November 16, 2022 |
Filing
229
OPINION AND ORDER granting 225 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 11/16/22. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 13, 2022 |
Filing
216
OPINION AND ORDER deferring ruling on 211 Motion to Stay; denying 212 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 213 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 6/13/22. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 24, 2022 |
Filing
210
OPINION AND ORDER granting 206 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 5/24/22. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 17, 2020 |
Filing
170
ORDER - Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide written confirmation of his continued intention to seek the assistance of counsel as set forth in his filing of April 29, 2020. (ECF No. 168.) Plaintiff shall file this written confirmation on or before JANUARY 19, 2021. Status Report due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/17/2020. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 20, 2020 |
Filing
169
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 142 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 162 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 11/20/20. (ds)
|
March 4, 2020 |
Filing
163
ORDER ADOPTING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 162 DENYING 142 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Lionel Harris and DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 139 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michelle Lovette, Melanie Fultz, Cynthia Ricker, McQueary, Hayes, Aaron Sowers, Chamberlain. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 03/04/2020. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 11, 2020 |
Filing
162
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF No. 132 ), Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel (ECF No. 133 ), and Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 144 ) are DENIED and Plaintif f's Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Affidavit (ECF No. 154 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 139 ) be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and that Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 142 ) be DENIED. (Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 11, 2020. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 27, 2019 |
Filing
129
ORDER - Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel 96 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Plaintiff's Motion for Expenses 109 is DENIED. The Court will issue a new discovery schedule by separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 27, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing
115
ORDER - Adopting the Report and Recommendations Docs. 98 and 99 , denies 51 , the motion for preliminary injunction, and denies 78 ; the defendants can litigate the qualified immunity defense in summary judgment proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 8/23/2018. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 2, 2018 |
Filing
99
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that 78 MOTION to Dismiss Raising Qualified Immunity as an Affirmative Defense filed by Melanie Fultz, Cynthia Ricker, Hayes, Aaron Sowers, Chamberlain be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 2, 2018. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
53
OPINION AND ORDER denying 45 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 28, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
9
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 8 Report and Recommendations, and dismisses the retaliation claim against Jill Gillespie, and permits plaintiff to proceed on the remainder of his claims. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12/19/2016. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing
8
INITIAL SCREEN REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 7 Complaint: It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's retaliation claims against Defendant Gillespie be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) (2)(B) for failure to state a claim for relief on w hich relief can be granted. It is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed with his remaining claims. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/14/2016. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|