of the IRS within (15) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/9/2019. (art)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for hearing on #1 USA's petition to enforce IRS summons. Counsel for USA (Nicholas Pantel) present, defendants not present. Court to issue a show cause order to defendants regarding their failure to appear at today's hearing. Order of the Court to follow. Hearing held on 9/9/2019. (Court Reporter Maryann Maffia.) (art)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States Of America re #2 Order to Show Cause, (Pantel, Nicholas)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for Monday, 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 708 - Cincinnati before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. IRS official within (30) days of this Order shall serve a copy of the petition and exhibits personally upon respondents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/1/2019. (art)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pantel, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Staggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Nicholas John Pantel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?