El-Bey et al v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Jhonali One Eye El-Bey and Nichole L. Taylor
Defendant: Holland, Butler, L. Wallace, S. Davis, The City of Franklin, Rossell and Franklin Police Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00389
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Summons forms received for Defendants, L. Wallace, Rossell, Butler, Holland, S. Davis, and Franklin Police Department. USM-285 Forms received for Defendants, L. Wallace, Rossell, Butler, Holland, and S. Davis. (kl)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/26/2021. To the extent Mr. El-Bey requests that defendants be ordered to pay the filing fee in this case, the request is DENIED. The Court GRANTS the #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and authorizes commencement of this action without prepayment of fees or costs as to Mr. El-Bey. Within thirty (30) days of receipt of this Order, Mr. El-Bey is ORDERED to submit a summons form and copy of the complaint for each named defendant so that service of process may be made in this case. Ms. Taylor has neither paid the filing fee nor filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. Therefore, this matter shall be considered as filed solely by Mr. El-Bey. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. A copy of the complaint and blank summons forms included in mailing to plaintiff.) Modified on 7/26/2021 (eh).
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jhonali One Eye El-Bey. (bjc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jhonali One Eye El-Bey (bjc)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that plaintiffs pay the full filing fee of $402.00. If plaintiffs are unable to afford the filing fee in this case, they must each submit an application and affidavit to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 06/14/2021. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Butler, S. Davis, Franklin Police Department, Holland, Rossell, The City of Franklin, L. Wallace, filed by Jhonali One Eye El-Bey, Nichole L. Taylor (complaint submitted with USM-285 Forms and no summons forms). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (bjc). Modified To Fix Upside-Down Page in Complaint on 6/10/2021 (bjc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Bey et al v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhonali One Eye El-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?