Lin v. United States Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Yong Lin
Defendant: Acting DHS Secretary and United States Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00731
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendants Acting DHS Secretary, United States Attorney General (King, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Acting DHS Secretary, United States Attorney General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to the marshal for service(jlw) Modified on 9/9/2019 (jlw).
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Acting DHS Secretary, United States Attorney General, filed by Yong Lin. (jlw)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/7/2019. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Yong Lin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. United States Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting DHS Secretary
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?